Spears, Britney Jean - Conservatorship
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BP108870

Tags
Last Updated August 15, 2021 at 7:23 PM EDT (3.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bessemer Trust Company Of California, NA, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Eardley John J., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Ghalib Adnah, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Ingham Iii Samuel D. Esq, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Lutfi Sam, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Spears, James P., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Wallet Andrew M., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Wantuch Stan, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Entertainment Tonight, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo KABC-TV, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Moore, Ernest L., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo People Magazine, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Perreault Katerina, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo S.J. Gibson Films, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Spears, Lynne, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo The Weekly LLC. The New York Times, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Tmz, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Wantuch Stan, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Wright Lauriann, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo American Contractors Indemnity Company, Surety Company
No Logo Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Surety Company
No Logo Boxer Joel E. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Cohen, Jeryll S. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Diamond Roger Jon, Attorney
No Logo Eardley Jon, Attorney
No Logo Freedman Bryan J. Esq, Attorney
No Logo In Pro Per, Attorney
No Logo Ingham Samuel D. Iii Esq, Attorney
No Logo Kreshek Bradley H. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Miller, Louis R., Esq., Attorney
No Logo Moore, Bonita D., Attorney
No Logo Neri, Geoffrey A., Attorney
No Logo Phillips Stacy D., Attorney
No Logo Schleimer Joseph D., Attorney
No Logo Swan Rebekah E., Attorney
No Logo Thoreen Vivian Lee Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wallet Andrew Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wasser Laura A. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wexler Jeffrey D., Attorney
No Logo Wyle Geraldine A. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Bua Joseph D. Sr, Probate Referee
No Logo Kraus Britt, Other
No Logo Montgomery, Jodi, Nominee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Rubin Jason, Nominee
Officer/Director, T-hq, Inc.
No Logo O'Riordon, Peter, Requestor
No Logo Park Jonathan Hoon, Associated Attorney for Petitioner
No Logo Thoreen Vivian Lee, Associated Attorney for Petitioner
Spears, Britney Spears, Britney, Subject
Officially listed as "Spears, Britney Jean"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Superior Court, Court
No Logo Wyle Geraldine A. Esq, Attorney Participant Removal (Conversion)
Type Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)
Status Under Court Supervision 04/30/2016
  Entries (500) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 514 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Proof Of Service-
re Renewed Motion Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
    Blank 513 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Miscellaneous Document
    Report Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
      Blank 512 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Miscellaneous Document
      Veri re Pet for Ord Apprv Agrmnt Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
        Blank 511 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Miscellaneous Document
        Veri re Third Acct Current ... Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
          Blank 510 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Miscellaneous Document
          Veri re Pet for Ord Allowing etc. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
            Blank 509 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Miscellaneous Document
            Verification Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
              Blank 508 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Miscellaneous Document
              Verification Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                Blank 507 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Miscellaneous Document
                FIRST AMENDED REDACTED REFILED AND ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                  Blank 506 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012 Declaration
                  JAMES P. SPEARS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                    Blank 505 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 Order
                    ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                      Blank 504 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Proof Of Service-
                      Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                        Blank 503 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Declaration
                        OF JOEL E. BOXER (PART 2) Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                          Blank 502 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Declaration
                          OF JOEL E. BOXER (PART 1) Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                            Blank 501 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 supplement
                            REDACTED Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                              Blank 500 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 response
                              PRELIMINARY Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                Blank 499 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Report - Court Appointed Counsel
                                Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                  Blank 498 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Motion
                                  MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER NTC.OF RENEWED MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES 1st Hearing Date: 06/20/2012 Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew, Esq., Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 26
                                    Blank 497 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: 4/10/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                    Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                      Blank 496 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Report
                                      No Fee) (Appraisal report of California sale & petition Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                        Blank 495 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                        Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                          Blank 494 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 waiver
                                          No Fee) (of motion to seal pleadings Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                            Blank 493 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 waiver
                                            No Fee) (of motion to seal petition Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                              Blank 492 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 Petition - Appoint Conservator of Person
                                              Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 04/25/2012 Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Conservator: Spears, Britney Jean, Subject Person Complaint Num: 33
                                                Blank 491 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                Continued Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                  Blank 490 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                  Continued Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                    Blank 489 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                    Continued Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                      Blank 488 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 waiver
                                                      No Fee) (of motion to seal petition Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                        Blank 487 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                        Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                          Blank 486 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Proof Of Service-
