Inofin Incorporated
Bankruptcy Case Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-11010
District Judge Joan N. Feeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 1:24 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Inofin Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Inofin Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Inofin Incorporated

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
No Logo Allan Hanan, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Arthur J. Vancini, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Barbara Byron, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Barbara E. St. Martin, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Bette Land, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Brenda Kneeland, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Brian Guernier, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Carlene M Brunk, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Catherine Hubbard, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Catherine Ingemi, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Chaiha K. Rhee, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo CHARLES SAMPSON, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Christine Spolar, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Dana Rosenblatt, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Daniela Fooksa, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Danya Ellis, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo David Holfon, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo David Holway, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Morrier +1 617 348 3051 +1 617 542 2241 jmorrier@mintz.com
No Logo David K. Thompson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo DAVID M. SIMON, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Dayna Smith, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Dolores G. Caggiano, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Donald Baarmen, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Douglas Baumann, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Erik R. Brown, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Frances Palmisano, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Francis Huot, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Gerald Chicallo, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Gilbert Wheeler, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo H. Huyler Stagg, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Hugh B. Walker, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo James Bakule, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo James Caggiano, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo James Ellis, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo James Ingemi, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo James Tarbox, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Janet Stagg, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Janice Holton, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Jeffrey Thompson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo John Hamilton, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo John St. Martin, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Joost Hiltermann, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Judith Brodhead, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Judith M. Knights, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Julie Thompson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Keith Brodhead, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Kelly B Sampson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Kelly Holway, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Morrier +1 617 348 3051 +1 617 542 2241 jmorrier@mintz.com
No Logo Kim Johnstone, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Linda Ann Edwards, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Linda Chernisky, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Lynn McIsaac, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Mainsail Consulting Inc., Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Marie-Danielle Baumann, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Nancy Hamilton, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Nancy Markley, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Norman S. Robson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Patricia Grossman, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Paul McIsaac, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Peter Carey, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Priscilla A. Walker, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Ralph L. Thompson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Raymond F. Edwards, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Richard Bryan, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Richard Rhodes, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Richard Weigleb, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Robert Barkin, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Robert C Brunk, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Robert Thompson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Rodek Fooksa, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Sheila Thompson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Sigmund Cohen, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Staysail Development, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Stephen C. Thompson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Steven G Brunk, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Susan K. Cohen, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Thomas A Gulbranson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Vicki L Gulbranson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Virginia J. Janusz, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Walter Suydam, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Wendy Stein Thompson, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo William Bryan, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo John Fitzgerald, Assistant U.S. Trustee
No Logo Mark G. Degiacomo, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Murtha Cullina LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark G. DeGiacomo +1 617 457 4000 +1 617 482 3868 mdegiacomo@murthalaw.com
Space Ryan M. MacDonald +1 617 457 4000 +1 617 482 3868 RMacdonald@Murthalaw.com
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
Hearing Rescheduled for 4/26/2011 at 10:00 AM Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109, Objections due by 4/25/2011 at 12:00 PM. RE: 27 Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral. (mnd) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
    Notice of Continued Hearing Scheduled for 4/26/2011 at 10:00 AM Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 RE: 89 Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Certain Executory Contracts Up to and Including June 17, 2011 with certificate of service. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
