Sandisk Corporation v. PNY Technologies, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-205928

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 9:34 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

SanDisk Corporation SanDisk Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Pny Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LLP, Miller, Kaplan, Arase & Co., Subpoenaed Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A Meyer +1 310 282 2000 rmeyer@loeb.com
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (255) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 255 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
Redacted Motion in Limine #12 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
    Blank 254 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
    Plt's Motion in Limine #11 to Exclude Evidence that challenges th etruth of the factual recital in the parites agreement; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
      Blank 253 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
      Redacted Motion in Limine #11 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
        Blank 252 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
        #10 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
          Blank 251 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
          #9 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
            Blank 250 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
            #8 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
              Blank 249 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
              Plt's Motion in Limine No.#7 to Exclude Evidence of Sandisk's Prvileged Communications with Miller Kaplan; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                Blank 248 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                Redacted Motion in Limine #7 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                  Blank 247 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                  Plt's Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude Evidence or Agrument that the Agreement requires the offices to Negotiatie or Require Face to Face Negotiations; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                    Blank 246 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                    Redacted Motion in Limine #6 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                      Blank 245 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                      Plt's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidnece or Agrument that Independent Audit was required under the agreement; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                        Blank 244 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                        Redacted Motion in Limine #5 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                          Blank 243 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                          Plt's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence that purports to show that three-bit-per-cell flash is not Royalty bearing under the parties agreement; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                            Blank 242 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                            Redacted Motion in Limine #4 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                              Blank 241 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                              Plt's Motion in Limine No.3 to Preclude Def PNY Technologies Inc. from Offering Testimony of its Proposed Expert, Dr. Vivek Subramanian; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                Blank 240 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                Redacted Motion in Limine #3 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                  Blank 239 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                  #2 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                    Blank 238 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                    Plt's Motion in Limine No.1 to Exclude Evidence related to Affirmative Defenses Requiring proof of Antcompetitive Effects as Irrelevant and Waste of time; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                      Blank 237 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                      Redacted Motion in Limine #1 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                        Blank 236 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                        of Patrick Hammon in support of Plt's Application to File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Trial Brief, Exhibits 1&2 threreto Portions of Motion in Limine Nos.1, 3-7, 11-13 and Exhibits 1-12, 17-18,21,28; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                          Blank 235 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Application
                                          Application to File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Trial Brief, Exhibits 1&2 threreto Portions of Motion in Limine Nos.1, 3-7, 11-13 and Exhibits 1-12, 17-18,21,28 by Pltl (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Application... w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                            Blank 234 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                            CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                              Blank 233 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None statement
                                              by Plt (Allen J. Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Statement of the Case; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                                Blank 232 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                by Plt (Allen J. Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Exhibits List; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                                  Blank 231 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                  Plt's Trial Brief; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                                    Blank 230 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Brief: Trial
                                                    Redacted-Trial Brief by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Trial Brief; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                                      Blank 229 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                      to temporary judge signed by Judge Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order; Decision = M; Closed = 02/13/2013
                                                        Blank 228 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                        CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/07/2013
                                                          Blank 227 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                                          Atty Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 02/07/2013
                                                            Blank 226 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                                            Atty Schaefer; Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 02/07/2013
                                                              Blank 225 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                              SanDisk's mtn to compel is GRANTED IN PART. SanDisk's mtn for issue & evidentiary sanctions, or in the alt, to compel the production of responsive docs, is DENIED. Judge Manoukian; Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = R; Closed = 02/06/2013
                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 01/31/2013
                                                                  Blank 223 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                                  $150 deposited; Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2013
