Pozos-Tamayo, et al v. KY TN Growers Assn, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Western District Court, Case No. 5:02-cv-00203
District Judge Edward H. Johnstone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 1:48 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Armando Rosales-Pozos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Administrative Office of the United States Courts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda Gail Lowe +1 502 564 5576 +1 502 564 6131 kywd_ecf_deadletter@kywd.uscourts.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Migrant Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/15/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonya Renee Tennell +1 212 908 8539

Toggle Switch Represented by Texas Rio Grande Legal Aid, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas L. Stevick +1 314 449 5161 dstevick@trla.org
No Logo Berardo Campos-Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Administrative Office of the United States Courts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda Gail Lowe +1 502 564 5576 +1 502 564 6131 kywd_ecf_deadletter@kywd.uscourts.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Migrant Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/15/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonya Renee Tennell +1 212 908 8539

Toggle Switch Represented by Texas Rio Grande Legal Aid, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas L. Stevick +1 314 449 5161 dstevick@trla.org
No Logo Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Administrative Office of the United States Courts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda Gail Lowe +1 502 564 5576 +1 502 564 6131 kywd_ecf_deadletter@kywd.uscourts.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Migrant Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/15/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonya Renee Tennell +1 212 908 8539

Toggle Switch Represented by Texas Rio Grande Legal Aid, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas L. Stevick +1 314 449 5161 dstevick@trla.org
No Logo Nestor Pozos-Tamayo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Administrative Office of the United States Courts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda Gail Lowe +1 502 564 5576 +1 502 564 6131 kywd_ecf_deadletter@kywd.uscourts.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Migrant Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas L. Stevick +1 314 449 5161 dstevick@trla.org
TERMINATED: 07/15/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonya Renee Tennell +1 212 908 8539
v.
No Logo Brenda McGregor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith McGregor, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Juliette P. Tugander
No Logo Kentucky-Tennessee Growers Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia A. Piekarski +1 336 519 5502 +5197 519 519 7441

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. R. Loftis +1 336 721 1001 rloftis@constangy.com
No Logo Patricia Sowards, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl J. Marshall +1 270 554 0051 +1 270 554 0052 cmarshall@millerlaw-firm.com
No Logo Smith McGregor, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith McGregor, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Juliette P. Tugander
No Logo Brenda McGregor, Cross Defendant
No Logo Kentucky-Tennessee Growers Association, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia A. Piekarski +1 336 519 5502 +5197 519 519 7441