                                                          Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                            Blank 485 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                              Blank 484 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Proof Of Service-
                                                              Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                Blank 483 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Petition - Report and Confirmation of Sale
                                                                Judgment by Court-Petition Denied Supervisory Order 12094 SUMMIT CIRCLE 1st Hearing Date: 04/25/2012 Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Complaint Num: 30
                                                                  Blank 482 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                  Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 04/25/2012 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 32
                                                                    Blank 481 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Settlement Agreement
                                                                    Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 04/25/2012 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 31
                                                                      Blank 480 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Motion
                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEAL PLEADINGS RELATING TO PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING AND APPROVING PAYMENT OF: 1)COMPENSATION TO CONSERVATORS... 1st Hearing Date: 04/25/2012 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 25
                                                                        Blank 479 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: 3/21/2012 Motion
                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEAL PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES 1st Hearing Date: 04/25/2012 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 24
                                                                          Blank 478 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Motion
                                                                          1st Hearing Date: 04/20/2012 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 23
                                                                            Blank 477 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                              Blank 476 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 TOP
                                                                              Re confidential financial statements Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                Blank 475 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                  Blank 474 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                  Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                    Blank 473 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Motion
                                                                                    1st Hearing Date: 04/11/2012 Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 22
                                                                                      Blank 472 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Notice
                                                                                      on Ex Parte Petition Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                        Blank 471 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                        and Motion to Confirm Sealing Ord. for Third Account Current, etc. Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                          Blank 470 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                          Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                            Blank 469 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                            FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                              Blank 468 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Declaration
                                                                                              URGENCY Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                Blank 467 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Consent
                                                                                                BRAND SENSE PARTNERS, LLC Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                  Blank 466 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Consent
                                                                                                  SAMUEL INGHAM III Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                    Blank 465 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Notice
                                                                                                    MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE PETITION, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                      Blank 464 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Order
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPL. FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                        Blank 463 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Order
                                                                                                        REDACTED ON EXPARTE PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                          Blank 462 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                          REDACTED Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                            Blank 461 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012 Notice
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR JAMES P. SPEARS, CO- CONSERVATOR OF THE ESTATE AND CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                              Blank 460 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012 Accounting
                                                                                                              1st Hearing Date: 04/25/2012 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 28
                                                                                                                Blank 459 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Motion
                                                                                                                1st Hearing Date: 04/25/2012 Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 21
                                                                                                                  Blank 458 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 waiver
                                                                                                                  No Fee) (Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                    Blank 457 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                    Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                      Blank 456 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                      Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                        Blank 455 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 waiver
                                                                                                                        No Fee) (Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                          Blank 454 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Order
                                                                                                                          ALLOWING AND APPROVING PAYMENT, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                            Blank 453 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                              Blank 452 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Accounting
                                                                                                                              1st Hearing Date: 01/19/2012 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 27
                                                                                                                                Blank 451 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                1st Hearing Date: 01/19/2012 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 20
                                                                                                                                  Blank 450 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                  MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER 1st Hearing Date: 01/19/2012 Filed by: PVP Attorney Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Conservator: Spears, Britney Jean, Subject Person Motion Num: 19
