USA v. Johnson
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-10026
District Judge Mark L. Wolf, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Verna Johnson, Defendant (1)

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum from Probation regarding Transfer of case to the Low Intensity Caseload as to Verna Johnson. Requested action: None (Weisberg, Tracy) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
    Memorandum from Probation Office regarding Payment schedule as to Verna Johnson. Requested action: approval (Ball, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
      TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION as to Verna Johnson. Received certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from New Hampshire (Attachments: # 1 cpy of docket# 2 cpy of indictment# 3 cpy amdjgm# 4 copy of ledger)(Catino2, Theresa) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
        Certified copy of transfer order from District of New Hampshire as to Verna Johnson. (Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 106 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?