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. R. Loftis +1 336 721 1001 rloftis@constangy.com
No Logo Smith McGregor, LLC, Cross Defendant
No Logo Patricia Sowards, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl J. Marshall +1 270 554 0051 +1 270 554 0052 cmarshall@millerlaw-firm.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: None
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re order (DN 37) sent to D. Michael Dale. (CD) (Entered: 10/28/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: None
    ORDER by Edward H. Johnstone on 10/16/2003; granting 35 Motion to Dismiss. (cps. to all parties) (CD) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kentucky-Tennessee Growers Association and Patricia Sowards. (CD) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None
        UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss w/prej by Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos ; Berardo Campos-Garcia ; Nestor Pozos-Tamayo ; Armando Rosales-Pozos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(CD) (Entered: 10/15/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None
          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to D.Michael Dale. (KJI) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone on 08/28/03 Dismissing Case as settled; if settlement not concluded by 09/29/03, any party may move to have case reinstated on docket. (cps. to cnsl)(CD) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Settlement by Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, Berardo Campos-Garcia, Nestor Pozos-Tamayo, Armando Rosales-Pozos; settlement documents will be filed w/in 30 days. (CD) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Type of Deficiency: tendered order w/DN 30; failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court ; response to notice of deficiency due 7/29/03 (cc: attorney of ntoe) (CSD) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                  MOTION by plaintiffs to defer ruling on motion for summary judgment pending further discover ; Memorandum in Support (CSD) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
                    MOTION by defendant Patricia Sowards to substitute exhibit re [28-1] ; order & exhibit tendered (CSD) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                      MOTION by defendant Patricia Sowards for summary judgment ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Melody Fowler-Green to appear pro hac vice(FEE PAID #12440) [25-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 7/15/03] (CSD) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion to withdraw attorney [23-1] Lillian Howard Potter for Nestor Pozos-Tamayo, Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, for Berardo Campos-Garcia, for Armando Rosales-Pozos (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 7/15/03] (CSD) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/15/2003
                            MOTION by plaintiff Armando Rosales-Pozos, plaintiff Berardo Campos-Garcia, plaintiff Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, plaintiff Nestor Pozos-Tamayo for attorney Melody Fowler-Green to appear pro hac vice(FEE PAID #12440) ; Declaration in Support; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Type of Deficiency: proposed order failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court ; response to notice of deficiency due 6/27/03 (cc: atty of record) (KJI) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/15/2003
                                MOTION by plaintiff Armando Rosales-Pozos, plaintiff Berardo Campos-Garcia, plaintiff Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, plaintiff Nestor Pozos-Tamayo to withdraw attorney (KJI) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney D. Michael Dale to appear pro hac vice [20-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 4/17/03] (LMW) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Type of Deficiency: PHV fee (DN 20); failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court; response to notice of deficiency due 3/19/03 (cc: attorney of note) (CSD) (Entered: 03/14/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/17/2003
                                      MOTION by plaintiff for attorney D. Michael Dale to appear pro hac vice ; Declaration in Support; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 03/14/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None
                                        DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Brenda McGregor, defendant Smith McGregor LLC (cc: all parties) (CSD) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone: scheduling conference held on 2/3/03; discovery set for 10/1/03; disp mtn ddl set for 11/3/03; final pretrial conf set for 4:30 2/2/04 before Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone; jury trial set for 9:00 2/17/04 before Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone; Case to Magistrate Judge C. C. Gambill to conduct settlement conference; counsel shall jointly contact Mag. Judge Gambill by 08/15/03 to obtain date for conference. (cc: all counsel, Mag. Judge Gambill) [Entry Date: 2/3/03]{3142} (CSD) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                            LITIGATION PLAN by defendants, plaintiffs (CSD) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by plaintiff Armando Rosales-Pozos, plaintiff Berardo Campos-Garcia, plaintiff Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, plaintiff Nestor Pozos-Tamayo for entry of default as to Brenda McGregor, Smith McGregor LLC ; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone: scheduling conf. set for 11:00 2/3/03 before Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 1/7/03] (CSD) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM [11-2] by cross-defendant KY TN Growers Assn (CSD) (Entered: 12/16/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney W. R. Loftis,Jr. to appear pro hac vice (fee paid #12046) [10-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 12/4/02] (CSD) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Virginia A. Pierkarski to appear pro hac vice (fee paid #12046) [9-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 12/4/02] (CSD) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to [1-1], to [7-1] AND CROSSCLAIM by defendant Patricia Sowards against defendant KY TN Growers Assn, defendant Smith McGregor LLC, defendant Brenda McGregor; jury demand (CSD) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/4/2002
                                                          MOTION by defendant KY TN Growers Assn for attorney W. R. Loftis,Jr. to appear pro hac vice (fee paid #12046) ; Affidavit in Support; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/4/2002
                                                            MOTION by counsel for defendant KY TN Growers Assn for attorney Virginia A. Pierkarski to appear pro hac vice (fee paid #12046) ; Affidavit in Support; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER by defendant KY TN Growers Assn to [7-1] (CSD) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Armando Rosales-Pozos, plaintiff Berardo Campos-Garcia, plaintiff Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, plaintiff Nestor Pozos-Tamayo (JCD) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by plaintiff Armando Rosales-Pozos, plaintiff Berardo Campos-Garcia, plaintiff Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, plaintiff Nestor Pozos-Tamayo of filing of pla 1st amd cmp (JCD) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Douglas L. Stevick to appear pro hac vice (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 8/21/02] (CSD) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Lillian Potter to appear pro hac vice [2-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 8/21/02] (CSD) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff Nestor Pozos-Tamayo, plaintiff Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, plaintiff Berardo Campos-Garcia plaintiff Armando Rosales-Pozos for attorney Douglas L. Stevick to appear pro hac vice ; fee pd, rcpt #011183; order tendered (JCD) Modified on 08/02/2002 (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/21/2002
                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Nestor Pozos-Tamayo, plaintiff Maria Concepcion Alanis de Pozos, plaintiff Berardo Campos-Garcia, plaintiff Armando Rosales-Pozos for attorney Lillian Potter to appear pro hac vice ; fee pd, rcpt #011183; order tendered (JCD) Modified on 08/02/2002 (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT, summons issued, filing fee pd - receipt # 011183 (JCD) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?