                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                    Reply in support of Sandisk Corporation's Motion for Issue and Evidence Sanctions for PNY's willful Violation of the Court's Discovery Order or in the Alternative for an Order Compelling to Produce Responsive Documents; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2013
                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                      Second Declaration of James P. Schaefer in support of Sandisk Corporation's Motion for Issue and Evidence Sanctions for PNY's willful Violation of the Court's Discovery Order or in the Alternative for an Order Compelling to Produce Responsive Documents; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2013
                                                                        Blank 220 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                        CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2013
                                                                          Blank 219 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                          re the scope of PNY Techologies, Inc.'s affirmative defenses, Daniel B. Asimow GRANTED by Judge Manoukian; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 01/23/2013
                                                                            Blank 218 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                            undocumented action: decl of Amy L. Bomse to mtn for issue & evid sanc; decl of Daniel B. Asimow to mtn for issue & evid sanc; resp to stmt of disputed facts in sup of mtn for sanc or to compel; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                              Blank 217 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                              of 1/18/13 ltr from Roert D. Hallman; memo in opp to mtn for sanc & compelling prod of docs; resp; evid objs; decls of A. Bomse, D. asimow, R. Hernandez, T. D'Alessandro; proof of serv, on multiple parties, 01-18-13; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                Blank 216 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                resp to stmt of disputed facts in sup of mtn for sanc or to compel; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                  Blank 215 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                  decl of Daniel B. asimow in opp to mtn for issue & evid sanc; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                    Blank 214 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                    decl of Amy L. Bomse in opp to mtn for issue & evid sanc; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                      Blank 213 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Objection: Evidence
                                                                                      to decl of James P. schaefer in su of mtn for issue & evid sancs for willful violation of court's disc orders or, for ord compelling PNY to produce resp docs, D. Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Obj:Evidence; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                        Blank 212 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                        REDACTED of Daniel B. Asimow to mtn for issue & evid sanc; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                          Blank 211 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                          REDACTED of Amy L. Bomse to mtn for issue & evid sanc; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                            Blank 210 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                            to mtn for sanc or, for ord compelling prod of docs, Daniel B. Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                              Blank 209 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                              of Richard Hernandez to mtn for issue & evid sanc; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                                Blank 208 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                of Toni D'Alessandro, to mtn for sanc or, for an ord compelling prod of docs,; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2013
                                                                                                  Blank 207 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 01/11/2013
                                                                                                    Blank 206 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                    Of James Schaefer in support of Mtn to Compel on 1-25-13; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/11/2013
                                                                                                      Blank 205 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                      Of disputed Discovery Items in support of Mtn to Compel on 1-25-13 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Separate Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/11/2013
                                                                                                        Blank 204 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                        To Def's Mtn to Compel (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/11/2013
                                                                                                          Blank 203 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                          CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 01/11/2013
                                                                                                            Blank 202 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                            Of James Schaefer in support of Mtn to Compel on 1-18-13.; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/11/2013
                                                                                                              Blank 201 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                              In support of Mtn to Compel on 1-18-13 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 01/11/2013
                                                                                                                Blank 200 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                Sandisk Corporation's statement of disputed matters in support of its mtn for issue and evidence sanctions; Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/09/2013
                                                                                                                  Blank 199 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                  decl. of James P. Schaefer in support of mtn for issue and evidence sanctions.; Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/09/2013
                                                                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                    Sandisk's memorandum of p's & a's in support of mtn for issue and evidence sanctions; Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/09/2013
                                                                                                                      Blank 197 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                      CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 01/09/2013
                                                                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/09/2013
                                                                                                                          Blank 195 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                          "Plaintiff Sandisk Corporation's ntc of mtn for issue and evidence sanctions for PNY's willful violation of the court's discvoery orders, or in the alternative for an order compelling PNY to produce responsive docs. 2/1/13, 9am, D19. atty Allen Ruby; Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/09/2013