                                                                                                                                    Blank 449 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 supplement
                                                                                                                                    TO THE PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING AND ETC. Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                      Blank 448 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                      ERRATA Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                        Blank 447 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                        Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                          Blank 446 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                          JAMES P. SPEARS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                            Blank 445 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                            Notice of motion & motion to seal 1st supplement Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                              Blank 444 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 supplement
                                                                                                                                              REDACTED Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                Blank 443 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                1st Hearing Date: 11/28/2011 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 18
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 442 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                  COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 441 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                    Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 11/16/2011 Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Complaint Num: 26
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 440 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 TOP
                                                                                                                                                      POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 439 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 supplement
                                                                                                                                                        1st supplement to petition Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 438 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                          of James P. Spears Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 437 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 waiver
                                                                                                                                                            No Fee) (SAMUEL D. INGHAM, III Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 436 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                              Pet for Ord Allowing & Apprv Pymnt 1st Hearing Date: 11/16/2011 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 25
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 435 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                No Fee) (Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 434 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED DECLARATION Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 433 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED FIRST SUPPLEMENT Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 432 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                      COVER PAGE FOR REDACTED VERSION OF INTERIM ORDER INSTRUCTING CONSERVATORS Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 431 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                        COVER PAGE FOR REDACTED VERSION OF ORDER INSTRUCTING CONSERVATORS Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 430 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED ATTORNEY DECLARATION, ETC Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 429 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: 8/23/2011 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 428 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011 response
                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS, ETC. Filed By: Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Petitioner Repres By: Miller, Louis R., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 427 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                GERALDINE A. WYLE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 426 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                  OF CON-CONSERVATORS' JOINDER IN OPPOSITION OF CONSERVATEE TO MOTION OF BRAND SESE PARTNERS..... . Repres By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 425 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                    CO-CONSERVATOR'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS.... Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 424 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX OF OUT OF STATE AUTHORI- TIES FILED IN SUPPOORT OF CO-CON- SERVATORS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS..... Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 423 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 422 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 421 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 420 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                              BRAND SENSE PARTNERS LLC'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE THE BRIEFING AND DETERMINATION ON THE PENDING MOTION OF BRAND SENSE PARTNERS, LLC. Filed By: Neri, Geoffrey A., Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 419 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                SHORETNING TIME Filed By: SUPERIOR COURT, Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 418 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY DECL. RE HEARING Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 417 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    URGENCY Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 416 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 415 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        1st Hearing Date: 08/12/2011 Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Repres By: Wallet, Andrew, Esq., Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn Repres By: Ingham, III, Samuel D., ESQ., Petitioner in Pro Per Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Motion Num: 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 414 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON CONTINUING HEARING ON BRAND SENSE'S MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS AND SET ASIDE ORDERS OF MAY 25, 2011 AND JUNE 7, 2011, TO AUGUST 30, 2011 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 413 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE RE: CHANGE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME ON BRAND SENSE PARTNERS LLC'S MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS AND SET ASIDE ORDERS OF MAY 25 AND JUNE 7, 2011 Filed By: Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Petitioner Repres By: Miller, Louis R., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 412 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE Filed By: SUPERIOR COURT, Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 411 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Report - Court Appointed Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                [RE EX PARTE] Repres By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Filed By: Spears, Britney Jean, Subject Person
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 410 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF URGENCY RE EX PARTE Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 409 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RE EX PARTE & SUPPORT Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 408 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/28/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONT HRG Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 407 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 406 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER 1st Hearing Date: 08/17/2011 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Petitioner Repres By: Miller, Louis R., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 405 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Denied W/O PREJUDICE- SHORTENING TIME Filed By: Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Petitioner Repres By: Miller, Louis R., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 404 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              For Hearing dated: 2011-07-07 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 403 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 07/07/2011 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 402 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  1st Hearing Date: 07/07/2011 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 401 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Order - Approving Account
