Monahan v. Romney et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-10921
District Judge Nancy Gertner, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William P. Monahan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Hayes +1 617 523 8773 +1 617 523 8510 ppsi1998@aol.com
v.
No Logo Eric Fehrnstrom, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G. Jones +1 617 951 7564 +1 617 951 7050 robert.jones@ropesgray.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Nicholas Tzitzon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G. Jones +1 617 951 7564 +1 617 951 7050 robert.jones@ropesgray.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Shawn Feddeman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G. Jones +1 617 951 7564 +1 617 951 7050 robert.jones@ropesgray.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Spencer Zwick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G. Jones +1 617 951 7564 +1 617 951 7050 robert.jones@ropesgray.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Willard Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Connolly +6177272 200 ext3309 +1 617 727 3118 Rosemary.Connolly@ago.state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G. Jones +1 617 951 7564 +1 617 951 7050 robert.jones@ropesgray.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Remark
Letter from the Supreme Court of the United States, the Court today entered the following order in the above-entitled case: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 USCA Mandate
    MANDATE of USCA as to 62 Notice of Appeal, filed by William P Monahan. Appeal 62 Terminated. Mandate issued in the USCA 11/29/2010 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 USCA Judgment
      USCA Judgment as to 62 Notice of Appeal, filed by William P Monahan. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The judgment of the district court is affirmed. Judgment issued in the USCA 11/3/2010 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 USCA Opinion
        OPINION of USCA No. 09-2458. Opinion issued in the USCA 11/3/2010 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: # 1 Main Document) (Ramos, Jeanette). (Entered: 11/04/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
          Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 62 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/24/2009, Entered: 10/24/2009 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by William P Monahan as to 58 Final Judgment. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 01010000000002637451 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 11/13/2009. (Hayes, Richard) Modified on 10/26/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2009: # 1 certificate of service) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 10/24/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Opposition to Motion
              Opposition re 59 First MOTION for New Trial filed by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support re 59 First MOTION for New Trial. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Motion for New Trial
                  First MOTION for New Trial by William P Monahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support)(Hayes, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 58 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Judgment*Court Filing
                    Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiff.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 ~Notice (other)
                      [Proposed] Final Judgment by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick re 56 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law (Jones, Robert) Modified on 9/11/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                        Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The defendants are directed to provide the Court with a form of judgment by September 10, 2009.(GAM) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Brief
                          BRIEF by Willard Mitt Romney Regarding the Availability of Adequate Post-Deprivation Process and Qualified Immunity. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jones, Robert) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Response
                            Response by William P Monahan. (Hayes, Richard) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                Transcript of Bench Trial Day Four held on April 28, 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 5/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                  Transcript of Bench Trial Day Three held on April 23, 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 5/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                    Transcript of Bench Trial Day Two held on April 22, 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 5/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      Transcript of Bench Trial Day One held on April 21, 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 5/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) ( (Scalfani, Deborah). (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick.(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 47 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Exhibit
                                          Amended Exhibit List by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick.. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                                            REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider.(Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick Pursuant to Local Rule 43.1 (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Collings for Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                  MOTION in Limine To Exclude Calculation of Purported Damages by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan Diederich)(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert Jones. (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE of ADR Conference: Mediation Hearing set for 4/16/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. All parties and trial counsel are REQUIRED to attend and must have full binding settlement authority, leave of Court is required for any exceptions. All confidential meditation briefs are to be submitted to the Court via facsimile at (617) 204-5833 no later than TWO BUSINESS DAYS prior to the hearing. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                        PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by William P Monahan, Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Trial Brief
                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by all defendants. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Objection
                                                            Objection to 37 Exhibit List by William P Monahan, Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Basil, Kriss) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Exhibit
                                                              Plaintiff Exhibit list Exhibit List by William P Monahan.. (Hayes, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Witness List
                                                                Defendants' Witness List and Exhibit List by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT of counsel regarding discovery schedule. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert G. Jones. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) to Judge Gertner filed by Robert Jones, Esq. re: status of case. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Attorney Richard J. Hayes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on September 25, 2007 before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-2346 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                            JOINT STATEMENT of counsel re: Proposed Discovery and Briefing Schedule. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Supplemental Opposition re 20 MOTION for Limited Admission : Limit Appearances of Bryan R. Diederich and Robert G. Jones filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by all defendants. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Limit Appearances by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William P Monahan. (Hayes, Richard) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Opposition re 19 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Bryan R. Diederich filed by all defendants. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply)(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Bryan R. Diederich in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Limited Admission : Limit Appearances of Bryan R. Diederich and Robert G. Jones filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Opposition re 20 MOTION for Limited Admission : Limit Appearances of Bryan R. Diederich and Robert G. Jones filed by all defendants. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William P Monahan. (Hayes, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                MOTION for Limited Admission : Limit Appearances of Bryan R. Diederich and Robert G. Jones by William P Monahan.(Hayes, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Declaration of Bryan R. Diederich by William P Monahan.(Hayes, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Rosemary Connolly (Connolly, Rosemary) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/22/2007 to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss by William P Monahan.(Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Answer
                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick.(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9)(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick.(Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Jones on behalf of all defendants (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time by William P Monahan, Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick. (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan R. Diederich on behalf of all defendants (Diederich, Bryan) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Shawn Feddeman waiver sent on 9/15/2006, answer due 11/14/2006. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Eric Fehrnstrom waiver sent on 9/15/2006, answer due 11/14/2006. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nicholas Tzitzon waiver sent on 9/15/2006, answer due 11/14/2006. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Willard Mitt Romney waiver sent on 9/15/2006, answer due 11/14/2006. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Spencer Zwick waiver sent on 9/15/2006, answer due 11/14/2006. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemary Connolly on behalf of Willard Mitt Romney (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemary Connolly on behalf of Willard Mitt Romney (Connolly, Rosemary) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Notice regarding mandatory use of ECF
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE issued to Attorney Richard J. Hayes regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Willard Mitt Romney, Eric Fehrnstrom, Nicholas Tzitzon, Shawn Feddeman, Spencer Zwick Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 72699, filed by William P Monahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?