Mills v. Straight Creek Coal Resources
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00184
District Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Joanne Mills, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Grigsby +1 606 546 5115 +1 606 546 5117 grigsbyjohnl@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Alpha Natural Resources, Defendant
No Logo Straight Creek Coal Resources, Defendant
No Logo Travelers Insurance Company, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
ORDER: 1) Plf's Motion to Dismiss [R.12] is GRANTED; 2) Complaint is DISMISSED w/prejudice; 3) Action is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/22/2011.(RC)cc: COR (Entered: 02/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF FILING by Joanne Mills re 12 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss by Joanne Mills Oral agreement reached after case filed Frist Order Dismissing Case (Attachments: # 1 Order Dismissing Case)(Grigsby, John) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
      FIRST MOTION to Dismiss by Joanne Mills Oral agreement reached after case filed (Grigsby, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2011: # 1 Proposed Order) (RC). (Entered: 02/11/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
        CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to US Marshal re 10 Summons Issued. (SYH) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Alpha Natural Resources, Travelers Insurance Company and mailed to U.S. Marshal with copy of complaint certified mail return receipt requested for service pursuant to order DE 9 . (Attachments: # 1 USM 285-Alpha Natural Resources, # 2 USM 285-Travelers Insurance, # 3 Certified Mail Receipt-US Marshal, # 4 copy of Order Adding Parties)(RC) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
            ORDER: 1) Alpha Natural Resources and Travelers Insurance Company are hereby added as Defendants in this action; 2) Process shall issue as to these additional defendants and they shall be served by the U.S. Marshal's Office as if they were original Defendants in this action. Alpha Natural Resources and Travelers Insurance Company added. Signed by Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/6/2011.(RC)cc: COR (Entered: 01/06/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
              Summons Returned Unexecuted via USM 285 Form by Joanne Mills as to Straight Creek Coal Resources. (Attachments: # 1 USM 285 Form, # 2 Order Granting IFP Status)(RC) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF FILING by Joanne Mills re 6 FIRST MOTION for Order by Joanne Mills To Add Defendants and for Issuance of and Service of Process on those Additional defendants Alpha Natural Resoures and Travelers Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Adding Additional Defendants and Requiring Issuance and Service Of Process)(Grigsby, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                  FIRST MOTION for Order by Joanne Mills To Add Defendants and for Issuance of and Service of Process on those Additional defendants (Attachments: # 1 Summons For Alpha Natural Resources, # 2 Summons For Travelers Insurance Company)(Grigsby, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2010: # 3 Proposed Order) (RC). (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                    CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to US Marshal re 4 Summons Issued. (JMB) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Summons Issued as to Straight Creek Coal Resources; and mailed to the US Marsha for service by certified mail return receipt requested. (Attachments: # 1 USM 285 Form, # 2 Certified Mail Receipt to USM)(RC) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                        ORDER: 1) Plff's Motion to Proceed IFP is [R. 1] GRANTED; 2) Plff may proceed w/o prepayment of costs or fees herein; and 3) The tendered Complaint shall be made a permanent part of the record.. Signed by Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/23/2010.(RC)cc: COR (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT, filed by Joanne Mills. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Assignment, # 3 Proposed Summons)(RC) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                            MOTION (APPLICATION)for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joanne Mills (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(RC) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 185 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?