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 400 Filed: 5/28/2011, Entered: 5/28/2011 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO SECOND ACCOUNT CURRENT, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 399 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 398 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE PETN FOR INSTRUCTIONS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 397 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NTC OF MOTION & MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE PETN FOR INSTRUCTIONS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 396 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted FOR HRG ON MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE FOR INSTRUCTION Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 395 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE FOR ORD SHORTENING TIME T O HEAR MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE PET N FOR INSTRUCTIONS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 394 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 393 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [ CONTINUED ] Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 392 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE - DENITED Filed By: KABC-TV, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 391 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDIA REQUEST Filed By: KABC-TV, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 390 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: 4/27/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF NOTICE OF GERALDINE A. WYLE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 389 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: 4/27/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 388 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE PETITION, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 387 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Memorandum-Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                $655.00 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 4/14/11 Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 386 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIRMED REMITTITUR ISSUED 04/07/11 S/T D/9 ON 04/15/11 Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 385 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 384 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No Fee) (JOSEPH D. BUA Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 383 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No Fee) (Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 382 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING AND APPROVING PAYMENT OF: 1) COMPENSATION TO CONSERVATORS AND ATTORNEYS FOR CONSERVATORS 2) REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 381 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Inventory & Appraisal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            #3 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 380 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Inventory & Appraisal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              #2 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 379 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 378 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GRANTING EX PARTE PETN FOR MODIF & CLARIFICATION - ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 377 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    GRANTING AUTHORIZING RETENTION OF BIRD MARELLA BOXER -ETC AS LITIG COUNSEL Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 376 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF GERALDINE A. WYLE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 375 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF GERALDINE A. WYLE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 374 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE PETN FOR ORD AUTH RETENTION OF BIRD, MARELLA, -ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 373 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE PETITION FOR MODIFICATION & CLARIFICATION OF THE CRT'S SEPT. 8 & NOV. 18, 2010 INVESTMENT ORDS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 372 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 ExParte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted FOR BOND & MODIFICATIONOF ORD RE E X PARTE RE INVESTMENT POWERS & STR ATEGY Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 371 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                & URGENCY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 370 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR APPROVAL OF BOND & MODIFICATI ON OF ORD RE EX PARTE RE INVESTMEN T POWERS & STRATEGY Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 369 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 368 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JAMES P. SPEARS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 367 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVING APPRAISAL BY PROBATE REFEREE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 366 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No Fee) (Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 365 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            VERIFICATION OF JAMES P. SPEARS RE SECOND ACCOUNT CURRENT, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 364 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No Fee) (Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 363 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 362 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Notice-Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Support of petiton for allowing and approving payment... FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 361 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order petnr: James P. Spears 1st Hearing Date: 12/15/2010 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 360 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 12/15/2010 Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 359 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        1st Hearing Date: 12/15/2010 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 358 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RE EX PARTE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF BOND AND ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 357 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Bond - $23,500,000.00 Filed by: Conservator Posted By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 356 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO CONFIRM SEALING ORDER,OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE...... Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 355 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (REDACTED) EX PARTE PTITION RE INVESTMENT POWERS & STRATEGY.... Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 354 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (REDACTED) ORDER RE EX PARTE PETIT ION RE INVESTMENT & POWERS.... Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 353 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (REDACTED) TO EX PARTE PETITION Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 352 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 351 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 350 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 349 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 348 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 347 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 346 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Consent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 345 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Consent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TO EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 344 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Abstract of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 343 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GERALDINE A. WYLE 1st Hearing Date: 10/27/2010 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Motion Num: 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 342 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 341 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 340 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Abstract of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 339 