L and P Property Management Company et al v. JTMD, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10207
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 10:11 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo L&P Property Management Company, Plaintiff

Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Norma McKenna and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth N. McKenna +1 781 414 7810

Toggle Switch Represented by Wood Herron & Evans, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore R. Remaklus +1 513 241 2324 +1 513 421 7269 tremaklus@whepatent.com
No Logo Leggett & Platt ,incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Norma McKenna and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth N. McKenna +1 781 414 7810

Toggle Switch Represented by Wood Herron & Evans, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore R. Remaklus +1 513 241 2324 +1 513 421 7269 tremaklus@whepatent.com
No Logo Ascion, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Strand +1 617 720 3500 +1 617 720 2441 jstrand@wolfgreenfield.com
No Logo Jtmd, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Strand +1 617 720 3500 +1 617 720 2441 jstrand@wolfgreenfield.com
v.
No Logo Ascion, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Abrahamsen +1 617 720 3500 +1 617 720 2441 rabrahamsen@wolfgreenfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Albert +1 617 720 3500 +1 617 720 2441 malbert@WolfGreenfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony W. Hong +1 713 432 9992 +1 713 432 9984 awhong@lawgroupip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Strand +1 617 720 3500 +1 617 720 2441 jstrand@wolfgreenfield.com
No Logo Jtmd, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vercruysse Murray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Bernard +1 248 540 8019

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Abrahamsen +1 617 720 3500 +1 617 720 2441 rabrahamsen@wolfgreenfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Albert +1 617 720 3500 +1 617 720 2441 malbert@WolfGreenfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony W. Hong +1 713 432 9992 +1 713 432 9984 awhong@lawgroupip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Strand +1 617 720 3500 +1 617 720 2441 jstrand@wolfgreenfield.com
No Logo L&P Property Management Company, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

