USA v. Lawrence, et al
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cr-00200
District Judge Wayne R. Andersen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Montel Goings, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anita Rivkin-Carothers and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Anita Rivkin-Carothers +1 312 641 2901 +1 312 332 3179 arcarothers@cypressmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Rosalie Jane Lindsay +1 312 621 8300 +1 312 621 8399 rose_lindsay@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1444 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
USCA case number as to Montel Goings 10-2246 for notice of appeal 1440 (las, ) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1443 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
    Transmission of short record as to Montel Goings to US Court of Appeals re notice of appeal 1440 . (gej, ) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1442 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, ) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1441 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
        DOCKETING statement by Montel Goings regarding notice of appeal 1440 (Brook, Carol) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1440 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Montel Goings (Brook, Carol) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 1434 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION to reduce sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582 for Montel Goings (7), 1287 is denied as to Montel Goings. Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 5/7/2010. Mailed notice (las, ) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1429 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
              ATTORNEY Appearance for USA byStephen Chahn Lee (Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1423 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM by Montel Goings in support of MOTION by Montel Goings for retroactive application of sentencing guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582for Montel Goings (7) re Count 1. 1287 (Lindsay, Rosalie) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1421 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen:as to Montel Goings, Marchello Duncan, Status hearing held on 10/15/2009. Defendant's motion to reduce sentence regarding crack cocaine are briefed as follows: Responses due by 10/30/2009. Replies due by 11/6/2009. Ruling will be made by mail. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1393 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen:as to Montel Goings, Marchello Duncan, Status hearings held on 6/11/2009 and continued to 10/15/2009 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS as to Montel Goings held on 02/12/2009, before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, (312)435-5815, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov.IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2009. (Scarpelli, Rosemary) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1380 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS as to Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Clarence Irons, Kent Clark, Mark Conner, Tasha Deere, Ninja Palms, Montel Goings, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Andre Seymour, Rogers Jordan, Deandre Steele, Darren Stewart, Tondelya Hollins, Paris Lawrence, Green Sallis, Stacia Smith, Jemel Young, Cameron Wilson, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Marchello Duncan, William Kelly, Horance White held on 09/15/2003, before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, (312)435-5815, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov.IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2009. (Scarpelli, Rosemary) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1371 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen:as to Montel Goings, Status hearing held on 4/15/2009 and continued to 6/11/2009 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1365 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen:as to Montel Goings, Status hearing set for 4/15/2009 at 09:30 AM. re: crack cocaine motion. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1338 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen:as to Montel Goings, Status hearing held on 2/12/2009. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Montel Goings by Rosalie Jane Lindsay (emd, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                  ORDER Appointing Counsel Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 1/14/09. (emd, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen as to Montel Goings: Enter order appointing federal defender program to represent Montel Goings. (For further details see separate order) Mailed notice (emd, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                      REPLY by Montel Goings to response to motion 1314 , MOTION by Montel Goings for retroactive application of sentencing guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582for Montel Goings (7) re Count 1. 1287 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lindsay, Rosalie) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen:as to Montel Goings, Status hearing reset for 2/12/2009 at 10:00 AM. for ruling on the motion regarding crack cocaine. