Coach, Inc. et al v. Veronica's Fashion, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-02066
District Judge John F. Grady, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge John F. Grady
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coach Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bell Boyd & Lloyd, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Patrick McKey +1 312 372 1121 pmckey@bellboyd.com

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
No Logo Coach, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bell Boyd & Lloyd, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Patrick McKey +1 312 372 1121 pmckey@bellboyd.com

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 through 100, Defendant
No Logo Maria Guadalupe Ramirez, Defendant
No Logo Veronica's Fashion, Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
Rule 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. as to Veronica's Fashion, Inc. on 4/28/2011, answer due 5/19/2011. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. as to Maria Guadalupe Ramirez on 4/28/2011, answer due 5/19/2011. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Maria Guadalupe Ramirez, Veronica's Fashion, Inc. (hp, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Steven Patrick McKey (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5836839.(McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 114 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?