Galpin v. American Greetings, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00880
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Terry Galpin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Levin Livingston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Davis mdavis@davislevin.com
v.
American Greetings Corporation American Greetings Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Bennett +1 808 586 1180

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Joseph Brogan +1 202 879 3926 +1 202 626 1700 JonesDayMDL1570@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Buell Marshall +1 202 879 7611 +1 202 626 1700 abmarshall@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David T. Miller +1 202 879 3939 +1 832 239 3600 dtmiller@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George J. Moscarino +1 202 897 3939
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Walker +1 216 586 7207 +1 216 579 0212 rswalker@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Watanabe Ing & Komeiji, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Winegar +5448 544 544 8300
No Logo Erwin Weiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Prudential Financial

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah K. Wright +1 214 777 4500 +1 214 721 6087 deborah.wright@prudential.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Watanabe Ing & Komeiji, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/19/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Winegar +5448 544 544 8300
No Logo Magnivision, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Bennett +1 808 586 1180

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Joseph Brogan +1 202 879 3926 +1 202 626 1700 JonesDayMDL1570@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Buell Marshall +1 202 879 7611 +1 202 626 1700 abmarshall@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David T. Miller +1 202 879 3939 +1 832 239 3600 dtmiller@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George J. Moscarino +1 202 897 3939
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Walker +1 216 586 7207 +1 216 579 0212 rswalker@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Watanabe Ing & Komeiji, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Winegar +5448 544 544 8300
No Logo Steve Crellin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Watanabe Ing & Komeiji, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/19/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Winegar +5448 544 544 8300
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent T. White +5225 522 522 5900
No Logo Hawaii Women Lawyers, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lea O. Hong +5241 524 524 1800 +1 808 524 5976
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louise K.Y. Ing ling@ahfi.com
No Logo Legislative and Public Policy Director, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "National Employment Lawyers Association"

Toggle Switch Represented by American Savings Bank Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl M. Varady carl@varadylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaiiemploymentrights.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Simons +5363 536 536 3255 dsimons@hawaiiemploymentrights.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (293) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: None
Certification by defendant Erwin Weiss Re: Destruction of Confidential Documents; certificate of service (gab) (Entered: 11/24/2000)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
    EP : status conference held 9/13/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Status Conference Re Dismissal held. Case settled. Parties circulating settlement documents. Nadine Ando communicated with Deborah Wright. ( Ct Rptr : No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 09/14/2000)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
      EO : Status Conference Re Dismissal cont from 9-11-00 to 9-13-00 @ 8:30, BMK. Notified: Michael Livingston, Deborah Wright, Thomas Sylvester thru Sandy, William McCorriston. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 09/13/2000)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
        EO : status conference re dismissal cont from 8/31/00 to 9:30 9/11/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Livingston to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 09/11/2000)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
          EO : status conference re dismissal set for 8:45 8/31/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Michael Livingston to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 08/30/2000)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None
            JUDGMENT: action is dismissed with prejudice re [287-2] (cc: all counsel) (eps) (Entered: 08/22/2000)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER of dismissal by Judge Helen Gillmor terminating case (cc: all counsel) (eps) (Entered: 08/22/2000)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                EO : status conference re dismissal cont from 8/17/00 to 9:30 8/30/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Sheryl from Wright's office to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 08/21/2000)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                  EO : status conference re dismissal cont from 8/14/00 to 9:00 8/17/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Betty from Livingston's office to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 08/14/2000)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                    EO : status conference re dismissal cont from 8/7/00 to 9:00 8/14/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Thomas Sylvester to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 08/09/2000)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Suspending proceedings - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - [agreement of the parties that all further proceedings in this matter be and herey are suspended until further order of this court; alll other matters shall be subject of a stipulated confidentiality order and the transcript of today's proceedings shall be sealed] - on behalf of defendants (lmg) (Entered: 07/26/2000)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                        EP : settlement on the record - sealed hearing held; trial dates and deadlines vacated; ;status conference re dismissal set for 9:00 8/7/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; notified: Kathryn Koshi, David Hisashima ( Ct Rptr : tape) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg) (Entered: 07/26/2000)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: None
                          EP : ;final pretrial conference held on 07/21/00 ; further settlement conference held ( Ct Rptr : No record) JUDGE (lmg) (Entered: 07/26/2000)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION; motion by defendants for leave to participate amici curiae ; memorandum in support of motion; and certificate of service - set for 2:00 8/16/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg) (Entered: 07/19/2000)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: None