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE by United States of America as to Montel Goings regarding MOTION by Montel Goings for retroactive application of sentencing guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582for Montel Goings (7) re Count 1. 1287 (DeWald, Ronald) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1303 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen:as to Montel Goings, Motion hearing held on 12/11/2008 regarding defendant's motion to reduce sentence re Crack Cocaine offense - 18:3582 1287 is briefed as follows: Responses due by 12/31/2008. Replies due by 1/9/2009. Ruling set for 1/22/2009 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1289 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for USA byRonald L. DeWald, Jr (DeWald, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1288 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Motion by Rosalie Jane Lindsay for presentment of motion to reduce sentence re Crack Cocaine offense - 18:3582 1287 before Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 12/11/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Lindsay, Rosalie) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1287 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION by Montel Goings for retroactive application of sentencing guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582for Montel Goings (7) re Count 1. (Lindsay, Rosalie) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                    ATTORNEY Designation for USA of Joel M. Hammerman Attorney Designation (Hammerman, Joel) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1252 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                      ORDER as to Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Clarence Irons, Kent Clark, Mark Conner, Tasha Deere, Ninja Palms, Montel Goings, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Andre Seymour, Rogers Jordan, Deandre Steele, Darren Stewart, Tondelya Hollins, Paris Lawrence, Green Sallis, Stacia Smith, Jemel Young, Cameron Wilson, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Marchello Duncan, William Kelly, Horance White, Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 6/12/08. (emd, ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1251 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen: Government's motion to permit destruction of weapons 1238 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice (emd, ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1240 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                          ORDER as to Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Clarence Irons, Kent Clark, Mark Conner, Tasha Deere, Ninja Palms, Montel Goings, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Andre Seymour, Rogers Jordan, Deandre Steele, Darren Stewart, Tondelya Hollins, Paris Lawrence, Green Sallis, Stacia Smith, Jemel Young, Cameron Wilson, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Marchello Duncan, William Kelly, Horance White Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 5/23/08. (emd, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1239 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen as to all defendants: Government's motion to permit destruction of weapons 1237 is granted. Enter order of destruction. Mailed notice (emd, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1238 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Reid J Schar for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,, 1237 before Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 6/12/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Schar, Reid) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION by United States of America GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO PERMIT DESTRUCTION OF WEAPONS as to Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Clarence Irons, Kent Clark, Mark Conner, Tasha Deere, Ninja Palms, Montel Goings, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Andre Seymour, Rogers Jordan, Deandre Steele, Darren Stewart, Tondelya Hollins, Paris Lawrence, Green Sallis, Stacia Smith, Jemel Young, Cameron Wilson, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Marchello Duncan, William Kelly, Horance White (Schar, Reid) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen : Defendant's motion to release forfeiture 1117 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice (emd, ) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER as to Montel Goings Signed by Judge Wayne R. Andersen on 1/18/07. (emd, ) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen : Enter order. It is hereby ordered that the forfeiture agreement recorded in Cook County, Illinois on 3/4/2003 under document number 0030299996, pertaining to real property located at 345 East 25th Street, Chicago Heights, Illinois, is released. Mailed notice (emd, ) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 1/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        motion to release forfeiture agreement NOTICE of Motion by Anita Rivkin-Carothers for presentment of motion for forfeiture 