Barnes v. River Birch, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-02726
District Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 1:00 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Miguel Barnes, Plaintiff

Represented by James L. Arruebarrena LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Louis Arruebarrena +1 504 525 0250 jim@unfairtermination.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Ann Martin-Deckelmann +1 504 212 4166 rachel@unfairtermination.com
v.
No Logo Riverbirch Inc., Defendant

Represented by Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/25/2011 Richard G. Passler +1 504 584 5440 +1 504 584 5452 rgp@bswllp.com
TERMINATED: 01/25/2011 Jerry L. Stovall, Jr. +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 387 5397 jls@bswllp.com

Represented by Fisher & Phillips LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Francis Harold +1 504 522 3303 +1 504 529 3850 eharold@laborlawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Joseph Sorohan, II +1 504 522 3303 lsorohan@fisherphillips.com
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
Bill of Costs Taxed in amount of $983.40. Signed by Clerk. (ecm, ) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
BILL OF COSTS by River Birch, Inc. Matter to submitted on 9/13/2011 at 10:30 AM before Clerk of Court. Any opposition should be filed within 14 days of the filing of this document. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Bill of Costs, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Notice of Submission)(Sorohan, Lawrence) (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/31/2011) (ecm, ). (Entered: 08/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT entered in favor of River Birch, Inc. against Miguel Barnes. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon.(ecm, ) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND REASONS granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's complaints are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (ecm, ) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Miguel Barnes re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order to Permit Amended Witness and Exhibit Lists. (Arruebarrena, James) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Notice of Submission by River Birch, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Notice of Submission)(Harold, Edward) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 Scheduling Order to Permit Amended Witness and Exhibit Lists by River Birch, Inc. Motion set for 8/24/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)(Harold, Edward) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
Supplemental Memorandum filed by Miguel Barnes, in Opposition of 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (ecm, ) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (ecm, ) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File River Birch's Supplemental Exhibits to Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/27/11. (ecm, ) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Reply Memorandum by Miguel Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Arruebarrena, James) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits To Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by River Birch, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Proposed Order)(Harold, Edward) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by River Birch, Inc. re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(ecm, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2011: # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J) (ecm, ). (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (ecm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File by River Birch, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Proposed Order)(Harold, Edward) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Miguel Barnes re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Arruebarrena, James) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 25 MOTION to Continue Hearing on 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion is continued to 7/27/2011 before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon.(ecm, ) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Miguel Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Martin-Deckelmann, Rachel) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION for Summary Judgment by River Birch, Inc.. Motion set for 7/13/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Notice of Submission)(Harold, Edward) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III: Settlement Conference held on 6/23/2011. Settlement can not be reached at this time. (sek, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
Witness and Exhibit List by River Birch, Inc.. (Harold, Edward) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
Witness and Exhibit List by Miguel Barnes. (Martin-Deckelmann, Rachel) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/23/2011 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III.(sek, ) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the parties contact Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III within 10 days for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Settlement conference must be held before pre-trial. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (NEF: Judge Knowles)(ecm, ) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint by River Birch, Inc..(Harold, Edward) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against River Birch, Inc. filed by Miguel Barnes.(ecm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 3/21/11. (ecm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Miguel Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Martin-Deckelmann, Rachel) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2011 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. 3 Day Jury Trial set for 9/12/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form)(cbn, ) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Enroll as Co-Counsel of Record for Attorney Rachel Ann Martin-Deckelmann for Miguel Barnes. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 2/17/2011. (ijg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Miguel Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arruebarrena, James) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Edward Francis Harold, Lawrence Joseph Sorohan, II for River Birch, Inc. Attorney Jerry L. Stovall, Jr, Peter J. Butler, Jr, and Richard G. Passler terminated. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (ecm, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Edward F. Harold & Larry Sorohan to be substituted in place of Peter J. Butler, Jr., Richard G. Passler & Jerry L. Stovall, Jr. by River Birch, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Harold, Edward) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Due to a conflict in the court's calendar, the scheduling conference set January 20, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. is continued to Thursday, February 17, 2011 at 10:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon.(ecm, ) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Order: All parties did not consent to proceed to trial before the Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 USC 636 (c) 7 . Ordered that the automatic referral is revoked. Further Ordered that a Scheduling Conference is set for 1/20/2011 10:15 AM before courtroom deputy by telephone. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon.(ijg, )(NEF: Judge Knowles, S. Kall, C. Nelson) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: One of the parties to this proceeding does not wish to consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Accordingly, the matter is hereby returned to the docket of the District Judge for the scheduling of a preliminary conference and the selection of pre-trial and trial dates. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary conference set on THURSDAY, DECEMBER 9, 2010 at 9:15 a.m. in this case is hereby CANCELLED and counsel need not appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (NEF: Judge Lemmon, C. Nelson)(sek, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: A Preliminary Conference is set for 12/9/2010 09:15 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III.(sek, ) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by River Birch, Inc..(Butler, Peter) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed; River Birch, Inc. served on 8/17/2010, answer due 9/7/2010. (Arruebarrena, James) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to River Birch, Inc. (ecm, ) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (jmd, ) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT with jury demand against River Birch, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053L-2563672) filed by Miguel Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Arruebarrena, James) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 84 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?