Aloha Airlines, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Hawaii Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 08-00337
District Judge Bankruptcy Lloyd King, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
Space Brian G. Rich +1 850 561 3010 +1 850 561 3013 brich@bergersingerman.com
Space Paul Steven Singerman +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 singerman@bergersingerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/10/2008 David C Farmer +1 808 222 3133 +1 866 559 2922 farmerd001@hawaii.rr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marshall Sanford Sinick +1 202 626 6651 msinick@ssd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by wcelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil J. Verbrugge +5331 533 533 1877 nverbrugge@wcelaw.com
No Logo Dane S. Field, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagner Choi & Verbrugge

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison A. Ito +1 808 533 1877 +1 808 566 6900 aito@hibklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Watanabe Ing & Komeiji, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Komeiji +5448 544 544 8300

Toggle Switch Represented by wcelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck C. Choi +5331 533 533 1877 cchoi@wcelaw.com
Space Neil J. Verbrugge +5331 533 533 1877 nverbrugge@wcelaw.com
Space James A. Wagner +5331 533 533 1877
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/25/2008 Carol K Muranaka +1 808 522 8150

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis B. Ching +5228 522 522 8150 curtis.b.ching@usdoj.gov
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/04/2008 Carole Neville +1 212 421 4100
Space Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Tweeter Opco, LLC, et al.

Pro Se

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/04/2008 Fruman Jacobson +1 312 876 8000 +1 312 876 7934 fjacobson@sonnenschein.com
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1897 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Service ; Exhibits "A" and "B". Filed by James A. Wagner. (Related document(s): 1896 ). (Wagner, James) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1896 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
    Supplemental Application to Employ KMH, LLP as Benefit Plan Audit Service Provider for the Debtor Pension Plans Nunc Pro Tunc to August 1, 2010; Exhibits "A" - "D;" Declaration of John P. Quinn. Filed by Trustee Dane S. Field. (Wagner, James) **Modified on 1/7/2011 to add relation to document no. 1523 ** (LL). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1890
        LREF
        Blank 1889
          LREF
          Blank 1853
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1821
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1820
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Blank 1815
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1812
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1809
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1807
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1806
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1805
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1801
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1800
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Blank 1593
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1590
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1589
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1588
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1587
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Blank 1580
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1576
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1571
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Blank 1404
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1330 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment; BNC Certificate of Service (related document(s): 1329 ) Service Date 03/07/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/07/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Order Concerning Auction Sale (related document(s) 1328 Memorandum Decision, 1130 Motion to Approve, 1295 Order to Show Cause, , ). Date of Entry: 3/5/2009. (LL, ) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Memorandum Concerning Auction Sale (related document(s) 1130 Motion to Approve, 1295 Order to Show Cause, , ). Date of Entry: 3/5/2009. (LL, ) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 1327 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Stipulated Order Modifying Automatic Stay to Permit Setoff Date of Entry: 3/5/2009. (LL, ) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Minutes of Hearing held on: 03/03/2009 Proceedings: (LK)-1)Order to Show Cause re Sale of Intellectual Property and 2)Further Hearing to Confirm the Sale of Intellectual Property to Yucaipa-the sale is declared invalid for reasons stated for the record; the trustee will propose a new sale. Also, the trustee is ordered to return deposit to Hawaiian Airlines since they are no longer interested in being the back-up bid. (related dkts # 1130 , # 1295 ). Appearances: James Wagner/Chuck Choi (trustee); Dane Field-trustee; Robert Klyman (Yucaipa); Ted Pettit (GMAC Commercial Finance); Curtis Ching-USTRO; Cuyler Shaw (State of Hawaii); Tom Roesser/Sidney Levinson (HA); Rebecca Covert (International Association of Machinist); Kurt Leong/Jeffrey Bartos (AFA); Tina Colman (Ing Family Partnership); by TELECONFERENCE CALL-Bartos/Levinson. (vCal Hearing ID (58407)). (courtrm,ov). (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Stipulated Order to Modify Automatic Stay (Debra Gottman) Date of Entry: 2/26/2009. (LL, ) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate of Service Re: Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Response to Order to Show Cause; Declaration of Hoyt H. Zia in Support of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Response to Order to Show Cause; Exhibit A. Filed by Tom E. Roesser. (Related document(s): 1319 ). (Roesser, Tom) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Service ; Exhibit "A". Filed by Chuck C. Choi. (Related document(s): 1318 ). (Choi, Chuck) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate of Service to IAM Supplemental Statement. Filed by Rebecca L. Covert. (Related document(s): 1321 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A# 2 Exhibit(s) B) (Covert, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Supplemental IAM Response to Motion for Order to Approve sale of Aloha IP . Filed by Creditor Int'l Ass'n of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1245. (Related document(s): 1130 Motion to Approve,, filed by Dane S. Field, 1296 Response,, filed by Int'l Ass'n of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1245). (Covert, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Response to Order to Show Cause re Sale of Debtors' Intellectual Property . Filed by Interested Parties Yucaipa Corporate Initiatives Fund I, L.P., Yucaipa Corporate Initiatives Fund I, LLC. (Related document(s): 1295 Order to Show Cause,, ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A# 2 Exhibit(s) B# 3 Certificate of Service) (Klyman, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 1182
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1146
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 952
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 929
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 917
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 842
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 731
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 728
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 726
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 725
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 517
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 516
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 382
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 364
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 356
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 294
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?