      Endorsed Order Dated 4/13/2011 Regarding 89 Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Certain Executory Contracts Up to and Including June 17, 2011 with certificate of service. THE COURT GRANTS THE MOTION IN PART AND EXTENDS THE TIME WITHIN WHICH TO ASSUME OR REJECT CERTAIN EXECUTORY CONTRACTS TO APRIL 26, 2011 AT 10:00 AM AT WHICH TIME THE COURT SHALL HEAR THE MOTION. THE COURT DIRECTS THE TRUSTEE TO SERVE ALL PARTIES IN INTEREST WITH NOTICE OF THE HEARING AND AN OBJECTION DEADLINE OF APRIL 25, 2011 AT NOON AND TO FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO THAT EFFECT WITH THE COURT THEREAFTER. (dk, USBC) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Modified on 4/14/2011 to show correct PDF Image.(dk, USBC). (Entered: 04/14/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
        Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Certain Executory Contracts Up to and Including June 17, 2011 with certificate of service. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (DeGiacomo, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. RE: 86 Hearing Scheduled Service Date 04/01/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/02/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
            Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing (Re: 71 Motion for Relief From Stay) filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Notice of Hearing) (Jeffery, Donald) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
              Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2011 at 10:00 AM Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 RE: 71 Motion filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. for Relief from Stay Re: RCG Portfolio (pd, USBC) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                Waiver (Re: 71 Motion for Relief From Stay) filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. (Jeffery, Donald) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/26/2011, Entered: None
                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 83 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay Service Date 03/26/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/27/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                    Order dated 3/23/2011 Re: 68 Motion filed by Creditor GMAC INC., n/k/a Ally Financial Inc. for Relief from Stay Re: 2010 GMC Yukon, VIN #1GKUKKE38AR117546. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT GMAC INC., N/K/A ALLY FINANCIAL INC., INCLUDING ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, IS GRANTED RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY. See Order for complete text. (kc, usbc) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 82 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                      Objection with certificate of service filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo Re: 71 Motion filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. for Relief from Stay Re: with certificate of service Fee Amount $150, (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                        Request for Notice filed by Creditor IKON Office Solutions. (ymw) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                          Schedules. and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo (Attachments: 1 Summary of Schedules2 Schedule A3 Schedule B4 Schedule D5 Schedule E6 Schedule F7 Schedule G8 Schedule H9 Statement of Financial Affairs) (DeGiacomo, Mark) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/13/2011, Entered: None
                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 74 Order on Application to Employ Service Date 03/13/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/12/2011, Entered: None
                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 72 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral Service Date 03/12/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/13/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/12/2011, Entered: None
                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. RE: 73 Hearing Scheduled Service Date 03/12/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/13/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 70 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay Service Date 03/11/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/12/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo (Re: 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral) (Attachments: 1 Notice of (i) Entry of Final Order Re: Use of Cash Collateral; and (ii) Continued Nonevidentiary Hearing and Objection Deadline Re: Chapter 7 Trustees Emergency Motion for Use of Cash Collateral) (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                      Endorsed Order dated 3/10/2011 Re: 45 Application filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Employ Verdolino & Lowey, P.C. as Accountant. NO OBJECTIONS. APPLICATION GRANTED. (usbc, slandry) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Continued Hearing Scheduled for 4/28/2011 at 10:00 AM Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 RE: 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral. Objections Due by 4/25/2011 at 12:00 PM. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                          Final Order Dated 3/10/2011 Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral Re: 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 71 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                            Motion filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. for Relief from Stay Re: with certificate of service Fee Amount $150, Objections due by 03/23/2011. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C4 Exhibit D5 Exhibit E6 Exhibit F7 Exhibit G8 Exhibit H9 Certificate of Service) (Jeffery, Donald) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                              Order Dated 3/9/2011 Re: 36 Motion filed by Creditor GMAC INC., n/k/a Ally Financial Inc. for Relief from Stay Re: 2008 Cadillac Escalade. GRANTED. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 69 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                Objection filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. Re: 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral. (Jeffery, Donald) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Motion filed by Creditor GMAC INC., n/k/a Ally Financial Inc. for Relief from Stay Re: 2010 GMC Yukon, VIN #1GKUKKE38AR117546 with certificate of service and proposed order Fee Amount $150, Objections due by 03/22/2011. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Retail Instalment Sale Contract, Title and NADA) (Lushan, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 65 Order on Motion for Order/Authority Service Date 03/05/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 63 Order on Motion to Extend Service Date 03/05/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Endorsed Order Dated 3/2/2011 Re: 60 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtors Prepetition Payroll Account at Bank of America. MOTION ALLOWED. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo (Re: 60 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtors Prepetition Payroll Account at Bank of America). (Attachments: 1 Notice of Hearing) (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Endorsed Order Dated 3/3/2011 Re: 59 Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Extend Deadline for Filing Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs and Related Documents Until March 16, 2011 (Re: 20 Order to Update). MOTION ALLOWED. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Hearing scheduled for 3/3/2011 at 10:00 AM Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 60 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtors Prepetition Payroll Account at Bank of America. (mnd) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate of Service filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo (Re: 59 Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Extend Deadline for Filing Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs and Related Documents Until March 16, 2011, and 60 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtors Prepetition Payroll Account at Bank of America. (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtors Prepetition Payroll Account at Bank of America (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Extend Deadline for Filing Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs and Related Documents Until March 16, 2011 (Re:20 Order to Update) (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. RE: 47 Court's Notice of 341 sent 7 Business Asset Service Date 02/26/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/27/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. RE: 43 Court's Notice of 341 sent 7 Business Asset Service Date 02/25/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/26/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 41 Order Service Date 02/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 40 Order Service Date 02/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 39 Order Service Date 02/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 38 Order on Motion for Order/Authority Service Date 02/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 37 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral Service Date 02/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 35 Order on Motion for Order/Authority Service Date 02/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 34 Order on Application to Employ Service Date 02/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. RE: 42 Hearing Scheduled Service Date 02/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Matrix (Re: 1 Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)) filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo (DeGiacomo, Mark) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Amended Court's Notice of 341 sent (cb, USBC) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo (Re: 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral). (Attachments: 1 Notice of Continued Nonevidentiary Hearing) (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Application filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Employ Verdolino & Lowey, P.C. as Accountant with Affidavit and with certificate of service. (Attachments: 1 Exhibt A (Signed Statment of Craig R. Jalbert, CIRA)2 Certificate of Service) (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Request for Notice by American Express Bank FSB (Weisman, Gilbert) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Court's Notice of 341 sent. (ADI) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice of Continued Final Hearing Scheduled for 3/10/2011 at 10:00 AM Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 RE: 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Order Dated 2/22/2011 Authorizing Interim Use of Cash Collateral Re: 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Order Dated 2/22/2011 Approving Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for Authority to Maintain the Debtor's Prepetition Operating Account Soley as Deposit Account Re: 28 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtor's Prepetition Operating Account Solely as Deposit Account. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order Dated 2/22/2011 Approving Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for Authority to Operate the Debtor's Business on a Limited Basis Re: 26 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Operate the Debtors Business on a Limited Basis. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Order Dated 2/22/2011 Re: 28 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtor's Prepetition Operating Account Solely as Deposit Account. HEARING HELD. NO OBJECTIONS WERE FILED. THE COURT GRANTED THE TRUSTEE'S MOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO MAINTAIN THE DEBTOR'S PREPETITION OPERATING ACCOUNT WITH BANK OF AMERICA SOLEY AS DEPOSIT ACCOUNT. A SEPARATE ORDER WAS ENTERED. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Order Dated 2/22/2011 Regarding 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral. HEARING HELD. NO OBJECTIONS WERE FILED. THE COURT AUTHORIZED THE TRUSTEE TO USE CASH COLLATERAL ON AN INTERIM PRELIMINARY BASIS THROUGH TO THE CONTINUED HEARING DATE OF MARCH 10, 2011 AT 10:00 AM AND ANY OBJECTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY MARCH 8, 2011 BY 12:00 NOON. A SEPARATE ORDER WAS ENTERED. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Motion filed by Creditor GMAC INC., n/k/a Ally Financial Inc. for Relief from Stay Re: 2008 Cadillac Escalade, VIN #1GYFK63898R131020 with certificate of service and proposed order Fee Amount $150, Objections due by 03/8/2011. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit GMAC SmartLease Agreement, Title and NADA) (Lushan, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Order Dated 2/22/2011 Re: 26 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Operate the Debtors Business on a Limited Basis. HEARING HELD. NO OBJECTIONS WERE FILED. THE COURT GRANTED THE TRUSTEE'S MOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO OPERATE THE DEBTOR'S BUSINESS. A SEPARATE ORDER WAS ENTERED. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Endorsed Order Dated 2/22/2011 Re: 25 Application filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Employ Murtha Cullina LLP as Counsel. APPLICATION GRANTED. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing (Re: 26 Motion for Order/Authority, 27 Motion for Cash Collateral, 28 Motion for Order/Authority) filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo (Attachments: 1 Notice of Nonevidentiary Hearing) (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. RE: 30 Hearing Scheduled Service Date 02/20/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 18 Order for Relief (Ch.7) Service Date 02/18/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/19/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2011 at 11:00AM Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re: 26 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Operate the Debtors Business on a Limited Basis, 27 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral, 28 Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtor's Prepetition Operating Account Solely as Deposit Account. Objections due by 2/22/2011 at 9:30AM.