Unknown
Bankruptcy Case Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Supplemental Schedule of Allowed Claims
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Motion to Borrow
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Motion to Vacate
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Notice of Dismissal
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000 Order (Miscellaneous Relief)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 Motion to Allow Claims
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Objection
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000 Modify Plan
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Supplemental Schedule of Allowed Claims
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Order Remanding Hearing
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Notice of Hearing.
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Motion to Show Cause
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999 Response
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 Order (Miscellaneous Relief)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 Motion to Show Cause
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Withdrawal of Document
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/11/1998 Order to Resume Payments
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998 Order to Show Cause
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 10/24/1997 Motion to Reinstate Case
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/16/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Notice of Dismissal
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/16/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Motion to Dismiss
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 Order on Motion to Remand Hearing
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Order to Show Cause
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/24/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Motion to File Amended Document
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996 Order (Miscellaneous Relief)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996 Order to Show Cause
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 Motion to Show Cause
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 Document (Amended/Supplemental)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Order on Motion to File Document
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Objection
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 7/18/1996 Schedule of Allowed Claims
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/20/1996 Motion to Extend/Shorten/Waive Time
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 5/15/1996 Motion to Extend/Shorten/Waive Time
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Notice for Objections
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Document (Amended/Supplemental)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: 4/12/1996 Order (Miscellaneous Relief)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Order on Motion to File Document
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Meeting of Creditors Held.
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 Order on Motion to Continue Meeting of Creditors
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/17/1996 Order on Motion to Continue Meeting of Creditors
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/9/1996 Appraisal
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Chapter 13 Plan
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Voluntary Petition
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?