United States v. Trinh
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-10048

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2021 at 4:11 PM DT (3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Letter- non-motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Compassionate Release - 18:3582
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Service Order - 2255 Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 289 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
        SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Hung Van Le, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
          MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Hung Van Le, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions Assented by defense counsel and government as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby Tai Trinh. (Glaser, Lenore) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
              Transcript Redaction Request in case as to Quoc Boa Trinh re 248 Transcript, 247 Transcript, filed by attorney Richard L. Hoffman. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh 250 MOTION to Redact 248 Transcript, 247 Transcript,, filed by USA (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Robert B. Collings. (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Redact 248 Transcript, 247 Transcript,, as to Quoc Boa Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 11/11/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding as to Quoc Boa Trinh has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      REDACTED Transcript of Detention Hearing - Day Two as to Quoc Boa Trinh held on February 23, 2007, before Judge Collings. Court Reporter Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2008: # 1 Redacted) (Scalfani, Deborah). Modified on 12/3/2008 (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        REDACTED Transcript of Detention Hearing - Day One as to Quoc Boa Trinh held on February 15, 2007, before Judge Collings. Court Reporter Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 10/24/2008 (Scalfani, Deborah). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2008: # 1 Redacted) (Scalfani, Deborah). Modified on 12/3/2008 (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Judge William G. Young: ElectronicORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinh Time excluded from 9/3/08 until 3/2/09. (Smith, Bonnie) Modified on 9/16/2008 (Paine, Matthew) (DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER ASSIGNED IN ERROR - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED TO ENTRY). (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 212 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                            Sealed Document (Letter). (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Seal as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Unseal Document (Forfeiture Restraining Order) as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Unseal Second and Third Superseding Indictments as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Continue Hearing as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, and Antwon Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. RESTRAINING ORDER as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Stephanie Hong Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 191 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                        Sealed Document as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, and Stephanie Hong Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                          SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, and Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, and Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Seal Document as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Smith3, Dianne) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                THIRD SUPERSEDING SEALED INDICTMENT as to Quoc Boa Trinh (1) count(s) 1sss, 2sss-3sss, 11sss, 19sss-20sss, 21sss-22sss, Tan Dinh Phung (2) count(s) 1sss, Hung Van Le (5) count(s) 1sss, Lam Hong Chau (8) count(s) 1sss, Tiem Trinh (9) count(s) 1sss, 11sss, 12sss-14sss, 15sss-17sss, 19sss-20sss, 21sss-22sss, 23sss, Anna Trinh (10) count(s) 1sss, 11sss, 18sss, Antwon Trinh (11) count(s) 1sss, Tai Trinh (12) count(s) 1s,4s, 5s-7s, 8s-10s, 11s, 17s, Jeremy Katz (13) count(s) 1s, Stephanie Hong Trinh (14) count(s) 11, 12-14, 15-16, 18. (Attachments: # 1 js45's)(Smith3, Dianne) Modified on 5/12/2008 (Catino3, Theresa) to edit counts. (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Opposition by USA as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Antwon Trinh re 176 MOTION to Suppress (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application and Affidavit for Search Warrant, # 2 Exhibit Search Warrant as Returned, # 3 Exhibit Photo 1Electrical Wiring, # 4 Exhibit photo 2 Electrical Outlets, # 5 Exhibit photo 3 grow-lights, # 6 Exhibit photo 4 Grow-light Hoods, # 7 Exhibit photo 5 Bloom Boosters, # 8 Exhibit photo 6 Seed Starters, # 9 Exhibit photo 7 Buckets and Pots, # 10 Exhibit photo 8 Dirty Cups, # 11 Exhibit photo 9 Buckets with mj, # 12 Exhibit photo 10 Bucket with mj close-up 1, # 13 Exhibit photo 11 Bucket with mj close-up 2, # 14 Exhibit photo 12 MJ)(Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Judge William G. Young: ElectronicORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh Time excluded from 4/7/08 until 11/3/08. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                      STATUS REPORT by Quoc Boa Trinh, USA, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Moran, Timothy) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: for bail and arraignment only as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                          SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Quoc Boa Trinh (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, Tan Dinh Phung (2) count(s) 1ss, Hoang Pham (3) count(s) 1ss, Hung Van Le (5) count(s) 1ss, Lam Hong Chau (8) count(s) 1ss, Tiem Trinh (9) count(s) 1ss, Anna Trinh (10) count(s) 1ss, Antwon Trinh (11) count(s) 1ss, Tai Trinh (12) count(s) 1, Jeremy Katz (13) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 js45's)(Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Seal as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katzby USA. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: FOR BAIL AND ARRAIGNMENT ONLY as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Catino2, Theresa) ...Modified on 12/14/2007 (Catino3, Theresa)...to edit filing date of referral... (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                INDICTMENT as to Quoc Boa Trinh (1) count(s) 1s, Tan Dinh Phung (2) count(s) 1s, Hoang Pham (3) count(s) 1s, Quang Chien Do (4) count(s) 1s, Hung Van Le (5) count(s) 1s, Vinh Dung Diep (6) count(s) 1s, Wylun J. Chao (7) count(s) 1s, Lam Hong Chau (8) count(s) 1s, Tiem Trinh (9) count(s) 1s, Anna Trinh (10) count(s) 1s, Antwon Trinh (11) count(s) 1s. (Attachments: # 1 js45's)(Catino2, Theresa) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Richard L. Hoffman appearing for USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER to maintain custody of certain property pending conclusion of criminal forfeiture proceedings in this case as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Forfeiture of Property United States' Second Application and Proposed Order to Maintain Property in Custody for Criminal Forfeiture as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE United States' Second Forfeiture Bill of Particulars by USA as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Timothy E. Moran appearing for USA. (Moran, Timothy) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER Authorizing the United States and Its Agencies to Maintain Custody of Certain Property Pending the Conclusion of Criminal Forfeiture Proceedings as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Forfeiture of Property United States' Application and Proposed Order to Maintain Property in Custody for Criminal Forfeiture as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE United States' First Forfeiture Bill of Particulars by USA as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Albert F. Cullen, Jr.. as to Quoc Boa Trinh. (Cullen, Albert) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    Sealed Document (Letter) re 80 Motion to Seal. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Seal attached Letter, as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE USMS Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (Zahzouhi - Pet Store owner) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE USMS Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (Allen Leavens) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE USMS Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (S. Elliott/T. Bauersfeld-tenants) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE USMS Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (Edward Ciszek, Jr. "Junk Store" owner) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE United States Marshals Service Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (427 Elmwood Ave, Buffalo, NY) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles A. Clifford appearing for Quoc Boa Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh Time excluded from 4/4/07 until 9/1/08. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2008 09:00 AM before Judge William G. Young. Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2008 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF DETENTION PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. s. 3142(e) as to Quoc Boa Trinh (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Unseal Document as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Updated EXHIBIT List as to Detention Hearing(s) held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings as to Quoc Boa Trinh (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Automatic Discovery as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Herbert, James) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                EXHIBIT List as to Detention Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings as to Quoc Boa Trinh. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Andrews. as to Quoc Boa Trinh. (Andrews, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Quoc Boa Trinh: Appointment of Attorney Albert F. Cullen, Jr for Quoc Boa Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Quoc Boa Trinh: Appointment of Attorney Michael C. Andrews for Quoc Boa Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Unseal Case as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: for bail and arraignment only as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Case as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SEALED INDICTMENT as to Quoc Boa Trinh (1) count(s) 1, Tan Dinh Phung (2) count(s) 1, Hoang Pham (3) count(s) 1, Quang Chien Do (4) count(s) 1, Hung Van Le (5) count(s) 1, Vinh Dung Diep (6) count(s) 1, Wylun J. Chao (7) count(s) 1, Lam Hong Chau (8) count(s) 1, Tiem Trinh (9) count(s) 1, Anna Trinh (10) count(s) 1, Antwon Trinh (11) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 js45) (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 94 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?