Wawrzonek v. Gagliarducci et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-30016
District Judge Michael A Ponsor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joyce Wawrzonek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 10 Poplar Drive

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joyce Wawrzonek +1 413 596 3139 +1 413 519 2350
No Logo Sean Wawrzonek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 10 Poplar Drive

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Wawrzonek +1 413 596 3139
v.
No Logo Allison Spanos-Gearing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Bruce Ecker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Whitcomb +1 413 784 1240 +1 413 784 1244 Jim.Whitcomb@ago.state.ma.us
No Logo Cara Gelinas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Donna Goff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Donna Scanlon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Eileen Hagerty, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kotin, Crabtree & Strong, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie F. Mercier +1 617 227 7031 +1 617 367 2988 mmercier@kcslegal.com
No Logo Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Kotin, Crabtree & Strong, LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kotin, Crabtree & Strong, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie F. Mercier +1 617 227 7031 +1 617 367 2988 mmercier@kcslegal.com
No Logo Lawrence Kotin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kotin, Crabtree & Strong, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie F. Mercier +1 617 227 7031 +1 617 367 2988 mmercier@kcslegal.com
No Logo Leslie Dupre, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Lynne Kimball, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Paul Gagliarducci, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Raymond Oliver, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Whitcomb +1 413 784 1240 +1 413 784 1244 Jim.Whitcomb@ago.state.ma.us
No Logo Robert Crabtree, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kotin, Crabtree & Strong, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie F. Mercier +1 617 227 7031 +1 617 367 2988 mmercier@kcslegal.com
No Logo State of Massachusetts Department of Education, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Whitcomb +1 413 784 1240 +1 413 784 1244 Jim.Whitcomb@ago.state.ma.us
No Logo Susan Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo Thomas Philpott, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter L. Smith +1 413 525 1136 +1 413 525 4128 plsmithlawoffice@choiceonemail.com
No Logo William Strong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kotin, Crabtree & Strong, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie F. Mercier +1 617 227 7031 +1 617 367 2988 mmercier@kcslegal.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1218(2)
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
Opposition re 60 MOTION for Clarification re 59 Judgment, 57 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File MOTION to Vacate MOTION for Clarification re 59 Judgment, 57 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File filed by Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, State of Massachusetts Department of Education, Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Raymond Oliver, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing. (Whitcomb, James) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
    Pltf's MOTION for Clarification re [ 57 Order denying Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File, MOTION to Vacate 59 Judgment of Dismissal ( Responses due by 7/17/2008) by Joyce Wawrzonek filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Corrected certificate of service)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Paul Gagliarducci, et al against Plaintiff Sean Wawrzonek, a minor by and through his mother Joyce, and Joyce Wawrzonek. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 58 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge Michael A Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered adopting 53 Report and Recommendations, granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss; and granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; The clerk is ordered to enter a judgment in favor of all defendants. See the attached memo and order for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          Judge Michael A Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File. See the attached memo and order for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
            Opposition re 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 26, 2008 to File filed by Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
              MOTION for Extension of Time to June 26, 2008 to File Objections to findings and recommendations due to loss of data by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/20/08 to File Objections to Report and Recommendation by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek.(Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Ch. Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Donna Goff, Allison Spanos-Gearing, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Bruce Ecker, Lynne Kimball, Leslie Dupre, Thomas Philpott, Donna Scanlon, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, Paul Gagliarducci, 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Raymond Oliver, State of Massachusetts Department of Education, 39 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(B)(6) filed by Lawrence Kotin, Eileen Hagerty, William Strong, Robert Crabtree, Kotin, Crabtree and Strong, LLP. Recommendation: "...The court commends Plaintiff's persistent efforts. Indeed, the court shows that, with Plaintiff's support, her son is enjoying significant academic and personal success and learning to surmount many obstacles. Nontheless, the court is bound by the statutes of limitations detained above. Accordingly, the court hereby recommends that Defendants' motions to dismiss be ALLOWED." Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2008(Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                    Ptf's Opposition to 32 MOTION to Dismiss, 30 MOTION to Dismiss, 39 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(B)(6) filed by Joyce Wawrzonek. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: See the attached memo & order complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE to Motion re: 47 SEALED MOTION filed by State of Massachusetts Department of Education, Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Raymond Oliver. (Whitcomb, James) Modified on 1/3/2008 (Stuckenbruck, John). (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                          Opposition re 46 MOTION 3 of 3 Sought Under Seal Seeking More Time to Obtain Legal Counsel to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing. (Smith, Peter) Modified on 1/4/2008 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek re: 46 SEALED MOTION, 45 SEALED MOTION, 47 SEALED MOTION, all filed previously on 12/7/07. (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                              SEALED MOTION by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek.(Lindsay, Maurice) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                SEALED MOTION by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                  SEALED MOTION by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek.(Lindsay, Maurice) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Attorney Peter L. Smith entered. Attorney Smith's Show Cause Response due by 10/19/2007; cc/Atty. Peter L. Smith.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Extension of the Time period to 12/10/07 for Response in order to obtain legal counsel.by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Seal Parent Affidavit in support of Ptf's Enlargement of the period for response in order to obtain legal counsel, by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek.(Lindsay, Maurice) Maurice). (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                            First MEMORANDUM in Support re 39 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(B)(6) filed by Lawrence Kotin, Robert Crabtree, William Strong, Kotin, Crabtree and Strong, LLP., Eileen Hagerty. (Mercier, Marie) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                              First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(B)(6) by Lawrence Kotin, Robert Crabtree, William Strong, Kotin, Crabtree and Strong, LLP., Eileen Hagerty.(Mercier, Marie) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                Deft's assent to plaintiff's motion to enlarge time to respond to deft's motion to dismiss filed by pltf. (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/10/2007 to resp. to the Defts' motions to dismiss by Joyce Wawrzonek filed. (Document not signed) - Pltf. notified)(Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2007 (Lindsay, Maurice). Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Marie F. Mercier on behalf of Lawrence Kotin, Robert Crabtree, William Strong, Kotin, Crabtree and Strong, LLP., Eileen Hagerty (Mercier, Marie) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Pltfs' RESPONSE to Motion re 29 First MOTION for Extension of Time to September 25, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 8 Amended Complaint,, by Sean Wawrzonek, Joyce Wawrzonek filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L. Smith on behalf of Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Pltf's consolidated complaint by Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of Massachusetts Department of Education, Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Raymond Oliver. (Whitcomb, James) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by State of Massachusetts Department of Education, Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Raymond Oliver.(Whitcomb, James) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time to September 25, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 8 Amended Complaint,, by Eileen Hagerty.(Mercier, Marie) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Whitcomb on behalf of State of Massachusetts Department of Education, Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Raymond Oliver (Whitcomb, James) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Bruce Ecker - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Eileen Hagerty served on 8/13/2007, answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed William Strong - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Robert Crabtree - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Lawrence Kotin - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Raymond Oliver w/s/o Kathleen Leblanc - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Marcia Mittnacht, Director of Bureau of Special Education Appeals w/s/o Kathleen Leblanc - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed State of Massachusetts Department of Education (David Driscoll) w/s/o Kathleen Leblanc - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Susan Mandolini Jones w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cara Gelinas w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Allison Spanos-Gearing w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Leslie Dupre w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Donna Goff w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lynne Kimball w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Marguerite Myers-Killeen w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Thomas Philpott w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Donna Scanlon w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as Peter Salerno, Co-Chair Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee w/s/o Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007, answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Paul Gagliarducci - served on 8/13/2007. Answer due 9/3/2007. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lawrence Kotin, Robert Crabtree, William Strong, Kotin, Crabtree and Strong, LLP., Eileen Hagerty, Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, State of Massachusetts Department of Education, Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Raymond Oliver, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing by Joyce Wawrzonek, Sean Wawrzonek filed. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 - Amended complaint# 2 Part 3 - last part Amended complaint)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Pltf's MOTION to Amend 1 Complain to add Eileen Hagerty, Kotin, Crabtree & Strong as additional Defts. and to add herself, Joyce Wawrzonek as an additional Pltf. and MOTION for Reconsideration of the 4/02/2007 denial of her 3/28/2007 motion to amend and to accept the corrected amendment as of the 3/28/2007 date by Sean Wawrzonek filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amendment (Addendum) to the Complaint)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Ptf's MOTION for Reconsideration to allow Amendment to pleadings to add new parties and enlargement of the time period to serve all parties. by Sean Wawrzonek.(Lindsay, Maurice) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2007 (Lindsay, Maurice). (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Pltf's MEMORANDUM in Support of hsi 2 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint,, 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Transfer Case by Sean Wawrzonek filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Pltfs' MOTION to Consolidate two current related cases and MOTION to Transfer Case 03-CV-4326 from the Boston Municipal Court, Suffolk County to the U.S. District Court by Sean Wawrzonek filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Pltf's NOTICE of service by Sean Wawrzonek of 2 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint on new parties to be added to the complaint filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Pltf's MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint to add Eileen Hagerty and Kotin, Crabtree and Strong, LLP as Defts. by Sean Wawrzonek filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Cara Gelinas, Susan Jones, Donna Goff, Leslie Dupre, Hampden-Wilbraham Regional School District School Committee, State of Massachusetts Department of Education, Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Raymond Oliver, Paul Gagliarducci, Thomas Philpott, Bruce Ecker, Donna Scanlon, Lynne Kimball, Marguerite Myers-Killeen, Allison Spanos-Gearing , filed by Sean Wawrzonek. (Attachments: # 1 Cover & Category Sheets)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 505 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?