No Logo Leggett & Platt ,incorporated, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 53 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Ascion, LLC., L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated, JTMD, LLC. (Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 1, 2009 to Serve Opening Expert Reports to July 29, 2009 to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports, to August 29, 2009 to Complete Discovery and to September 10, 2009 to File Dispositive Motions by Ascion, LLC., L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated, JTMD, LLC.(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
      JOINT STATEMENT pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 26(f), local rule 16.1 and in response to the Court's September 28, 2008 Order, filed.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Claim Construction, ENTERED. "The parties will within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order file a joint proposed Scheduling Order that will bring this case to an expedited resolution."(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
          Response by L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated to 48 Letter/request (non-motion) of Robert M. Abrahamsen, Esq.. (Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert M. Abrahamsen, Esq. to Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(f) MOTION to Stay Motion for Summary Judgment as to '258 Patent Issue Pending Claim Construction Ruling MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(f) filed by L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Thoeodre R. Remalkus and Exhibits thereto in Support of Motion)(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(f), MOTION to Stay Motion for Summary Judgment as to '258 Patent Issue Pending Claim Construction Ruling ( Responses due by 2/6/2008) by L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated.(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Martin Rawls-Meehan by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC. (Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                    Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC. (Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC. (Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC.(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION re 40 Memorandum of Law of Robert M. Abrahamsen, Esq. by JTMD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by JTMD, LLC. (Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                              BRIEF by L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated in Response to Defendants' Claim Construction Briefs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Transcript of Stuart Lipoff# 2 Exhibit 2 - E-mail communications)(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2007 to File Responsive Claim Construction Briefs by Ascion, LLC., L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated, JTMD, LLC.(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION re 35 Brief, 34 Brief, 33 Brief of Robert M. Abrahamsen, Esq. by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2 part 1# 3 Exhibit 2 part 2# 4 Exhibit 2 part 3# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6 part 1# 9 Exhibit 6 part 2# 10 Exhibit 7# 11 Exhibit 8 part 1# 12 Exhibit 8 part 2# 13 Exhibit 8 part 3# 14 Exhibit 9# 15 Exhibit 10# 16 Exhibit 11)(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION re 33 Brief of Stuart Lipoff by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14)(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                      BRIEF by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Memorandum Concerning U.S. Patent No. 6,684,423. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                        BRIEF by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Memorandum Concerning U.S. Patent No. 6,106,576. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                          BRIEF by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Memorandum Concerning U.S. Patent No. 5,235,258. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Abrahamsen, Robert) Modified on 11/5/2007 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                            BRIEF by L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated to Scheduling Conference,,, on Patent Claim Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 423 patent# 2 Exhibit 2 - 576 patent# 3 Exhibit 3 - 258 patent# 4 Exhibit 4 - Chart of disputed terms and constructions# 5 Exhibit 5 - List of asserted claims in priority order# 6 Exhibit 6 - 423 patent file history part I# 7 Exhibit 6 - 423 patent file history part II# 8 Exhibit 6 - 423 patent file history part III# 9 Exhibit 7 - 576 patent file history part I# 10 Exhibit 7 - 576 patent file history part II# 11 Exhibit 7 - 576 patent file history part III# 12 Exhibit 8 - 258 patent file history part I# 13 Exhibit 8 - 258 patent file history part II# 14 Exhibit 8 - 258 patent file history part III# 15 Exhibit 8 - 258 patent file history part IV# 16 Exhibit 9 - Dictionary definitions part I# 17 Exhibit 9 - Dictionary definitions part II# 18 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Arthur J. Helmicki, Ph.D.# 19 Exhibit 11 - 784 patent# 20 Exhibit 12 - Motorola MC145026/27 data sheet)(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Strand on behalf of Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC (Strand, John) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Graff on behalf of L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated (Graff, John) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC.(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated.(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) Certification# 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) Certification)(Remaklus, Theodore) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim s by Leggett and Platt, Incorporated.(Mirick, John) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim s by L and P Property Management Company.(Mirick, John) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2007 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                              DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC.(Albert, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION re 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony W. Hong by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC. (Albert, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony W. Hong by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC.(Albert, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 22, 2007 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC.(Albert, Michael) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Albert on behalf of Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC (Albert, Michael) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Abrahamsen on behalf of Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC (Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster on behalf of Ascion, LLC., JTMD, LLC (Foster, James) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Theodore R. Remaklus by L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated.(Mirick, John) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                              First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JTMD, LLC, filed by L and P Property Management Company, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated.(Mirick, John) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Mirick on behalf of Leggett and Platt, Incorporated (Mirick, John) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Mirick on behalf of L and P Property Management Company (Mirick, John) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    Case transferred in from Eastern District of Michigan; Case Number 2:06cv13311-SFC-RSW. Original file with documents numbered 1-11, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet - Eastern District of Michigan# 2 Complaint# 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement# 4 Corporate Disclosure# 5 Motion for More Definite Statement# 6 Exhibit - Motion for More Definite Statement# 7 Exhibit - Motion for More Definite Statement# 8 Exhibit - Motion for More Definite Statement# 9 Exhibit - Motion More Definite Statement# 10 Exhibit - Motion More Definite Statement# 11 Exhibit - Motion More Definite Statement# 12 Exhibit - Motion for Definite Statement# 13 Certificate of Service# 14 Notice of Hearing# 15 Notice of Appearance# 16 Response# 17 Exhibit - Response# 18 Exhibit Response# 19 Exhibit - Response# 20 Exhibit - Response# 21 Exhibit - Response# 22 Exhibit - Response# 23 Exhibit - Response# 24 Exhibit - Response# 25 Exhibit - Response# 26 Exhibit - Response# 27 Exhibit - Response# 28 Exhibit - Response# 29 Exhibit - Response# 30 Exhibit - Response# 31 Exhibit - Response# 32 Exhibit - Response# 33 Exhibit - Response# 34 Exhibit - Response# 35 Exhibit - Response# 36 Reply# 37 Reply -Exhibit# 38 Reply - Exhibit# 39 Exhibit - Response# 40 Exhibit - Reply# 41 Exhibit - Reply# 42 Exhibit - Reply# 43 Exhibit - Reply# 44 Exhibit - Reply# 45 Exhibit - Reply# 46 Exhibit - Reply# 47 Exhibit - Reply# 48 Exhibit - Reply# 49 Exhibit - Reply# 50 Exhibit - Reply# 51 Exhibit - Reply# 52 Exhibit - Reply# 53 Exhibit - Reply# 54 Exhibit - Reply# 55 Exhibit - Reply# 56 Exhibit - Reply# 57 Opinion and Order# 58 Notice) (Paine, Matthew) Modified on 2/2/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 265 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?