Olinger v. The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:07-cv-00029

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 11:07 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara Olinger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce William Francisky +1 859 744 6980 bfrancisky@bellsouth.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Stidham +1 606 666 5401 +1 606 666 2112 stidhammicheala@bellsouth.net
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon L. Fleischaker +1 502 540 2300 +1 502 585 2207 jon.fleischaker@dinslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Stuart Rogers +1 502 540 2384 +1 502 585 2207 jeremy.rogers@dinslaw.com
No Logo Jason Starks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernard Pafunda +1 859 259 0102 +1 859 252 5335 pafundalawoffice@windstream.net
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL: action is DISMISSED, with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/9/2008.(STB)cc: COR (Entered: 07/09/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss by Jason Starks Jointly with Plaintiff Barbara Olinger (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Pafunda, Bernard) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER (1) the initial pretrial conf currently scheduled for 7/10/08 is SET ASIDE; (2) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED to 8/21/2008 09:30 AM; (3) Pretrial Filings due by 8/14/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 7/1/08.(KJR)cc: COR,D (Entered: 07/01/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER that the FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE currently scheduled for 7/14/08 is CONTINUED to 8/25/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/27/08.(KJR)cc: COR,D (Entered: 06/30/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER (1) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE currently scheduled for 6/26/08 is CONTINUED to 7/22/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph M. Hood; (2) parties' ex parte settlement conf statements shall be delivered under seal to MJ Todd by 7/15/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 6/19/08.(KJR)cc: COR,D (Entered: 06/19/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER - that the COURT TRIAL currently scheduled for 8/12/08 is CONTINUED to 9/9/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/12/08.(KJR)cc: COR,JC,D (Entered: 06/12/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER (1) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 6/26/2008 09:00 AM; (2) ?by 6/19/08, parties DELIVER UNDER SEAL directly to Mag Judge Todd separate ex parte settlement conference statements & status reports on settlement negotiations; (3) these documents may be submitted directly to Chambers or faxed. Signed by Judge James B Todd. (KJR)cc: COR,D (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER (1) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/10/2008 09:00 AM; (2) Pretrial Filings due by 7/3/2008; (3) court reporter needed for hearing. Signed by Judge James B Todd. (KJR)cc: COR,D (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER (1) DENYING pla's 26 NOTED motion for a continuance; (2) GRANTING dft Corporation of the President's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) DISMISSING all claims against dft COP. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER re pla's 26 Response to Motion - the clerk shall NOTE on the docket the filing of pla's Motion for a Continuance to permit affidavits to be obtained or depos to be taken or disc to be had. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints filed by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Interrogatory Answers# 2 Exhibit Interrogatories and Req. for Prod. of Doc.)(Fleischaker, Jon)
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                        RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints filed by Barbara Olinger. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of barbara olinger# 2 Proposed Order)(Stidham, Michael)
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Court Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING pla's 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to dft's 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Response due within 15 days of this order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
                            LREF
                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                            MOTION for Extension of Time by Brenda Olinger to file a response dft's 23 motion for summary judgement (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stidham, Michael) Modified by adding a link on 9/17/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
                              LREF
                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support # 2 Exhibit 1 - Aff. of Brimhall# 3 Exhibit 1(A) - Exh. A to Brimhall Aff.# 4 Exhibit 1(B/C) - Exh. B and C to Brimhall Aff.# 5 Exhibit 2 - Aff. of Donahoo# 6 Exhibit 3 - Aff. of Powell# 7 Exhibit 4 - Aff. of Porter# 8 Proposed Order)(Fleischaker, Jon)
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO BRUCE WILLIAM FRANCISKY, a non-registered atty re 21 Order on Motion to Remand had to be MAILED TO a non-registered atty, which is in direct violation of this court's General Orders re: Mandatory ECF. Failure to comply will result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR (KJR)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Court Filing
                                  ORDER DENYING pla's 7 Motion to Remand . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Court Filing
                                    ORDER GRANTING pla's 16 Motion to Amend/Correct dft's name; all further pleadings shall identify dft by its proper name of Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING pla's 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures; that pla is permitted to file the disclosures. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007
                                        NOTICE OF FILING by Brenda Olinger re 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Brenda Olinger, 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Brenda Olinger (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order File Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Late# 2 Proposed Order To Correct Named Defendant)(Stidham, Michael)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                          DISCLOSURES Plaintiff Barbara Olinger, Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Brenda Olinger.(Stidham, Michael)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct by Brenda Olinger Motion to Amend or Correct Named Defendant (Stidham, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Brenda Olinger Motion for Leave to File Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclsoures Late (Stidham, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                NOTICE OF FILING by Brenda Olinger Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Stidham, Michael)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING by Brenda Olinger Motion to Correct Named Defendant (Stidham, Michael)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING by Brenda Olinger Mt. for Leave to File Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Stidham, Michael)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) REFERRED to Mag Judge Todd for discovery disputes; (2) REFERRED for expedited settlement processes; (3) Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2007; (4) Discovery due by 12/31/2007; (5) Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2008; (6) expert witness reports due by - pla 2/1/08 - dft 3/1/08; (7) motions in limine due by 6/18/08; (8) REFERRED for initial pretrial conference; (9) pretrial filings due 1 week before Mag Judge Todd's initial pt conf; (10) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/14/2008 10:00 AM; (11) COURT TRIAL set for 8/12/2008 09:00 AM (4-5 days).Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood (KJR)cc: COR,JBT,D
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Brenda Olinger filed by The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Paul Rytting)(Fleischaker, Jon)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fleischaker, Jon)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                            Notice of Filing by Brenda Olinger re 7 Motion to Remand (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ORDER REMANDING)(Stidham, Michael) Modified by taking out the words "Motion for Order" & replacing with "Notice of Filing" & addking a link on 3/1/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007
                                                              FIRST MOTION to Remand by Brenda Olinger (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1-4# 2 Exhibit B-1# 3 Exhibit B-2# 4 Exhibit B-3# 5 Exhibit B-4# 6 Exhibit B-5# 7 Exhibit B-6# 8 Exhibit B-7)(Stidham, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER (1) parties meet within 21 days & exhcange disclosures; (2) Rule 26 Meeting Report due within 10 days after the meeting. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood (KJR)cc: COR
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007
                                                                  NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Bruce Francisky by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. (Attachments: # 1 Atty Info Form)(KJR)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Starks.(Pafunda, Bernard)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                      FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (KJR)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (KJR)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee Circuit Court, case number 06-CI-184. ( Filing fee $350; receipt number 895183), filed by The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 State Court Record Complaint# 2 ca sheet)(KJR)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?