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed by: Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 338 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 337 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 336 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      1st Hearing Date: 09/20/2010 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Motion Num: 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 335 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF COSTS Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 334 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 333 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 332 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No Fee) (Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 331 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No Fee) (Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 330 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No Fee) (Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 329 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Accounting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judgment by Court-Petition Denied After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 07/27/2010 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 328 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TO CONFIRM SEALING ORDER for acctg or in the alt-motion to seal 1st Hearing Date: 07/27/2010 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 327 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 326 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No Fee) (Evidence code 730 Expert FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 325 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 324 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAHP, RECORD, OR BROADCAST Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 323 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Notice-Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 322 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner Repres By: Kreshek, Bradley H., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 321 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISMISSED APPEAL FILED 4/29/09 REMITTITUR ISSUED 5/14/10 S/T D-9 5/26/10 Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 320 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 319 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 318 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Support of Attorney's fees, FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 317 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statements for Legal Services (LODGED ONLY ) FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 316 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR APPROVAL OF COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 315 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order Pet for Ord Allowing & Apprv Pymnt of Compensation to Consor & Atty for Consor., etc. 1st Hearing Date: 06/03/2010 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 314 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES 1st Hearing Date: 06/03/2010 Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 313 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER 1st Hearing Date: 06/18/2010 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 312 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 311 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER 1st Hearing Date: 06/03/2010 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 9
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 310 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER 1st Hearing Date: 05/24/2010 Filed by: Attorney for Respondent Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner Motion Num: 8
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 309 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            For Hearing dated: 2010-05-24 Support of Atty's Mo to be Relieved as Counsel Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 308 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REMITTITUR ISSUED 3-26-10 Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 307 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE (RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SUSPENDING) Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 306 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER 1st Hearing Date: 05/10/2010 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 305 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No Fee) (SAMUEL D. INGHAM, III Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 304 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DENIED ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 303 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCAST Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 302 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DENIED ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 301 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAHP, RECORD, OR BROADCAST Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 300 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DENIED ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 299 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 298 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BO SEAL...ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF ERRATA RE: NTC OF MOTION & MOTION TO SEAL PETN FOR ORDER RE CONSERVATEE'S ACCOUNT Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 296 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER 1st Hearing Date: 03/19/2010 Repres By: Wallet, Andrew, Esq., Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Motion Num: 6
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 295 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        1st Hearing Date: 03/19/2010 Repres By: Wallet, Andrew, Esq., Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Motion Num: 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 294 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Petition - Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 03/16/2010 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 293 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR LEAVE TO LATE-FILE PETITION, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER AUTHORIZING CONSERVATORS TO DISPOSE OF CERTAIN TANGIBLE PERSONAL PROPERTY OF CONSERVATEE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 291 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DENIED Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 290 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 289 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 288 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE - DENIED Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 287 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TMZ - MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCASE Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 286 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: 12/10/2009 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER 1st Hearing Date: 01/15/2010 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 285 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 284 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR APPROAL OF COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 283 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOURTH SUPPL. TO FIRST ACCOUNT CURRENT AND ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 282 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Inventory & Appraisal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 281 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 280 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION...ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 279 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM SEALING ORDER PURSUANT TO PROCEDURES REGARDING SEALING AND REDACTION; DECLARATION OF GERALDINE A. WYLE IN SUPPORT THEREOF 1st Hearing Date: 11/20/2009 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Motion Num: 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 278 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 277 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Notice - Clerk's Notice of Filing Fees Required
