Shortess v. State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-00523
District Judge Ralph E. Tyson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 7:59 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Mr. Robert Shortess, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net
v.
No Logo State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pugh Accardo et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/04/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Louis Burns +1 504 799 4500 +1 504 799 4520 aburns@pugh-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitehead Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John-Ed Long Bishop +1 225 303 8600 +1 225 303 0013 jbishop@whitehead-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack K. Whitehead, Jr. +1 225 303 8600 +1 225 303 0013 jwhitehead@whitehead-law.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 12182
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING granting 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center, dismissing plaintiff's ADA and age discrimination claims. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/1/10. (BP, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    RULING denying 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992; denying as moot 27 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/30/10. (BP, ) Modified on 7/1/2010 to edit document type (BP, ).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
      REPLY TO 69 Pltfs Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to 55 Defts MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (JDL, ) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 67 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Pltfs Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defts Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/4/2009. (JDL, ) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
          REPLY to 58 Response in Opposition to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(NLT, ) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 66 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/3/2009. (NLT, ) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to file Reply Brief to Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Brief to Supplemental Opposition)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to proposed Reply Brief)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Shortess. (NLT, ) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 60 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment In Excess of Thirty Pages filed by Robert Shortess. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/2/2009. (NLT, ) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                      Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Shortess. (NLT, ) Modified on 4/1/2009 to edit text (NLT, ). (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 61 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Shortess. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/31/2009. (NLT, ) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Robert Shortess. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Supplemental Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A and B)(Craft, Jill) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition to Defendnat's Motion for Summary Judgment In Excess of Thirty Pages by Robert Shortess. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Opposition)(Craft, Jill) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                              Statement of Material Facts to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment , In Opposition filed by Robert Shortess. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE in Opposition to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Shortess. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-K, # 5 Exhibit L-V, # 6 Exhibit W)(Craft, Jill) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The pla is permitted to respond by 3/16/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/11/2009. (NLT, ) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert Shortess. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(NLT, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2009: # 3 Additional Exhibits to the Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment) (NLT, ). (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER terminating 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel Appointed John-Ed Long Bishop for State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center; granting 50 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney John-Ed Long Bishop for State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/3/2009. (NLT, ) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/3/2009. (NLT, ) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                            Additional Exhibits to 51 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Memorandum in Support Memo in Supp of MSJ, # 3 Exhibit Exh 1 Memo to MSJ, # 4 Statement of Undisputed Facts Statement of Material Facts)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Enroll John-Ed Long Bishop as Attorney by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 48 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 2/1/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/19/2008. (NLT, ) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (for Dispositive Motions) by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Minute Entry/ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland: Telephone Hearing held on 12/8/2008 re 41 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notice filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. Court determined that the prospective deponent is involved with the facts of the case. IT IS ORDERED that the 43 motion for expedited hearing and the 46 motion for oral argument are GRANTED as the hearing was held this date. FURTHER ORDERED that the 41 motion for protective order is DENIED. (JDL, ) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Oral Argument on 41 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notice by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order to Motion for Oral Argument)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Exhibit(s) to 43 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on 41 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notice by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of 43 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on 41 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notice filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Expedited Hearing on 41 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notice by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of 41 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notice filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notice by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order to Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notice)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to 39 Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center.(Whitehead, Jack) Modified on 10/10/2008 to correct title (JDL, ). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Second SUPPLEMENTAL and AMENDING PETITION against State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center, filed by Robert Shortess.(JDL, ) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amending Petition filed by Robert Shortess. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 10/1/2008. (JDL, ) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amending Petition by Robert Shortess. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Second Supplemental and Amending Petition)(Craft, Jill) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992. Pltfs Response due 9/17/2008. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 9/10/2008. (JDL, ) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 filed by Robert Shortess. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 by Robert Shortess. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defts Motion. Pltfs response due 9/8/2008. Discovery motions and completing all discovery, except experts, due 11/1/2008. Pltfs expert witness list due 8/31/2008, Defts due 9/30/2008. Pltfs expert reports due 9/30/2008, Defts due 10/31/2008. Experts deposed by 12/1/12008. Dispositive motions due 1/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 8/25/2008. (JDL, ) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response and of All Deadlines by Robert Shortess. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 30 Motion to Amend Exhibit H of EHCC's Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction to Stay LA Civil Service Proceedings, rec doc #22 and #26. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/22/2008. (JDL, ) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                        MOTION to Amend 26 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,, (Exhibit H) by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, Pages 2 and 3)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992. Pltfs response due 8/22/2008. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/10/2008. (JDL, ) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 by Robert Shortess. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Oral Argument on 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Additional Exhibits to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D - Pages 1 - 3, # 2 Exhibit E - Pages 1 - 3, # 3 Exhibit F - Pages 1 - 7, # 4 Exhibit G - Pages 1 - 12, # 5 Exhibit H - 1 Page, # 6 Memorandum in Support of Doc. Rec. 22)(Whitehead, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2008: # 7 Exhibit H) (JDL, ). Modified on 7/23/2008 to add corrected Exhibit H, see doc #31 for order. (JDL, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Additional Exhibits to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Pages 68-75, # 2 Exhibit C - Pages 76-90, # 3 Exhibit C - Pages 91-100, # 4 Exhibit C - Pages 101-105, # 5 Exhibit C - Pages 106-120, # 6 Exhibit C - Pages 121-135)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Additional Exhibits to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Pages 1-15, # 2 Exhibit C - Pages 16-30, # 3 Exhibit C - Pages 31-45, # 4 Exhibit C - Pages 46-60, # 5 Exhibit C - Pages 61-67)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Additional Exhibits to 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - Pages 1 - 15, # 2 Exhibit B - Pages 16-30, # 3 Exhibit B - Pages 31-45, # 4 Exhibit B - Pages 46-60, # 5 Exhibit B - Pages 61-75, # 6 Exhibit B - Pages 76-82)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Preliminary Injunction to Stay Louisiana Civil Service Proceedings No. S-15992 by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Pages 1 to 15, # 2 Exhibit A - Pages 16 - 30, # 3 Exhibit A - Pages 31 - 45)(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: The deadline for filing all discovery motions and completing all discovery, except experts is hereby amended and changed to September 1, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 6/17/2008. (JKH, ) Modified on 6/17/2008 to edit text (JKH, ). (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 19 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines: All discovery motions and completing all discovery due by 8/1/2008. Expert Witness List due by 6/30/2008 for plf, 7/31/2008 dfts. Expert Reports due by 7/31/2008 for plf, 8/31/2008 for dfts Experts shall be deposed by 10/1/2008. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 11/1/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 6/9/08. (JKH, ) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines /Modify Scheduling Order (Corrected) by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines /Modify Scheduling Order by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Supplemental and Amended ANSWER to 16 Amended Complaint by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center.(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center, filed by Robert Shortess.(BP, ) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 14 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 5/21/08. (BP, ) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend and Supplement Petition by Robert Shortess. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Supplemental and Amending Petition)(Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 12 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. All Discovery and Discovery Motions due by 8/15/2008. Expert Witness List due by 6/15/2008 for pla and 7/15/2008 for dfts. Expert Reports due by 7/15/2008 for pla and 8/15/2008 for dfts. Experts shall be deposed by 9/1/2008. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 10/1/2008.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/21/2008. (NLT, ) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Robert Shortess, State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alexander L. Burns is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/4/08. (BP, ) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Alexander L. Burns to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order On Motion to Withdraw As Attorney)(Burns, Alexander) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland: Telephone Conference held on 2/12/2008. Discovery discussed. (BP, ) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 7 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Alexander Louis Burns for State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 01/28/08. (PAH, ) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Enroll Alexander L. Burns as Additional Attorney and proposed order by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling cnf set for 11/29/07 is cancelled. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/12/2008 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2008. Filing all discovery motions and completing all discovery, except experts due by 6/15/2008. Expert Witness List due by 4/15/2008 for pla and 5/15/08 for dft. Expert Reports due by 5/15/2008 for pla and 6/15/08 for dft. Experts shall be deposed by 7/1/2008. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 8/1/2008. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 11/16/07. (BP, ) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by Robert Shortess. (Craft Alford, Jill) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center.(Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER... IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for August 29, 2007 at 10:45 A. M. is hereby CANCELLED AND RESET.... Status Report is due by 11/14/2007. Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/29/2007 at 10:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 8/3/2007. (SAH) Modified on 8/3/2007 (SAH, )...to edit text.. (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference is set for 8/29/2007 at 10:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland. Status Report is due by 8/15/2007.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 8/3/2007. (SAH) Modified on 8/3/2007 (SAH, )...to edit text.. (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC - East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 556,441. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 243745), filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal filed by DPSC# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Jack) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2007 (SAH, ). Modified on 7/24/2007 (SAH, ).... corrected attachments... (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?