Blum, et al v. RMI Network Svc Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-07334
District Judge Paul E. Plunkett, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 9, 2016 at 11:51 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dale Notbusch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo Diane Malone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo Edward Healy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo Harold Blum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo James C Strait, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo Jeffrey Edwards, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo Morgan Shank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo Nancy Bensen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo Sean McEwan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott Thackaberry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Thackaberry +1 847 919 0705
No Logo Steven F Neylon, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Dynamic Management Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Deutsch Levy & Engel Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Devine +1 312 346 1460 devine@dlec.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Halloran Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Edward OHalloran, III +1 630 279 1007 jeo@ohalloranlaw.com
No Logo Flagship Integration Services Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz Cooper Greenberger & Krauss, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric S. Rein +1 312 876 1700 +1 312 627 2302 rrein@scgk.com
No Logo Kim Flagstad, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz Cooper Greenberger & Krauss, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric S. Rein +1 312 876 1700 +1 312 627 2302 rrein@scgk.com
No Logo Kim Flagstad Welch, Defendant
No Logo Kim M Welch, Defendant
No Logo Kim Michelle Flagstad, Defendant
No Logo Kim Welch, Defendant
No Logo Kim Welch Flagstad, Defendant
No Logo Michael Calumet, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox, Hefter, Swibel, Levin & Carroll, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawton Sandler +1 312 224 1200 +1 312 224 1202 rsandler@fhslc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Sugden Manley +1 202 282 5826 kmanley@winston.com
No Logo Michael Shapiro, Defendant
No Logo Mrs E Welch George, Defendant
No Logo Rmi Network Services Inc, Defendant
No Logo William Borgstrom, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by INVALID ADDRESS - Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula K. Jacobi +1 312 214 4866 +1 312 759 5646 pjacobi@btlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugar & Felsenthal LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Suzanne DiCarlantonio +1 312 704 9400
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1002
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' instanter motion to dismiss without prejudice 31 is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions are moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (eav, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None
    INSTANTER MOTION by Plaintiffs to dismiss without prejudice (eav, ) Modified on 8/30/2006 (lcw, ). (Entered: 03/21/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTE entry before Judge Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing reset for 3/17/2005 at 12:00 PM. Mailed notice (clw, ) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTE entry before Judge Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing held on 2/3/2005. Plaintiffs are given an extension of time to 3/7/05 to file a second amended complaint. Status hearing set for 3/10/2005 at 11:00 AM. Mailed notices. (clw, ) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None
          MINUTE ORDER of 12/9/04 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing set for 2/3/05 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff has requested leave to file a second amended complaint. For the reasons set forth on the reverse of this form, we grant the motion. Ruling date on pending motions set for 1/20/05 at 11:00 a.m. stricken. Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
            MINUTE ORDER of 12/3/04 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Ruling date on pending motions to dismiss [12-1], [16-1], [17-1], [18-1] is reset to 1/20/05 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
              JOINT REPLY by defendants to plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint; Notice of filing (eav) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None
                RESPONSE by plaintiffs to defendant's motion to dismiss amended complaint (cdy) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE by plaintiffs to motion of defendant Michael Calument's to dismiss the amended complaint under Rule 12(B)(6) [18-1] (cdy) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Flagship Integration Services, Inc. and Kim Flagship's to motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint [17-1] (cdy) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE by plaintiffs to William Borgstrom's rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss his as a party defendant; Notice (cdy) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None
                        MINUTE ORDER of 8/26/04 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Plaintiff's emergency motion to extend time amended on its face to twenty-eight days to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss is granted [20-1]. Plaintiff's answer to all pending motions to dismiss [17-1] [18-1] [16-1] [12-1] is extended to 09/23/04; joint reply is extended to 10/21/04; ruling date is reset to 12/16/04 at 11:00a.m. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None
                          EMERGENCY MOTION by plaintiff to extend time to respond to defendant's motions ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None
                            MINUTE ORDER of 7/29/04 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Briefing schedule set on the following motions: 1) Defendants Flagship Integration Services, Inc. and Flagstad's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint; 2) Defendant Borgstrom's Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss him as a party defendant; 3) Defendant Calumet's motion to dismiss the amended complaint under Rule 12(b)(6); and 4) Defendants Shapiro and Dynamic Management Solutions, Inc.'s motion to dismiss amended complaint [12-1]; answer is due by 8/26/04; joint reply is due by 9/23/04; [12-1], [16-1], [17-1] [18-1] ruling on said motions is set for 10/28/04 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                              MOTION by defendant Michael Calumet to dismiss the amended complaint under Rule 12(B)(6) ; Notice of motion; Memorandum of law in support (eav) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None
                                MOTION by defendants Kim Flagstad and Flagship Integration to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint ; Notice of motion; Memorandum in support (eav) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
                                  RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION by defendant William Borgstrom to dismiss him as a party defendant ; Notice of motion; Memoranum of law in support (Attachment) (eav) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Flagship Integration Services, Inc., Kim Flagstad by Eric S. Rein, Arika Joy Osacky. (hp) (Entered: 07/13/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Michael Calumet by Richard Lawton Sandler, Karen Sugden Manley. (hp) (Entered: 07/13/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant William Borgstrom by Paula Kay Jacobi, Pamela Suzanne DiCarlantonio. (lc) (Entered: 07/12/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None
                                          MOTION by defendants Michael Shapiro and Dynamic Mgt to dismiss amended complaint ; Notice of filing; Brief in support (Attachments) (eav) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: None
                                            MINUTE ORDER of 6/10/04 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing reset to 6/24/04 at 11:00 a.m. Defendants Shapiro and Dynamic Management Solutions, Inc.'s motion for an extension of time to 6/23/04 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. [10-1] Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 06/14/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by defendants Michael Shapiro and Dynamic Mgt for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to complaint ; Notice of motion (eav) (Entered: 06/14/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Dynamic Mgt by Michael Joseph Devine, James Edward O'Halloran III (eav) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiffs; adding Steven F Neylon, Flagship Integration (eav) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 3/11/04 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing set for 5/13/04 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs' motion to vacate dismissal for want of prosecution is granted [6-1]. This case is reinstated. Plaintiffs are given leave to file an amended complaint by 03/31/04 Case reopened] Mailed notice (ntf) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION by plaintiffs to vacate dismissal for want of prosecution (Attachments); Notice (ntf) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 2/4/04 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Plaintiff fails to appear at two consecutive status hearings. The above-entitled case is hereby dismissed for want of prosecution. terminating case Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 1/21/04 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Plaintiff fails to appear at status hearing. Status hearing reset to 2/4/04 at 9:30 a.m. Failure of plaintiff to appear may result in this case being dismissed for want of prosecution. Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                            MINUTE ORDER of 10/17/03 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing is set for 12/17/03 at 9:30 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the court's action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for plaintiff by Scott A. Thackaberry ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett (eav) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                COMPLAINT; jury demand - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of Scott A Thackaberry as attorney(s) for plaintiffs ( Eight original and eight copies summons(es) issued.) ( Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (las) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Space Space

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?