Cunningham v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-00602
District Judge Ralph E. Tyson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:04 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Albert R. Cunningham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net
v.
No Logo Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vicki M. Crochet +1 225 387 3221 +1 225 214 0462 vicki.crochet@taylorporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H.L. Kaufman +1 225 387 3221
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Murrill +1 225 387 3221 +3468 346 346 8049 john.murrill@taylorporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Shelby, II +1 225 387 3221 +3468 346 346 8049 david.shelby@taylorporter.com
No Logo Ed Laws, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vicki M. Crochet +1 225 387 3221 +1 225 214 0462 vicki.crochet@taylorporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H.L. Kaufman +1 225 387 3221
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Murrill +1 225 387 3221 +3468 346 346 8049 john.murrill@taylorporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Shelby, II +1 225 387 3221 +3468 346 346 8049 david.shelby@taylorporter.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
60 DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL...This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/29/09. (BP, ) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    RULING Adopting 40 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws, is granted, dismissing the pltfs claims under 42 USC 1983 for First Amendment retaliation and Fourteenth Amendment deprivation of property and liberty interests in his employment and reputation. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 9/17/2008. (JDL, ) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      REPLY TO 41 Objection to Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge filed by all defendants. (Shelby, David) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
        OBJECTION to 40 Report and Recommendations filed by Albert R. Cunningham. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws...It is recommended that the motion be granted, dismissing the pltfs claims under 42 USC 1983 for First Amendment retaliation and Fourteenth Amendment deprivation of property and liberty interests in his employment and reputation... Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/15/2008. (JDL, ) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Albert R. Cunningham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(PAH, ) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by Albert R. Cunningham. NO ADDITIONAL MEMORANDA ARE NEEDED FROM ANY PARTY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/6/2008. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by Albert R. Cunningham. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Supplemental Brief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                  REPLY Memorandum in Support of 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Ed Laws and Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit A-4, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C-1, # 7 Exhibit C-2, # 8 Exhibit D)(NLT, ) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 34 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/22/2008. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C-1, # 8 Exhibit C-2, # 9 Exhibit D)(Shelby, David) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Support of 31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Albert R. Cunningham. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                          Statement of Material Facts to 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , In Opposition filed by Albert R. Cunningham. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Albert R. Cunningham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response due by 1/9/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/18/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Albert R. Cunningham. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER REFERRING MOTION to USMJ: 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 12/5/07. (BP, ) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-1# 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts # 3 Memorandum in Support # 4 Attachment Order)(Shelby, David) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 25 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Dispositive Motions.... The scheduling order previously issued is hereby amended as follows.... Dispositive motions shall be filed by November 29, 2007.. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/31/2007. (SAH) Modified on 11/1/2007 (SAH, )...to edit text.. (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Shelby, David) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          RULING... denying 23 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/12/2007. (SAH) Modified on 9/13/2007 (SAH, )...to edit text.. (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order for Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines)(Shelby, David) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              RULING.... granting 14 Motion to Quash.... Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/14/2007. (SAH) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 14 MOTION to Quash filed by Albert R. Cunningham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Craft, Jill) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 19 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Vicki M. Crochet for Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College and Ed Laws; added John P. Murrill for Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College and Ed Laws. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/8/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Enroll Vicki Crochet and John Murrill as Additional Attorney by all defendants. (Shelby, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2007 (PAH, ). (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER: as to 14 MOTION to Quash.... IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his response to the motion by noon, Tuesday, August 14, 2007.. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/6/2007. (SAH) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Letter dated 8/3/2007 from David J. Shelby II. to SCR Re: Status of Discovery (SAH) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                          Letter dated 8/2/2007 from Jill L. Craft Alford to SCR Re: Status of Discovery (SAH) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of 14 MOTION to Quash filed by all defendants. (Shelby, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2007 (DMC, ). (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Quash by all defendants. (Shelby, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2007 (DMC, ). (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 12 Motion for Protective Order as stated herein.... Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/17/2007. (SAH) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by all defendants. (Shelby, David) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Letter dated 3/22/2007 from David J. Shelby, II to SCR Re: Status of Discovery (SAH) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter dated 3/12/2007 from Jill L. Craft to SCR Re: Status of Discovery (SAH) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:.... Motions to Amend Pleadings or add new parties or claims are due by 2/15/2007..... The initial disclosures required by Rule 26 (a) (1), Fed. R. Civ. P., / Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2007.... All fact Discovery and motions to compel discovery are due by 9/28/2007.... Parties Expert Witness List due by 7/16/2007.... Parties Expert Reports due by 8/16/2007.... Experts shall be deposed by 8/31/2007. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 10/31/2007..... IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the conference scheduled for December 14, 2006, is canceled.... . Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/5/2006.(SAH, ) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          STATUS REPORT by Albert R. Cunningham. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws.(Shelby, David) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING COMPLAINT against Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws, filed by Albert R. Cunningham.(SAH, ) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                Defendants', Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University Agricultural and Mechanical College and Ed Laws, ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by all defendants. (Shelby, David) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 3 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Petition filed by Albert R. Cunningham. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/10/2006. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Petition by Albert R. Cunningham. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Supplemental and Amending Petition)(BP, ) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2006 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. Status Report due by 12/4/2006.. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/12/2006.(SAH, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4699003859), filed by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Ed Laws.(DCB, ) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?