1117 before Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 1/18/2007 at 10:00 AM. (Rivkin-Carothers, Anita) (Entered: 01/01/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 1/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION by Montel Goings for forfeiture release of forfeiture (Rivkin-Carothers, Anita) (Entered: 01/01/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION by United States of America to amend/correct as to Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Clarence Irons, Kent Clark, Mark Conner, Tasha Deere, Ninja Palms, Montel Goings, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Andre Seymour, Rogers Jordan, Deandre Steele, Darren Stewart, Tondelya Hollins, Paris Lawrence, Green Sallis, Stacia Smith, Jemel Young, Cameron Wilson, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Marchello Duncan, William Kelly, Horance White Government's Motion To Correct Reocrd (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Huff, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE by United States of America as to Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Clarence Irons, Kent Clark, Mark Conner, Tasha Deere, Ninja Palms, Montel Goings, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Andre Seymour, Rogers Jordan, Deandre Steele, Darren Stewart, Tondelya Hollins, Paris Lawrence, Green Sallis, Stacia Smith, Jemel Young, Cameron Wilson, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Marchello Duncan, William Kelly, Horance White Government's Response To Defendants' Motion To Suppress Title II Recordings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Huff, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 6/29/05; Before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen as to Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Clarence Irons, Kent Clark, Mark Conner, Tasha Deere, Ninja Palms, Montel Goings, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Andre Seymour, Rogers Jordan, Deandre Steele, Darren Stewart, Tondelya Hollins, Paris Lawrence, Green Sallis, Stacia Smith, Jemel Young, Cameron Wilson, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Marchello Duncan, William Kelly, Horance White (emd, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  Judgment and Commitment Returned Executed as to Montel Goings on 10/18/05. (emd, ) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    JUDGMENT (Sentencing Order) as to Montel Goings (7), Count(s) 1, It is the judgment of this court that: the defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total uninterrupted term of one hundred seventy-four (174) months on Count One(1). Upon release from inprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for the periods specified for each count of conviction. The defendant is sentenced on all count(s) of conviction, namely, Count One (1) to a period of ten(10) years of Supervised Release. Criminal monetary penalties. Schedule of payments. The defendant is immediately remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Count(s) 24, The remaining Count(s) are dismissed. Montel Goings terminated. Signed by Judge Wayne R. Andersen on 9/16/05.Mailed notice (las, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      COMMENTARY by Montel Goings and objections to PSI; Notice. (emd, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address for Charles G. Murphy (las, ) . Modified on 4/1/2008 (las, ). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          RESPONSE by United States of America to defendants' additional sentencing motions (Exhibits); Notice (las, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen, Montel Goings : Sentencing set for 9/13/2005 at 09:30 AM. in courtroom 1403. Mailed notice (emd, ) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE by United States of America as to defendants' various post-trial motions for a new trial; Notice (yap, ) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                LETTER from Nyrobi Seymour to Judge Andersen dated 4/27/04. (emd) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER from Nyrobi Seymour to Judge Andersen dated 4/27/04. (emd) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RELEASE by USA of forfeiture agreement as to Clarence Irons (meg) (Entered: 02/27/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 1/16/04 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to Montel Goings : Oral motion to extend surrender date from 1/16/04 to 1/23/04 by 4:00pm to the United States Marshal Service is granted. No notice (emd) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                        JURY note as to defendants. (emd) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 1/7/04 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to Montel Goings : Defendant Montel Goings shall surrender to the United States Marshal on 1/16/04. Mailed notice (emd) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                            FORFEITURE jury instructions by USA (pmp) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                              PORPOSED jury instructions by USA (pmp) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SECOND set of proposed Jury Instructions by USA (emd) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  