Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:07-cv-40015
District Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Butters, Brazilian & Small LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Butters +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 butters@buttersbrazilian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Denner Pellegrino, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Kimberly Depietri, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Depietri

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Butters +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 butters@buttersbrazilian.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas J. Fiorillo

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Butters +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 butters@buttersbrazilian.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Robert Depietri, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Depietri

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Butters +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 butters@buttersbrazilian.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Butters, Brazilian & Small LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Butters +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 butters@buttersbrazilian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Denner Pellegrino, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DeOrchis Hillenbrand Wiener & O'Brien LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony M. Traini +1 401 621 4700 +1 401 621 5888 amt@atrainilaw.com
No Logo LBM Financial, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer, Antonellis, Jachowicz & Haranas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evans J. Carter +1 508 620 0140 +1 508 875 7728 ecarter@hkwg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Riemer & Braunstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Ganz +1 617 523 9000 +1 617 880 3456 jganz@riemerlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alissa L. Poynor +1 617 880 3416 +1 617 880 3456 apoynor@riemerlaw.com
No Logo Marcello Mallegni, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer, Antonellis, Jachowicz & Haranas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evans J. Carter +1 508 620 0140 +1 508 875 7728 ecarter@hkwg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Riemer & Braunstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Ganz +1 617 523 9000 +1 617 880 3456 jganz@riemerlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alissa L. Poynor +1 617 880 3416 +1 617 880 3456 apoynor@riemerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Gamewell Realty, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/04/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip F. Coppinger +1 617 570 1000 +2278 227 227 8591

Toggle Switch Represented by Seder & Chandler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/04/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt L. Binder +1 508 757 7721 +1 508 798 1863 kbinder@sederlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Robert Seder +1 508 757 7721 +1 508 831 0955 jrseder@sederlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Todd & Weld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian Crawford +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 icrawford@toddweld.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Rich +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 drich@toddweld.com
No Logo LBM Financial, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer, Antonellis, Jachowicz & Haranas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evans J. Carter +1 508 620 0140 +1 508 875 7728 ecarter@hkwg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Riemer & Braunstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Ganz +1 617 523 9000 +1 617 880 3456 jganz@riemerlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alissa L. Poynor +1 617 880 3416 +1 617 880 3456 apoynor@riemerlaw.com
No Logo Marcello Mallegni, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer, Antonellis, Jachowicz & Haranas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evans J. Carter +1 508 620 0140 +1 508 875 7728 ecarter@hkwg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Riemer & Braunstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Ganz +1 617 523 9000 +1 617 880 3456 jganz@riemerlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alissa L. Poynor +1 617 880 3416 +1 617 880 3456 apoynor@riemerlaw.com
No Logo Michael Norris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Cohen +1 617 951 4703 +1 617 951 2125 scohen@peabodyarnold.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Markowski +1 617 951 2010 +1 617 235 3555 jmarkowski@peabodyarnold.com
No Logo Wolfpen Financial, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seder & Chandler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin C. McGee +1 508 757 7721 +1 508 831 0955 kmcgee@sederlaw.com
No Logo Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Denner Pellegrino, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Kimberly Depietri, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Denner Pellegrino, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas J. Fiorillo

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Robert Depietri, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Denner Pellegrino, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Denner Pellegrino, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DeOrchis Hillenbrand Wiener & O'Brien LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony M. Traini +1 401 621 4700 +1 401 621 5888 amt@atrainilaw.com
No Logo Tracy Krowel, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracy Krowel

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
No Logo Commerce Bank And Trust Company, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain, Dearborn & Whiting, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. O'Brien, Jr. +1 508 756 2423 +1 508 755 6640 obrien@mountaindearborn.com
No Logo David G. Massad, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Todd & Weld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian Crawford +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 icrawford@toddweld.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Rich +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 drich@toddweld.com
No Logo Pamela Massad, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Todd & Weld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian Crawford +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 icrawford@toddweld.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Rich +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 drich@toddweld.com
No Logo Tracy Krowel, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracy Krowel