                              PRETRIAL STATEMENT by defendant Erwin Weiss'; exhibit 1; certificate of service (lmg) (Entered: 07/17/2000)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: None
                                PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT by plaintiff's; exhibit a; certificate of service (lmg) (Entered: 07/17/2000)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: None
                                  PRETRIAL STATEMENT of defendants American Greetings, and Magnivision, Inc.; certificate of service (lmg) (Entered: 07/17/2000)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: None
                                    PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Steve Crellin's; certificate of service (lmg) (Entered: 07/17/2000)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 07/14/2000)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 07/14/2000)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff for an order precluding discovery into plaintiff's sexual conduct with an unrelated party outside the workplace and for order striking deposition testimony of Bob Kogen ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Mark S. Davis; exhibits 1-3; and certificate of service - set for 2:00 8/11/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 07/13/2000)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION as to documents numbered AGMV 0030137 - AGMV 0030182; AGMV 0030183 - AGMV 0030246; and AGMV 0030644 - AGMV 0030654 - by plaintiff (afc) (Entered: 07/13/2000)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part defts American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records [183-1] - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - by defts (afc) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 07/05/2000)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren denying defts American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel credit information release forms from plaintiff [196-1] - by plaintiff (afc) (Entered: 07/03/2000)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/28/2000)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/28/2000)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion to terminate or limit deposition upon oral examination of plaintiff, filed on June 13, 2000 - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - on behalf of defendants (lmg) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision for attorney Stephen J. Brogan to appear pro hac vice ; affidavit of Stephen J. Brogan; affidavit of consent of Nadine Y. Ando; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/26/2000)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/26/2000)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        EO : MINUTE ORDER On June 13, 2000, the Court heard arguments from each of the parties in this action and took under submission the summary judgment motion of Defendant American Greetings Corp. and Magnivision Inc. and the summary judgment motions of Defendants Steve Crellin and Erwin Weiss. At the hearing, Plaintiff and the various defendants attempted to present to the Court additional documents and evidence that had not been included in the previous filings presented to the Court. The parties also summarized the testimony of various witnesses without having exact citations to the testimony. In response to these actions by the parties, and in order to insure a full and clear record, the Court allowed the parties to provide to the Court citations to certain testimony referenced at oral argument, and to present responses to limited issues raised at the hearing. The Court instructed the parties as to what they should present to the Court at the end of the hearing, and also memorialized these instructions in a Minute Order dated June 13, 2000.In response to the Court's specific instructions as memorialized by the June 13, 2000 Minute Order, the parties submitted a flurry of letters, as follows: 1. June 14, 2000 letter from Michael K. Livingston, addressing four separate questions. Attached to this letter is the June 2, 2000 declaration of Sharon Miller. 2. June 19, 2000 letter from Deborah K. Wright, responding to the points raised in Mr. Livingston's June 14 letter. 3. June 19, 2000 letter from Thomas Sylvester, responding to the points raised in Mr. Livingston's June 14 letter. 4. June 19, 2000 letter from Alison Marshal, responding to the points raised in Mr. Livingston's June 14 letter. 5. June 20, 2000 letter from Michael Livingston, stating that Defendants' three letters in response to his June 14 letter were improper as they exceeded the scope of the Court's instructions at oral argument and as set forth in the Court's June 13, 2000 Minute Order.6. June 20, 2000 letter from Deborah Wright, responding to Mr. Livingston's June 20 letter. 7. June 21, 2000 letter from Thomas Sylvester, responding to Mr. Livingston's June 20 letter.The Court has reviewed each of these letters, and determines that portions of the letters clearly exceed the scope of the Court's instructions at the June 13, 2000 hearing and in the Court's June 13, 2000 Minute Order. Defendants utilized the letters to provide further argument including case citations. It was not the Court's intent to allow this type of belated argument. Rather than striking any of the material, the Court allows Mr. Livingston a last letter limited to five pages responding to the arguments raised in the defendants' letters by Wednesday, June 28, 2000. The parties shall otherwise present no additional argument or evidence with respect to the various motions for summary judgment in this matter at this stage, and the Court will not consider any other additional letter submissions. cc: Michael Livingston, Mark Davis Alison Marshal, Nadine Ando; Deborah K. Wright; Thomas Sylvester; Judge Gillmor's chambers re [120-1], re [118-1], re [116-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (eps) (Entered: 06/23/2000)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/23/2000)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/23/2000)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/23/2000)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/23/2000)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  EP: plaintiff's motion to terminate or limit deposition upon oral examination of plaintiff [222-1] - GRANTED in part; Shumaker to prepare order (Ct Rptr: Tape-C6) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 06/23/2000)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to the Honorable Helen Gillmor from Deborah K. Wright (attorney for deft Erwin Weiss), in response to attorney Michael Livingston's letter dated 06/20/00 [243-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to the Honorable Helen Gillmor from Michael K. Livingston (attorney for plaintiff Terry Galpin) in re: 06/13/00 minute order [223-1] and in re: M's/SJ [120-1], [118-1], [116-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                        