Amgen Inc. v. F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-12237

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (1278) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Blank 1756
        LREF
        Blank 1746
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1790
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1789
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1788
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1787
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                  OPINION of USCA. Opinion issued in the USCA 9/15/2009 (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                    MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 1768 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Amgen Inc., 1748 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Hoffmann LaRoche Inc., F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH. Appeal 1768 , 1748 Terminated. This cause having been heard and considered, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: AFFIRMED-IN-PART, VACATED-IN-PART, and REMANDED. Mandate issued in the USCA for the Federal Circuit 12/17/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1775 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STIPULATION AND ORDER(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc., Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Nicole Rizzo Smith as to Julia Huston (Smith, Nicole) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1772 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Nicole A. Rizzo Smith Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Lee Carl Bromberg (Rizzo Smith, Nicole) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Nicole A. Rizzo Smith (Rizzo Smith, Nicole) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                USCA Case Number 09-1096 for 1768 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Amgen Inc. (Attachments: # 1 attachment, # 2 attachment)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                  Certified and Transmitted Notice of Appeal & Judgment to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 1768 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 1756 Judgment by Amgen Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 01010000000002192813 Appeal Record due by 12/8/2008. (Paine, Matthew) Modified on 11/18/2008 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by Amgen Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 01010000000002192813. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 12/8/2008. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. for proceedings held on 5/10/2006-4/2/2008 before Judge William G. Young, (Toms, Keith) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1424 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                          DECLARATION re 1420 MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 6: To Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Based on a Claim Construction that is Inconsistent with the Court's Construction of '868 Claim Term "Isolated DNA Sequence Encoding Human Er, 1415 MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 1: To Preclude Richard A. Flavell From Testifying During the Infringement Stage on Issues Pertaining to Invalidity, 1423 MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 9: To Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Regarding "Isolated DNA Sequence Encoding Human Erythropoietin" Based on His Refusal to Provide the Basis for Those Opinions at Deposition, 1421 MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 7: To Preclude Richard Flavell From Offering Opinions Based on a Claim Construction that Requires That the Term "Obligate" Glycoprotein Be Read into the Asserted '933 Claim, 1419 MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 5: To Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Based on an Infringement Analysis that is Inconsistent with Federal Circuit Precedent and with the Court's Claim Construction Ruling that Amgen's, 1416 MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 2: To Preclude Richard A. Flavell from Offering Opinions Based on a Claim Construction that is Inconsistent with the Claim Terms "Isolating" and "Comprising," as set forth in the Asserted &, 1417 MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 3: to Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Based on a Claim Construction that is Inconsistent with the Court's Claim Construction of the '933 Patent Claim Term "Non-Naturally Occurrin, 1418 MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 4: To Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Regarding the Asserted '933 Claims that are Based on a Construction that is Inconsistent with the Court's Claim Construction of the Claim Term &q of Linda Sasaki-Baxley by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1423 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                            MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 9: To Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Regarding "Isolated DNA Sequence Encoding Human Erythropoietin" Based on His Refusal to Provide the Basis for Those Opinions at Deposition by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1422 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                              MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 8: To Preclude Richard A. Flavell from Offering Opinions that were Rejected by this Court's Holding that PEG-EPO Infringes Claim 1 of Dr. Lin's '422 Patent by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1421 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 7: To Preclude Richard Flavell From Offering Opinions Based on a Claim Construction that Requires That the Term "Obligate" Glycoprotein Be Read into the Asserted '933 Claim by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1420 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                  MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 6: To Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Based on a Claim Construction that is Inconsistent with the Court's Construction of '868 Claim Term "Isolated DNA Sequence Encoding Human Erythropoietin" by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1419 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                    MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 5: To Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Based on an Infringement Analysis that is Inconsistent with Federal Circuit Precedent and with the Court's Claim Construction Ruling that Amgen's Claims are Open-Ended by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1418 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                      MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 4: To Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Regarding the Asserted '933 Claims that are Based on a Construction that is Inconsistent with the Court's Claim Construction of the Claim Term "Human Erythropoietin" by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1417 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                        MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 3: to Preclude Richard Flavell from Offering Opinions Based on a Claim Construction that is Inconsistent with the Court's Claim Construction of the '933 Patent Claim Term "Non-Naturally Occurring" by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1416 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                          MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 2: To Preclude Richard A. Flavell from Offering Opinions Based on a Claim Construction that is Inconsistent with the Claim Terms "Isolating" and "Comprising," as set forth in the Asserted '698 and '868 Claims by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1415 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                            MOTION in Limine Regarding Flavell No. 1: To Preclude Richard A. Flavell From Testifying During the Infringement Stage on Issues Pertaining to Invalidity by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1414 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Roches Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limit in Support of Its Motion for Judgment of Non-Infringement as a Matter of Law by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1413 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                MOTION in Limine to Preclude Roche's Purported FRE 406 Witness, Mr. Sofocleous, And Patent Law Experts Generally, From Testifying In The Inequitable Conduct Phase Of The Trial by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1412 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limit in Support of its Opposition to Roche's Judgment as a Matter of Law and Amgen Inc.'s Cross-Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Memorandum in Opposition to Roche's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity and Cross-Motion)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1411 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Preclude Roche's Expert Dr. Klibanov From Offering Opinions Based On A Construction That Is Inconsistent With The Court's Claim Construction Of The Claim Term "Human Erythropoietin" by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1410 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                      MOTION to Preclude Roche's Expert Dr. Klibanov From Offering Opinions Based on an Infringement Analysis That Is Inconsistent With Federal Circuit Precedent And With The Court's Claim Construction Ruling that Amgen's Claims Are Open-Ended by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1409 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                        Response by Amgen Inc. to 1398 Brief, Roches Bench Memorandum (D.I. 1398) Offering Opinions Based On A Claim Construction That Is Inconsistent With The Courts Claim Construction Of The Claim Terms Isolating And Comprising,. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1407 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                          Opposition re 1388 MOTION For A Corrective Instruction Regarding Roche's Patent on Pegylated Erythropoietin filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1406 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                            Opposition re 1385 MOTION To Preclude Gregory D. Longmore, M.D. From Offering Opinions Based On A Construction That Is Inconsistent With The Court's Claim Construction Of The Claim Term "Human Erythropoietin" filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1405 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                              Opposition re 1391 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Gregory D. Longmore, M.D. From Offering Opinions Based On A Claim Construction That Is Inconsistent With The Court's Claim Construction Of The Claim Terms "Isolating" and "Comprising," As Set Fo filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1404 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                Opposition re 1392 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Roche from Offering Evidence Regarding Amgen's Efforts to Pegylate Molecules, Including EPO, as it is Irrelevant to the Infringement Inquiry filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1403 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                  Opposition re 1384 MOTION To Preclude Roche's Expert Dr. Gregory D. Longmore From Offering Opinions Based On An Infringement Analysis That Is Inconsistent With Federal Circuit Precedent And With The Court's Claim Construction Ruling That Amgen's Claims Ar filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1402 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                    Opposition re 1368 MOTION to Preclude Roche's Experts from Claiming Unproven and Undisclosed FDA Certification filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1401 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                      NOTICE by Amgen Inc. of Submission to the Court for Ruling Its Motion to Admit Into Evidence Admissions of Roche Related to Infringement Prior to Close of Amgen's Case in Infringement Phase of Trial and the Exhibits Thereto (CORRECTED NOTICE) (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1400 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                        Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1394 Brief, Roches Response to Amgens Bench Memorandum to Preclude Roche from Examining Dr. Torchilin on Evidence Regarding Patient Choice and the Safety and Dosing Benefits of MIRCERA in Contravention of the Courts Previous Rulings. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1399 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                          BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roches Bench Memorandum that the Doctrine of Equivalents Does not Apply to Infringement Under Section 271(g) and Therefore to the Asserted Claims of the 868, 698 of 349 Patents. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1398 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                            BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roches Bench Memorandum in Support of its Argument that Roches Epoetin Beta Starting Material Used to Synthesize CERA Fails to Meet the Expressed by Said Cells Limitation in the Asserted Claims of the 698 Patent. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 1397 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw 1360 Brief, Without Prejudice Amgen's Bench Memorandum to Explain the Relevance of Exhibits GXD and EYV to Issues of Infringement by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1396 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                NOTICE by Amgen Inc. of Manual Filing of Its Motion to Admit Into Evidence Admissions of Roche Related to Infringement Prior to Close of Amgen's Case In Infringement Phase of Trial and the Exhibits Thereto (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1395 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                  BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum that Roche Should Be Precluded From Questioning Dr. Torchilin About Comparisons Between PEG-EPO and Amgen's Aranesp Product Because Such Comparisons Are Irrelevant to Whether PEG-EPO Infringes Amgen's Patents-in-Suit. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1394 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                    BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum to Preclude Roche from Examining Dr. Torchilin on Evidence Regarding Patient Choice and the Safety and Dosing Benefits of Mircera in Contravention with the Court's Previous Rulings. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 1393 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                      BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum to Prevent Roche from Cross Examining Dr. Torchilin About Amgen's Efforts to Pegylate Molecules, Including EPO, and the Predictability of Pegylation in General as it is Irrelevant to the Infringement Inquiry. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 1392 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Preclude Roche from Offering Evidence Regarding Amgen's Efforts to Pegylate Molecules, Including EPO, as it is Irrelevant to the Infringement Inquiry by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1391 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine To Preclude Gregory D. Longmore, M.D. From Offering Opinions Based On A Claim Construction That Is Inconsistent With The Court's Claim Construction Of The Claim Terms "Isolating" and "Comprising," As Set Forth In The Asserted '698 And '868 Claims by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1390 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                            Roche's Response to Amgen's Bench Memorandum to Preclude Roche From Introducing Testimony of Dr. Longmore That is Contrary to the Court's Prior Orders Regarding Safety, Dosing, Undisclosed FDA Communications, and Whether MIRCERA Contains Human EPO Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1378 Brief,. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 1389 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                              Roche's Bench Memorandum in Response to Amgen's Bench Memorandum concerning the Appropriate Jury Instruction on 35 U.S.C. Section 271(g) Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1358 Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 1388 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                MOTION For A Corrective Instruction Regarding Roche's Patent on Pegylated Erythropoietin by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 1387 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                  Response by Amgen Inc. to 1342 Brief, = Amgen's Opposition to Roche's Bench Memorandum Regarding Its Proposed Jury Instruction That Contemporaneous Invention By Others Is A Consideration Favoring Obviousness. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 1386 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                    Response by Amgen Inc. to 1354 Opposition to Motion = Amgen's Opposition to Roche's Motion for Reconsideration of The Court's October 4, 2007 Order Regarding The '868 File History. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1385 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                      MOTION To Preclude Gregory D. Longmore, M.D. From Offering Opinions Based On A Construction That Is Inconsistent With The Court's Claim Construction Of The Claim Term "Human Erythropoietin" by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 1384 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                        MOTION To Preclude Roche's Expert Dr. Gregory D. Longmore From Offering Opinions Based On An Infringement Analysis That Is Inconsistent With Federal Circuit Precedent And With The Court's Claim Construction Ruling That Amgen's Claims Are Open-Ended by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 1383 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine To Preclude Roche From Undermining The Court's Prior Rulings And Unduly Prejudicing Amgen By Agruing Its ODP-Related Inequitable Conduct Theory To The Jury by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1382 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine To Preclude Roche From Arguing To The Jury That Amgen Committed Inequitable Conduct Through Its Characterization Of The Chugai ITC Decision, The PTO Interference Actions, And Articulation Of The Test For ODP by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 1381 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                              Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum To Explain the Relevance of Exhibit EYV Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1360 Brief,. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 1380 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                                Opposition re 1371 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing Testimony of Vladimir Torchilin Related to Pegylation of Non-EPO Compounds filed by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 1379 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                                  Response by Amgen Inc. to 1363 Brief, = Amgen's Response to Roche's Bench Memorandum Requesting Jury Instruction Regarding Amgen's "Failure to Proffer Secondary Consideration Evidence of the Failure of Others Similarly Situated to the Inventor". (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 1378 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum to Preclude Roche From Introducing Testimony of Dr. Longmore That Is Contrary To The Court's Prior Orders Regarding Safety, Dosing, Undisclosed FDA Commuincations, And Whether MIRCERA Contains Human EPO. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 1377 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum Regarding Evidence of Infringement of '349 Claim 7 by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1376 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Amgen's Bench Memorandum That Roche Should Be Precluded From Relying On Comparisons Between Peg-EPO and Amgen's Aransep Product Because Such Comparisons Are Irrelevant To Whether Peg-EPO Infringes Amgen's Patents-In-Suit. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1375 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Clarification Defendants' Motion for Clarification on Whether the Court's Prior Rulings Preclude Defendants From Arguing Non-Infringement of '933 Claims 9 and 12 Based on the Markush Group Limitations by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1374 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 1373 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 1341 MOTION and Supporting Memorandum Requesting That This Court Try Roche's Inequitable Conduct Defenses filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 1372 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 1371 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing Testimony of Vladimir Torchilin Related to Pegylation of Non-EPO Compounds filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1371 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing Testimony of Vladimir Torchilin Related to Pegylation of Non-EPO Compounds by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1370 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 1369 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Roche From Using Unreliable Computer-Generated Models Of Peg-EPO At Trial Due To Roche's Selective Production Only Of Models That Were Created For This Litigation (=DECLARATION OF RENEE DUBORD BROWN) by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Errata 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1369 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine To Preclude Roche From Using Unreliable Computer-Generated Models Of Peg-EPO At Trial Due To Roche's Selective Production Only Of Models That Were Created For This Litigation by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1368 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Preclude Roche's Experts from Claiming Unproven and Undisclosed FDA Certification by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1367 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                          Response by Amgen Inc. to 1315 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1343 Proposed Jury Instructions, 1332 Brief, 1291 Brief, 1232 Brief, (Response to Various Filings by Roche Regarding Date of Invention). (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1366 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                            Amended Proposed Jury Verdict by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1365 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                              Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum For Further Jury Instruction Regarding Inherent Written Description Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1326 Brief. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1364 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                Amended Proposed Jury Verdict by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1363 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum Requesting Jury Instruction Regarding Amgen's Failure to Proffer Secondary Consideration Evidence of the Failure of Others Similarly Situated to the Inventor. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1362 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum Requesting That the Jury be Instructed that the Processes of Claims '868 1 and 2 and '698 4-9 Culminate in Isolation, Not Purification, of the Recited Polypeptide. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1361 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                      Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum Regarding Evidence of Infringement of Claim 7 of the '349 Patent (D.I. 1339) Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1339 Brief. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1360 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum to Explain the Relevance of Exhibits GXD and EYV to Issues of Infringement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 2)# 3 Exhibit 2 (part 1 of 3)# 4 Exhibit 2 (part 2 of 3)# 5 Exhibit 2 (part 3 of 3))(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1359 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Responding to Roche's Bench Memorandum Regarding Jury Consideration of Prior Art Evidence. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1358 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Regarding Application of the Doctrine of Equivalents to Establish Infringement Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 271(g). (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1357 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                              Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum Regarding Resolution of Definiteness As A Matter of Law (DI 1334) Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1334 Brief. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1356 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum Regarding Its Proposed Jury Instruction on Obviousness (DI 1335) Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1335 Brief. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1355 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 1354 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Krista M. Rycroft in Support of Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Correct the File History of the '868 Patent by Adding a Document That Was Missing by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1)# 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 3)# 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3 of 3)# 4 Exhibit 2 (part 1 of 3)# 5 Exhibit 2 (part 2 of 3)# 6 Exhibit 2 (part 3 of 3))(Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1354 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 1311 MOTION to Correct the File History of the '868 Patent by Adding a Document that was Missing filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1353 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to 1325 Brief by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum for a Jury Instruction that Subsequent Art Cannot Be Considered for Validity. (Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1352 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 1333 MOTION To Prclude Roche from Offering Additional Evidence and Argument Regarding the Genetics Institute filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1351 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by Amgen Inc. to 1273 Brief = Opposition to Roche's Bench Memorandum Regarding Amgen's Demonstration of the Requisite Nexus Regarding Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1350 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Submit Supplemental Demonstratives from the October 4, 2007 Hearing on Obviousness-Type Double Patenting by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Demonstratives)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1349 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 1222 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing a Declaration of Dr. Harvey Lodish in Connection with the Hearing on Obviousness-Type Double Patenting filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1348 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt to defendant Roche for documents returned on October 10, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1347 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to 1318 Proposed Jury Instructions by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. (Roche's Preliminary Objections to Amgen's [Proposed] Revised Final Jury Instructions). (Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1346 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by Amgen Inc. to 1340 Response = Amgen's Response to Roche's Lists of Prior Art and Chart Identifying Claims by Category Requested by the Court at the October 4, 2007 Afternoon Hearing. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1345 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition/ Response by Amgen Inc. to 1329 Brief /Bench Memo of Roche Requesting a Jury Instruction that Statements in the Specifications are Binding Admissions on Amgen. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1344 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roches Bench Memorandum Requesting Jury Instruction Regarding Amgens Failure to Demonstrate the Requisite Nexus Regarding Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness. (Drozdoff, Vladimir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1343 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Drozdoff, Vladimir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1342 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roches Bench Memorandum Regarding its Proposed Jury Instructions that Contemporaneous Invention by Others is a Consideration Favoring Obviousness. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Drozdoff, Vladimir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1341 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION and Supporting Memorandum Requesting That This Court Try Roche's Inequitable Conduct Defenses by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1340 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Roches List of Prior Art and Chart Identifying Claims by Category Requested by the Court at the October 4, 2007 Afternoon Hearing Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Drozdoff, Vladimir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1339 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Amgen's Bench Memorandum Concerning Amgen's Evidence of Infringement of '349 Claim 7. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1338 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Cullen N. Pendleton in Support of Amgen Inc.'s Motion To Shift Burden of Proof for '349 Claim 7 Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. s. 295 by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1337 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 1336 MOTION To Shift Burden of Proof For '349 Claim 7 Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. s. 295 filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1336 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION To Shift Burden of Proof For '349 Claim 7 Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. s. 295 by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1335 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Regarding its Proposed Jury Instruction on Obviousness. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1334 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Regarding Resolution of Definiteness by the Court as a Matter of Law. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1333 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION To Prclude Roche from Offering Additional Evidence and Argument Regarding the Genetics Institute by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1332 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. ROCHES BENCH MEMORANDUM REGARDING AMGENS (AND DR. LINS) FAILURE TO ESTABLISH AN INVENTION DATE PRIOR TO THE EFFECTIVE FILING DATE OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT. (Drozdoff, Vladimir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1331 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum In Support of Proposed Jury Instruction For Inequitable Conduct (D.I. 1323) Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1323 Brief. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1330 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ROCHES OPPOSITION TO AMGENS BENCH MEMORANDUM REQUESTING A JURY INSTRUCTION REGARDING THE HEIGHTENED PRESUMPTION OF VALIDITY WHEN ROCHE DID NOT PRESENT ANY ART THAT WAS NOT CONSIDERED BY THE PTO Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1319 Brief. (Drozdoff, Vladimir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1329 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum Requesting A Jury Instruction That Statements In The Specification Are Binding Admissions On Amgen. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1328 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ROCHES OPPOSITION TO AMGENS BENCH MEMORANDUM CONCERNING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING SOURCE AND PROCESS LIMITATIONS Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1320 Brief. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1327 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to 917 Proposed Jury Instructions by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1326 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum For Further Jury Instruction Regarding Inherent Written Description. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1325 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum For A Jury Instruction That Subsequent Art Cannot Be Considered For Validity. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1324 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Requesting That The Court Issue A Corrective Instruction That Remedies And Patent Choice Are Irrelevant To The Issues The Jury Must Decide. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1323 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum In Support of Proposed Jury Instruction For Inequitable Conduct. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1322 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Concerning The Appropriate Jury Instruction On Infringement and "Additional Elements". (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1321 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Concerning The Appropriate Jury INstruction On 35 U.S.C. Sec. 271(g). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1320 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Concerning Proposed Jury Instructions Regarding Source and Process Limitations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1319 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Requesting A Jury Instruction Regarding The Hightened Presumption of Validity When Roche Did Not Present Any Art That Was Not Considered By The PTO. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1318 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Proposed Jury Instructions by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1317 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: 10/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Defendants' Motion to Submit Demonstratives From the October 4, 2007 Hearing on Obviousness-Type Double Patenting by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix part 1 of 4# 2 Appendix part 2 of 4# 3 Appendix part 3 of 4# 4 Appendix part 4 of 4)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1316 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Paul Belt on behalf of F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. (Belt, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1315 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 1284 MOTION for Directed Verdict Regarding Invalidity (Leave to file granted on October 4, 2007) filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1314 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 1217 MOTION to Admit Exhibits into Evidence Leave to File Granted on 10/4/07 filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1313 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION To PROVIDE THE COURT WITH ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS FROM THE INTERFERENCE PROCEEDINGS THAT ARE NECESSARY FOR COMPLETENESS AND TO PROVIDE A COMPLETE UNDERSTANDING OF THE PROCEEDINGS by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1312 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 1311 MOTION to Correct the File History of the '868 Patent by Adding a Document that was Missing of Steven M. Odre by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3 Part One# 4 Exhibit 3 Part Two# 5 Exhibit 3 Part Three# 6 Exhibit 4)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1311 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Correct the File History of the '868 Patent by Adding a Document that was Missing by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1310 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding No Obviousness-type Double Patenting. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1309 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 1249 MOTION to Strike EVIDENCE REGARDING ROCHES ALLEGATION THAT CLAIM 7 OF THE 349 PATENT IS NOT ENABLED BECAUSE ROCHE DID NOT PREVIOUSLY IDENTIFY SUCH DEFENSE IN INTERROGATORY RESPONSES filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1308 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 1290 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Drs. Lodish and Torchilin From Presenting Animations Not Discussed in Their Expert Reports filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2007 (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1307 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 1288 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony By Dr. Vladimir Torchilin Regarding Issues Pertaining Strictly to Invalidity filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1306 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 1292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen's Expert Dr. Torchilin From Offering Testimony on Literal Infringement or Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1305 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to 1078 Brief by Amgen Inc. and Response to Defendants' Offer of Proof Regarding the Testimony of Michael Sofocleous. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1304 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 1303 Brief of Andrew A. Kumamoto in Support of Amgen's Bench Memorandum as to the Admissability of Exhibit EYU as a Roche Party Admission by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1303 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum as to the Admissability of Exhibit EYU as a Roche Party Admission. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1302 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition/ Response by Amgen Inc. to 1257 Brief, Roche's Bench Memorandum to Preclude Amgen from Introducing Belatedly Produced Documents Relating to Its Experiments with Pegylation. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1301 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1299 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE INFRINGEMENT TESTIMONY BY DR. LODISH WHICH IS IRRELEVANT AND BEYOND HIS EXPERTISE (of Patricia A. Carson) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1300 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 1299 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE INFRINGEMENT TESTIMONY BY DR. LODISH WHICH IS IRRELEVANT AND BEYOND HIS EXPERTISE filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1299 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE INFRINGEMENT TESTIMONY BY DR. LODISH WHICH IS IRRELEVANT AND BEYOND HIS EXPERTISE by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1298 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to Amgen's Bench Memorandum Regarding Pegylation of Non-EPO Compounds. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1297 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen From Proffering Testimonial or Documentary Evidence Concerning Infringement Testing Under Federal Rules of Evidence 602,901 and 702/703 by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1296 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 1265 MOTION to Preclude Roche from Introducing Evidence or Testimony Regarding the Safety or Efficacy of PEG-EPO Because Roche has Asserted that these Topics are Irrelevant and on that Basis Denied Amgen Fulsome Discovery filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1295 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 1281 MOTION [RENEWED] To Admit Exhibit BWZa (In Redacted Form) Into Evidence filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1294 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 1276 MOTION TO ADMIT TRIAL EXHIBIT NUK INTO EVIDENCE filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1293 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = Bench Memorandum Requesting That The Court Enforce Its Order On Motion In Limine No. 12 And Issue A Corrective Instruction To Remedy Roche's Improper Argument That The Jury Consider "Patient Choice" Because Such Argument Was Tantamount To Requesting Jury Nullification. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1292 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen's Expert Dr. Torchilin From Offering Testimony on Literal Infringement or Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1291 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum Regarding Amgen's Failure to Establish an Invention Date Prior to the Effective Filing Date of the Patents-In-Suit. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1290 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine To Preclude Drs. Lodish and Torchilin From Presenting Animations Not Discussed in Their Expert Reports by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1289 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 1261 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen's Expert Witness Dr. Leslie Benet from Offering Testimony on Infringement filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1288 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony By Dr. Vladimir Torchilin Regarding Issues Pertaining Strictly to Invalidity by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1287 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum (D.I. 1267) That It Is Appropriate for Dr. Lodish To use Computer-Modeled Demonstratives Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1286 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition Response by Amgen Inc. to 1258 Brief of Defendants' to Strike Portions of Dr. Lin's Testimony for Lackof Personal Knowledge. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1285 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF THE PAGE LIMIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR A DIRECTED VERDICT OF INVALIDITY by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1284 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Directed Verdict Regarding Invalidity by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1283 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = BENCH MEMORANDUM CONCERNING THE RELEVANCE OF U.S. PATENT 4,776,075 TO ROCHE'S OBVIOUSNESS DEFENSE. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1282 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 1278 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE AMGEN FROM OFFERING ARGUMENTS AND EXPERT TESTIMONY ON OBVIOUSNESS-TYPE DOUBLE PATENTING THAT IT FAILED TO DISCLOSE IN ITS INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND EXPERT REPORTS (of Patricia A. Carson) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1281 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION [RENEWED] To Admit Exhibit BWZa (In Redacted Form) Into Evidence by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1280 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Roche's Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen's Expert Witness Dr. Harvey F. Lodish from Offering Testimony Regarding the Expert Statements of Richard D. Kolodner and Donald W. McLawhon, PH.D by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1279 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 1278 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE AMGEN FROM OFFERING ARGUMENTS AND EXPERT TESTIMONY ON OBVIOUSNESS-TYPE DOUBLE PATENTING THAT IT FAILED TO DISCLOSE IN ITS INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND EXPERT REPORTS filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1278 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE AMGEN FROM OFFERING ARGUMENTS AND EXPERT TESTIMONY ON OBVIOUSNESS-TYPE DOUBLE PATENTING THAT IT FAILED TO DISCLOSE IN ITS INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND EXPERT REPORTS by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1277 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 1239 MOTION to ADMIT EXHIBITS INTO EVIDENCE FOR INFRINGEMENT PHASE OF TRIAL filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1276 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO ADMIT TRIAL EXHIBIT NUK INTO EVIDENCE by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1275 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE DR. BENET FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING ISSUES PERTAINING TO INVALIDITY by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1274 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. TO AMGEN'S BENCH MEMORANDUM REGARDING THE ADMISSIBILITY OF POST-FILING EVIDENCE OF STRUCTURAL AND FUNCTIONAL DIFFERENCES (DN 1235). (Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1273 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. BENCH MEMORANDUM REGARDING AMGEN'S FAILURE TO DEMONSTRATE THE REQUISITE NEXUS REGARDING SECONDARY CONSIDERATIONS OF NON-OBVIOUSNESS. (Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1272 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition/ Response by Amgen Inc. to 1260 Brief Roche's Bench Memorandum to Preclude Amgen from Introducing Testimony Related to Pegylation of Non-EPO Compounds. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1271 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by Amgen Inc. to 1232 Brief, AMGENS RESPONSE TO ROCHES BENCH MEMORANDUM REGARDING UNCONTROVERTED EVIDENCE OF RECORD THAT DR. FRITSCH ISOLATED THE EPO GENE PRIOR TO THE EFFECTIVE FILING DATE OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT". (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1270 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) - RENEWED by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1269 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered re1217 Motion to Admit Exhibits into Evidence. "Motion allowed in part and denied in part. Where allowed, the allowance is subjected to particularized objection by Roche. Where denied, the denial is without prejudice. See particularized notations herein. Exhibits FTF and GUR, however, are not admissible. The Chugai and G1 documents are not admissible for the reasons advance by Roche notwithstanding their antiquity." (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1268 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 1267 Brief of Daniel A. Curto in Support of Amgen's Bench Memorandum that it is Appropriate for Dr. Lodish to use Computer-Modeled Demonstratives that will assist the Jury in Understanding His Infringement Testimony by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1267 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum That it is Appropriate for Dr. Lodish to use Computer-Modeled Demonstratives that will assist the Jury in Understanding His Infringement Testimony. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1266 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Response To Amgen's Bench Memorandum That Documents Showing That Amgen's Competitors In 1984 Acknowledged That Amgen Was The First To Clone The EPO Gene, That Amgen's Cloning Was Patentable And That They Sought To Copy Amgen Are Relevant To Secondary Considerations Of Non-Obviousness. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1265 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Preclude Roche from Introducing Evidence or Testimony Regarding the Safety or Efficacy of PEG-EPO Because Roche has Asserted that these Topics are Irrelevant and on that Basis Denied Amgen Fulsome Discovery by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1264 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Roche's Defense of Non-Infringement Under "The Reverse Doctrine of Equivalents". (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1263 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 1255 MOTION Defendants' Request for Permission to File Opposition to Amgen's In Limine Motion Regarding MIRCERA European Approval and Label re 1251 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE ROCHE FROM CLAIMING DURING THE INFRINGEMENT CASE THAT (1) MIRCER MOTION Defendants' Request for Permission to File Opposition to Amgen's In Limine Motion Regarding MIRCERA European Approval and Label re 1251 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE ROCHE FROM CLAIMING DURING THE INFRINGEMENT CASE THAT (1) MIRCER MOTION Defendants' Request for Permission to File Opposition to Amgen's In Limine Motion Regarding MIRCERA European Approval and Label re 1251 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE ROCHE FROM CLAIMING DURING THE INFRINGEMENT CASE THAT (1) MIRCER MOTION Defendants' Request for Permission to File Opposition to Amgen's In Limine Motion Regarding MIRCERA European Approval and Label re 1251 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE ROCHE FROM CLAIMING DURING THE INFRINGEMENT CASE THAT (1) MIRCER filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1262 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Admit Documents by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Reply)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1261 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen's Expert Witness Dr. Leslie Benet from Offering Testimony on Infringement by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1260 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum to Preclude Amgen from Introducing Testimony Related to Pegylation of Non-EPO Compounds. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1259 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike the ODP Testimony of Roche's Expert Thomas Kadesch that was not Previously Disclosed in any of his Three Expert Reports by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1258 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Lin's Testimony for Lack of Personal Knowldege. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1257 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum to Preclude Amgen From Introducing Belatedly Produced Documents Relating to Its Experiments with Pegylation and COS-EPO as Untimely and Prejudicial. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1256 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Offers to Compromise. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1254 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 1217 MOTION to Admit Exhibits into Evidence Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Admit Exhibits Into Evidence filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1253 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Amgen Inc. re 1218 MOTION to Admit Exhibit BWZ into Evidence Notice of Manual filing of Exhibit BWZa (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1252 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1251 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE ROCHE FROM CLAIMING DURING THE INFRINGEMENT CASE THAT (1) MIRCERA DOES NOT COMPRISE HUMAN EPO, IN CONTRADICTION OF THIS COURTS FINDING OF INFRINGEMENT ON CLAIM 1 OF THE 422 PATENT AND (2) THAT EUROPEAN REGULATORY APPROV MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE ROCHE FROM CLAIMING DURING THE INFRINGEMENT CASE THAT (1) MIRCERA DOES NOT COMPRISE HUMAN EPO, IN CONTRADICTION OF THIS COURTS FINDING OF INFRINGEMENT ON CLAIM 1 OF THE 422 PATENT AND (2) THAT EUROPEAN REGULATORY APPROV Declaration by Daniel A. Curto by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1251 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE ROCHE FROM CLAIMING DURING THE INFRINGEMENT CASE THAT (1) MIRCERA DOES NOT COMPRISE HUMAN EPO, IN CONTRADICTION OF THIS COURTS FINDING OF INFRINGEMENT ON CLAIM 1 OF THE 422 PATENT AND (2) THAT EUROPEAN REGULATORY APPROVAL HAS ANY RELEVANCE TO THE CLAIMS IN THIS LAWSUIT by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1250 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 1249 MOTION to Strike EVIDENCE REGARDING ROCHES ALLEGATION THAT CLAIM 7 OF THE 349 PATENT IS NOT ENABLED BECAUSE ROCHE DID NOT PREVIOUSLY IDENTIFY SUCH DEFENSE IN INTERROGATORY RESPONSES Declaration of Daniel A. Curto by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1)# 2 Exhibit A (part two)# 3 Exhibit A (part three))(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1249 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike EVIDENCE REGARDING ROCHES ALLEGATION THAT CLAIM 7 OF THE 349 PATENT IS NOT ENABLED BECAUSE ROCHE DID NOT PREVIOUSLY IDENTIFY SUCH DEFENSE IN INTERROGATORY RESPONSES by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1248 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 1246 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. Lodish on Amgen's Validity Case on Matters that Are of No Relevance to this Case (of Julia Huston) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1247 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 1246 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. Lodish on Amgen's Validity Case on Matters that Are of No Relevance to this Case filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1246 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. Lodish on Amgen's Validity Case on Matters that Are of No Relevance to this Case by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1245 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum That The U.S. Patent No. 4,766,075 Is Relevant Prior Art That is Presumed To Be Enabled. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1244 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Motion In Limine To Preclude Amgen Expert Harvey Lodish From Giving Irrelevant Testimony Related To Cell Lines. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1243 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Motion In Limine To Preclude Expert Testimony By Dr. Lodish Regarding The Conduct Of Drs. Lin and Goldwasser Which Is Spectulative, And Outside His Competence As An Expert. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1242 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Motion in Limine To Preclude Dr. Lodish From Opining Improperly Regarding Prior Art References. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1241 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by Amgen Inc. BENCH MEMORANDUM THAT DOCUMENTS SHOWING THAT AMGEN'S COMPETITORS IN 1984 ACKNOWLEDGED THAT AMGEN WAS THE FIRST TO CLONE THE EPO GENE, THAT AMGEN'S CLONING WAS PATENTABLE AND THAT THEY SOUGHT TO COPY AMGEN ARE RELEVANT TO SECONDARY CONSIDERATIONS OF NON-OBVIOUSNESS. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1240 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum For A Clarifying Preliminary Jury Instruction on Infringement of "422 Patent, Claim 1 To Provide The Jury With Procedural Context And Minimize Confusion. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1239 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to ADMIT EXHIBITS INTO EVIDENCE FOR INFRINGEMENT PHASE OF TRIAL by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A (Attachment A- Chart of Documents to be Admitted))(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1238 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Amgen Inc. BENCH MEMORANDUM TO PRECLUDE ROCHE FROM ARGUING OR PRESENTING EVIDENCE THAT MIRCERA DOES NOT CONTAIN HUMAN ERYTHROPOIETIN. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1237 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Amgen Inc. BENCH MEMORANDUM CLARIFYING CASE LAW CONCERNING SOURCE AND PROCESS LIMITATIONS. (Rich, Patricia) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2007 (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1236 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum Requesting A Clarifying Preliminary Jury Instruction Relating to Roche's Patent On Pegylated Erythropoietin. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1235 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by Amgen Inc. BENCH MEMORANDUM REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY OF POST-FILING EVIDENCE OF FUNCTIONAL AND STRUCTURAL DIFFERENCES TO REBUT ROCHES INVALIDITY ALLEGATIONS. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1234 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roches Opposition to Amgens Motion to Admit Exhibit BWZ in Evidence. (Drozdoff, Vladimir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1233 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Bench Memorandum Clarifying That Product by Process Claims are Limited Only by Limitations Recited in the Claims or the Specification. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1232 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roches Bench Memorandum Regardubg Uncontroverted Evidence of Record that Dr. Fritsch Isolated the EPO Gene Prior to the Effective Filing Date of the Patents-in-Suit. (Drozdoff, Vladimir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1231 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum That Correspondence Between Chugai and Genetics Institute is Inadmissible Under the "Ancient Documents" Exception Because those Documents are not Authenticated, Contain Hearsay Within Hearsay, and are Misleading, Confusing and Unduly Prejudicial. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1230 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Supplement Trial Exhibit 2011. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1229 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench memorandum Regarding Showing the Jury Photographs Contained in a Learned Treatise. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1228 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1212 Brief Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum That Trial Exhibit FTF is Admissible After Dr. Ajit Varki Explains the Relevance of Dr. Catlin's Experiment. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1227 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum for a Clarifying Preliminary Jury Instruction on Infringement of '422 Patent, Claim 1, to Provide the Jury with Procedural Context and to Minimize Jury Confusion. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1226 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum for a Clarifying Preliminary Jury Instruction Relating to Roche's Patent on Pegylated Erthropoietin. (Attachments: # 1)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1225 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Motion re 876 MOTION in Limine No. 17: to Exclude Roche from Presenting Evidence to Challenge the Non-obviousness of the DNA Sequence Encoding for Human Erythropoietin in 1983 (Leave to File Granted on October 1, 2007) filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1224 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Amgen Inc. re 1217 MOTION to Admit Exhibits into Evidence OF MANUAL FILING (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1223 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 1206 MOTION To Preclude the Testimony of Dr. Thomas Kadesch Based on Roche's Representation That It Would Not Call Dr. Kadesch At Trial, Or, In The Alternative, To Limit His Testimony Regarding Obviousness-Type Double Patenting To the Two Sentences On filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1222 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing a Declaration of Dr. Harvey Lodish in Connection with the Hearing on Obviousness-Type Double Patenting by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1221 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Amgen's Offer of Proof on Obviousness-Type Double Patenting by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1220 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1219 MOTION to Streamline and Expedite the Live Testimony of Dr. Thomas Strickland of Patricia R. Rich by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1219 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Streamline and Expedite the Live Testimony of Dr. Thomas Strickland by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1218 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Admit Exhibit BWZa into Evidence by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2007 (Paine, Matthew). Modified on 10/3/2007 (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1217 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Admit Exhibits into Evidence by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1216 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition/ Response by Amgen Inc. to 1204 Brief Roche's Bench Memorandum Regarding Expected Cumulative Testimony by Amgen's Expert Carlo Brugnara. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1215 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 1214 Emergency MOTION To Preclude Amgen From Publicly Disclosing Roche's Trade Secrets Without Prior Notice to Roche By Julia Huston by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1214 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION To Preclude Amgen From Publicly Disclosing Roche's Trade Secrets Without Prior Notice to Roche by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD.(Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1213 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 1205 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen from presenting Testimony of Attorney Ian Crawford filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1212 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum that the Digital Photograph of Dr. Catlin's IEF Experiment (Trial Exhibit FTF) is Admissable After Dr. Ajit Varki Explains the Relevance of Dr. Catlin's Experiment. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1211 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Showing Jury Photographs Contained in Learned Treatise. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1210 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Play a Designation for Leroy Hood which was Designated by Roche, Allowed by the Court, and Subsequently Withdrawn by Roche by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1209 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Clarification Defendants' Motion For Clarification of the Court's Ruling on Roche's Motion to Admit Exhibits Into Evidence by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1208 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT TRIAL EXHIBIT 2011 by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1207 Filed: 9/30/2007, Entered: 9/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 1206 MOTION To Preclude the Testimony of Dr. Thomas Kadesch Based on Roche's Representation That It Would Not Call Dr. Kadesch At Trial, Or, In The Alternative, To Limit His Testimony Regarding Obviousness-Type Double Patenting To the Two Sentences On This Issue Contained in His Expert Report, Declaration Of Aaron R. Hand by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1206 Filed: 9/30/2007, Entered: 9/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION To Preclude the Testimony of Dr. Thomas Kadesch Based on Roche's Representation That It Would Not Call Dr. Kadesch At Trial, Or, In The Alternative, To Limit His Testimony Regarding Obviousness-Type Double Patenting To the Two Sentences On This Issue Contained In His Expert Report by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1205 Filed: 9/30/2007, Entered: 9/30/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen from presenting Testimony of Attorney Ian Crawford by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1204 Filed: 9/30/2007, Entered: 9/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum Regarding Expected Cumulative Testimony by Amgen's Expert Carlo Brugnara. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1203 Filed: 9/30/2007, Entered: 9/30/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion In Limine to Preclude Amgen From Presenting Testimony of Gary Rogers by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1202 Filed: 9/29/2007, Entered: 9/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That The Baron-Goldwasser EPO Studies and Their NIH and FDA Grant Applications Are Not Prior Art by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1201 Filed: 9/29/2007, Entered: 9/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by Amgen Inc. = OPPOSITION TO ROCHE'S MEMORANDUM REGARDING BARON-GOLDWASSER PRIOR ART: BARON-GOLDWASSER CLINICAL STUDY, BARON GOLDWASSER IND AND GOLDWASSER NIH GRANTS (D.I. 1141-5 Exhibit D). (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1200 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 1198 MOTION to Quash Subpoena ad Testificandum Served on Third Party Dr. Fu-Kuen Lin, 1199 Memorandum in Support of Motion of Geoffrey M. Godfrey by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1199 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 1198 MOTION to Quash Subpoena ad Testificandum Served on Third Party Dr. Fu-Kuen Lin filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1198 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash Subpoena ad Testificandum Served on Third Party Dr. Fu-Kuen Lin by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1197 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 1196 MOTION to Authenticate by Declaration in Lieu of the Live Testimony of Charles Kung by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Charles Kung)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1196 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Authenticate by Declaration in Lieu of the Live Testimony of Charles Kung by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1195 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 1098 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Edward Harlow, a Roche Expert Witness, Because It Is Irrelevant and Is Inadmissible Hearsay (Leave to File Granted on September 28, 2007) filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1194 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Browne Testifying About Previous Litigations. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1193 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Bench Memorandum: Dr. Browne Should be Precluded from Testifying About the Specific Claims of the Patents-In-Suit. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1192 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition/ Response by Amgen Inc. to 1182 Brief to Restrict Dr. Goldwasser to Testifying Only to Opinions Consistent with his Expert Report. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1191 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition/ Response by Amgen Inc. to 1181 Brief to Preclude Amgen from Soliciting Cumulative Trial Testimony from Dr. Eugene Goldwasser. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1190 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 1187 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion In Limine to Preclude Amgen From Presenting Testimony of Charles Kung filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1189 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION requesting an instruction ot the jury regarding the fact that Dr. Harlow's statements, as Roche's agent, are admissions by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1188 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1187 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion In Limine to Preclude Amgen From Presenting Testimony of Charles Kung (by Peter Fratangelo) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1187 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion In Limine to Preclude Amgen From Presenting Testimony of Charles Kung by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1186 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Thomas F. Fleming re: Agreement between the parties as to trial exchanges. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1185 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt to Defendant Roche for documents returned on September 26, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1184 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 1183 Brief Declaration of Alfred H. Heckel In Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Goldwasser From Relying on Exhibit AYS, Declaration of Thomas Heckler by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1 of 2# 2 Exhibit A part 2 of 2)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1183 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Motion In Limine To Exclude Dr. Eugene Goldwasser From Testifying Regarding Exhibit AYS, Declaration Of Thomas Heckler. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1182 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Restrict Goldwasser To Testifying Only to Opinions Consistent With His Expert Report. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1181 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen From Soliciting Cumulative Trial Testimony From Dr. Eugene Goldwasser. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1180 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1179 Opposition to Motion of Kevin Flowers in Support of Amgen's Opposition to Roche's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Adrian Katz by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1179 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 1140 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Adrian Katz Obtained By Amgen Through Duress And Subterfuge For Lack Of Competence And Improper Expert Testimony From A Fact Witness filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1178 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 1177 Opposition to Motion, of Renee Dubord Brown in Support of Amgen's Opposition to Roche's Motion in Limine to Exclude Deposition Testimony of Dr. Leroy Hood by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 6# 2 Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 6# 3 Exhibit 1, Part 3 of 6# 4 Exhibit 1, Part 4 of 6# 5 Exhibit 1, Part 5 of 6# 6 Exhibit 1, Part 6 of 6# 7 Exhibit 2, Part 1 of 4# 8 Exhibit 2, Part 2 of 4# 9 Exhibit 2, Part 3 of 4# 10 Exhibit 2, Part 4 of 4# 11 Exhibit 3# 12 Exhibit 4)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1177 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 1118 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Deposition Testimony of Dr. Leroy Hood, Whom Amgen Did Not Identify as an Expert or Disclose as a Knowledgeable Witness Under Rule 26(A)(1) MOTION in Limine to Exclude Deposition Testimony of Dr. Leroy Hood, Whom Amgen Did Not Identify as an Expert or Disclose as a Knowledgeable Witness Under Rule 26(A)(1) filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1176 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff Amgen Inc. From Offering Testimony Concerning Assays From Fact Witness Dr. Lin Because He Lacks Personal Knowledge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1175 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Defendants' Motion in Limine to preclude Plaintiaff Amgen Inc. From Offering Testimony Concerning Epogen From Fact Witness Dr. Lin Who Lacks Personal Knowledge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1011 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Attachment 4DECLARATION of Aaron R. Hand, Esq. In Support of Amgen Inc.'s Motion In Limine No. 25: Exclude Deposition Testimony From a Prior Litigation of Takaji Miyake, A Non-Party Witness Whom Roche did Not Previously Disclose by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1174 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION To Allow Amgen To Use the Deposition Testimony Of Dr. Baron In Its Case-In-Chief On Validity by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1173 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1172 MOTION for Protective Order TO LIMIT ROCHE'S DEPOSITION OF JEFFREY BROWNE TO FOUR HOURS BECAUSE OF ROCHE'S REFUSAL TO START THE DEPOSITION ON SEPTEMBER 26, 2007 of Daniel A. Curto by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1172 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order TO LIMIT ROCHE'S DEPOSITION OF JEFFREY BROWNE TO FOUR HOURS BECAUSE OF ROCHE'S REFUSAL TO START THE DEPOSITION ON SEPTEMBER 26, 2007 by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1171 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 1098 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Edward Harlow, a Roche Expert Witness, Because It Is Irrelevant and Is Inadmissible Hearsay Leave to File Granted on September 26, 2007 by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1170 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Document Containing Defendants' Trade Secrets Submitted in Connection with Amgen's Motion for Leave to Reply in Further Support of Its Motion In Limine No. 13 by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1169 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 1136 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) (leave to file granted 9/26/07) filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1168 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 1167 Opposition to Motion Of Deborah E, Fishman in Support of Amgen Inc's Opposition to Roche Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen from calling Jeffrey Brown at Trial by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1167 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 1149 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Amgen From Calling Jeffrey Browne At Trial After Failing To Produce Him For Deposition Pursuant To Subpoena filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1166 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt to Defendant Roche for documents received on September 25, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1165 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1162 Brief of Geoffrey M. Godfrey in Support of Amgen's Bench Memorandum and Offer of Proof Regarding No Obviousness-Type Double Patenting by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D-1 OF 2# 5 Exhibit D-2 OF 2# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I 1 of 3# 11 Exhibit I 2 of 3# 12 Exhibit I 3 of 3# 13 Exhibit J)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1164 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 1162 Brief of Harvey F. Lodish, Ph.D. in Support of Bench Memorandum and Offer of Proof Regarding No Obviousness-Type Double Patenting by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1163 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Further Support of Defendants' Motion In Limine To Preclude Amgen From Introducing the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Edward Harlow, A Roche Expert Witness On the Issue of Obviousness-Type Double Patenting Who Will Not Be Testifying At Trial by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1162 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum and Offer of Proof Regarding No Obviousness-Type Double Patenting. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1161 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 1061 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Grant of Summary Judgment of Infringement of '422 Claim 1 filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1160 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by Amgen Inc. to 1078 Brief in Opposition to Roche's Memorandum of Law on the Admission of of Mr. Sofocleous' Testimony During the Validity Phase. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1159 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum No. 5 That Dr. Orkin Should be Precluded Under F.R.E. 802 From Offering Testimony on the Cloning Efforts of Biogen. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1158 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum No. 4 That Dr. Orkin Should be Precluded From Testifying That in 1983 There was Uncertainty That There was a Commercial Market for an EPO Drug Product, Because Such Testimony Would Contradict Binding Admissions in Amgen's Patents. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1157 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum No. 3 that Dr. Orkin Should be Precluded from Testifying That There Was No Known Source of Human EPO MRNA in 1983 Because Such Testimony Contradicts Admissions In the Specifications of Amgen's Patents. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1156 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum No. 2 that Dr. Orkin Should be Precluded from Testifying to a Claim-By-Claim Analysis of the Patents-In-Suit and/or Offering an Opinion on the Ulitimate Issue of Validity Because These Opinions are not in His Expert Reports. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1155 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum No. 1 That Dr. Orkin Should be Precluded from Offering Opinions on Topics About Which He Has Expressly Disclaimed Expertise. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1154 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 1153 Brief of Daniel A. Curto in Support of SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF BENCH MEMORANDA REGARDING: (1) AUTHENTICATION OF JANUARY 16, 1984 LETTER; AND (2) AUTHENTICATION OF JAN. 11, 1984 TELEX by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Ian Crawford, Esq.))