(Creyes, Usbc) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service (Re: 25 Application to Employ, 26 Motion for Order/Authority, 27 Motion for Cash Collateral, 28 Motion for Order/Authority) filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Maintain the Debtor's Prepetition Operating Account Solely as Deposit Account (Attachments: 1 [Proposed] Order Approving Chapter 7 Trustees Motion for Authority to Maintain the Debtors Prepetition Operating Account Solely as Deposit Account) (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo for Use of Cash Collateral [Emergency Determination Requested] (Attachments: 1 [Proposed] Order Authorizing Interim Use of Cash Collateral) (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Emergency Motion filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo For Authority to Operate the Debtors Business on a Limited Basis [Emergency Determination Requested] (MacDonald, Ryan) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Application filed by Trustee Mark G. DeGiacomo to Employ Murtha Cullina LLP as Counsel with Affidavit and. (DeGiacomo, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Macken Toussaint with certificate of service filed by Creditor Russell Park Quincy LLC (Toussaint, Macken) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Douglas K. Clarke with certificate of service filed by Creditor Russell Park Quincy LLC (Clarke, Douglas) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Alexander G. Rheaume with certificate of service filed by Creditors Russell Park Quincy LLC, Russell Park Quincy LLC (Rheaume, Alexander) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: 20 Order to Update. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Order to Update Re: 1 Chapter 7 Petition. Creditor Matrix Due 2/22/2011. Statement of Tax ID Number Due 2/22/2011. Corporate Vote Due by 2/23/2011. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Due 2/23/2011. Debtor's Signature on Page 3 of the Voluntary Petition Due 3/2/2011. Schedules A-H Due 3/2/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/2/2011. Summary of Schedules Due 3/2/2011. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities Due 3/2/2011. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Appointment and Acceptance of Trustee and Fixing of Bond (cb, USBC) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Order Dated 2/16/2011 Re: 3 Motion filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway and Kelly Holway for the Appointment of an Interim Chapter 7 Trustee (Emergency Determination Requested) with certificate of service. THE MOTION TO APPOINT AN INTERIM TRUSTEE IS MOOT AS THE COURT ENTERED AN ORDER FOR RELIEF ON THE CHAPTER 7 INVOLUNTARY PETITION BASED UPON A LETTER READ INTO THE RECORD FROM HOLLAND & KNIGHT, FORMER COUNSEL FOR THE ALLEGED DEBTOR, DATED FEBRUARY 11, 2011, IN WHICH IT REPRESENTED THAT THE ALLEGED DEBTOR CONSENTS TO THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER FOR RELIEF. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Inofin Incorporated 2/14/2011, Answer Due 3/7/2011 filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway, Kelly Holway (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. Re: 15 Statement in Support of Motion to Appoint Trustee filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. (Jeffery, Donald) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Statement in Support of Motion to Appoint Trustee filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green, Inc. Regarding 3 Emergency Motion filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway and Kelly Holway to Appoint Trustee (Emergency Determination Requested) with certificate of service. (Jeffery, Donald) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Modified text on 2/16/2011 to reflect documents. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Additional Petitioning Creditors filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway, Kelly Holway (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (Re: Involuntary Petition - Add Party) filed by Petitioning Creditor Donald Baarmen (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway and Kelly Holway Re: 3 Motion filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway and Kelly Holway for the Appointment of an Interim Chapter 7 Trustee (Emergency Determination Requested) with certificate of service. (Goldberg, Michael) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Removed linkage from #11. Added link to #3 on 2/14/2011. (dk, USBC). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway and Kelly Holway RE: 3 Motion filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway and Kelly Holway for the Appointment of an Interim Chapter 7 Trustee (Emergency Determination Requested) with certificate of service. (Morrier, John) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Removed linkage from #6. Added link to #3 on 2/14/2011. (dk, USBC). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 8 Order on Generic Motion Service Date 02/13/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. RE: 6 Hearing Scheduled Service Date 02/13/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Order Dated 2/11/2011 Regarding 7 Emergency Motion filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway and Kelly Holway for Immediate Entry of Order for Relief (Emergency Determination Requested) with certificate of service. THERE IS NO RETURN OF SERVICE OF THE INVOLUNTARY SUMMONS ON RECORD. AN ATTORNEY HAS NOT FILED AN APPEARANCE IN THE CASE ON BEHALF OF THE ALLEGED DEBTOR. THE MOVING PARTY REPRESENTS THAT AN UNIDENTIFIED ATTORNEY HAS CONSENTED TO THE ENTRY OF THE ORDER FOR RELIEF. THE MOVING PARTY, HOWEVER, FURTHER REPRESENTS THAT SAID ATTORNEY WILL NOT BE REPRESENTING THE DEBTOR IN THIS CASE. SUCH ALLEGED CONSENT IS AN INADEQUATE BASIS FOR THE ENRY OF AN ORDER FOR RELIEF. ADDITIONALLY, THERE IS NO EVIDENCE OF A CORPORATE VOTE BY THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE ALLEGED DEBTOR AUTHORIZING CONSENT TO THE ENTRY OF THE ORDER FOR RELIEF. FOR THOSE REASONS, THE EMERGENCY MOTION IS DENIED. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency Motion filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway and Kelly Holway for Immediate Entry of Order for Relief (Emergency Determination Requested) with certificate of service. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2011 at 01:30 PM Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109, Objections due by 2/15/2011 at 04:30 PM. RE: 3 Motion filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway, Kelly Holway for the Appointment of an Interim Chapter 7 Trustee. (mnd) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: 4 Involuntary Summons Issued Inofin Incorporated. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Involuntary Summons Issued on Inofin Incorporated. (dk, USBC) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway, Kelly Holway for the Appointment of an Interim Chapter 7 Trustee (Emergency Determination Requested) with certificate of service. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (Re: 1 Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)) filed by Petitioning Creditors David Holway, Kelly Holway (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition. Fee Amount $299 Re: Inofin Incorporated filed by David Holway, Kelly Holway (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 812 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?