FACSIMILE LETTER addressed to the Honorable Helen Gillmor from Alison B. Marshall (attorney for defts American Greetings Corp, and Magnivision) in re: defts' M/SJ hearing on 06/13/00 and in response to pltf's counsel's letter to the court dated 06/14/00 [116-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to the Honorable Helen Gillmor Deborah K. Wright (attorney for deft Erwin Weiss) re: response to Michael K. Livingston's June 14, 2000 letter to the Court in re: motions for SJ [225-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to the Honorable Helen Gillmor from Thomas R. Sylvester (attorney for deft Steve Crellin) re: opposing pltf's additional submission dated 06/14/00 [225-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    EP:American Greetings and Magnivision's M/Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories Regarding Plaintiff's Medical History and Medical Records [183-1]- pltf to turn over her medical records by close of business on 6-28-00. Supplemental response to interrogatories as to status of any medical records no longer in pltf's or her husband's possession to be prepared by close of business on 6-28-00. Shumaker to prepare order. American Greetings and Magnivision's M/Compel Credit Information Release Forms From Plaintiff [196-1] - DENIED. Livingston to prepare order. Pltf's M/Terminate or Limit Deposition Upon Oral Examination of Plaintiff [222-1] moved from 07/13/00 to 06/20/00 at 9:30 a.m. BMK (Ct Rptr: Tape-C6) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 235 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision in opposition to plaintiff's motion to terminate or limit deposition upon oral examination of plaintiff [222-1]; declaration of Michael R. Shumaker; exhibits A-C; certificate of service (SEALED) (afc) (Entered: 06/20/2000)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/19/2000)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision in support of defts' motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records [183-1]; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibit 1; certificate of service (SEALED) (afc) (Entered: 06/19/2000)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision in support of their motion to compel credit information release forms from plaintiff [196-1]; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibits 1 and 2; certificate of service (SEALED) (afc) (Entered: 06/19/2000)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to file under seal defts American Greetings Corp. and Magnivision, Inc.'s reply memorandum in support of defts' M/compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibit a; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting defendant American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel the deposition of Michael J. Galpin or preclude his testimony at trial - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren [180-1] (cc: all counsel) (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to the Honorable Helen Gillmor in RESPONSE to defts motions for summary judgment; appendices a and b [120-1], [118-1], [116-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Lieutenant Commander Sharon Miller - by plaintiff (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              EP:DEFENDANT AMERICAN GREETINGS CORP. and MAGNIVISION, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [116-1]; DEFENDANT ERWIN WEISS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [120-1]; DEFENDANT STEVE CRELLIN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [118-1]; The Court heard arguments from each of the parties in this action, and took the case under submission. With respect to additional submissions and responses by the parties, the Court orders as follows: 1. Defendants Magnivision and American Greetings Corp. argued in their reply memorandum that Ellen Piloto and Marceline Hamman, during their depositions, retracted statements they had made in their declarations. Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's arguments regarding these two depositions by Wednesday June 14, 2000. Defendants may respond by Monday June 19, 2000. 2. During oral argument, Plaintiff's counsel referenced the deposition testimony of Plaintiff concerning statements made by Jeff Taylor with respect to Plaintiff securing military accounts on behalf of Magnivision. Plaintiff's counsel was unable to offer a citation to the record for this testimony. If Plaintiff desires that the Court consider this testimony, Plaintiff's counsel must submit to the Court a citation to the record for the testimony by Wednesday June 14, 2000. (Ct Rptr: Stephen Platt) JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (cc: Michael K. Livingston, Esq. Nadine S. Ando, Esq. Alison B. Marshall, Esq. Deborah K. Wright, Esq. Thomas R. Sylvester, Esq. Judge Gillmor's chambers) (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Terry Galpin to terminate or limit deposition upon oral examination of plaintiff ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Mark S. Davis; exhibit a; certificate of service - set for 2:00 7/13/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to defendants American Greetings Corp. and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records [183-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiff's in opposition to defendants American Greetings Corp. and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel credit information release forms from plaintiff [196-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDMENT to disclosure statement; certificate of service - by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision (amending "their disclosure statement filed on March 12, 1999) (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER by defendant Erwin Weiss in defts American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel credit information release forms from plaintiff [196-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to plaintiff's supplemental opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment [116-1]; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibits a-b; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY by defendant Erwin Weiss in response to plaintiff's supplemental master memorandum in opposition in opposition to defendant Erwin Weiss' motion for summary judgment (dated 06/06/00); affidavit of Deborah K. Wright; exhibits a-b; certificate of service [120-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED spearate concise STATEMENT of material facts by plaintiff in support of plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to corporate defendants American Greetings and Magnivision's motion for summary judgment [116-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED separate concise STATEMENT of material facts by plaintiff in support of plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to defendant Erwin Weiss' motion for summary judgment; certificate of service [120-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED separate concise STATEMENT of material facts by plaintiff in support of plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to defendant Steve Crellin's motion for summary judgment [118-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          EO: On April 28, 2000, each of the three Defendants in this action filed a motion for summary judgment. On May 25, 2000, Plaintiff's filed an Ex Parte Motion for leave to file a consolidated memorandum in opposition to these motions no longer than 65 pages in length. On the same day, the Court granted Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion. The Court required, however, that Plaintiff file three separate concise statements of fact, one in response to each of the defendants' concise statements of fact. On May 26, 2000, Plaintiff filed three concise statements of fact, one in response to each motion. Plaintiff's concise statement of facts, however, fail to comply with Local Rule LR 56.1(b). Plaintiff's counsel was notified on Wednesday, June 7 of this error. The Court hereby strikes Plaintiff's separate and concise statement of facts in response to each of the three defendant's separate and concise statement of facts. Plaintiff shall file three amended separate and concise statements of fact, which properly follow LR 56.1 and this Court's memorandum explaining that rule, by 12:00 p.m. on Friday June 9, 2000. Plaintiff, in her revised concise statement of facts, should either state "disputed" or "undisputed" with respect to each of the particular defendant's factual statements, as required by the rule and as set forth in the examples attached to this Court's Memorandum re: Compliance with Local Rule LR 56.1. Evidentiary support is required for each response. Please note the requirement that, "material facts put forward by the moving party's separate concise statement are deemed admitted unless controverted by the separate concise statement of the opposing party." [120-1],[118-1], [116-1] striking statements: [160-1], [159-1], [158-1] () JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/3/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to compel credit information release forms from plaintiff ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibits 1-8; certificate of service - set for 11:00 6/19/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 06/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision shorten time for hearing on defts M/compel credit information release forms from plaintiff (motion submitted on June 5, 2000); declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP: Steve Crellin's and Erwin Weiss' M/Order Compelling Plaintiff Terry Galpin's Attendance at FRCvP Rule 35 Examination [168-1] and American Greetings Corp. and Magnivision, Inc.'s M/Order Requiring Plaintiff Terry Galpin to Submit to a Mental Examination [166-1] GRANTED in part. Defts allowed one psychiatrist and one psychologist. Appropriate testing allowed. Each examination to be completed in a day. Parties may apply to the court if time frame needs to be extended. Livingston to prepare order. M/Compel Deposition of Michael J. Galpin or Preclude His Testimony at Trial [180-1] GRANTED. Capt. Galpin's deposition to be taken no later than 7-6-00 and preferably 6-17-00 or 6-18-00. Moscarino to prepare order. Settlement Conference held. (Ct Rptr : Tape-C6) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 06/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MASTER MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to defts American Greetings Corp and Magnivision Inc.'s motion for summary judgment [116-1], to deft Erwin Weiss' motion for summary judgment [118-1], to deft Steve Crellin's motion for summary judgment [120-1]; declaration of Michael K. Livingston; exhibit 44; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER by defendant Steve Crellin n defts American Greetings Corp and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel the deposition of Michael J. Galpin or preclude his testimony trial [180-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION of defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision for leave to file reply memorandum of law in support of their motion for summary judmgent in excess of page limitation; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; Order - by Judge Helen Gillmor; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 188 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by defendant Steve Crellin, defendant Erwin Weiss to plaintiff's master memorandum in opposition to: (1) defendants American Greetings Corp. and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for an order requiring plaintiff Terry Galpin to submit to a mental examination [166-1], and (2) defendant Steve Crellin's and Erwin Weiss' motion for order compelling plaintiff Terry Galpin's attendant at Fed R. Civ Pro Rule 35 examination [168-1]; certificate of service (SEALED) (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER shortening time - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - ordered that motion to compel the deposition of Michael J. Galpin or preclude his testimony at trial [180-1] shall be set for hearing on June 6, 2000 at 2:00 in Courtroom 6, and the Motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records [183-1] shall be heard before Mag Judge Kurren on June 19, 2000 at 11:00 in Courtroom 6; further ordered that plaintiff may file any opposition to this motion on or before 06/13/00, and defts may file any reply on or before 06/16/00 at 4:00 p.m. (cc: all counsel) (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER by defendant Steve Crellin in defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records [183-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by defendant Erwin Weiss in defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc's motion to compel the deposition of Michael J. Galpin or preclude his testimony at trial [180-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER by defendant Erwin Weiss in defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records [183-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/7/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibits 1-28; certificate of service - referred to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (SEALED) (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to file under seal defendants American Greetings Corp's and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records; certificate of service - (re: document 183) (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to shorten time for hearing on defts American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s (1) motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories regarding plaintiff's medical history and medical records and (2) motion to compel the deposition of Michael J. Galpin or preclude his testimony at trial[180-1]; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; ORDER; certificate of service - referred to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/15/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to compel the deposition of Michael J. Galpin or preclude his testimony at trial ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibits 1-12; certificate of service - set for 2:00 6/6/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to plaintiff's master memorandum in opposition to (1) deft American Greetings Corp. and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for an order requiring plaintiff Terry Galpin to submit to a mental examination [166-1], and (2) deft Steve Crellin's and Erwin Weiss' motion for order compelling plaintiff Terry Galpin's attendant at Fed R. Civ Pro Rule 35 examination [168-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MASTER MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Terry Galpin in opposition to (1) defts American Greetings Corp. and Magnivision Inc.'s motion for an order requiring plaintiff Terry Galpin to submit to a mental examination [166-1], and (2) deft Steve Crellin's and Erwin Weiss' motion for order compelling plaintiff Terry Galpin's attendant at Fed R. Civ Pro Rule 35 examination [168-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by defendant Steve Crellin to plaintiff's master memorandum in opposition to (1) Corporate Defendants American Greetings and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment [116-1], (2) deft Erwing Weiss' motion for summary judgment [120-1], and (3) deft Steve Crellin's motion for summary judgment [118-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to pltf's opposition filed on 05/26/00 to defts' M/SJ filed 04/28/00; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibits A-N; certificate of service [116-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by defendant Erwin Weiss to plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to deft Weiss' M/SJ; affidavit of Deborah K. Wright; exhibits 1-5; certificate of service [120-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUBMISSION OF ORIGINAL DECLARATION of Daryl Matthews in support of defendants American Greetings Corp and Magnivision Inc.'s motion for order requiring plainitff to submit to a mental exam; certificate of service - by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision re [166-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUBMISSION OF ORIGINAL DECLARATION of Reneau Kennedy in support of defts American Greetings Corp and Magnivision Inc.'s M/order requiring plaintiff to submit to a mental exam; certificate of service - by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision re [166-1] (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant Steve Crellin re [168-1] to file under seal defendant Steve Crellin's and Erwin Weiss' motion for order compelling plaintiff Terry Galpin's attendance at Fed R Civ Pro Rule 35 examination ; declaration of Thomas R. Sylvester; certificate of service - SEALED (eps) (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Erwin Weiss, defendant Steve Crellin for order compelling plaintiff Terry Galpin's attendant at Fed R. Civ Pro Rule 35 examination ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of Thomas R. Sylvester; exhibit a; certificate of compliance; certificate of service - set for 2:00 6/6/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - SEALED (eps) (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant Steve Crellin shorten time for hearing defendants Steve Crellin's and Erwin Weiss' moton for order compelling plaintiff Terry Galpin's attendant at Fed R. Civ Pro Rule 35 examination lodged on May 26, 2000 ; declaration of Thomas R. Sylvester; certificate of service (eps) (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision for an order requiring plaintiff Terry Galpin to submit to a mental examination ; memorandum of law in support of motion; affidavit of Nadine Y. Ando; exhitis 1-6; certificate of service - set for 2:00 6/6/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - SEALED (eps) Modified on 05/31/2000 (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to file under seal motion for an order requiring plaintiff Terry Galpin to submit to a mental examination ; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibit a; certificate of service - SEALED counsel) (eps) (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision shorten time for an order requiring plaintiff Terry Galpin to submit to a mental examination (motion submitted on May 25, 2000) ; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; certificate of service - hrng set 6/6/00 @ 2; response shall be filed by 6/2/00; reply due 6/5/00 - SEALED (eps) Modified on 05/31/2000 (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (eps) (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA by plaintiff Terry Galpin to memorandum in opposition [154-1] to 1) Corporate defendants American Greetings Corp and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment; 2) deft Erwin Weiss' motion for summary judgment; 3) defendant Steve Crellin's motion for summary judgment, filed May 26, 2000; certificate of service (eps) (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of hearing ; Pretrial conference set for 8:30 8/17/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor (cc: all counsel) (eps) (Entered: 05/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Separate concise STATEMENT of material facts by plaintiff Terry Galpin in support of plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to defendant Steve Crellin's motion for summary judgment [118-1]; certificate of service (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Separate concise STATEMENT of material facts by plaintiff Terry Galpin in suppport of plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to defendant Erwin Weiss' motion for summary judgment [120-1]; certificate of service (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Separate concise STATEMENT of material facts by plaintiff Terry Galpin in support of plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to corporate defendants American Greetings and Magnivision's motion for summary judgment [116-1]; certificate of service (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MASTER MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Terry Galpin in opposition to corporate defendants American Greetings Corp & Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment [116-1], to defendant Erwin Weiss' motion for summary judgment [120-1], to defendant Steve Crellin's motion for summary judgment [118-1]; declaration of Michael K. Livingston; declaration of Terry Galpin; exhibits 1-43; certificate (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for leave to file memorandum in opposition to defendants' motions for summary judgment in excess of page limitation; declaration of Michael K. Livingston; certificate of service; and Order by Judge Helen Gillmor by plaintiff Terry Galpin re [120-1], re [118-1], re [116-1] - pltf shall provide 3 separate concise statements of material facts, one per deft (eps) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to admit for attorney Michael R. Shumaker to appear pro hac vice , affidavit of Michael R. Shumaker; for attorney Michael P. Gurdak to appear pro hac vice ; affidavit of Michael P. Gurdak; affidavit of