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 276 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No Fee) (Evidence code 730 expert FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 275 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE RE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GERALDINE A. WYLE...ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 274 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 7-15-09 S/T D-9 7-23-09 Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 273 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 272 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 271 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE RE FIRST ACCOUNT CURRENT, ET AL.; ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 270 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF JEFFREY C. ALEXANDER RE PERSONAL SERVICE OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION...ETC. Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 269 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            QUALIFYING BOND $1,500,000.00 Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Posted By: Spears, James P., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 268 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed by: Appellant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 267 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 266 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 265 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 264 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      - FOR APPROVAL OF COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 263 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        - FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 262 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No Fee) (WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SAMUEL D. INGHAM, III, OF EX PARTE PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE...ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 261 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No Fee) (WAIVER OF NOTICE OF JEFFREY D. WEXLER OF EX PARTE PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF ATTORNEY'S FEES...ETC Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 260 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 259 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 258 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 257 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST ACCOUNT CURRENT AND REPORT OF JAMES P. SPEARS AND ANDREW M. WALLET, CO-CONSERVATORS OF THE ESTATE; PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND FOR APPROVAL THEREOF Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 256 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 255 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D. WEXLER IN REPLY TO OBJECTIONS RE: ATTORNEYS' FEES Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 254 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT TO DECLARATION OF JOEL E BOXER RE TOTAL ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS RE REQUESTS FOR INJUNCTIONS; SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D WEXLER Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 253 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMBINED REPLY TO EARDLEY AND LUTFI'S OBJECTIONS, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 252 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TO DECLARATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES COSTS; ETC. Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 251 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JOEL E. BOXTER, ETC Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 250 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 249 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed by: Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 248 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF INTENT TO MOVE TO VACATE THE JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 247 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO REQUEST FOR ATTORNENY'S FEES Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Diamond, Roger Jon, Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 246 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF ERRATA RE HEARING DATE ON CAPTI ON TO DECL. OF JOEL E. BOXER Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 245 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/7/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION OF JOEL E. BOXER RE TOTAL ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS RE REQUESTS FOR INJUNCTIONS Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 244 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/7/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Post-Move Notice of change of residence of conservatee FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 243 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/6/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 242 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF CH-140 RESTRAINING ORDER AGAINST ADNAN GHALIB Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 241 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF ORDER EXTENDING TRO & SETTING NEW HEARING Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 240 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 239 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 238 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 237 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed by: Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 236 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 235 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, Britney Jean, Subject Person Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, Britney Jean, Subject Person Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 233 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXTENDING TEMP RESTRAINING ORDERS AND SETTING NEW HEARING Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wexler, Jeffrey D., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 232 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 231 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL DEPOSIT Filed by: Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 230 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Diamond, Roger Jon, Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 229 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Diamond, Roger Jon, Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 228 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Inventory & Appraisal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              $599,952.41 ALSO CHECK MARK FOR CORRECTED Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 227 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 226 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  - OF NOTICE OF GEARALDINE A. WYLE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING CO- CONSERVATORS OF THE ESTATE TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR LYNNE SPEARS Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 225 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT Filed by: Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 224 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 223 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTEND TRIAL Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Diamond, Roger Jon, Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 222 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEDIA REQUEST Filed by: Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 221 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEDIA TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD OR BROADCAST Filed by: Personal Representative
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 220 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 219 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 218 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 217 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 216 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 215 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE LEGAL STANDARS FOR ISSUANCE OF INJUNCTION Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (SUPPLEMENTAL) OF NANCY KAMMER IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARRASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 213 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL) Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 212 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF LODGING OF NON CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES CITED IN RESPONSE TO JON EARDLEY'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 210 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTH. IN RESPONSE TO JON EARDLEY'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 209 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTH. IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION ETC. Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 208 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF FIREARMS TURNED IN OR SOLD Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Ghalib, Adnah, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 207 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FOR ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENA OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR A MOTION FOR ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENA, ETC. Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 206 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OFR ORDER COMPELLING BRINTNEY JEAN SPEARS TO COMPLY WITH NOTICE TO APPEAR, ETC. Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO EXPARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CONSERVATEE, ETC. Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              $1,500,000.00 - QUALIFYING BOND Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Posted By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No Fee) (Evidence Code 730 Expert FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (EVIDENTIARY) TO THE DECLARATION OF JOHN. T. ANDERSON, ETC. Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (EVIDENTIARY) TO THE DECLARATION OF STUART RICHARDS, ETC. Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (EVIDENTIARY) TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D. WEXLER, ETC. Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (EVIDENTIARY) TO THE DECLARATION OF DANIEL HAINES, ETC. Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (EVIDENTIARY) TO THE DECLARATION OF NANCY KAMMER,ETC. Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Lutfi, Sam, Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS AGAINST OSM (SAM) LUTFI Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 195 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: POWERS OF CONSERVATOR THROUGHOUT PENDENCY OF APPEAL Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 194 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXTENTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS AGAINST OSMA LUTFI Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 193 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF FILING OF ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS AND SETTING NEW HEARING Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Form 130) (Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FOR ORDER RE POWERS OF CONSERVATORS THROUGHOUT PENDENCY OF APPEAL Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF GERALDINE A. WYLE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 189 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No Fee) (BY ROGER JON DIAMOND Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 188 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE POWERS OF CONSERVATORS THROUGHOUT PENDENCY OF APPEAL Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS AND SETTLING NEW HEARINGS Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMBINED WITH ELECTION TO PROCEED PROSUANT TO CALIF. RULES OF COURT RULE 8.124 BY WAY OF APPENDIX IN LIEU OF CLERKS TRANSCRIPT Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner On Behalf of: Spears, Britney Jean, Subject Person
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSELY BY JAMES P. SPEARS Repres By: Wexler, Jeffrey D., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF GERALDINE A. WYLE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF JAMES P. SPEARS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION, ETCL Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 179 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR ORDER ALLOWING COMPENSATION ON ACCOUNT, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 02/27/2009 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 12 ExParte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 177 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCAST RADIO TELEVISION NEWS ASSOCIATION Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION OF STUART RICHARDS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE RADIO TELEVISION NEWS ASSOCIATION Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF JON EARDLEY IN OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Diamond, Roger Jon, Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOHN T ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION OF DANIEL HAINES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CO-CONSERVATORS' SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BLAIR BERK IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Diamond, Roger Jon, Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPEONA ON OSAMA ("SAM") LUFTI Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTIAN DOCUMENTS, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF ITAMAR GELBMAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION OF JOHN T ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 164 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Thoreen, Vivian Lee, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCAST E! ENTERTAINMENT Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE E! ENTERTAINMENT Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING UNDER SEAL OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS REFERRED TO IN PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION OF JESSE MARTELL IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GERALDINE A WYLE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 157 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CO-CONSERVATORS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION OF RAM MOSKOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 155 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION OF SERGIO D KOPELEV IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 154 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEMURRER OF RESPONDENT JON J EARDLEY TO PETITION Filed By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Diamond, Roger Jon, Attorney for Respondent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 153 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS REFERRED TO IN PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D WEXLER Repres By: Boxer, Joel E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 151 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION OF SAM LUFTI IN OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JAMES P SPEARS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARRASSMENT AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE ATTACHED THERETO Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Freedman, Bryan J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CO-CONSERVATORS' NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL RE REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CO-CONSERVATORS' PROOFS OF SERVICE RE CIVIL HARASSMENT PAPERS Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 147 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF GERALDINE A. WYLE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION, ETC. Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 146 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING RETENTION OF BIRD, MARELLA AS LITIGATION COUNSEL, ETC. Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 145 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING RETENTION OF BIRD, MARELLA AS LITIGATION COUNSEL, ETC. Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No Fee) (Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No Fee) (Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION GRANTED SUPERVISORY ORDER Motion Num: 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILE UNDER SEAL Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JEFFREY D WEXLER Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANDREW M WALLET Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JAMES P SPEARS Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BLAIR BERK Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          GERALDINE A. WYLE Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 133 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE REQUEST Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO STOP HARASSMENT Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Letter(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Issued To:: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Letter(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Issued To:: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 1/3/2009, Entered: 1/3/2009 Order - Appointing Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Conservator: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILE UNDER SEAL Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No Fee) (Of notice of andrew M. Wallet ex parte pfor order approving compensation for James P. Spears.... FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF ERALDING WYLE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR FEES, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Declaration of Andrew M. Wallet in Support of Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, ETC. Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order CAL #502 1st Hearing Date: 12/22/2008 Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Complaint Num: 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/2/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed by: Attorney for Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 ExParte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte application for order confirming that conservator James P. Spears is authorized to obtain text messages pursuant to the stored Communications Act.....FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Notice-Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non-California authorities cited in Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Ex Parte application ......
