Fraserside IP LLC v. IG Media Inc

Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-03015
District Judge Mark W Bennett, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Mark W Bennett
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Fraserside Ip LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Lorin Belville +1 480 203 5861 +1 602 297 6953 cbelville@azbar.org
v.
No Logo IG Media Inc, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 Order on Motion to Dismiss
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/15/2011, Entered: 5/15/2011 Disclosure Statement LR 7.1
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Complaint
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0862-1189497.), filed by Fraserside IP LLC. Dismissal Deadline 8/31/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Appendix Attachment 1, # 3 Appendix Attachment 2, # 4 Appendix Attachment 3, # 5 Appendix Attachment 4, # 6 Appendix Attachment 5, # 7 Appendix Attachment 6, # 8 Appendix Attachment 7) (Belville, Chad) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Notice of New Case Filing
NOTICE of New Case Filing by Fraserside IP LLC. No conflicts identified with parties, plaintiff's attorney, MWB/PAZ. (src) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 92 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?