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Butters +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 butters@buttersbrazilian.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Andrews, Jr. +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 pandrews@dennerpellegrino.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 rsinsheimer@dennerpellegrino.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (185) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT and Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by LBM Financial. (Coppinger, Philip) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 189 Motion to Dismiss. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 192 MOTION for Attorney Fees In Accordance With Court's August 24, 2010 Order filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rich, David) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Attorney Fees In Accordance With Court's August 24, 2010 Order by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad.(Rich, David) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
            Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 173 MOTION for Sanctions of Dismissal in Accordance With Fed.R.Civ.P.37 for Plaintiff's Willful and Intentional Violation of The Court's June 2, 2010 Discovery Order filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Rich, David) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
              Opposition re 189 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Rich, David) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Tracy Krowel.(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                  STATUS REPORT by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E)(Rich, David) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                    Opposition re 183 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Add Party Defendants filed by Commerce Bank and Trust Company. (O'Brien, James) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                      Opposition re 183 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Add Party Defendants and to Consolidate filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF EVANS J. CARTER, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Carter, Evans) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                        Opposition re 183 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rich, David) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LBM Financial (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Carter, Evans) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and to add party defendants by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Tracy Krowel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                              Opposition re 181 MOTION for Extension of Time to 21 Days to to employ corporate counsel filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Rich, David) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Extension of Time for 21 Days to employ corporate counsel by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Tracy Krowel, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc., c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                  MOTION to Compel Interrogatories by Commerce Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(O'Brien, James) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                    Additional MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 173 MOTION for Sanctions of Dismissal in Accordance With Fed.R.Civ.P.37 for Plaintiff's Willful and Intentional Violation of The Court's June 2, 2010 Discovery Order filed by Robert Depietri, Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                      Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                        Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 173 MOTION for Sanctions of Dismissal in Accordance With Fed.R.Civ.P.37 for Plaintiff's Willful and Intentional Violation of The Court's June 2, 2010 Discovery Order filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A Part 1, # 2 Ex. A. Part 2, # 3 Ex. B Part 1, # 4 Ex. B Part 2, # 5 Ex. C)(Rich, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/7/2010) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/7/2010) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/7/2010) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 173 MOTION for Sanctions of Dismissal in Accordance With Fed.R.Civ.P.37 for Plaintiff's Willful and Intentional Violation of The Court's June 2, 2010 Discovery Order filed by Robert Depietri, Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.1 - F)(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                            SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Tracy Krowel and Status Report by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Carter, Evans) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                              MOTION for Sanctions of Dismissal in Accordance With Fed.R.Civ.P.37 for Plaintiff's Willful and Intentional Violation of The Court's June 2, 2010 Discovery Order by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad.(Rich, David) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered on Defendants' David Massad, Pamela Massad and Gamewell Realty's Inc.'s Motion to Compel Tracey Krowel to Appear for Deposition and For Sanctions. Granting 166 Motion to Compel ; reserving ruling on 166 Motion for Sanctions (Collins, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered granting 158 Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Discovery Responses; taking under advisement 158 Motion for Fees And Costs (Collins, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Return receipt received for mail sent to Robert Depietri Delivered on 5/29/10. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/18/2010 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                        SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Shrewsbury Street Development Company by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Carter, Evans) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Opposition re 160 MOTION to Bifurcate Pursuant to F.R.C.P. No. 42(b), 13(i) and 20(b) MOTION to Bifurcate Pursuant to F.R.C.P. No. 42(b), 13(i) and 20(b) filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Tracy Krowel, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                            MOTION to Compel Tracey Krowel to Appear for Deposition and for Sanctions by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rich, David). Added MOTION for Sanctions on 4/27/2010 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                              SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Tracy Krowel by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Carter, Evans) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Thomas J Butters (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. re 153 MOTION for Order filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 158 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Provide Discovery Responses and Request For An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Tracy Krowel, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Bifurcate Pursuant to F.R.C.P. No. 42(b), 13(i) and 20(b) by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Attachments: # 1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, # 2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER, # 3 LOCAL RULE 71 CERTIFICATE, # 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Carter, Evans) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Ian Crawford (Crawford, Ian) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                          MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Provide Discovery Responses and Request For An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs by Gamewell Realty, Inc., David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-7, # 3 Exhibit 8-13)(Rich, David). Added MOTION for Costs on 6/2/2010 (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Opposition re 153 MOTION for Order filed by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Butters, Thomas) Modified docket text on 3/12/2010 (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Interim MOTION For an Order Directing Plaintiffs Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Tracey Krowel, and Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. to Return Consideration Gien by LBM Financial, LLC in return for General Release by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Carter, Evans) Modified event type on 2/23/2010 (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 02/17/2010 by David G. Massad, Pamela Massad, Gamewell Realty, Inc..