(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1153 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by Amgen Inc. to 1048 Brief, 1049 Brief Supplemental Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF BENCH MEMORANDA REGARDING: (1) AUTHENTICATION OF JANUARY 16, 1984 LETTER; AND (2) AUTHENTICATION OF JAN. 11, 1984 TELEX. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1152 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 1113 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Proposed Amgen Witness Nancy Spaeth Based on Additional Evidence filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1151 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 1149 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Amgen From Calling Jeffrey Browne At Trial After Failing To Produce Him For Deposition Pursuant To Subpoena (Declaration of Manvin Mayell) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1150 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 1149 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Amgen From Calling Jeffrey Browne At Trial After Failing To Produce Him For Deposition Pursuant To Subpoena filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1149 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine To Preclude Amgen From Calling Jeffrey Browne At Trial After Failing To Produce Him For Deposition Pursuant To Subpoena by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1148 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Opposition re 1136 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) Regarding 102(f) Derivation and Obviousness of Claim 7 of the '349 Patent Raised by Amgen During the September 24th Hearing filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1147 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. re 1143 Declaration, Notice of Service of Confidential Document (Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1146 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Opposition re 1136 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) Regarding the Estoppel Effect of the Chugai Litigation Raised by Amgen During the September 24th Hearing filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1145 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Opposition re 1136 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) Regarding the Oviousness of Claims 11 and 14 of the '933 Patent as Raised by Amgen During the September 24th Hearing filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1144 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Opposition re 1136 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) Regarding Structural Identity Between Amgen's Product Claims and the Prior Art Raised by Amgen During September 24th Hearing filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1143 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 1140 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Adrian Katz Obtained By Amgen Through Duress And Subterfuge For Lack Of Competence And Improper Expert Testimony From A Fact Witness (by Emily J. Schaffer) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1# 2 Exhibit A, Part 2# 3 Exhibit B)(Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1142 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Opposition re 1136 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) Regarding Obviousness and the Opinions of Roche's Expert Dr. Lowe Raised by Amgen During September 24th Hearing filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1141 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 1136 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) Regarding Roche's Invalidity Defenses filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1140 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Adrian Katz Obtained By Amgen Through Duress And Subterfuge For Lack Of Competence And Improper Expert Testimony From A Fact Witness by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1139 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. BENCH MEMORANDUM THAT DR. RICHARD FLAVELL PROPERLY TESTIFIED REGARDING HIS OPINION THAT CLAIM 7 OF THE 349 PATENT LACKS ENABLEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1138 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt to Plaintiff Amgen, Inc. for documents returned on September 25, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1137 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File to File an Oversized Brief in Support of its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Amgen Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a))(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1136 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) by Amgen Inc..(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1135 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt to Defendant Roche for documents received on September 24, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1134 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. OF PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO ADMIT PARTY ADMISSIONS AND PREVIOUS FINDINGS OF FACT INTO EVIDENCE (D.N. 1067) (Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1133 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by Amgen Inc. OPPOSITION TO ROCHES MOTION TO ADMIT EXHIBITS INTO EVIDENCE (FILED IN OPEN COURT ON 9/24/07). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1132 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 1131 Opposition to Motion OF RENEE DUBORD BROWN IN SUPPORT OF AMGENS OPPOSITION TO ROCHES MOTION TO PRECLUDE AMGEN FROM ARGUING TO THE JURY THAT EPOGEN IMPROVES QUALITY OF LIFE by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1131 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 1105 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Arguing to the Jury that Epogen Improves Quality of Life Where the FDA Does Not Support the Inclusion of Such Claims on the Product Label filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1130 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 1067 MOTION Omnibus Motion Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Admit Party Admissions and Previous Findings of Fact into Evidence AND OBJECTIONS filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1129 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 1119 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinion Testimony of Amgen's Expert Witness Dr. Friedman Based on Improper Instructions Not to Answer at His Deposition filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1128 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Amgen Inc. re 1127 MOTION for Leave to File A Declaration in Support of Its Opposition to Defendant Roche's Motion to Preclude the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Edward Everett Harlow OF SERVICE OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1127 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Declaration in Support of Its Opposition to Defendant Roche's Motion to Preclude the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Edward Everett Harlow by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1126 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Amgen Inc. AMGENS BENCH BRIEF ON DOCUMENTS ALREADY IN EVIDENCE THAT DEMONSTRATE A NEXUS BETWEEN EPOGEN AND AT LEAST ONE CLAIM OF A PATENT-IN-SUIT. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1125 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Emily J. Schaffer on behalf of F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. (Schaffer, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1124 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 1123 Reply to Response to Motion, of Aaron R. Hand in Support of Motion in Limine No. 13 - Leave to File Granted on 9/24/07 by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Coversheet)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1123 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 856 MOTION in Limine No. 13: Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Roche's FDA Filings and Communications Withheld Throughout Fact Discovery Leave to File Granted on 9/24/07 filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1122 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 1036 MOTION in Limine to Bind Amgen Inc. to Prior Admissions Relevant to Double Patenting filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1121 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by Amgen Inc. BENCH MEMORANDUM THAT DR. RICHARD A. FLAVELL SHOULD BE PRECLUDED FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING HIS UNTIMELY OPINION THAT CLAIM 7 OF THE 349 PATENT LACKS ENABLEMENT. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1120 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 1119 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinion Testimony of Amgen's Expert Witness Dr. Friedman Based on Improper Instructions Not to Answer at His Deposition (of Howard S. Suh) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1119 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinion Testimony of Amgen's Expert Witness Dr. Friedman Based on Improper Instructions Not to Answer at His Deposition by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1118 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Deposition Testimony of Dr. Leroy Hood, Whom Amgen Did Not Identify as an Expert or Disclose as a Knowledgeable Witness Under Rule 26(A)(1) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1117 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 1096 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Fact Testimony and Expert Testimony of Dr. Catlin On the Basis That Athlete Doping Is Irrelevant To Any Issue In This Case filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1116 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. re 1113 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Proposed Amgen Witness Nancy Spaeth Based on Additional Evidence (Notice of Service of Confidential Exhibit to the Declaration of Peter Fratangelo) (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1115 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 1113 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Proposed Amgen Witness Nancy Spaeth Based on Additional Evidence (of Peter Fratangelo) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Toms, Keith) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2007 (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1114 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 1113 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Proposed Amgen Witness Nancy Spaeth Based on Additional Evidence filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1113 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Proposed Amgen Witness Nancy Spaeth Based on Additional Evidence by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1112 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum That it is Improper for Richard A. Flavell to Offer Opinions That Restate Arguments Rejected by Grant of Summary Judgment That Claim 7 of the '349 Patent is Definite Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1111 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 1065 MOTION in Limine Roche's Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Arguing That Lin Described Human EPO With The 1-165 Amino Acid Residues of Fig. 6 filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1110 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 1066 MOTION in Limine Roche's Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Arguing that Examples in the Lin Specification Inherently Produce Human EPO with 165 Amino Acid Residues filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1109 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Bench Memorandum: Amgen Should be Precluded from Cross-Examining Dr. Bertozzi on Comparisons Between Urinary Epo and Recombinant Epo. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1108 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 1099 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum Served on Third Party Bruce Spinowitz, M.D. filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1107 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum Regarding Fritsch Deposition Testimony Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1106 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 1105 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Arguing to the Jury that Epogen Improves Quality of Life Where the FDA Does Not Support the Inclusion of Such Claims on the Product Label (of Keith E. Toms) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Toms, Keith) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2007 (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1105 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Arguing to the Jury that Epogen Improves Quality of Life Where the FDA Does Not Support the Inclusion of Such Claims on the Product Label by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1104 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 1098 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Edward Harlow, a Roche Expert Witness, Because It Is Irrelevant and Is Inadmissible Hearsay filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1103 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandum That it is Improper for Dr. Richard A. Flavell to Offer Opinions Based on His Improper Rejection of This Court's Claim Construction of the Term "Human Erythropoietin" Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1102 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Bench Memorandums (D.I. 1048 and 1049) Regarding the Authentication of a Jan. 11, 1984 Telex and a Jan. 16, 1984 Letter Response by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1101 Filed: 9/23/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 1026 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Using Alleged Claim Features to Distinguish Prior Art when those Claim Features were Not Proven to Establish Infringement, 1046 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Amgen Inc. From Arguing That Source Limitations Distinguish the Prior Art From Its '422 Patent Claim 1, 1047 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Amgen Inc. From Arguing That Process Limitations Distinguish the Prior Art From Its '933 Product-By-Process Claims filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1100 Filed: 9/22/2007, Entered: 9/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 1099 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum Served on Third Party Bruce Spinowitz, M.D. filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1099 Filed: 9/22/2007, Entered: 9/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum Served on Third Party Bruce Spinowitz, M.D. by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1098 Filed: 9/22/2007, Entered: 9/22/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Edward Harlow, a Roche Expert Witness, Because It Is Irrelevant and Is Inadmissible Hearsay by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1097 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 1088 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibit Submitted in Connection with Amgens Motion to Remove the Confidential Designation from the June 21, 2007 Deposition Transcript of Roches Expert Dr. Thomas Kadesch filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1096 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Fact Testimony and Expert Testimony of Dr. Catlin On the Basis That Athlete Doping Is Irrelevant To Any Issue In This Case by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1095 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt to Plaintiff Amgen, Inc. for documents received on September 20, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1094 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Amgen Inc. re 1093 MOTION for Leave to File Amgen's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion in Limine No. 13: to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Roche's FDA Filings and Communications Withheld Throughout Fact Discovery of Service of Confidential Document (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1093 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amgen's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion in Limine No. 13: to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Roche's FDA Filings and Communications Withheld Throughout Fact Discovery by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Reply# 2 Exhibit B - [Proposed] Declaration of Aaron Hand in Support of Reply)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1092 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 1091 Brief, in Support of Defendants' Bench Memorandum Regarding the Relevance of Baron and Goldwasser's Prior Art and Refuting Amgen's Assertiions that the Baron-Goldwasser IND and Goldwasser Grants are Not "Printed Publications," Anticipatory or Enabling Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102 (by Patricia Carson) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 1 of 14# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 2 of 14# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 3 of 14# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 4 of 14# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 5 of 14# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 6 of 14# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 7 of 14# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 8 of 14# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 9 of 14# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 10 of 14# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 11 of 14# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 12 of 14# 13 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 13 of 14# 14 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 14 of 14# 15 Exhibit Exhibit 2 part 1 of 3# 16 Exhibit Exhibit 2 part 2 of 3# 17 Exhibit Exhibit 2 part 3 of 3# 18 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 1 of 5# 19 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 2 of 5# 20 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 3a of 5# 21 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 3b of 5# 22 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 4 of 5# 23 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 5 of 5# 24 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 25 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 26 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 27 Exhibit Exhibit 7 part 1 of 2# 28 Exhibit Exhibit 7 part 2 of 2# 29 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1091 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Defendants' Bench Memorandum Regarding the Relevance of Baron and Goldwasser's Prior Art and Refuting Amgen's Assertions that the Baron-Goldwasser IND and Goldwasser Grants Are Not "Printed Publications," Anticipatory or Enabling Under 35 U.S.C.Section 102. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1090 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 1089 Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Alfred H. Heckel in Support of Roche's Opposition to Amgen's Emergency Motion to Allow Amgen to Examine Dr. Don Catlin on Monday, September 24, or in the Alternative to Take Depositon De Bene Esse by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1089 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 1083 Emergency MOTION to allow Amgen to Examine Dr. Don Catlin on Monday Setember 24, or in the Alternative to take Deposition De Bene Esse filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1088 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibit Submitted in Connection with Amgens Motion to Remove the Confidential Designation from the June 21, 2007 Deposition Transcript of Roches Expert Dr. Thomas Kadesch by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1087 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 1063 MOTION to Remove the "Confidential" Designation from the June 21, 2007 Deposition Transcript of Roche's Expert Dr. Thomas Kadesch filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1086 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 986 MOTION in Limine No. 23: Exclude Testimony of Daniel Shouval Regarding Erythropoietin-Producing Cell Lines and His Work on EOP MRNA filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1085 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1083 Emergency MOTION to allow Amgen to Examine Dr. Don Catlin on Monday Setember 24, or in the Alternative to take Deposition De Bene Esse of Jonathan D. Loeb by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1084 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 1083 Emergency MOTION to allow Amgen to Examine Dr. Don Catlin on Monday Setember 24, or in the Alternative to take Deposition De Bene Esse of Dr. Don H. Catlin by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1083 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency MOTION to allow Amgen to Examine Dr. Don Catlin on Monday Setember 24, or in the Alternative to take Deposition De Bene Esse by Amgen Inc..(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1082 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 970 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing Evidence Regarding the Safety of Mircera filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1081 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt for documents returned on September 14, 2007, to Plaintiff Amgen, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1080 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. re 1079 Declaration of Filing with Clerks Office of Exhibits to the Declaration of Krista M. Rycroft in Support of Defendants' Offer of Proof Regarding the Testimony of Michael Sofocleous (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1079 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 1078 Brief Offer of Proof Regarding the Testimony of Michael Sofocleous (of Krista M. Rycroft) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1078 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Offer of Proof Regarding the Testimony of Michael Sofocleous. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1077 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Defendants' Bench Memorandum of Law on Admission of Mr. Sofocleouss Testimony In the Validity Phase. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1076 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt to Plaintiff Amgen, Inc. for documents received on September 13, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1075 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1055 Brief Roche's Response to Amgen's Bench Memorandum Regarding Publication Requirements for Section 102 Prior Art. (Fleming, Thomas) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2007 (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1074 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Amgen Inc.. Document received: Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions and Objections to Roche's Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions Concerning Source and Process Limitations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1073 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING EVIDENCE THAT WAS EXCLUDED AT THE VALIDITY PHASE OF THE TRIAL. (Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1072 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 1071 Brief of Daniel A. Curto in Support of Amgen's Bench Memorandum that it is Improper for Richard A. Flavell to Offer Opinionis that Restate Arguments Rejected by Grant of Summary Judgment that Claim 7 of the '349 Patent is Definite by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1071 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum that it is Improper for Richard A. Flavell to Offer Opinions that Restate Arguments Rejected by Grant of Summary Judgment that Claim 7 of the '349 Patent is Definite. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1070 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File A SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF AMGEN INC.S PROPOSED REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17: TO EXCLUDE ROCHE FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE TO CHALLENGE THE NON-OBVIOUSNESS OF THE DNA SEQUENCE ENCODING FOR HUMAN ERYTHROPOIETIN IN 1983 by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1069 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1068 Brief Of Daniel A. Curto in Support of Amgen's Bench Memorandum That it is Improper For Dr. Richard A. Flavell To Offer Opinions Based on his Improper Rejection of This Court's Claim Construction of the term "Human Erythropoietin" by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1068 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum That it is Improper For Dr. Richard A. Flavell To Offer Opinions Based on his Improper Rejection of This Court's Claim Construction of the Term "Human Erythropoietin". (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1067 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Omnibus Motion Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Admit Party Admissions and Previous Findings of Fact into Evidence by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1066 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Roche's Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Arguing that Examples in the Lin Specification Inherently Produce Human EPO with 165 Amino Acid Residues by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1065 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Roche's Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Arguing That Lin Described Human EPO With The 1-165 Amino Acid Residues of Fig. 6 by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1064 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Amgen Inc. re 1063 MOTION to Remove the "Confidential" Designation from the June 21, 2007 Deposition Transcript of Roche's Expert Dr. Thomas Kadesch Of Confidential Service (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1063 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Remove the "Confidential" Designation from the June 21, 2007 Deposition Transcript of Roche's Expert Dr. Thomas Kadesch by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2 - Confidential Exhibit Coversheet# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6, Part One# 7 Exhibit 6, Part Two)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1062 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 1061 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Grant of Summary Judgment of Infringement of '422 Claim 1 filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1061 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Grant of Summary Judgment of Infringement of '422 Claim 1 by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1060 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Bench Memorandum: The '008 Patent Claims Are Considered Solely for Purposes of Obviousness-Type Double Patenting and Are Not Prior Art for Obviousness Under 103. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1059 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Bench Memorandum that Later Admissions that the Structure of Recombinant EPO Is Identical to Prior Art Urinary EPO are Relevant and Admissible. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1058 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 1057 Response to Motion of James M. Fraser (leave to file granted 9/7/2007) by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1057 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion re 724 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Testimony from Amgen's Belatedly Disclosed Fact Witnesses (leave to file granted on 9/7/2007) filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1056 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Relevance of Dr. Baron and Dr. Goldwasser's Failure to Publish Their Work. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1055 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Publication Requirements for Section 102 Prior Art. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1# 2 Attachment 2# 3 Attachment 3# 4 Attachment 4# 5 Attachment 5)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1054 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. to 1042 Brief Thomas Fleming. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1053 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 1049 Brief of Kevin M. Flowers Regarding Genetics Insitute Doucments by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1052 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Thomas F. Fleming. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1051 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 1048 Brief, 1049 Brief of Aaron R. Hand in Support of Amgen Inc.'s Bench Memoranda Regarding the Authntication of January 11, 1984 Telex