                                                                                                                            Blank 194 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                            to Plt's Separate Statement of Disputed Discovery Items in Support of it's Mtn to Compel (Daniel B. Asimow) hrg 1/18/13 9am D-18; Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 01/07/2013
                                                                                                                              Blank 193 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                              CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/07/2013
                                                                                                                                Blank 192 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                (of Robert Hallman) to Plt's Mtn to Compel (Daniel B. Asimow) hrg 1/18/13 9am D-18; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/07/2013
                                                                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                  to Plt's Mtn to Compel (Daniel B. Asimow) hrg 1/18/13 9am D-18; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 01/07/2013
                                                                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
                                                                                                                                    CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Decision = M; Closed = 01/03/2013
                                                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                                      CV Separate Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/02/2013
                                                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                        of Robert Hallman; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 01/02/2013
                                                                                                                                          Blank 187 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                          CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 01/02/2013
                                                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                            taken on mtn to compel; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 01/02/2013
                                                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                              re: mtn to compel; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/02/2013
                                                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                                                plt Sandisk Corp. to produce documents, Atty Asimow, 1/25/13 @ 9:00am D/18; ; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Compel; Decision = M; Closed = 01/02/2013
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                  Cross-Complaint w/o Prejudice and Affirmative Defense No. 24 in Def's 11-08-12 Amended General Denial filed by PNY Technologies, Inc. (Atty Amy L. Bomse); Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 01/02/2013
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                    of Patrick Hammon; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 12/26/2012
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                                                      CV Separate Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 12/26/2012
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                        CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 12/26/2012
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                          CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 12/26/2012
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                            CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 12/26/2012
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                                                              DEF to designate witnesses most qualified to testify on its behald & produce them for deposition; D. W. Hansen; 1/18/13, 9a, D18; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Compel; Decision = M; Closed = 12/26/2012
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 176 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Commission Issued
                                                                                                                                                                CV Commission Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 12/11/2012
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 175 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                  re: mtn to compel; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 12/07/2012
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                    re: denied ex parte application; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 12/07/2012
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Order: Deeming Case Not ComplexCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      signed by Judge James P. Kleinberg; Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Not Complex; Decision = M; Closed = 12/05/2012
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                        Ntc of Undocumented Action: ; Sandisk Corp's submission of documents under seal for in camera review pursuant to court order of 11/16/12.; Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 12/07/2012
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          after in camera review- the privilege log submitted by Sandisk is accurate and correctly describes the documents and the privilege claimed for each. Each document is protected by the privileges consistent with the Court's ruling. Therefore, none of the documents shall be delievered to PNY in responses its inspection demand. The documents produced by Sandisk for review under seal will be filed with the clerk under seal. Signed by Judge Stoelker; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 12/05/2012
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            PLX Sandisk Corp's Ex Parte App (of November 13, 2012) for an OST to hear its mtn to compel is DENIED. The Court's October 12, 2012 Order Granting In Part SanDisk's Mtn to Compel Further Responses is hereby modified: The November 30, 2012 deadline for PNY's production of docs pursuant to the Order is extended to December 7, 2012. Judge Stoelker; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = D; Closed = 11/29/2012
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Def PNY Technologies, Inc.'s mtn to compel Plt SanDisk Corp's written responses to production of docs, set one is DENIED IN PART & GRANTED IN PART. Judge Stoelker (see order for more details); Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = P; Closed = 11/29/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 168 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                PNY's mtn to compel MKA to produce the withheld documents that are responsive to the subpoena is DENIED. SanDisk's mtn to quash the subpoena to the extent that it seeks to obtain the 62 documents identified in the privilege log and for a protective order directing that those documents are not discoverable is GRANTED. Judge Stoelker (see order for more details); Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = R; Closed = 11/20/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 167 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                  to 1st amended cross-complaint. atty James Schaefer; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 11/15/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 166 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Def/X-Complt's Mtn for Leave to Amend the Answer & Cross-Complaint is GRANTED. Def/X-Complt shall file its Amended Answer & Cross-Complaint within 5 days of the entry of this Order. (Judge Kirwan) hrg 11/1/12 9am D-8 *nsase; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 11/15/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                      re oppo to exparte for ost for mtn to compel (Robert Hallman); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 11/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                        to exparte for ost for mtn to compel (Robert Hallman); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 11/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 11/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                            of Claire A. mccormack in supp of exparte for ost for mtn to compel (James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 11/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                              exparte for ost for mtn to compel (James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 11/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None General Denial (no fees)
