Del Construction Co, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 90-16573
District Judge Bankruptcy Carol J. Kenner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Del Construction Co, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian E. Donovan +1 617 471 7755 +1 617 472 9028 bedlawoffice@verizon.net
No Logo M. Ellen Carpenter, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
No Logo Northeast Specialty Supply Co, Inc., Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel Briansky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Briansky +1 617 357 9172
No Logo Ricky Files, d/b/a Sprint Ceiling Co., Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel Briansky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Briansky +1 617 357 9172
No Logo Superior Sheet Metal Of Holbrook, Inc., Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel Briansky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Briansky +1 617 357 9172
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: None
Kenner, J. Order Approving Trustee's Final Report and Account After Distribution, Discharging Trustee and Closing Case. (mcm) (Entered: 11/21/1996)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: None
    Certificate Of Review by U.S. Trustee Of [64-1] Distribution Report . (mcm) (Entered: 11/20/1996)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/19/1996, Entered: None
      Trustee's Final Report and Account After Distribution and Request for Discharge. (mcm) (Entered: 11/20/1996)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: None
        Notice Fee bill paid ( Amount: $ 38.50 Receipt # 371077) [43-1] Notice (mnd) (Entered: 05/31/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: None
          Order Regarding [54-1] Asset Report, Granting [58-1] Application For Final Allowence Of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Verdolino & Lowery, P.C., Accountants for The Chapter 7 Trustee. by Keith D. Lowey payment to M. E. Carpenter of $5785.66 in fees and $1111.74 in expenses payment to M. E. Carpenter of $17854.50 in fees payment to Keith D. Lowey of $1011.75 in fees and $69.78 in expenses, Granting [57-1] Application For Allowance of Final Compensation and Expense Reimbursement as Counsel to the Trustee by M. Ellen Carpenter, Granting [56-1] Application For Final Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses, Report of Receipts and Disbursements, and Notice of Proposed Distribution by M. Ellen Carpenter. NO OBJECTION FILED. ALLOWED. Entered on 5/22/96 (mcm) (Entered: 05/23/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: None
            Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Deborah A. Levine for Creditor Federal Deposit Insurance Corp.. c/s (mcm) (Entered: 05/16/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: None
              Withdrawal by Richard N. Gottlieb for F.D.I.C. **Never Appeared as Counsel for F.D.I.C** (mcm) (Entered: 05/16/1996)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
                Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [0-0] Hearing, [58-1] Application For Final Allowence Of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Verdolino & Lowery, P.C., Accountants for The Chapter 7 Trustee. by Keith D. Lowey, [57-1] Application For Allowance of Final Compensation and Expense Reimbursement as Counsel to the Trustee by M. Ellen Carpenter, [56-1] Application For Final Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses, Report of Receipts and Disbursements, and Notice of Proposed Distribution by M. Ellen Carpenter, [54-1] Asset Report # of notices: 67. (mcm) (Entered: 03/15/1996)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: None
                  Application For Final Allowence Of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Verdolino & Lowery, P.C., Accountants for The Chapter 7 Trustee. . (mnd) (Entered: 02/13/1996)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: None
                    Application Of M. Ellen Carpenter For Allowance of Final Compensation and Expense Reimbursement as Counsel to the Trustee . (mnd) (Entered: 02/13/1996)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: None
                      Trustee's Application For Final Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses, Report of Receipts and Disbursements, and Notice of Proposed Distribution . *Attached to [54-1] Trustee's Final Report. (mnd) (Entered: 02/13/1996)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: None
                        Certificate Of Review of United States Trustee Re: Trustee's [54-1] Final Report and Account. *U.S.Trustee states no objection to the same. (mnd) (Entered: 02/13/1996)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/22/1996
                          Trustee's Final Report and Account Before Distribution, Request for Compensation, and Report on Claims/Proposed Distribution. (mnd) (Entered: 02/13/1996)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: None
                            Kenner, J. Order on Objections to the Chapter 7 Trustee RE: [44-1] Claims Objection by M. Ellen Carpenter. Entered on 9/6/95 ***SEE ORDER DOC. #53 FOR COMPLETE TEXT*** (mcm) (Entered: 09/07/1995)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: None
                              Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Denise M. Pappalardo for Creditor Federal Deposit Insurance Corp.. (ma) (Entered: 08/11/1995)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None
                                Response By Creditor A. Raymond Zerio & Sons, Inc. To [44-1] Claims Objection by M. Ellen Carpenter . Exhibits and C/S Attached. (mcm) (Entered: 08/07/1995)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: None