JURY Instructions proposed by USA (emd) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 10/30/03 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to all defendants: Motion to re-seal Title III recordings is granted [602-1]. (Entered Order) No notice (emd) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA to re-seal Title III recordings ; Notice. (emd) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 10/10/03 by Hon. Charles P. Kocoras as to defendants: (RESTRICTED). (emd) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          APPLICATION by USA (RESTRICTED). (emd) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER of 10/9/03 by Hon. Charles P. Kocoras as to all defendants: (RESTRICTED) (yap) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              APPLICATION by USA as to all defendants (RESTRICTED) (yap) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceeding as to Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Cameron Wilson, Green Sallis, Paris Lawrence, Andre Seymour, Montel Goings, Ninja Palms, Tasha Deere, Mark Conner, Kent Clark, Clarence Irons, Stacia Smith, Tondelya Hollins, Darren Stewart, Marchello Duncan, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Jemel Young, William Kelly, Horance White, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Rogers Jordan, Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Deandre Steele held before Hon. Wayne R. Andersen on 7/1/03, 7/31/03, 9/3/03 (558-1 through 558-3). (emd) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTIONS by USA in limine regarding forms of argument or evidence designed to elicit jury nullification , in limine regarding discovery requests or commentary regarding discovery in presence of jury , in limine regarding cumulative cross-examination (emd) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 9/15/03 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen: Defendant's motion for a continuance of the trial to 11/1/03 [535-1] is denied. No notice (yap) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 9/5/03 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Cameron Wilson, Green Sallis, Paris Lawrence, Andre Seymour, Montel Goings, Ninja Palms, Tasha Deere, Mark Conner, Kent Clark, Clarence Irons, Stacia Smith, Tondelya Hollins, Darren Stewart, Marchello Duncan, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Jemel Young, William Kelly, Horance White, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Rogers Jordan, Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Deandre Steele : The following motions are denied [487-1], [477-1], [477-2] , [450-1], [364-1], [362-1], [326-1], [244-1], [449-1], [448-1], [446-1], [354-1], [238-1], [445-1], [240-1], [507-1], [508-1], [268-1], [247-1], [248-1], [239-1], [442-1], [443-1], [502-1], [501-1], [419-1], [272-1], [242-1] , [472-1], [355-1], [245-1], [360-1], [360-2], [356-1], [357-1], [358-1], [352-1], [288-1], [363-1]. The following motion is granted in part and denied in part [243-1] (Stacia Smith). The following motion is granted [364-1] (Andre Lawrence). Entered Memorandum Opinion and Order. Mailed notice (meg) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CONSOIDATED pretrial motions by USA for cross-examination based on arrests , for inquiry into underlying details of convictions , for cross-examination based on other "Bad Acts" of witnesses , for evidence of defendants' lawful behavior , for argument or evidence of entrapment or Alibi , for testimony concerning the Title III Wiretrap , for argument or reference relating to possible penalities defendants faced if convicted and for forms of argument or evidence designed to elicit jury nullification as to all defendants ; Notice (pmp) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          EVIDENTIARY Proffer supporting the admissibility of co-sonspirator statements by USA tice (kmt) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            INFORMATION and notice by USA of intention to seek statutory enhanced penalties pursuant to 21 USC 851; Notice.. (emd) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 7/18/03 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to all defendants: Status hearing reset for 7/31/03 at 10:15am. Status hearing set for 7/23/03 is stricken. Time is hereby excluded to 7/31/03 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (emd) Modified on 07/24/2003 (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                INFORMATION and notice by USA of intention to seek statutory enchanced penalties pursuant to 21 USC 851 as to Andre Lawrence; Notice. (emd) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  INFORMATION and notice by USA of intention to seek statutory enhanced penalties pursuant to 21 USC 851 as to Antwon Williams; Notice. (emd) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    INFORMATION and notice by USA of intention to seek statutory enhanced penalties pursuant to 21 USC 851 as to Clarence Irons; Notice. (emd) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      INFORMATION by USA and notice of intention to seek statutory enhanced penalties pursuant to 21 USC 851 as to Artrez Nyroby Seymour; Notice. (emd) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        INFORMATION by USA and notice of