Liu v. Bush et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-11471
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Quinsheng Liu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Liu, Quinsheng

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Quinsheng Liu +1 508 208 2268
v.
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Governor Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest Sarason +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 Ernest.Sarason@jud.state.ma.us
No Logo Henry M. Paulson, Defendant
No Logo John C. Dugan, Defendant
No Logo Lt. Governor Kerry Healey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest Sarason +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 Ernest.Sarason@jud.state.ma.us
No Logo Massachusetts Commission Against Discrimination, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest Sarason +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 Ernest.Sarason@jud.state.ma.us
No Logo Melinda Goodnight, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "President George W. Bush"
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Secretary of State Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo Thomas Reilly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest Sarason +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 Ernest.Sarason@jud.state.ma.us
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Alberto +1 617 223 9976
Citation JS 44 Sec. IV - no matching citation currently in database
Nature of Suit 810 - Selective Service
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss by Quinsheng Liu.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
    MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss by Quinsheng Liu.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
      Letter/request (non-motion) from Qingsheng Liu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
        Letter/request (non-motion) from Qingsheng Liu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Letter to Kerry Healey)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
          MOTION (Letter) for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Vacate Notice of Default, by Quinsheng Liu.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
            Opposition re 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Condoleezza Rice, 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to George W. Bush, 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by all defendants. (Alberto, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 MOTION to Vacate Notice of Default filed by all defendants. (Alberto, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION to Vacate Notice of Default by United States of America.(Alberto, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by all defendants. (Alberto, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by United States of America.(Alberto, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                      NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Melinda Goodnight, United States of America, George W. Bush, Condoleezza Rice, Henry M. Paulson, and John C. Dugan. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                        EXHIBIT to re 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Condoleezza Rice, 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to George W. Bush, 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by Quinsheng Liu. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by Quinsheng Liu.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Default Judgment as to Condoleezza Rice by Quinsheng Liu.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Default Judgment as to George W. Bush by Quinsheng Liu.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thomas Reilly,, Mitt Romney,, Kerry Healey,, Massachusetts Commission Against Discrimination, (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION. (Sarason, Ernest) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Massachusetts Commission Against Discrimination, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, Kerry Healey. (Sarason, Ernest) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Massachusetts Commission Against Discrimination, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, Kerry Healey.(Sarason, Ernest) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Alberto on behalf of United States of America (Alberto, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Massachusetts Commission Against Discrimination served by certified mail on 8/23/2006, answer due 9/12/2006. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Henry M. Paulson served by certified mail on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Mitt Romney served by certified mail on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas Reilly served by certified mail on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Kerry Healey served by certified mail on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed George W. Bush served by certified mail on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Condoleezza Rice served by certified mail on 8/23/2006, answer due 9/12/2006. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Melinda Goodnight served by certified mail on 8/23/2006, answer due 9/12/2006. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against Melinda Goodnight, Massachusetts Commission Against Discrimination, George W. Bush, Condoleezza Rice, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, Kerry Healey, Henry M. Paulson, John C. Dugan Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 74524, filed by Quinsheng Liu. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 226 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?