                                  Withdrawal by Creditor Commonwealth of Massachusetts (The) of Proof of Claim (mcm) (Entered: 08/01/1995)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                                    Motion of Withdrawal by Creditor Commonwealth of Massachusetts (The) of Proof of Claim c/s (mcm) (Entered: 07/31/1995)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: None
                                      Objection By Creditor UTS of Massachusetts, Creditor First Needham Development Corp., Creditor Cadillac Plastic & Chemical Co. To [44-1] Claims Objection by M. Ellen Carpenter . (mcm) (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Hearing M. Ellen Carpenter for Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter [0-0] Hearing, RE: [44-1] Claims Objection by M. Ellen Carpenter (mcm) (Entered: 07/21/1995)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: None
                                          Certificate Of Service By Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter Of [44-1] Claims Objection by M. Ellen Carpenter . (ndl) (Entered: 06/30/1995)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: None
                                            Withdrawal by Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter of Proof of Claim in the name of Debtor Del Construction, Inc. in the amount of $2,733.97. (mcm) (Entered: 06/29/1995)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: None
                                              Objection By Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter To Various Claims. (mcm) (Entered: 06/29/1995)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: None
                                                Court's Notice Fee bill issued in the amount of $38.50 as follows: Notice Fees $22.00, Claims Fees $12.00, Copy Fees $4.50. Claim Register sent to Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter as requested. Notice Fee Due on 4:00 6/16/95 (ndl) (Entered: 06/01/1995)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: None
                                                  Notice by M. Ellen Carpenter [41-1] Motion To Set 45 Day Amended Bar Date for Claims and to Issue Notice to Creditors by M. Ellen Carpenter c/s (mcm) (Entered: 03/30/1995)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                    Motion by Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter To Set 45 Day Amended Bar Date for Claims and to Issue Notice to Creditors Exhibits and C/S attached. (mcm) (Entered: 03/27/1995)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                      Motion By Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter To Compromise Controversy With Foodmaster Supermarkets c/s (mcm) (Entered: 03/10/1995)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                        Stipulation by and between Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter and Foodmaster Supermarkets, Inc. (mcm) (Entered: 03/10/1995)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                          Motion By M. Ellen Carpenter for Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter For Approval On [37-1] Settlement Agreement by M. Ellen Carpenter and Uno Restaurants (copy of Settlement Agreement) c/s . (mcm) (Entered: 03/10/1995)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                            Settlement Agreement between Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter and Uno Restaurants, Inc. (mcm) (Entered: 03/10/1995)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                              Motion By Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter To Compromise Controversy With Foodmaster Supermarkets, Inc. (mcm) (Entered: 03/08/1995)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                                Stipulation by Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter and between Foodmaster Supermarkets, Inc. (mcm) (Entered: 03/08/1995)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                                  Motion By M. Ellen Carpenter For Approval On [33-1] Settlement Agreement between M. Ellen Carpenter and Uno Restaurants . (mcm) (Entered: 03/08/1995)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                                    Settlement Agreement by and between Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter and Uno Restaurants, Inc. (mcm) (Entered: 03/08/1995)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/23/1994, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice Fee bill issued in the amount of $58.25. Notice Fees $47.00; Claims Fees $8.25; Copy Fees $3.00. Copy of Notice Fees and Claims Register Sent to Trustee. (pbl) (Entered: 06/23/1994)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: None
                                                                        Certificate Of Service By M. Ellen Carpenter for Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter Of [29-1] Application To Employ Accountant (Keith D. Lowey, CPA) by M. Ellen Carpenter, [30-1] Affidavit . (ndl) (Entered: 04/15/1994)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: None
                                                                          Affidavit Of Keith D. Lowey In Support Of Application For Employment. Re: [29-1] Application To Employ Accountant (Keith D. Lowey, CPA) by M. Ellen Carpenter. (ndl) (Entered: 04/15/1994)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: None
                                                                            Trustee's Application By Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter To Employ Accountant (Keith D. Lowey, CPA) . (ndl) (Entered: 04/15/1994)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/1/1993, Entered: None