consent of Nadine Y. Endo; certificate of service counsel) (eps) (Entered: 05/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP : discovery conference held; depo of Erwin Weiss to be taken the week of 5/29/00; Weiss to be made available for 3 mornings; ddl for disclosure of experts to remain unchanged; expert reports may be supplemented if necessary; M/SJ to remain as sched on 6/13/00 HG; suppl to opp to motion based on Weiss material due 6/6/00; reply to suppl due 6/9/00; notified Jeff Collins, Judge Gillmor's law clerk ( Ct Rptr : No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 05/15/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO : discovery conference set for 9:00 5/12/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Lynn from Davis office to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 05/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA sheet regarding defendant Steve Crellin's motion for summary judgment; certificate of service - by defendant Steve Crellin to [118-1] (eps) (Entered: 05/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTION to defendant Erwin Weiss' memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment, filed April 28, 2000; exhibit "a"; certificate of service by defendant Erwin Weiss to [120-1] (eps) (Entered: 05/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND STIPULATED amendment to rule 16 scheduling order filed 12/20/99 and ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : [Rule 26(2) disclosures: pltf - 6/1/00, defts- 7/12/00] - on behalf of defendants (wnn) (Entered: 05/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 05/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of original DECLARATION of Steve Crellin in support of motion for summary judgment filed on April 28, 2000; certificate of service - by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision re [116-1] (eps) (Entered: 05/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submission of original DECLARATION of Jo Turner in support of motion for summary judgment filed on 4/28/00; certificate of service - by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision re [116-1] (eps) (Entered: 05/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submission of original DECLARATION of Ron Peer in support of motion for summary judgment filed on 4/28/00; certificate of service - defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision re [116-1] (eps) (Entered: 05/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Erwin Weiss; exhibit "a"; certificate of service - by defendant Erwin Weiss re [120-1] (eps) (Entered: 05/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Erwin Weiss in support of motion for summary judgment [120-1]; exhibits "a"-"w"; certificate of service (fe) (Entered: 05/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Erwin Weiss for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; affidavit of Deborah K. Wright; exhibits "1"-"9"; certificate of service - set for 9:45 6/13/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor (fe) (Entered: 05/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Steve Crellin in support of motion for summary judgment [118-1]; declaration of Steve Crellin; declaration of Ron Peer; affidavit of Anna M. Elento-Sneed; exhibits "a"-"p"; certificate of service (fe) (Entered: 05/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Steve Crellin for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - set for 9:45 6/13/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor (fe) (Entered: 05/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision in support of motion for summary judgment [116-1]; declaration of Christopher J. Cole; exhibits 1-42; certificate of service (fe) (Entered: 05/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision for summary judgment ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of William Barrington; declaration of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibits a-y; declaration of Christopher J. Cole; exhibits 1-4; cerficate of service - set for 9:45 6/13/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor (fe) (Entered: 05/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE MOTION and Order - GRANTED by Judge Helen Gillmor by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision for leave to filel memorandum of law in support of their motion for summary judgment in excess of page limitation ; declaration of Nadien Y. Ando; certificate of service (eps) (Entered: 04/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor denying defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to transfer of venue [31-1] - the court determines it is appropriate to have this action remain in the US District Court for the District of Hawaii (cc: all counsel) (eps) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE MOTION defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to admit Robert S. Walker and David E. Miller pro hac vice upon written application ; affidavit of Robert S. Walker; affidavit of David E. Miller; affidavit of consent of Mark Bennett; order - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 04/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to complaint filed 11/02/98; certificate of service - [5-1] by defendant American Greetings, defendant Erwin Weiss, defendant Magnivision, defendant Steve Crellin (afc) (Entered: 04/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 04/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 04/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 04/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/23/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting defendant American Greetings Corporation and defedant Magnivision's motion for leave to amend answer to complaint to add affirmative defense; ORDER granting plaintiff Terry Galpin's motion for leave to amend complaint filed on November 2, 1998 [30-1], [36-1], [35-1] (cc: all counsel) (afc) (Entered: 03/21/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP :1.Defendants American Greetings' and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to transfer of venue; 2. defendant Edward Weiss' joinder in #1; 3. Defendant Steve Crellin's joinder in #1; [31-1]; arguments made; the motion is denied; the Court will prepare the order ( Ct Rptr : Terrence Chun) JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (fe) (Entered: 03/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of intent to rely on uncited authorities; certificate of service - by plaintiff RE: motion to transfer of venue [31-1] (afc) (Entered: 03/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying motion of defendant Steven Crellin for leave to amend answer [28-1]; ORDER denying defendant Erwin Weiss' motion for leave to amend answer [29-1] (cc: all counsel) (afc) (Entered: 02/28/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 02/28/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision in support of motion to transfer of venue; declaration of Reid Takatsuka; declaration of Claudine Brooks-Takatsuka; declaration of Nadine Y. ando; exhibits A and B; certificate of