                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED- Atty: Asimow; Legacy Name = CV General Denial w/out fees; Decision = M; Closed = 11/08/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                  in supp of mtn to compel to produce docs responsive to PNY's doc requests as agreed (ccp 2031.320); Atty: Asimow; 11/16/12, 9am, D18; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 11/08/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    re: Amended General Denial & X-Complt; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 11/08/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Cross-Complaint (Amended) (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Atty: Asimow; Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Cross Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 11/08/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Response to Sandisk Co.'s Separate Statement of Disputed Discovery items in support to Mtn. to Quash Depo Subpoena (Amy L. Bomse) 11-9-12 D-18 @ 9am; Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 11/05/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          to Def's Motion to Comple Responses to Production of Documents by Plt (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                              to PNY Techologies, Inc's Separate Statement of Disputed Discovery items in support of its Motion to Compel Responses by Plt (Jaems P. Schefer) 11-16-12 @9am in D-18; Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                of James P. Schaefer in support of Plt's Opposition to Motion to Compe Responses; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    of James P. Schaefer in support of Plt's Opposition to Def's Motion for an Order Directing Issuance and Recording of Abstract of Judgment and Motion for Order Requiring Plt Robert to Post Security; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      in Memo of P's & A's of its Motion to Quash PNY's Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Buisness Records to Miller Kaplan and for a Protective Order as to Documents Protected by Plt (James P. Schaefer) 11-9-12 @9am in D-18; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Brief (Atty R. Hallman) 11-09-12 D18; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Brief - Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          in Support of Mtn to Compel 3rd Party Miller Kaplan Arase & Co., LLP to Produce Documents Responsive to PNY's Deposition Subpoena as Greed (Atty Robert Hallman) 11-09-12 D18; Legacy Name = CV Reply Brief; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            memo; response; decl in opp (sealed; decl in opp (public) (Atty Bomse); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/31/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Lodged Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Decl of Amy Bomse in Opp to DXC's mtn to quash depo subpoenas for business records 11-9-12 9AM D-18 (Atty Bomse) *ok to lodge pursuant to attached May 9, 2012 Order signed by Judge Pierce* ab; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 10/31/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                to mtn to quash depo subpoenas 11-9-12 9AM D-18 (Atty Bomse); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 10/31/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  to Sandisk Corp's Separate Statement in support of its mtn to quash 11-9-12 9AM D-18 (Atty Bomse); Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 10/31/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    to quash depo subpoenas for production of business records issued to Miller, Kaplan, Arase & Co. LLP 11-9-12 9AM D-18 (Atty Bomse); Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 10/31/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to PNY's separate statement in support of mtn to compel production of docs responsive to depo subpoena 11-9-12 9AM D-18 (Atty Meyer); Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 10/29/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to mtn to compel production of docs responsive to depo subpoena 11-9-12 9AM D-18 (Atty Meyer); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 10/29/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to mtn to compel production of docs responsive to depo subpoena 11-9-12 9AM D-18 (Atty Meyer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 10/29/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            in sup of mtn for leave to amend answer & xcomplt, Daniel B. Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              of Richard Hernandez; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Separate Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sandisk Corp to produce docs responsive to PNY's doc requests as agreed; D. B. Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Compel Answers; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/22/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Decl of Amy Bomse in suppt of Reply Brief; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (Atty Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Brief in support of Motion to Designate Case as Complex (Atty Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Reply to Motion; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  of James P. Schaefer in support of Sandisk's opposition to PNY's motion for leave to amend; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to PNY's motion for leave to amend its answer and cross-complaint 11-1-12 9am dept.8 David W. Hansen; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Separate Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          declaration of Amy Bomse; Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of Amy Bomse; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  re: mtn to compel; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    third party Kaplan Arase & Co, LLP to produce documents, Atty Asimow, 11/9/12 @ 9:00am D/18; ; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Compel; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Separate Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        of James Schaefer; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of David Hansen; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Motion-Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Depo Subpoena & for protective Order as to docs protected by the atty-client privilege & atty work product doctrine; Atty: Hansen; 11/9/12, 9am, D18; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Quash; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      order granting in part plt Sandisk Corp mtn to compel further responses from and to compel compliance as agreed by def PNY Technologies, Inc to Sandisk's first and second sets of requests for production Signed by Judge Stoelker; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 10/18/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        in Opposition to Motion to Designate the case complex (Atty Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Memorandum; Decision = M; Closed = 10/15/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          memo in Opposition tp PNY Tech. Motion to designate the case complex, 10-26-12, 9:00 a.m., (Atty Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 10/15/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $150 jury fee deposited for Plt Sandisk by Atty Ruby; Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit; Decision = M; Closed = 10/10/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply in support of Sandisk Corporation's Motion to Compel Further Responses from and to Compel Compliance as agreed by Def to Plt's First and Second Sets of Request for Production; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 10/04/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/04/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  of James P. Schefer in support of Plt's Reply Brief in support of its Motion to Compel Further Responses and Request for Production of Documents by Plt; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 10/04/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to designate aS a complex case. 10/26/12, 9am, D1. atty Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Supplemental
