USA v. Items of asssorted jewelry
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-mj-00436

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Unseal Case as to Items of asssorted jewelryby USA. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
    Seizure Warrant Returned Executed on 1/25/07 in case as to Items of asssorted jewelry. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
      APPLICATION and Affidavit for Seizure Warrant as to Items of asssorted jewelry (Smith3, Dianne) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2007 (Smith3, Dianne). (Entered: 01/29/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 7 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?