Unknown
Bankruptcy Case Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Claude R. Smith, Trustee
No Logo Tam Q. Le, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy P. Rooney +1 504 455 4185 +1 504 455 4480 slctpr@aol.com
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: None
Final Decree. Signed-On Date: 1/17/96. [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 01/17/1996)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: None
    Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [10-1] Discharge Order by Tam Q. Le . [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 01/16/1996)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: None
      Order Discharging Debtor Tam Q. Le. Signed-On Date: 12/22/95. [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 01/04/1996)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: None
        Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Becket & Watkins for Creditor First USA Bank. [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 11/07/1995)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: None
          Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor And Sun Finance Company, Inc.. [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 11/03/1995)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: None
            First Meeting Held and Examination of Debtor. [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 10/31/1995)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: None
              Order Granting [5-1] Trustee's Disclaimer and Abandonment . Signed-On Date: 10/30/95 [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 10/30/1995)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/27/1995
                Trustee's Disclaimer and Abandonment [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 10/30/1995)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: None
                  Trustee's Report of No Assets. [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 10/30/1995)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: None
                    Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [0-0] First Meeting . [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 09/29/1995)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: None
                      Appointment of Interim Trustee, Claude Smith [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 09/22/1995)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: None
                        Voluntary Petition all schedules and statements. Filing Fees Pd: 130.00. Notice Fee Pd: 30.00. Receipt No.: 00121775. [Edwards,L.] (Entered: 09/15/1995)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 23 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?