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ntc concerning documents lodged under seal. Atty Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Supplemental; Decision = M; Closed = 10/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            responses to separate statement of disputed discovery items; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 10/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Proof of Pers Svc/WV; Decision = M; Closed = 10/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                lodging of documents under seal (Daniel Asimow) 10-12-12 9am D-18; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 10/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  of Richard Hernandez in support of opposition to motion to compel further responses and to compel compliance (Daniel Asimow) 10-12-12 9am D-18; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 10/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    in opposition to motion to compel further responses and to compel compliance (Daniel Asimow) 10-12-12 9am D-18; Legacy Name = CV Memorandum; Decision = M; Closed = 10/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to separate statement of disputed discovery items (Daniel Asimow) 10-12-12 9am D-18; Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 10/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 09/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 09/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Motion-Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            answer and cross-complaint. 11/1/12, 9am, D8. atty Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn for Leave to Amend; Decision = M; Closed = 09/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              of James P. Schaefer in support of plt Sandisk Corporation's mtn to compel further responses from and to compel compliance as agreed by def PNY Technologies, Inc. to Sandisk's 1st and 2nd sets of requests for production.; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                of James P. Schaefer; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sandisk Corporation's separate statement of disputed discovery items in support of its mtn to compel further responses from and to compel compliance as agreed by def PNY Technologies, Inc. to Sandisk's 1st and 2nd sets of requests for production.; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Separate Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      of lodging of document(s) under seal; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        memorandum in support of plt Sandisk Corporation's mtn to compel further responses from and to compel compliance as agreed by def PNY Technologies, Inc. to Sandisk's 1st and 2nd sets of requests for production.; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                further responses from and to compel compliance as agreed by def PNY Technologies, Inc. to Sandisk's 1st and 2nd sets of requests for production. 10/12/12, 9am, D18. atty David W. Hansen; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Compel; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stip to mediation with Daniel Weisntein 8-16-12 is granted by Judge Kirwan; MSRH reset for 8-23-12; Legacy Name = CV Stip & Order/$20 fee; Decision = G; Closed = 05/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      old John L. Cooper/new Daniel B. Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        an Amended Stipulation and Order re: Confidentiality by Plt/X-Def (Alan Ruby) GRANTED by Judge Pierce; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 05/09/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (Atty Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            extending time to comply with local rule 2(b)(2). See file for details. Signed by Judge Kirwan.; Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 05/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **PENDING** extending time to comply with local civil rule 2(b)(2). (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/02/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                extending time for deft PNY Technologies, Inc. to move to compel further responses from pltf to PNY's first set of requests for production of documents and things. (John L. Cooper); Order grants ext to 5-22-12, by Judge Stoelker; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 05/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sandisk's Demurrer to the 1st-4th COAs are Overruled. See file for details, Judge Stoelker.; Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = D; Closed = 04/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    to Extend Time to 5/1/12 to Comply with Local Rule signed by Judge Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = M; Closed = 04/17/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to Extemd Time to Move to Compel Further Responses from Plt Sandisk to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents amd Tjomgs (John L. Cooper) granted judge woodhouse; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 04/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to Further Extend Time for PNY Technologies, Inc. to move to compel further responses from Sandisk Corporation to PNY's first set of Requests For Production of Documents and things, Granted, Signed by Hon. Peter H. Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Stip & Order/$20 fee; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            to Extend Time for Def to Move to Compel Further Responses from Plt (John L. Cooper); Order ext's time to 4-16-12, granted by Judge Stoelker; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 04/03/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              of reply to demurrer, on John L. Cooper & Jessica K. Nall, 3-20-12; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 03/20/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                in sup of demurrer to PNY'S xcomplt, David W.ansen; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 03/20/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  atty ruby; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 03/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    atty cooper; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 03/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      of decl of J. Cooper; memo p&as in opp to demurrer, on Allen J . Ruby, David W. Hansen, 3-14-12; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 03/14/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        of John L. Cooper, of memo p&as in opp to demurrer; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 03/14/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          /demurrer to xcomplt, John L. Cooper; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 03/14/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            It is hereby Stipulated by and between Plt and Def to move to Compel Further Responses from Sandisk Corporation to PNY's First Set of Request for Production of Documents and Things by Judge Stoelker *see file for details*; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/12/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 02/01/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stip & Order Re: Confidentiality; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 