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Of Geralfine A. Wyle in support of Ex Parte application for order confirming that conservator James P. Spears is authorized to obtain text messages pursuant to stored communications act... FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Confirming that conservator James P. Spears is authorized to obtain text messages pursuant to the stored communications act, 18, U.S.C. 2701 et seq.; Memorandum of Points adn Authorities FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 ExParte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Authorizing co-conservators James P. Spears and Andrew M. Wallet to enter into agreement and execute documents relating to proposed business transaction FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Ex Parte Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Authorizing co-conservators James P. Spears and Andrew M. Wallet to enter into agreements and execute documents relating to proposed business transaction FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF LODGING OF AUTHORITIES CITED IN EX PARTE APPLICATION, ETC. Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF JEFFREY D. WEXLER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION, ETC. Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT, ETC. Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Hearing - Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            1st Hearing Date: 11/25/2008 Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Complaint Num: 13 ExParte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Conversion - Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Inventory & Appraisal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PARTIAL NO. 1 Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No Fee) (David W. Trader, M.D. FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No Fee) (Evidence Code 730 Expert FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No Fee) ([SEALED] REPORT OF DAVID W. TRADER, M.D.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Re Ex Parte APplication for ORder Granting Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Clay Townsend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: 9/29/2008 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, ETC Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 9/28/2008, Entered: 9/28/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSERVATORS POWER TO SELL TEMP CONSERVATEE'S RESIDENCE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCAST Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order PETNR: ANDREW M. WALLET 1st Hearing Date: 09/25/2008 Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner Complaint Num: 10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 09/05/2008 Filed By: Ingham, Samuel D., III, Esq., PVP Attorney Complaint Num: 9
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Petition - Allowance of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 09/25/2008 Filed By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 8
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          POWER TO SELL CONSERVATEE'S RE- SIDENCE.... Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order-Extending Temporary Letters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Temporary, expires 2008-12-31 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Letters - Temporary
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Temporary, expires 2008-12-31 Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Issued To:: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Letters - Temporary
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Temporary, expires 2008-12-31 Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Issued To:: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed By: Phillips, Stacy D., Former Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Conversion - Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IN SUPPORT OF PAYMENT ON ACCOUNT OF FEES, ETC. Filed By: Wasser, Laura A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            IN SUPPORT OF PAYMENT ON ACCOUNT OF FEES, ETC. Filed By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Conversion - Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Conversion - Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letters fron conservatee dated July 28, 2008 FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Report - Court Appointed Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Report of Evidence Code 730 Expert FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH,RECORD OR BROADCAST Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 ExParte Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEMP CO-CONSERVATOR INDEPENDENT POWER TO SELL TEMP CONSERVATEE'S RESIDENCE..... Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE Filed by: Personal Representative
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH,RECORD OR BROADCAST Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 5-28-08 S/T D-9 6-10-08 Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GERALDINE A. WYLE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Request - Media to Photograph, Record or Broadcast MC500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Order - Media Request to Permit Coverage MC510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND STIPULATION CONTINUING HEAR ING ON APPLICATION FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE - DENIED Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCAST Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE - DENIED Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCAST Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Order-Extending Temporary Letters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ESTATE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Order-Extending Temporary Letters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PERSON Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 TOP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        of non-stipulation to commissioner Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed by: Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed by: Appellant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Report - Court Appointed Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second Report of PVP Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Report - Court Appointed Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCAST Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE Filed By: TMZ, Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON APPLICATIONS TO SEAL Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Eardley, Jon, Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Report - Court Appointed Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Report of PVP Attorney FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Order - Appointing Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Letters - Temporary
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Temporary, expires 2008-02-14 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Letters - Temporary
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Temporary, expires 2008-02-14 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Order-Extending Temporary Letters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Order-Extending Temporary Letters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF GERALDINE A. WYLE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF PARTIAL W/DRAWAL OF APPL. TO SEAL RECORDS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF JAMES P. SPEARS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF JERYLL S. COHEN Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF JAMES P. SPEARS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF VIVIAN LEE THOREEN Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVRGE Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD, OR BROADCAST Filed by: Real Party in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO SEAL RECORD Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Subsequent) (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 02/14/2008 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF GERALDINE A. WYLE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Subsequent) (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 02/14/2008 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 6
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF JAMES P. SPEARS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Thoreen, Vivian Lee, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF LYNNE SPEARS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Probate-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF TEMP. CONSERVATOR Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Thoreen, Vivian Lee, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                GERALDINE A. WYLE Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR ORDER TO STOP HARASSMENT Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF LYNNE SPEARS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Thoreen, Vivian Lee, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Notice-Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AND TRO Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Letters - Temporary
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Temporary, expires Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $50,000.00 - QUALIFYING BOND Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Posted By: Spears, James P., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              $50,000.00 - QUALIFYING BOND Filed by: Attorney for Conservator Posted By: Wallet, Andrew M., Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Order - Appointing Temporary Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Temporary, expires 2008-02-04 BONND IS FIXED AT $100,000.00 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Conservator: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Letter(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NO BOND Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Order - Appointing Temporary Conservator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Temporary, expires 2008-02-04 NO BOND Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO SEAL RECORD - PERSON Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 11,939 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?