Gary Lee Harmon- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Indiana Southern Bankruptcy, Case No. 99-AJM-7
District Judge Anthony J. Metz III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian L. Whitesell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kroger Gardis & Regas, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James G. Lauck +1 317 692 9000 +1 317 264 6824 jgl@kgrlaw.com
Space Harley K Means +1 317 777 7439 +1 317 777 7439 hkm@kgrlaw.com
Space Steven Eric Runyan +1 317 777 7448 +1 317 777 7448 ser@kgrlaw.com
v.
No Logo Gary Lee Harmon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz & Korin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2009 Weston Erick Overturf +1 317 464 1100 woverturf@katzkorin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Redman Ludwig

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan William Gooden +1 317 685 2426 +1 317 636 8686 ngooden@redmanludwig.com
No Logo Samuel Trafelet, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Redman Ludwig

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan William Gooden +1 317 685 2426 +1 317 636 8686 ngooden@redmanludwig.com
No Logo Wachovia Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wachovia Bank National Association"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kayla D. Britton +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 kayla.britton@bakerd.com
Space Louis T. Perry +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 louis.perry@bakerd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brooks J. Grainger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/09/2011 Brooks J. Grainger +1 574 272 1000 +1 574 272 4303 bankruptcy@krisorlaw.com
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 91
    LREF
    Blank 90
      LREF
      Blank 89
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
        Minute Entry/Order re: Trial. Vacated: VACATED: Day 2 of trial not needed. (Docket Order Only) (re: Doc # 1 ). (rss) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 83
            LREF
            Blank 82
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
              Minute Entry/Order re: Continued Trial (Day 1 of 2). Vacated: Continued by Parties. (Docket Order Only) (re: Doc # 1 ). (rss) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                Minute Entry/Order re: Continued Trial (Day 2 of 2). Vacated: Continued by Parties. (Docket Order Only) (re: Doc # 1 ). (sos) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                  Minute Entry/Order re: Continued Trial (Day 1 of 2). Vacated: Continued by Parties. (Docket Order Only) (re: Doc # 1 ). (sos) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 83 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?