Nna et al v. WABTEC Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-11950
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 5:25 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Glory N Nna, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman & Sugarman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Casby +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 rcasby@sugarman.com
TERMINATED: 08/13/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel Thomas Pauling +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 tpauling@sugarman.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi M Petrucelli +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 jpetrucelli@sugarman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Sugarman +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 nsugarman@sugarman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Zimmermann +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 bzimmermann@sugarman.com
No Logo Jory S. Mason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman & Sugarman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Casby +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 rcasby@sugarman.com
TERMINATED: 08/13/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel Thomas Pauling +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 tpauling@sugarman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Sugarman +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 nsugarman@sugarman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Zimmermann +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 bzimmermann@sugarman.com
No Logo Michael P. Mason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman & Sugarman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Casby +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 rcasby@sugarman.com
TERMINATED: 08/13/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel Thomas Pauling +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 tpauling@sugarman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Sugarman +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 nsugarman@sugarman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Zimmermann +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 bzimmermann@sugarman.com
No Logo Peter W. Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman & Sugarman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Casby +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 rcasby@sugarman.com
TERMINATED: 08/13/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel Thomas Pauling +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 tpauling@sugarman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Sugarman +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 nsugarman@sugarman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Zimmermann +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 bzimmermann@sugarman.com
v.
No Logo American Standard, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler, Cohen, Harvey, Wakeman & Guekguezian LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel W. Bell +1 617 423 6674 +1 617 423 7152 gbell@adlercohen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Bernard Guekguezian +1 617 423 6674 +1 617 423 7152 bguekguezian@adlercohen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deirdre Kirby Lydon +1 617 423 6674 +1 617 423 7152 dlydon@adlercohen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maura Kathleen Monaghan +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 mkmonaghan@debvoise.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman & Sugarman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Sugarman +1 617 542 1000 +1 617 542 1359 nsugarman@sugarman.com
No Logo Bombardier Transit Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
Space Carla C. Ward +1 617 460 9633 +1 617 423 6917
No Logo Wabtec Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Casner & Edwards, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. Higgins +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 higgins@casneredwards.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT A. MURPHY +1 617 426 5900 +MDL TER MINATED rmurphy@casneredwards.com
Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by The McCormack Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy M. Soisson +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 asoisson@mccormackfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by American Standard, Inc.. (Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. Approving Petition for Approval of Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(York, Steve) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference to January 4, 2010 or any date thereafter by American Standard, Inc..(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee re 96 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. (Petrucelli, Jodi) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee re 97 Notice of Appearance. (Casby, Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee re 98 Notice of Appearance. (Zimmermann, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin R. Zimmermann on behalf of Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee (Zimmermann, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Casby on behalf of Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee (Casby, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jodi M Petrucelli (Petrucelli, Jodi) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi M Petrucelli on behalf of Glory N Nna (Petrucelli, Jodi) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Sugarman on behalf of Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee, American Standard, Inc. (Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Neil Sugarman of G. Thomas Pauling (Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 90 Amended Complaint by American Standard, Inc..(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
                            Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Standard, Inc., filed by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee.(Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to exclude expert testimony. The Plaintiffs are directed to file a Fourth Amended Complaint on or before May 15, 2009. (Woodlock, Douglas) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                REPLY Memorandum of law in further support to 74 MOTION Exclude Expert Testimony filed by American Standard, Inc.. (Monaghan, Maura) Modified text on 2/13/2009 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion to Exclude Testimony by American Standard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Monaghan, Maura) Modified to remove duplicate text on 1/23/2009 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to Response to 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Standard, Inc.. (Monaghan, Maura) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL: Pretrial Conference set for 12/29/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock.(Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for a Date Certain for a Hearing to Argue its Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Exclude Testimony by American Standard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Maura Kathleen Monaghan by American Standard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee re 80 Opposition to Motion, Exclude Expert Testimony. (Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED DOCUMENT by American Standard, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Bell, Gabriel)Related document 28 . (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                Opposition re 74 MOTION Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Sugarman, Neil) Modified to remove duplicate text on 12/18/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Facts filed by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee. (Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Neil Sugarman in Opposition re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Sugarman, Neil) Modified to remove duplicate text on 12/18/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Opposition re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee. (Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT re 74 MOTION Exclude Expert Testimony by American Standard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 74 MOTION Exclude Expert Testimony filed by American Standard, Inc.. (Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION Exclude Expert Testimony by American Standard, Inc..