intention to seek statutory enhanced penalties pursuant to 21 USC 851 as to Troy Lawrence; Notice. (emd) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          INFORMATION by USA and notice of intention to seek statutory enhanced penalties pursuant to 21 USC 851 at to Andre Seymour; Notice. (emd) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceeding as to Montel Goings held before Hon. Wayne R. Andersen on 01/28/03 (pmp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 2/27/03 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to Montel Goings : Status hearing held. (Entered Forfeiture Agreement). Mailed notice (yap) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                FORFEITURE AGREEMENT by Montel Goings (pmp) (Entered: 02/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen setting conditions of release for Montel Goings in the amount of $52,000 quit claim deed and forfeiture agreement Report to Pretrial Services: yes (MCC) (pmp) Modified on 02/28/2003 (Entered: 02/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceeding as to Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Cameron Wilson, Green Sallis, Paris Lawrence, Andre Seymour, Montel Goings, Ninja Palms, Tasha Deere, Mark Conner, Kent Clark, Clarence Irons, Stacia Smith, Tondelya Hollins, Darren Stewart, Marchello Duncan, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Jemel Young, William Kelly, Horance White, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Rogers Jordan, Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Deandre Steele held before Hon. Wayne R. Andersen on 1/22/03 (kmt) (Entered: 02/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 1/22/03 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to Montel Goings, Kent Clark, Stacia Smith, Andre Lawrence, Antwon Williams : Hearings are set for 01/27/03 at 1:30 p.m. No notice (ar) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        PLEA Agreement as to Montel Goings (kmt) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 1/28/03 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to defendant Montel Goings : Status hearing held. Defendant Montel Goings enters guilty plea as to count one (1). The court enters a judgment of guilty. No sentencing date set. No notice (kmt) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER of 1/21/03 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to Montel Goings : Defendant's motion for pretrial release [374-1] is entered and continued to 1:30 p.m. on 01/27/03. No notice (ar) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Montel Goings for pretrial release ; Notice (ar) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 12/5/02 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to all defendants: The Court allows the early return of subpoenas. No notice (emd) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 11/12/02 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to defendants: Status hearing held and continued to 1/22/03 at 1:00pm. Pretrial motions by 12/13/02. Government's consolidated response by 1/10/03. Time is hereby excluded to 1/22/03 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). No notice (emd) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 10/9/02 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to all defendants: Status hearing held; continued to 11/12/02 at 1:00 p.m. Time is hereby excluded to 11/12/02 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (kmt) (Entered: 10/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 9/3/02 by Hon. Wayne R. Andersen as to defendants: Status hearing held and continued to 10/9/02 at 1:00pm. Time is hereby excluded to 10/9/02 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). No notice (emd) (Entered: 09/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPEDITED REFERRAL ORDER: Case referred to Hon. Edward A. Bobrick for Mailed notice. (tsa) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 7/19/02 by Hon. Edward A. Bobrick as to Troy Lawrence, Green Sallis, Paris Lawrence, Andre Seymour, Montel Goings, Tasha Deere, Mark Conner, Kent Clark, Stacia Smith, Marchello Duncan, Jemel Young, William Kelly, Horance White, Andre Lawrence : Arraignment held. Defendants waive formal reading of the indictment and enter a plea of not guilty to all counts. 16.1(A) conference to be held by or on 8/9/02. Pretrial motions to be filed by or on 8/30/02. Status hearing before Judge Andersen set for 9/3/02 at 9:45am. Time is excludable under 18:3161(h)(F). Mailed notice (emd) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ARRAIGNMENT NOTICE: Before Hon. Edward A. Bobrick as to Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Cameron Wilson, Green Sallis, Paris Lawrence, Andre Seymour, Montel Goings, Ninja Palms, Tasha Deere, Mark Conner, Kent Clark, Clarence Irons, Stacia Smith, Tondelya Hollins, Darren Stewart, Marchello Duncan, Artrez Nyroby Seymour, Jemel Young, William Kelly, Horance White, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Rogers Jordan, Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Deandre Steele : Arraignment and plea set for 7/19/02 at 11:30 a.m. for Judge Andersen Mailed notice (kmt) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 7/16/02 by Hon. Morton Denlow as to Troy