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1050 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 1048 Brief, 1049 Brief of Cherie St. Jean in Support of Amgen Inc.'s Bench Memoranda Regarding The Authentication of January 11, 1984 Telex and January 16, 1984 Letter by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1049 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Authentication of January 16, 1984 Letter. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1047 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine To Preclude Amgen Inc. From Arguing That Process Limitations Distinguish the Prior Art From Its '933 Product-By-Process Claims by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1046 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine To Preclude Amgen Inc. From Arguing That Source Limitations Distinguish the Prior Art From Its '422 Patent Claim 1 by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1045 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Lloyd R. Day, Jr.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1044 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Inadmissibility of Documents Relevant Only To Allegations Of Inequitable Conduct That Were Not Plead By Roche. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1043 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Excluding Evidence Regarding Amgen's Clinical Trial and Other Evidence that Roche Intends to Proffer During the Testimony of Dr. Spinowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1042 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Eliciting From Dr. Lin Evidence That Violates 35 USC Sec. 103 Statutory Prohibition. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1041 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Dr. Lin's Subjective Expectations as Irrelevant to Proper Obviousness Inquiry. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 878 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attachment 40DECLARATION re 876 MOTION in Limine No. 17: to Exclude Roche from Presenting Evidence to Challenge the Non-obviousness of the DNA Sequence Encoding for Human Erythropoietin in 1983, 877 Memorandum in Support of Motion, of William G. Gaede, III by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Errata 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15, Part One# 16 Exhibit 15, Part Two# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20# 22 Exhibit 21# 23 Exhibit 22# 24 Exhibit 23# 25 Exhibit 24# 26 Exhibit 25# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28, Part One# 29 Exhibit 28, Part Two# 30 Exhibit 29, Part One# 31 Exhibit 29, Part Two# 32 Exhibit 29, Part Three# 33 Exhibit 30# 34 Exhibit 31, Part One# 35 Exhibit 31, Part Two# 36 Exhibit 32# 37 Exhibit 33# 38 Exhibit 36# 39 Exhibit 37# 40 Coversheet to Confidential Exhibits)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1040 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding the Relevance and Admissibility of Genentech's 1986 PLA. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1039 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Leora Ben-Ami. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1038 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 1036 MOTION in Limine to Bind Amgen Inc. to Prior Admissions Relevant to Double Patenting (of Krista M. Rycroft) by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 4)# 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 4)# 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 4)# 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 4 of 4))(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1037 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 1036 MOTION in Limine to Bind Amgen Inc. to Prior Admissions Relevant to Double Patenting filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1036 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Bind Amgen Inc. to Prior Admissions Relevant to Double Patenting by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1035 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by Amgen Inc. to 1020 Brief, or Roche's Offer of Proof Regarding Claims of US Patent No. 5,441,868 and no. 5.618,698 That Invalidate Claims of US Patent NO. 5,547,933, No. 5,756,349, and No. 5,955,422 Regarding Obviousness-Type Double Patenting. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1034 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 1005 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Asserting that there Was a Restriction Requirement Separating the '008 Patent Claims From the Claims of the '868 and '698 Patents filed by Amgen Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1033 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 965 Emergency MOTION For an Order Precluding Roche from Arguing that the '933, '422 and '349 Patent Claims are Invalid for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting Over the '868 and '698 Patent Claims (leave to file granted on September 10, 2007) filed by Amgen Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1032 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 931 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing into Evidence or Referencing to the Jury: (1) The September 30, 1985 Amgen/Ortho Product License Agreement, and (2) Evidence Concerning Licensing of the Patents-In-Suit MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Introducing into Evidence or Referencing to the Jury: (1) The September 30, 1985 Amgen/Ortho Product License Agreement, and (2) Evidence Concerning Licensing of the Patents-In-Suit (Leave to File Granted on September 10, 2007) filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1031 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Amgen Inc. Bench Memorandum Regarding Fritsch Deposition Testimony and Request for Corrective Instruction. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A# 2 Attachment B# 3 Attachment C)(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1030 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Jury Instructions: Product-By-Process Claims))(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1029 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 1028 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Arguing that the Goldwasser Clinical Study Is Not Prior Art filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1028 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Arguing that the Goldwasser Clinical Study Is Not Prior Art by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1027 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 1026 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Using Alleged Claim Features to Distinguish Prior Art when those Claim Features were Not Proven to Establish Infringement filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1026 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Using Alleged Claim Features to Distinguish Prior Art when those Claim Features were Not Proven to Establish Infringement by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc..(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1025 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 1009 MOTION in Limine No. 25: Exclude Deposition Testimony From A Prior Litigation of Takaji Miyake, A Non-Party Witness Whom Roche Did Not Previously Disclose filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1024 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. (Addition to Bench Memorandum Regarding Relevance and Admissibility of Genentech's PLA). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1023 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Leora Ben-Ami. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1022 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Defendants' Objections to the Court's September 7, 2007 Order That the Issue of Obviousness-Type Double Patenting is a Matter of Law that it is Not to be Presented to the Jury. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1021 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. To The Court's Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1020 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Offer Of Proof Regarding Claims Of U.S. Patent No. 5,441,868 And No. 5,618,698 That Invalidate Claims Of U.S. Patent No. 5,547,933, No. 5,756,349, And No. 5,955,422 Regarding Obviousness-Type Double Patenting. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1019 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Roche's Motion In Limine to Preclude Amgen From Introducing Into Evidence or Referencing to the Jury: 1) the September 30, 1985 Amgen/Ortho Product License Agreement, and 2) Evidence Concerning Licensing of the Patents-In-Suit by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1018 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Questionnaire submitted to prospective jurors prior to the start of empanelment. (Smith, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1017 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt to Defendants Roche for Document(s) received on September 6, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1016 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. Roche's Bench Memorandum Regarding Excluding from the Courtroom Expert Witnesses who Will be Opening with Respect to the Testimony of Other Witnesses. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1015 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Its Emergency Motion for Order Precluding Roche from Arguing That the '933, '422 and '349 Patent Claims are Invalid for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting Over the '868 and "698 Patent Claims by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amgen's [Proposed] Reply)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1014 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PRECLUDING ROCHE FROM ARGUING THAT THE 933, 422 AND 349 PATENTENT CLAIMS ARE INVALID FOR OBVIOUSNESS-TYPE DOUBLE PATENTING OVER THE 868 AND 698 PATENT CLAIMS by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (proposed reply))(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1013 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Amgen Inc. of Intent to Present Live Testimony of Dr. Strickland in Response to Roche's Deposition Designations (Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1012 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling with Respect to One Deposition Designation for Joseph M. Baron by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 992
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 991
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 990
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 989
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 988
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 986
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 985
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 984
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 983
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 982
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 981
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 979
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 978
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 977
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 976
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 975
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 974
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 973
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 972
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 971
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 970
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 968
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 967
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 965
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 964
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 962
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 961
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 960
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 959
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 958
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 956 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Craig H. Casebeer. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A (copies of slides referenced in letter))(Rich, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 955 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MEMORANDUM in Support re 936 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Objecting to Deposition Designations in Lieu of Live Testimony filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Brooks, Kregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 954 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Roche's Motion in Limine to Preclude Amgen from Offering Expert Opinions Based on Statements Made During Prior Legal Proceedings by Witnesses Who Will Not Testify at Trial in this Case by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply))(Rizzo, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 953 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 889 MOTION in Limine No. 18: Preclude Roche From Referring to Government Funding of Dr. Goldwasser's Research and From Arguing that Dr. Goldwasser's Research Should Not Have Been Shared With Amgen filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Brooks, Kregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 952 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Their Motion In Limine to Invoke Issue Preclusion as to Findings From Prior Litigation by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply))(Murphy, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 951 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to 918 Proposed Document(s) submitted by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc. - Defendants' Objections to Amgen's Proposed Pre-Trial Jury Instructions. (Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 950 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 847 MOTION in Limine No. 12: Exclude Reference to Amgen's "Monopoly" and the Patents-in-Suit as Limiting Consumer Choice filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Brooks, Kregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 949 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 841 MOTION in Limine No. 8: Exclude Roche from Relying on Comparisons Between Roche's PEG-EPO Product and Amgen's ARANESP Product filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Brooks, Kregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 948 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Their Motion In Limine to Preclude Amgen from Confusing the Jury with Statements Made in Earlier Foreign Proceedings by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply))(Seluga, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 947 Filed: 9/2/2007, Entered: 9/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Document(s) submitted by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. Document received: Defendants' Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Huston, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 946 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 891 MOTION in Limine No. 21: Exclude Introduction of Opinions or Supporting Evidence Not Previously Identified in Expert Reports filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 945 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 843 MOTION in Limine No. 9: Exclude the Testimony of Roche's Experts Kadesch and Lowe Regarding Protein Sequencing Due to Their Lack of Expertise filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 944 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 854 MOTION in Limine No. 10: Exclude Evidence Related to Roche's Antitrust Allegations filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 943 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 839 MOTION in Limine No. 6: Exclude Reference to Amgen's Request for Injunctive Relief filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 942 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 828 MOTION in Limine No. 4: Exclude Genetech's PLA Filing [Roche Trial Exh. No. 1072] Because it is not Prior Art filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 941 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 940 Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude References to Belatedly Produced Documents and Experiments from Barber by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 940 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 830 MOTION in Limine No. 3: Exclude References to Belatedly Produced Documents and Experiments from Barber filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 938 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 824 MOTION in Limine No. 1: Exclude Roche from Referring to Its Own Patent on Pegylated Erythropoietin filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Fleming, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 937 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 936 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Objecting to Deposition Designations in Lieu of Live Testimony filed by F. Hoffmann-LaRoche LTD, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Hoffmann LaRoche Inc.. (Toms, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?