Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. Hyatt Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-06145
District Judge Ruben Castillo, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 12:12 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

v.
No Logo AP Aim Deerfield Tenant LLC, Defendant
No Logo AP Aim Lisle Tenant LLC, Defendant
No Logo AP Aim Rosemont Tenant LLC, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth Hotels, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Hyatt Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Legal Department, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hyatt Hotels Corporation"
No Logo Hyatt Regency Woodfield - Schaumburg, Defendant
No Logo Hyatt Summerfield Suites Chicago/Schaumburg, Defendant
No Logo Noble I Schaumburg Op Co, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Select Hotels Group, L.l.c., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 21 filed by the Plaintiff on 9/30/11.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to All Defendants Without Prejudice (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Brian Erik Haan (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
        MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:The Clerk is to arrange for this case to be transferred to the Patent Case Pilot Program.Mailed notice (smm) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to AP Aim Lisle Tenant LLC on 9/14/2011, answer due 10/5/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Noble I Schaumburg Op Co, LLC on 9/14/2011, answer due 10/5/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to AP Aim Rosemont Tenant LLC on 9/14/2011, answer due 10/5/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Hyatt Hotels Corporation on 9/14/2011, answer due 10/5/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to AP Aim Deerfield Tenant LLC on 9/14/2011, answer due 10/5/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Hyatt Corporation on 9/14/2011, answer due 10/5/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Select Hotels Group, L.L.C. on 9/14/2011, answer due 10/5/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Commonwealth Hotels, LLC on 9/14/2011, answer due 10/5/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Hyatt Regency Woodfield - Schaumburg on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Hyatt Summerfield Suites Chicago/Schaumburg on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                              EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 11 C 6145, Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. Hyatt Corporation, et al., pending before the Hon. Robert W. Gettleman, has been identified for transfer to the Patent Case Pilot Program in which this Court is participating, therefore It is hereby ordered that 11 C 6145, Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. Hyatt Corporation, et al., is to be reassigned by lot to one of the district judges participating in the pilot program. Case reassigned to the Honorable Ruben Castillo for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/27/2011. Mailed Notice.(td, ) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Gabriel I Opatken (Opatken, Gabriel) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Matthew G. McAndrews (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                    Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patent by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                        CIVIL Cover Sheet (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6346329. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q Part 1, # 18 Exhibit Q Part 2)(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 324 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?