                                                                              Certificate Of Service By M. Ellen Carpenter for Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter Of [25-1] Motion To Act As Her Own Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc by M. Ellen Carpenter . (ndl) (Entered: 07/02/1993)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion By Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter To Limit Notice On Non-Adversarial Motion Of The Trustee To Act As Her Own Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc . C/S Re: Non-Adversarial Motion [25-1] Of Trustee to Act As her Own Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc. (ndl) (Entered: 06/25/1993)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                  Affidavit Of M. Ellen Carpenter. Re:[25-1] Motion To Act As Her Own Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc by M. Ellen Carpenter (ndl) (Entered: 06/25/1993)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                    Non-Adversarial Motion By Trustee M. Ellen Carpenter To Act As Her Own Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc . (ndl) (Entered: 06/25/1993)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/20/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion By Creditor Robert V. Cullinane For Relief from Automatic Stay . c/s. Objections Due 11/30/92. (jmd) (Entered: 11/23/1992)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice Of Withdrawal Of Appearance by David J. Braiterman for Creditor Superior Drywall, Inc. Re:[9-1] Notice To Appear by David J. Braiterman C/S (ndl) (Entered: 11/18/1991)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/3/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                          Motion by FDIC as Receiver of New Bank of New England To Substitute C/s. (gmk) (Entered: 10/04/1991)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/2/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Robert Virden for Creditor Butler Manufacturing Company. (ndl) (Entered: 08/05/1991)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/2/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Robert Virden for Creditor Butler Manufacturing Company. (ndl) (Entered: 08/02/1991)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/26/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Alan Kaplan for Creditor Middlesex Corporation. (jrc) (Entered: 06/27/1991)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/6/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Richard S. Daniels for Creditor A. Raymond Zerio & Sons, Inc.. (jrc) (Entered: 06/07/1991)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/23/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Toni-Lynne Rafanelli for Creditor Red Star Building Systems, Inc.. C/s. (gmk) (Entered: 04/23/1991)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Thomas E. Pontes for Creditor Thomas E. Pontes. (fac) (Entered: 04/04/1991)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Barbara M. Theberge for Creditor New Bank of New England. C/s. (gmk) (Entered: 03/27/1991)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [0-0] First Meeting # of notices: 15. (gmk) (Entered: 03/01/1991)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/11/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Thomas E. Nannicelli for Creditor Lorusso-Bristol Stone Corp.. (jrc) (Entered: 02/14/1991)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [0-0] First Meeting # of notices: 14. (gmk) (Entered: 02/11/1991)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice to Update Petition. Incomplete Filing; missing documents: Disclosure of Aty Compensation Schedules A and B Statement of Financial Affairs Exhibit A Stmt of Income & Expenditures Documents Due on 2/12/91 Matrix Due 2/4/91 (mem) (Entered: 01/29/1991)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Order For Relief (mem) (Entered: 01/29/1991)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By David J. Braiterman for Creditor Superior Drywall, Inc.. C/S. (fac) (Entered: 01/14/1991)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Motion By Creditor J.W. Cusack, Inc. For Relief From the Automatic Stay . C/s. (es) (Entered: 01/07/1991)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/28/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Donald E. Rothman for Creditor South Shore Bank. c/s (jrc) (Entered: 01/03/1991)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Motion By Daniel Briansky for Petitioning Creditor Northeast Specialty Supply Co, Inc., Petitioning Creditor Ricky Files, Petitioning Creditor Superior Sheet Metal Of Holbrook, Inc. To Continue Hearing On: ( [3-0] Involuntary Answer by Del Construction Co, Inc. ) . C/s (es) (Entered: 12/13/1990)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Response By Petitioning Creditor Superior Sheet Metal Of Holbrook, Inc., Petitioning Creditor Northeast Specialty Supply Co, Inc. To [3-0] Involuntary Answer by Del Construction Co, Inc. C/s. (es) (Entered: 12/13/1990)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/7/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Certificate Of Service By Brian E. Donovan for Debtor Del Construction Co, Inc. Of [0-0] Hearing, [3-0] Involuntary Answer by Del Construction Co, Inc. Notice of Hearing attached. (es) (Entered: 12/08/1990)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Answer of Del Construction Co, Inc. And Motion to Dismiss. C/s. (es) (Entered: 11/27/1990)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Summons Served 11/9/90 on Del Construction Co, Inc.. Involuntary Answer due on 11/29/90 for Del Construction Co, Inc. (es) (Entered: 11/16/1990)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Involuntary Petition. (bam) (Entered: 11/13/1990)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?