Lawrence, Levert Griffin, Cameron Wilson, Green Sallis, Paris Lawrence, Andre Seymour, Montel Goings, Ninja Palms, Tasha Deere, Mark Conner, Kent Clark, Clarence Irons, Stacia Smith, Tondelya Hollins, Darren Stewart, Marchello Duncan, Nyroby Seymour, Jemel Young, William Kelly, Horance White, John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Rogers Jordan, Kenneth Blair, Antwon Williams, Deandre Steele : No bond set; detained by magistrate as to Troy Lawrence, Cameron Wilson, Green Sallis, PAris Lawrence, Andre Seymour, Montel Goings, Tasha Deere, Kent Clark, Clarence Irons, Darren Stewart, Artez Nyroby Seymour, Jemell Young, William Kelly and Horance White, granted. Bond se tby magistrate to stand as bond in this instance as to Levert Griffin, Ninja Palms, Mark Conner, Stacia Smith, Tondelya Hollins, and Marchello Duncan, granted. To issue bench warrant and th egovernment will seek to have the defendant detained without bond pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, section 3142, as to John Tomaszewski, Andre Lawrence, Rogers Jordan, Kenneth Zbalir, Antwon Williams and Deandre Steele, granted. The district court cler's office is directed to disclose to the assistant U.S> attorney assigned to this case for the government, the name of the judge, magistrate judge, docket number assigned to this case and arrest warrants, in order to expedite arraignment of arrested defendant, granted. This information is not to be disclosed to any other party and the indictmentis to remain sealed until 7/16/02 at 12:00 p.m. or until further order of the court, granted. Do not seal the arrest warrants, granted. Enter Order. No notice (kmt) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION SHEET FELONy Category 1 (kmt) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT before Hon. Wayne R. Andersen Counts filed against Troy Lawrence (1) count(s) 1, 2, 11, 16, 17, 18, 19, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 35, 36, 37, 38, Levert Griffin (2) count(s) 1, 17, Cameron Wilson (3) count(s) 1, 14, 29, 30, Green Sallis (4) count(s) 1, 8, Paris Lawrence (5) count(s) 1, 3, 6, 7, 8, 12, 13, Andre Seymour (6) count(s) 1, 9, 15, Montel Goings (7) count(s) 1, 24, Ninja Palms (8) count(s) 1, Tasha Deere (9) count(s) 1, 24, 38, Mark Conner (10) count(s) 1, Kent Clark (11) count(s) 1, 28, Clarence Irons (12) count(s) 1, 31, 32, 33, Stacia Smith (13) count(s) 1, 21, 25, 27, Tondelya Hollins (14) count(s) 20, 22, Darren Stewart (15) count(s) 1, 3, 6, Marchello Duncan (16) count(s) 1, 5, 9, Nyroby Seymour (17) count(s) 1, Jemel Young (18) count(s) 1, 10, William Kelly (19) count(s) 1, 3, Horance White (20) count(s) 1, 4, John Tomaszewski (21) count(s) 1, 23, 34, 36, Andre Lawrence (22) count(s) 1, 39, 40, Rogers Jordan (23) count(s) 1, 7, Kenneth Blair (24) count(s) 1, Antwon Williams (25) count(s) 1, Deandre Steele (26) count(s) 1 (kmt) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 5/28/02 by Hon. Edward A. Bobrick as to defendants: (Enter agreed order) The curfew of the defendant Tondelya Hollins is extended each Wednesday to 10:45 p.m. so that he may continue to attend graduate school evening classes at a later time than during the prior semester. (Enter agreed order) Mailed notice (pmp) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Montel Goings by Anita Rivkin-Carothers (emd) (Entered: 04/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 4/9/02 by Hon. Edward A. Bobrick as to Montel Goings : Preliminary examination held. Enter a finding of probable cause; order defendant bound to the U.S. District Court for further proceedings. Mailed notice (pmp) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 4/5/02 by Hon. Arlander Keys as to Montel Goings : Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant appears in response to arrest on 4/5/02. The defendant is informed of his rights. Anita Rivkin-Carothers files her appearance as counsel for defendant. Detention hearing held. Defendant ordered detained until further order of court. Preliminary examination set for before Judge Bobrick on 4/9/02. Mailed notice (emd) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER of 3/5/02 by Hon. Edward A. Bobrick as to defendants: (Enter Order) Government's ex parte motion to unseal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrants as to all defendants is granted [24-1] No notice (pmp) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA to unseal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrants as to all defendants (pmp) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 3/4/02 by Hon. Edward A. Bobrick as to Montel Goings : Arrest warrant issued as to Montel Goings. No notice (pmp) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 3/4/02 by Hon. Edward A. Bobrick as to defendants: (Enter Order) Government's exparte motion to seal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrants as to all defendants is granted [2-1] until 04/03/02. No notice (pmp) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA to seal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrants as to all defendants (pmp) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT Hon. Edward A. Bobrick (pmp) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1,215 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?