01/30/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Re: Confidentiality Materials in Discovery (Signed by Judge Kirwan) *See filed for detail*; Legacy Name = CV Stip & Order/$20 fee; Decision = M; Closed = 01/30/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/03/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        3-27-12, 9am, d.8; atty ruby; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer & Ntc of Hrg; Decision = M; Closed = 01/03/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 12/27/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            re Order granting SanDisk's mtn to seal (Atty D. Hansen); Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 12/20/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 12/20/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                atty Cooper; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 12/19/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Atty. A. Ruby; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 12/19/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    re PNY's 11-3-11 mtn to stay - DENIED by Judge Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = M; Closed = 12/02/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      re 11-3-11 mtn to seal - GRANTED by Judge Kirwan ; *see order for details*; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = M; Closed = 12/02/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None General Denial (no fees)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        atty cooper; Legacy Name = CV General Denial w/out fees; Decision = M; Closed = 11/28/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 11/28/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Re: Def's Demurrer is Overruled (Signed by Judge Kirwan); Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = M; Closed = 11/15/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              of reply in support of deft's demurrer to complaint. (Roderick M. Thompson); Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 11/04/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                to Def's Demurrer by Plt (Allen J. Ruby) 11-10-11 @9am in D-8; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 10/28/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Redacted-of Def's Reply in support of its Motion to Stay by Def (Rodrick M. Thompson); Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 10/28/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Redacted Declaration of Jonathan Short in support of Def's Reply in support of its Motion to Stay 11-3-11 @9am in d-8; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 10/28/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to Plt Sandisk's Motion to Seal Unredacted Brief Delcaration and Exhibits; Request to Seal PNY's Unredcted Reply Brief and Declaration by DEf (Roderick M. Thompson) 11-3-11 @9am in d-8; Legacy Name = CV Joinder & Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 10/27/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          plt's ex parte appl for order shortening time to hear Sandisk's motion to seal unredacted brief, declaration and exhibits to its opposition to PNY's mtn to stay is GRANTED; Sandisk's mtn to seal declaration and exhibits to its Opposition to PNY's mtn to stay shall be heard on 11/3/11. Sandisk's mtn to seal shall be deemed filed by 10/21/11; PNY's opposition to Sandisk's mtn to seal shall be filed and served no later than 10/27/11; Sandisk's reply shall be filed and served o later than 11/1/11 at noon. This order to be served on def by 4 p.m. on 10/25/11 signed by Judge Peter Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              of Michael D. Saunders in support of Ex Parte Application; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                for an Order to Seal Unredacted Brief Declaration and Exhibits to its Opposition to PNY's Motion to Stay by Plt (David W. Hansen); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plt's Memo of P's & A's in Opposition to Def's Motion to Stay by Plt; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Michael D. Saunders in support of Plt's Opposition to Def's Motion to Stay; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      of Michael D. Saunders in support of Plt's Opposition to Def's Motion to Stay; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            to Stay by Plt (David W. Hansen) 11-3-11 @9am in d-8; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Motion: Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unredacted Brief, Declaration andExhibits to its Opposition to PNY's Motion to Stay by Plt (Davis W. Hasen) 11-3-11 @9am in d-8; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion to Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 10/21/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ntc of mtn and mtn to seal and supporting documents (date not reserved); Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 10/21/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  granted stip order cont hrg. from 10-25-11 to 11-3-11; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Req:Stip/Ord to Cont Hrg; Decision = G; Closed = 09/30/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    GRANTING def PNY Technologies, Inc.'s application for Ira Gottlieb, Scott Christie, & Jonathan Short to appear Pro Hac Vice - signed by Judge Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = M; Closed = 10/03/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Roderick Thompson; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Motion-Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          10/25/11 @ 9:00 a.m. Dept. 8 (Atty. Cooper; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Stay; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Atty. Cooper; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer, no fees; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  11/10/11 @ 9:00 a.m. Dept. 8 (Atty. Cooper); Legacy Name = CV Demurrer & Ntc of Hrg; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    re: Atty Allen J. Ruby; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 09/01/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to extend time to respond to complaint. (FF 495023936); Deadline to respond to complaint is 09-23-11, Judge Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 08/30/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        of Roderick Thompson in support of application to appear pro hac vice; 09/27/2011 9:00am dept 8; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 08/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of Jonathan Short; 09/27/2011 9:00am dept 8; Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of Scott Christie; 09/27/2011 9:00am dept 8; Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              of Ira Gottlieb; 09/27/2011 9:00am dept 8; Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                for order granting verified applications of Ira Gottlieb, Scott Christie and Jonathan Short to appear as counsel pro hac vice; 09/27/2011 9:00am dept 9 (atty Thompson); Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion/no fee; Decision = M; Closed = 08/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Balance Paid on Returned Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  $53.00 payment by Mobile Legal Service, Inc.; Legacy Name = Balance Pd on Returned Ck; Decision = M; Closed = 08/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    paid on stip and ord (FF 495023936); Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 08/19/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Notice: Returned Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      8/8/11 BAD CHECK $3.00 ISSUED BY MOBILE LEGAL SERVICE INC; Legacy Name = Ntc:Returned Check; Decision = M; Closed = 08/08/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 07/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 07/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 07/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              to Def's Mtns in Limine Nos. 1-7 (Patrick M. Hammon); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/01/2014

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?