Todd Michael Wagner- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-03139
District Judge Harry C. Dees, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pamela Wagner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brooks J. Grainger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brooks J. Grainger +1 574 272 1000 +1 574 272 4303 bankruptcy@krisorlaw.com
v.
No Logo Todd Michael Wagner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Andersen, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Tamke +1 574 289 8788 tamke@attorney-cpa.com
No Logo Debra L Miller, Trustee, Trustee
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for Trustee Debra Miller Filed by Trustee Debra L Miller, Trustee (Miller, Debra) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2010, Entered: None
    Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Todd Michael Wagner (Tamke, James) (Entered: 01/03/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2010, Entered: None
      Notice of Appearance of James K. Tamke, Debtor's attorney, Filed by Defendant Todd Michael Wagner (Tamke, James) (Entered: 01/03/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/19/2009, Entered: None
        BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s) 5 Order Setting Conference) Service Date 12/19/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/20/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
          Order Setting Conference (related document(s) 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pamela Wagner). Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/7/2010 at 03:15 PM at Room 201, 401 South Michigan Street (South Bend). (dlh) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
            Request for Hearing ( to set FRCP16 and FRCP 26 (F) Conference) Filed by Plaintiff Pamela Wagner (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
              Certificate of Service of Summons on Todd Michael Wagner 12/10/2009 . (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                Summons Issued on Todd Michael Wagner Answer Due 01/11/2010 Summon Issued (Grainger, Brooks). Page 2 (Certificate of Service). (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                  Adversary case 09-03139. (61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support),67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Complaint by Pamela Wagner against Todd Michael Wagner. Fee Amount $250. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 99 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?