service [31-1] (afc) (Entered: 02/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EP: Weiss' motion for leave to amend answer - taken on advisement [29-1]; Callin's motion for leave to amend answer - taken on advisement [28-1]; American Greetings and Magnavision's motion for leave to file amended answer - GRANTED [30-1], Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint - GRANTED [36-1], [35-1] (Ct Rptr : ESR-Tape/C6) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 02/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT by plaintiff t memorandum in opposition to defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion to transfer venue filed 01/18/00, filed 02/17/00; declaration of Michael K. Livingston; declaration of Marceline Hamman; declaration of Lieutenant Commander Sharon Miller; certificate of service [31-1] (afc) (Entered: 02/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION and ORDER; exhibit A - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - [re: production and use of discovery documents; deposition instructions, etc; instruction as to who may review documents/materials; instructions as to notation of documents that are confidential] - submitted on behalf of defts (afc) (Entered: 02/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Terry Galpin in opposition to motion to transfer venue [31-1]; declaration of Ellen Piloto; declaration of Michael K. Livingston; exhibits "a"-"b"; certificate of service (wnn) (Entered: 02/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (afc) (Entered: 02/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of intent to rely on uncited authority with respect to defendants Weiss and Crellin's motions for leave to amend answers; certificate of service by plaintiff Terry Galpin (eps) (Entered: 02/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated amendment to Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER; filed 12/20/99 and Order Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 02/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY memorandum by defendant Steve Crellin to Galpin's memorandum in opposition to defendant Steve Crellin's motion for leave to amend answer [28-1]; filed 1/18/2000; certificate of service (eps) (Entered: 02/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (eps) (Entered: 02/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY memorandum by defendant Erwin Weiss to plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to motion of defendant Erwin Weiss for leave to amend answer [29-1] filed 1/18/2000; certificate of service (eps) (Entered: 02/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of no opposition by defendant Erwin Weiss to deft Steve Crellin's motion for leave to amend answer [28-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 02/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT of no opposition by defendant Erwin Weiss to defendants American Greetings Corp and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for leave to amend answer to complaint to add affirmative defense [30-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 02/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE MOTION to shorten time for hearing by and for defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for transfer of venue filed on 01/18/00 [31-1]; declaration of counsel; ORDER granting ex parte motion - by Judge Helen Gillmor; certificate of service - motion set for 10:30 3/6/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor (afc) (Entered: 02/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of no position by defendant Erwin Weiss re: plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint filed on 11/2/98 [35-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 02/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER by defendant Steve Crellin in ex parte motion to shorten time for hearing on defendants' American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for transfer of venue filed on January 18, 2000; certificate of service [31-1] (afc) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION by defendant Steve Crellin RE: defendant Erwin Weiss's motion for leave to amend answer filed January 18, 2000; certificate of service [29-1] (afc) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION by defendant Steve Crellin RE: defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for leave to amend answer to complaint to add affirmative defense, filed January 18, 2000; certificate of service [30-1] (afc) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION by defendant American Greetings, defendant, Magnivision RE: plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint filed on 11/2/98, filed on January 18, 2000; certificate of service [35-1] (afc) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Terry Galpin in opposition to defendant Steve Crellin for leave to amend answer [28-1], and to defendant Erwin Weiss motion for leave to amend answer filed January 18, 2000 [29-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by defendant Erwin Weiss in the ex parte motion to shorten time for hearingt on defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc.'s motion for transfer of venue, filed on January 18, 2000 [31-1]; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION by plaintiff Terry Galpin to defendants American Greetings Corporation and Magnivision, Inc's motion for leave to amend answer to complaint to add affirmative defense [30-1], filed January 18, 2000; certificate of service (afc) (Entered: 02/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER by defendant Steve Crellin re motion to transfer of venue filed 1/18/00 [31-1]; certificate of servcie (fe) (Entered: 01/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Withdrawal and ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Cynthia Winegar for Steve Crellin and substituting attorney Thomas R. Sylvester - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe) (Entered: 01/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Withdrawal and ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Cynthia Winegar for Erwin Weiss and substituting attorney Deborah K. Wright - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe) (Entered: 01/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by plaintiff for leave to amend complaint filed on 11/2/98 ; amended certificate of service - set for 2:00 2/18/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff for leave to amend complaint filed on 11/2/98 ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Michael K. Livingston; exhibit "a"; certificate of service - set for 2:00 2/18/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe) Modified on 01/19/2000 (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER by defendant Erwin Weiss re motion to transfer of venue [31-1]; certificate of service (fe) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/13/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to transfer of venue ; memorandum of law in support of motion; affidavit of Mark J. Bennett (exhibit a); exhibit 1; affidavit of Nadine