Knox et al v. M-Qube, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10124

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Settlement Order of Dismissal
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: 10/13/2008 Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Motion to Continue
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Declaration
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Stipulation
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Stipulation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Order Referring Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Stipulation
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Declaration
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?