Combe v. Continental Airlines, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10155
District Judge Reginald C. Lindsay, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 3:26 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Didier Combe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Gotz +1 617 424 9100 +1 617 424 9120 jgotz@kreindler.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Tarricone , +1 617 424 9100 +1 617 424 9120 Srusso@kreindler.com
v.
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle +1 617 241 3109 +1 617 241 5115 kguilfoyle@campbell-trial-lawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by trial-lawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION for Reconsideration of Procedural Order by Didier Combe.(Gotz, James) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for no sooner than 1/5/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial set for running trial list as of 2/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time in Extending the Remaining Scheduling Order Deadlines by 90 Days by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
            REPLY to Response to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II and V of the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on the Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Continental Airlines, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of the Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims)(Parkerson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II and V of the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Didier Combe. (Gotz, James) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT of Lesli O'Reilly in Support re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II and V of the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Contract of Carriage (Pages 1-22), # 2 Exhibit Contract of Carriage (pages 23-end))(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II and V of the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Related to Claims for Breach of Contract filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                      MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II and V of the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: ORDER entered. Confidentiality Order(York, Steve) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                          Assented to MOTION for Order to Enter a Confidentiality Order by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality Order)(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                            JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Didier Combe.(Gotz, James) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D) by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceScheduling Conference set for 10/15/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                    Opposition re 22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Texas and in Reponse to the Opposition of the Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Didier Combe. (Gotz, James) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Texas and in Reponse to the Opposition of the Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Continental Airlines, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Texas and in Response to the Opposition of the Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Didier Combe in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas filed by Didier Combe. (Gotz, James) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                          Opposition re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas filed by Didier Combe. (Gotz, James) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/30/07 to File Response/Reply as to 18 Affidavit in Support, 16 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, 17 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Didier Combe.(Gotz, James) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas of Edna Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Contract of Carriage pages 1-21# 2 Exhibit 1 -- Contract of Carriage pages 22-45# 3 Exhibit 2 -- PNR)(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Judicial Caseload Profile)(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 9, 2007 to respond to the Amended Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 27, 2007 to respond to plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                          Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Didier Combe. (Gotz, James) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                            First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Continental Airlines, Inc., filed by Didier Combe.(Gotz, James) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Tarricone on behalf of Didier Combe (Tarricone, Anthony) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Parkerson on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Parkerson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Campbell on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Campbell, Richard) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Continental Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. (Gotz, James) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Gotz on behalf of Didier Combe (Gotz, James) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                COMPLAINT against Continental Airlines, Inc., filed by Didier Combe. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Cover Form)(Gotz, James) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?