Namie v. State of Louisiana et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-00403
District Judge Frank J. Polozola, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Amanda Lee Namie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net
v.
No Logo Livingston Parish, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Vogt +1 225 923 3200 + 225 923 3208 shvogt@bellsouth.net
No Logo State of Louisiana, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Thibaut, Jr. +1 225 923 3200 +9233 923 923 3208 johnstjr@bellsouth.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Vogt +1 225 923 3200 + 225 923 3208 shvogt@bellsouth.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 07/10/08. (PAH, ) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Amanda Lee Namie. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL...This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 06/05/08. (PAH, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frank J. Polozola: Settlement Conference held on 6/3/2008. The court will issue a 60 day order of dismissal..All deadlines previously assigned are hereby vacated and all pending motions are hereby denied as moot. (Court Reporter E. Champion.) (PAH, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 19 MOTION in Limine filed by State of Louisiana, Livingston Parish. (Vogt, Stephen) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/3/2008 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Judge Frank J. Polozola. The parties shall be prepared to discuss settlement and have full settlement authority. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 5/29/08. (BP, ) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
              Proposed Voir Dire Questions by State of Louisiana, Livingston Parish. (Vogt, Stephen) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                Exhibit List and Witness List by State of Louisiana, Livingston Parish.. (Vogt, Stephen) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                  Exhibit List and Witness List by Amanda Lee Namie.. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Amanda Lee Namie. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                      PROPOSED JURY VERDICT FORM by Amanda Lee Namie.. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                        RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Dr. Gene Thompson on 05-22-2008 by Personal Service (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                          RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Dr. Michael Sunseri on 05-22-2008 by Personal Service (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                            RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Dr. Charles Kaufman on 05/22/2008 by Personal Service (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                              MOTION in Limine by Amanda Lee Namie. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Amanda Lee Namie. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frank J. Polozola: Pretrial Conference held on 1/10/2008. Proposed jury charges, voir dire, stipulations and a verdict form shall be filed on or before 5/23/2008. Bench Book of Exhibits shall be filed on or before 5/23/2008. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2008 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Frank J. Polozola. (Court Reporter E. Champion.) (JKH, ) (JKH, ). (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                    Proposed Pretrial Order by Amanda Lee Namie. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      UNIFORM PRETRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2008 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge Frank J. Polozola. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/21/2007. (JKH, ) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Letter dated 06/18/07 from Stephen H. Vogt to Judge Riedlinger Re: Discovery status. (DMC, ) Modified on 6/19/2007 (DMC, ). (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Letter dated 06/13/07 from Jill L. Craft to Judge Riedlinger Re: Discovery status. (DMC, ) Modified on 6/19/2007 (DMC, ). (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines. All fact discovery shall be completed and motions to compel Discovery due by 6/29/2007. Expert Witness List due by 6/15/2007 for pla and 7/16/2007 for dfts. Expert Reports due by 7/2/2007 for pla and 7/31/07 for dfts. Experts shall be deposed by 9/14/2007. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 9/28/2007. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/7/07. (BP, ) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines Scheduling Order by all parties. (Vogt, Stephen) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                Letter dated 1/5/2007 from Jill L. Craft to SCR Re: Discovery (NLT, ) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Letter dated 1/12/2007 from Stephen H Vogt to SCR Re: Discovery (NLT, ) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2006. All fact Discovery and motions to compel due by 3/30/2007. Expert Witness List due by 3/15/2007 for pla and 4/16/07 for dfts. Expert Reports due by 4/2/2007 for pla and 4/30/07 for dfts. Experts shall be deposed by 6/15/2007. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 6/29/2007. The conference scheduled for 10/12/06 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/2/06.(BP, ) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                      STATUS REPORT by Amanda Lee Namie. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Louisiana, Livingston Parish, filed by Amanda Lee Namie.(NLT, ) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 4 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Petition filed by Amanda Lee Namie, . Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/6/2006. (SAH, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Petition by Amanda Lee Namie. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Supplemental And Amending Petition)(NLT, ) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by State of Louisiana.(PAH, ) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2006 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. Status Report due by 10/2/2006.. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/16/2006.(NLT, ) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4699003158), filed by State of Louisiana.(NLT, ) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?