Y. Ando; exhibits b-f; certificate of service - set for 9:45 3/28/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor (fe) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/20/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision for leave to amend answer to complaint to add affirmative defense ;memorandum of law in support of motion; exhibit a; certificate of service - set for 2:00 2/18/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Erwin Weiss for leave to amend answer ; memorandum of law in support of motion; affidavait of Deborah K. Wright; Affidaviat of Erwin Weiss; exhibit "1"; certificate of service - set for 2:00 2/18/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/25/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Steve Crellin for leave to amend answer ; memorandum of law in support of motion; affidavit of Steve Crellin; exhibit 1; certificate of service - set for 2:00 2/18/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE MOTION by defendant American Greetings, defendant Magnivision to admit attorney George J. Moscarino and Alison B. Marshall pro hac vice upon written application ; affidavit of George J. Moscarino; affidavit of Alison B. Marshall; affidavit of consent of Mark J. bennett; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren granting ex parte motion; certificate of service (wnn) (Entered: 12/28/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (wnn) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (wnn) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL and SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Cynthia Winegar for American Greetings, attorney Cynthia Winegar for Magnivision and substituting attorney Mark J. Bennett; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry K. Kurren (wnn) (Entered: 12/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP : Resetting Conference ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 9/6/00 ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 7/21/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor , ; Pretrial conference set for 8:30 8/18/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor , final pretrial statement by 7/14/00; file m/join added parties/amend pleadings by 1/18/00; ; Discovery ddl set for 6/6/00 , ; Motion filing ddl set for 4/28/00 , file ms/limine by 8/16/00; file opposition memo to ms/limine by 8/23/00; witness disclosures: pltf's 3/10/00; deft's 4/10/00; discovery deadline 7/6/00; , ; settlement conference set for 2:00 6/6/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , settlement conf stmt by 5/30/00; concise stmt of case, jury instructions by 8/23/00; final witness list by 8/16/00; exchange exhibit and demonstrative aids by 8/9/00; file stipulations re: authenticity/admissibility of proposed exhibits by 8/16/00; file objections to exhibits 8/23/00; file deposition excerpt designations 8/16/00; file deposition counter designations and objections by 8/23/00; file trial briefs by 8/23/00; parties to be present at settlement conference; cc: Mark Davis, Wm McCorriston, Cynthia Winegar, Deborah Wright, Thomas Sylvester ( Ct Rptr : No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe) (Entered: 12/20/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EO : rescheduling conference set for 4:00 12/16/99 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Mark Bennett to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps) (Entered: 12/14/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 11/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 11/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 11/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED report of SCHEDULING conference and ORDER - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - on behalf of plaintiff (afc) (Entered: 07/27/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EP: reschedling conference held 7/15/99 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 6/6/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 5/5/00 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; final pretrial statements: 04/28/2000 ; Motion filing ddl set for 1/6/00; expert witness disclosure for plaintiff: 12/06/99; defendants: 01/06/2000; Discovery ddl set for 4/6/00 ; settlement conference on call; Livingston to prepare order () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 07/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EO: rescheduling conference set for 8:30 7/15/99 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Lilly from Livingston's office to notify parties () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) (Entered: 07/12/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 03/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 03/16/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 03/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 03/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (fe) (Entered: 03/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg) Modified on 02/23/1999 (Entered: 02/17/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EP: rule 16 conference held on 9:00 2/8/99 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 1/25/00 before Judge Helen Gillmor ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 12/17/99 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; final pretrial stmts 12/10/99; file m/join additional parties/amend pleadings 4/9/99 ; Motion filing ddl set for 8/25/99 ; initial disclosures 3/9/99 ; expert witness disclosure (a) pltfs 7/26/99; (b) defts 8/26/99; discovery ddl 11/8/99; settlement conference set for 3:00 11/15/99 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren; pltf's demand 10/25/99; deft's offer 11/1/99; settlement conference stmts 11/8/99 ( Ct Rptr : No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg) Modified on 02/23/1999 (Entered: 02/17/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff Terry Galpin pursuant to Local Rule 26.1 (fe) (Entered: 02/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff Terry Galpin; certificate of service (fe) (Entered: 02/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant American Greetings, defendant Erwin Weiss, defendant Magnivision, defendant Steve Crellin; certificate of service (fe) (Entered: 02/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by defendant American Greetings, defendant Erwin Weiss, defendant Magnivision, defendant Steve Crellin to complaint [1-1] filed 11/02/98; certificate of service (fe) (Entered: 02/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Steve Crellin on 11/24/98 (tbf) (Entered: 12/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Magnivision thru Jo Turner authorized to accept on 11/12/98 (tbf) (Entered: 12/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay rule 16 pretrial conference set for 9:00 2/8/99 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg) (Entered: 11/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT; demand for jury trial; summons (issued) (lmg) (Entered: 11/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 407 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?