Spears, Britney Jean - Conservatorship
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BP108870

Tags
Last Updated August 15, 2021 at 7:23 PM DT (2.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bessemer Trust Company Of California, NA, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Eardley John J., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Ghalib Adnah, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Ingham Iii Samuel D. Esq, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Lutfi Sam, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Spears, James P., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Wallet Andrew M., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Wantuch Stan, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Entertainment Tonight, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo KABC-TV, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Moore, Ernest L., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo People Magazine, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Perreault Katerina, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo S.J. Gibson Films, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Spears, Lynne, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo The Weekly LLC. The New York Times, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Tmz, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Wantuch Stan, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Wright Lauriann, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo American Contractors Indemnity Company, Surety Company
No Logo Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Surety Company
No Logo Boxer Joel E. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Cohen, Jeryll S. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Diamond Roger Jon, Attorney
No Logo Eardley Jon, Attorney
No Logo Freedman Bryan J. Esq, Attorney
No Logo In Pro Per, Attorney
No Logo Ingham Samuel D. Iii Esq, Attorney
No Logo Kreshek Bradley H. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Miller, Louis R., Esq., Attorney
No Logo Moore, Bonita D., Attorney
No Logo Neri, Geoffrey A., Attorney
No Logo Phillips Stacy D., Attorney
No Logo Schleimer Joseph D., Attorney
No Logo Swan Rebekah E., Attorney
No Logo Thoreen Vivian Lee Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wallet Andrew Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wasser Laura A. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Wexler Jeffrey D., Attorney
No Logo Wyle Geraldine A. Esq, Attorney
No Logo Bua Joseph D. Sr, Probate Referee
No Logo Kraus Britt, Other
No Logo Montgomery, Jodi, Nominee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perreault Katerina F
No Logo Rubin Jason, Nominee
Officer/Director, T-hq, Inc.
No Logo O'Riordon, Peter, Requestor
No Logo Park Jonathan Hoon, Associated Attorney for Petitioner
No Logo Thoreen Vivian Lee, Associated Attorney for Petitioner
Spears, Britney Spears, Britney, Subject
Officially listed as "Spears, Britney Jean"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyle Geraldine A.
No Logo Superior Court, Court
No Logo Wyle Geraldine A. Esq, Attorney Participant Removal (Conversion)
Type Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)
Status Under Court Supervision 04/30/2016
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Order Appointing Counsel
Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
    Blank 13 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Petition - Appoint Conservator of Person
    Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 03/10/2008 Filed By: Spears, James P., Petitioner Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Thoreen, Vivian Lee, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1
      Blank 12 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
      OF LYNNE SPEARS - ES PARTE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
        Blank 11 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
        OF JAMES P. SPEARS - EX PARTE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
          Blank 10 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
          OF GERALDIN A. WYLE - EX PARTE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
            Blank 9 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Order
            DISPENSING WITH NOTICE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
              Blank 8 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Order
              Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                Blank 7 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
                OF LYNNE SPEARS - EX PARTE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Miscellaneous Document
                  TO SEAL RECORD - ESTATE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 MEMORANDUM
                    Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Declaration
                      OF JAMES P. SPEARS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Probate-Other
                        OF TEMP. CONSERVATOR - ESTATE Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Motion
                          PERSON RESTRAINED- OSAMA LUFTI 1st Hearing Date: 02/22/2008 Filed By: Spears, Britney Jean, Subject Person Repres By: Wyle, Geraldine A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 1
                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/30/1990, Entered: 1/30/1990 Consent
                            Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner

                              Space Space

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 11,917 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?