Amerifirst Bank v. TJX Companies, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10169
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2019 at 11:55 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amerifirst Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Sheehan +1 212 594 5300
v.
Fifth Third Bancorp Fifth Third Bancorp, Defendant
Unknown Role, Vantiv, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
No Logo TJ Maxx, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian R. Blais +1 617 951 7186 +1 212 596 9090 bblais@ropesgray.com
No Logo Tjx Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian R. Blais +1 617 951 7186 +1 212 596 9090 bblais@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth C. Harrington +1 617 951 7226 +1 617 951 7050 seth.harrington@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Harlan Meal +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 235 0232 douglas.meal@ropesgray.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
Remark: cc of order from MDL Panel advising case will be transferred when order is received. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10162-WGY, 1:07-cv-10169-WGY, 1:07-cv-10209-WGY, 1:07-cv-10217-WGY(Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Amerifirst Bank re Change of Law Firm (Sheehan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Batchelder, Jr on behalf of TJX Companies, Inc. (Batchelder, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Seth C. Harrington on behalf of TJX Companies, Inc. (Harrington, Seth) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas H. Meal on behalf of TJX Companies, Inc. (Meal, Douglas) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank. (Carroll, James) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Carroll on behalf of Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank (Carroll, James) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TJX Companies, Inc.. (Blais, Brian) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on the pending motions before it relating to this case and other related actions, and if transfer for multidistrict litigation pretrial proceedings is granted, until a consolidated scheduling order is entered by the transferee court to File Answer re 1 Complaint by TJX Companies, Inc., TJ Maxx, Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Blais, Brian) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Amerifirst Bank. TJ Maxx served on 2/21/2007, answer due 3/13/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Amerifirst Bank. (Sheehan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Amerifirst Bank. TJX Companies, Inc. served on 2/21/2007, answer due 3/13/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Amerifirst Bank. (Sheehan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Amerifirst Bank. Fifth Third Bank served on 2/16/2007, answer due 3/8/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Amerifirst Bank. (Sheehan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                            Request for Service by Certified Mail, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against TJX Companies, Inc., TJ Maxx, Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank , filed by Amerifirst Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Category Sheet)(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?