Jalbert v. Richard et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-10582
District Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Craig R. Jalbert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KENNETH SCOTT LEONETTI +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 kleonetti@foleyhoag.com
No Logo Safo, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul D. Moore +1 617 289 9230 +1 617 289 9201 pdmoore@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bronwyn L. Roberts +1 857 488 4200 +1 857 488 4201 blroberts@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Hertz +1 617 788 0412 Jennifer.L.Hertz@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Diane Richard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
No Logo Wayne Richard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Craig R. Jalbert (Leonetti, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S. Leonetti on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert (Leonetti, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION to Substitute Party Craig R. Jalbert, Liquidating Trustee, as Plaintiff by Safo, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roberts, Bronwyn) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2006 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth). (Entered: 07/12/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None
        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to June 23, 2006 to File Answer Assented-to by Wayne Richard, Diane Richard.(Carpenter, M.) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 24, 2006 to File Answer with c/s by Wayne Richard, Diane Richard.(Carpenter, M.) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Wayne Richard. Wayne Richard served on 4/4/2006, answer due 4/24/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Wayne Richard. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 04/14/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Safo, L.L.C.. Diane Richard served on 4/4/2006, answer due 4/24/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Safo, L.L.C.. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 04/14/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against Wayne Richard, Diane Richard Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 71477, filed by Safo, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Category Sheet)(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 161 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?