Molecular Insight Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-23355
District Judge Frank J. Bailey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Fitzgerald, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric K. Bradford +1 617 788 0415 +1 617 565 6368 Eric.K.Bradford@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Molecular Insight Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Candon +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 candon@cwg11.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia Glazer +1 617 342 4000 jglazer@foley.com
Space Geoffrey M Raux +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 graux@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth H. Eckstein +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000
Space Bradley O'neill

Toggle Switch Represented by Riemer & Braunstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan L. Braunstein +1 617 880 3516 abraunstein@riemerlaw.com
Space Guy B. Moss +1 617 523 9000 +1 617 880 3456 gmoss@riemerlaw.com
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 387
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Blank 381
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Blank 297
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Blank 234
                            LREF
                            Blank 136
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/2/2011, Entered: None
                              An official transcript (RE: 16 Hearing Scheduled for 12/14/2010 at 02:30 PM Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 RE: 5 Motion filed by Debtor Molecular Insight Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Use of Cash Collateral; Granting Adequate Protection; and Scheduling A Final Hearing; 6 Motion filed by Debtor Molecular Insight Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Approve) heard on 12/14/10 has been filed. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, electronic access to transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the date of filing. The transcript is available for inspection at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be purchased from the transcriber. Contact the ECR Operator for transcriber information. Parties have until 01/24/2011 to file a Request for Redaction with the Court. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made available electronically on 04/4/2011. (GCI Transcription Services) (Entered: 01/02/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Blank 1
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?