(Rich, David) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 122 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 125 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Ganz (with attached Certificate of Service) (Ganz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Evans J. Carter on behalf of LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni (Carter, Evans) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 144 Motion for Leave to File second amended compliant. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Opposition re 144 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Michael Norris. (Markowski, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/30/2009 to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to File Second Amended Complaint by Michael Norris.(Markowski, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 144 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Butters, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2009: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw 142 Summons Returned Executed by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Norris served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/29/2008. (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 135 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SHOULD NOT HAVE BEEN FILED UNTIL LEAVE OF COURT HAS BEEN GRANTED. COUNSEL WILL IN THE FUTURE FILE THIS AS AN ATTACHMENT TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE. REPLY to Response to 120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Michael Norris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Markowski, Jennifer) Modified on 12/4/2008 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Norris' Motion to Dismiss by Michael Norris.(Markowski, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION For Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Michael Norris.(Markowski, Jennifer) Modified on 11/28/2008 to correct event. (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas J. Fiorillo by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STATEMENT of facts Pursuant to Rule 56.1. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel, # 2 Exhibit A - C to Affidavit of Counsel, # 3 Exhibit D - H to Affidavit of Counsel, # 4 Exhibit I - K to Affidavit of Counsel, # 5 Exhibit L - U to Affidavit of Counsel, # 6 Exhibit V - AA to Affidavit of Counsel)(Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Opposition re 120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/18/08 to File Response/Reply as to 120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Opposition re 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/18/08 to File Response/Reply as to 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Counsel for LBM Financial, LLC and Marcello Mallegni re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc., 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C-D, # 3 Exhibit E-F, # 4 Exhibit G-H, # 5 Exhibit I-K, # 6 Exhibit L-M, # 7 Exhibit N-U, # 8 Exhibit V-FF, # 9 Exhibit GG-JJ, # 10 Exhibit KK-MM, # 11 Exhibit NN-TT)(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc., 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Kozik. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-G, # 3 Exhibit H-K, # 4 Exhibit L-M, # 5 Exhibit N-P, # 6 Exhibit Q-S, # 7 Exhibit T-U, # 8 Exhibit V, # 9 Exhibit W-X)(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc., 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Michael Norris, Esquire. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G, # 2 Exhibit H-K, # 3 Exhibit L-Q)(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc., 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Marcello Mallegni. (Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of facts re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. filed by LBM Financial, LLC and Marcello Mallegni. (Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni.(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of facts re 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni.(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Michael Norris. (Markowski, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Michael Norris.(Markowski, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Markowski on behalf of Michael Norris (Markowski, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E. Cohen on behalf of Michael Norris (Cohen, Susan) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Robert S. Sinsheimer and Denner Pellegrino LLP (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc of Disclosure Pursuant to LR 7.1 (Butters, Thomas) Modified on 8/29/2008 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Butters on behalf of Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Butters on behalf of Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Robert Sinsheimer in Support re 96 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. re 96 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Phase I by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni.(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 108 MOTION to Compel Response to Discovery Requests. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C, # 2 Exhibit D - E)(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Response to Discovery Requests by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni.(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Robert S. Sinsheimer in Opposition re 96 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 96 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rich, David) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw 102 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 96 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/14/2008 to File Response/Reply with Certificate of Service filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Ganz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/14/2008 to File Response/Reply by Nicholas J. Fiorillo.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Compliance with Initial Disclosure Requirements by David G. Massad, Pamela Massad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rich, David) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery (Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order) by David G. Massad, Pamela Massad, Gamewell Realty, Inc..(Crawford, Ian) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Commerce Bank and Trust Company.(O'Brien, James) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Commerce Bank and Trust Company.(O'Brien, James) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Counterclaim by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Correct 80 Answer to Counterclaim by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected motion)(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Status Conference held on April 9, 2008, before Judge Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at 508/929-3399. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Marcello Mallegni.(Ganz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by LBM Financial.(Ganz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by David G. Massad, Pamela Massad.(Rich, David) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Nicholas J. Fiorillo.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Counterclaim ANSWER to 78 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Robert Depietri.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2008: # 1 signed copy) (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/27/2008 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Phase 1 fact Discovery to be completed by 7/31/2008. Phase 1 dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2008.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint and Jury Deman d, COUNTERCLAIM against Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement to Answer and Exhibit A)(Ganz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by David G. Massad, Pamela Massad, Gamewell Realty, Inc..(Rich, David) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATEMENT RE: Scheduling Conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule) by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni, Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, David G. Massad, Pamela Massad, Commerce Bank and Trust Company, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc, Gamewell Realty, Inc..(Crawford, Ian) Modified the text on 5/5/2008, (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert S. Sinsheimer. (Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on March 14, 2008 before Judge Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 508/929-3399 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2008 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to claim preclusion filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert S. Sinsheimer. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Robert Depietri in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Robert Depietri. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 57 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Robert and Kimberly DePietri Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), 52 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Claims Asserted Against It, 54 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM in Further Support re 52 Motion to Dismiss filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rich, David) Modified on 3/3/2008 to correct document type and add linkage to document #52 rather than #66.(Costello2, Helen). (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by Gamewell Realty, Inc..(Rich, David) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas J. Fiorillo in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas J. Fiorillo in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Robert and Kimberly DePietri Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), 52 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Claims Asserted Against It, 54 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Robert and Kimberly DePietri Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), 52 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Claims Asserted Against It, 54 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment (Affidavits to Follow) filed by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Twenty (20) Pages by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 58 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 29, 2008 to File Response/Reply to Wolfpen Financial, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint by Commerce Bank and Trust Company.(O'Brien, James) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 57 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Wolfpen Financial, LLC. (McGee, Kevin) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Wolfpen Financial, LLC.(McGee, Kevin) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 29, 2008 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Robert Depietri, Kimberly Depietri, Erie Avenue Residential Realty Trust, Tracy Krowel, Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 54 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Affidavit Marcello Mallegni)(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni.(Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 52 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Claims Asserted Against It filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G - Part 1, # 8 Exhibit G - Part 2)(Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Claims Asserted Against It by Gamewell Realty, Inc..(Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint Pages 21 through 37 by David G. Massad.(Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint Pages 1 through 20 by David G. Massad.(Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint Pages 21 through 36 by Pamela Massad.(Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint Pages 1 thru 20 by Pamela Massad.(Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Robert and Kimberly DePietri Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Pamela Massad. (Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Robert and Kimberly DePietri Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Pamela Massad.(Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Rich on behalf of David G. Massad, Pamela Massad (Rich, David) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Crawford on behalf of David G. Massad, Pamela Massad (Crawford, Ian) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Marcello Mallegni, Michael Norris, LBM Financial, Inc., Wolfpen Financial, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 25 Motion to Consolidate Cases and granting 28 Motion to Amend complaint. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Amend Complaint, 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 07-40015-FDS and 07-40122-FDS filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: # 1 LR5- A, LP v. Meadow Creek, LLC et al - Memo & Order (Suffolk Sup. Ct. 06-2804 BLS1))(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 12/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Ganz on behalf of Marcello Mallegni (Ganz, Jeffrey) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2007 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Ganz on behalf of LBM Financial (Ganz, Jeffrey) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2007 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Philip F. Coppinger and Kurt L. Binder as Counsel to Gamewell Realty, Inc. (Coppinger, Philip) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Marcello Mallegni in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Ganz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 28 MOTION to Amend Complaint Add Party Plaintiffs and Add Party Defendants filed by LBM Financial, Marcello Mallegni. (Ganz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa L. Poynor on behalf of Marcello Mallegni (Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa L. Poynor on behalf of LBM Financial (Poynor, Alissa) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 28 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Rich, David) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Rich on behalf of Gamewell Realty, Inc. (Rich, David) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Crawford on behalf of Gamewell Realty, Inc. (Crawford, Ian) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT re 28 against Gamewell Realty, Inc. et al., filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Andrews, Paul) Modified on 11/23/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend Complaint by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert Depietri)(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gamewell Realty, Inc., filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo.(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases 07-40015-FDS and 07-40122-FDS by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 25, 2007 to Amend Complaint by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Extension of Time. Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2007. Status Conference reset for 9/25/2007 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2007 to Amend Complaint filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Opposition re 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2007 to Amend Complaint filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc.. (Coppinger, Philip) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2007 to Amend Complaint filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc.. (Coppinger, Philip) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2007 to Amend Complaint by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DELETED, ATTORNEY ANDREWS FILED ON BEHALF OF ANOTHER ATTORNEY, EMAILED THE ATTORNEY AND ADVISED THEM OF THE ERROR. NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Andrews, Jr on behalf of Nicholas J. Fiorillo (Andrews, Paul) Modified on 8/20/2007 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Andrews, Jr on behalf of Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc (Andrews, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on July 20, 2007 before Judge Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 508/929-3399 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on May 15, 2007 before Judge Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 508/929-3399 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Shrewsbury Street Development Compnaies, Inc. as Plaintiff by Gamewell Realty, Inc..(Coppinger, Philip) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Traini, Anthony) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit a# 2 exhibit b part 1# 3 exhibit b part 2# 4 exhibit b part 3# 5 exhibit b part 4# 6 exhibit b part 5# 7 exhibit c)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Traini, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Traini on behalf of Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc (Traini, Anthony) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue case for 30 days by Nicholas J. Fiorillo.(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to by Thirty Days with certificate of service by Gamewell Realty, Inc..(Coppinger, Philip) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order Proceedings held on January 17, 2007 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 5 Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B through Exhibit E# 3 Exhibit F Part 1# 4 Exhibit F Part 2# 5 Exhibit F Part 3# 6 Exhibit F Part 4# 7 Exhibit G Through Exhibit L)(Seder, J.) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gamewell Realty, Inc.. (Seder, J.) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered granting 3 Motion for TRO (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Hassett, Kathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc.(Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Gamewell Realty, Inc. , filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo, Shrewsbury Street Development Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits # 2 Civil Cover Sheets)(Hassett, Kathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 329 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?