(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB)(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                STATEMENT of facts re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Standard, Inc.. (Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Standard, Inc..(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by American Standard, Inc..(Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee.(Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Deirdre Kirby Lydon on behalf of American Standard, Inc. (Lydon, Deirdre) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: PROTECTIVE ORDER entered 64 regarding providing copies of documents to counsel. SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS.(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Proposed Document(s) submitted by American Standard, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Protective Order. (Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 40 Motion for Summary Judgment (Woodlock, Douglas) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from American Standard, Inc. for Hearing on American Standard, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents From The Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE issued to Attorney Deirdre Kirby Lydon regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Deirdre Kirby Lydon on behalf of American Standard, Inc. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority filed by American Standard, Inc.. (Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Opposition of Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority To Motion to Compel by American Standard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Amy M. Soisson on behalf of Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority (Soisson, Amy) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              Opposition re 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Soisson, Amy) (Entered: 11/23/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority by American Standard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WABTEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Memorandum# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Memorandum)(Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Supplemental Opposition re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glory N Nna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Errata Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by American Standard, Inc.. (Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Plaintiffs Consent for Defendant American Standard, Inc. to Amend its Answer to Second Amended Complaint by American Standard, Inc.. (Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER:Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/19/2008. Dispositive Motions or Status Report due by 12/1/2008. Further Status/Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock.(Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WABTEC Corporation. (Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by WABTEC Corporation.(Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of G. Thomas Pauling, Esq. in Opposition re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Opposition re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Plaintiffs filed by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee. (Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal Bombardier Transit Corporation Only (Assented To) by Glory N Nna. (Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 37 MOTION to Compel Wabtec Corporation for Production filed by WABTEC Corporation. (Murphy, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Opposition re 36 MOTION to Amend Second Amended Complaint filed by WABTEC Corporation. (Murphy, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of David M. Seitz in Support re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WABTEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2 (part 1)# 3 Exhibit 2 (part 2)# 4 Exhibit 3)(Murphy, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WABTEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Murphy, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by WABTEC Corporation.(Murphy, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT of counsel on Case Status and Proposed Discovery Schedule. (Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 37 MOTION to Compel Wabtec Corporation for Production filed by Glory N Nna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Photograph# 2 Exhibit Response# 3 Exhibit Letter and Proposal)(Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Wabtec Corporation for Production by Glory N Nna.(Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Second Amended Complaint by Glory N Nna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint)(Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) by American Standard, Inc..(Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against WABTEC Corporation, Bombardier Transit Corporation, American Standard, Inc. , filed by Glory N Nna, Michael P. Mason, Jory S. Mason, Peter W. Lee.(Nici, Richard) Modified on 4/25/2007 (Nici, Richard). Modified to add correct document on 2/4/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Second Amended Complaint by WABTEC Corporation.(Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION to Amend Complaint by Glory N Nna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by American Standard, Inc..(Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by A. Bernard Guekguezian on behalf of American Standard, Inc. (Guekguezian, A.) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by American Standard, Inc..(Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Standard, Inc.. (Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Standard, Inc..(Bell, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed (Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Carla C. Ward on behalf of Bombardier Transit Corporation (Ward, Carla) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/26/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Discovery to be completed by 5/15/2007. Motions due by 6/15/2007. Status Report due 6/19/07. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by all plaintiffs.(Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Bombardier Transit Corporation.(Kirpalani, Maynard) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by WABTEC Corporation.(Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend 1 Notice of Removal, Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Defendant by Glory N Nna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Glory N Nna. WABTEC Corporation served on 10/4/2006, answer due 10/24/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Glory N Nna. (Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Glory N Nna. Bombardier Transit Corporation served on 10/4/2006, answer due 10/24/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Glory N Nna. (Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Bombardier Transit Corporation.(Kirpalani, Maynard) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATEMENT of counsel. (Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by WABTEC Corporation.(Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Peter W. Lee.(Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Michael P. Mason.(Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Glory N Nna.(Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by WABTEC Corporation - Consent to Remove (Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Higgins on behalf of WABTEC Corporation (Higgins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Document disclosure by all plaintiffs.(Sugarman, Neil) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WABTEC Corporation. (Murphy, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WABTEC Corporation.(Murphy, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATE COURT Record. (Kirpalani, Maynard) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Bombardier Transit Corporation.(Kirpalani, Maynard) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Thomas Pauling on behalf of all plaintiffs (Pauling, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bombardier Transit Corporation. (Nici, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WABTEC Corporation, Bonbardier Transit Corporation from Middlesex Superior Court, case number 06-3351. $ 350, receipt number 75979, filed by WABTEC Corporation, Bonbardier Transit Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nici, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?