White et al v. Raytheon Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10222

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 66 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Johnson, Mary)
    LREF
    Blank 65 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting [46] Motion to Dismiss (Zierk, Marsha)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Response to [46] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery Defendant's Response to Government's Memorandum Regarding In Camera Review of Privileged Material (see docket entry #61) filed by Raytheon Company. (Harvey, Gary)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Memorandum of Law
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Akiko Ohata White to [61] Memorandum of Law. (Angelley, William)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
          MOTION for Leave to File Response by Akiko Ohata White.(Angelley, William)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Memorandum of Law
            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by United States of America. (Womack, Eric)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                Sealed Transcript of Motion to Dismiss held on October 31, 2008, before Judge Stearns. Court Reporter: Helana E. Kline at 508/525-7769. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Surreply to Motion
                  SUR-REPLY to Motion re [46] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White. (Flaherty, Elaine)FILED UNDER SEAL Modified on 11/3/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Gary W. Harvey for defendant Raytheon Company. (Attachments: # (1) O'Connell v. Foster Wheeler decision)(Harvey, Gary)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Sealed Document +
                      Sealed Document Reply In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [15] Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.Civ.P., FILED UNDER SEAL (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 10/28/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                        Motion for Leave to file SUR-REPLY to Motion re [46] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery /I> filed by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White. (Tarricone, Anthony) Modified on 10/29/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine). Modified on 2/23/2009 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Raytheon Company.(Knight, Peter)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE to Motion re [46] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Tarricone, Anthony) Modified on 12/8/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Excess of 20 Pages in Opposition to Def's Motion to Dismiss by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White.(Tarricone, Anthony)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/08 to File Response/Reply as to [46] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White.(Tarricone, Anthony) Modified on 11/21/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Sealed Document +
                                  Sealed Document: Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss filed by defendant Raytheon Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1 thru 11 (voluminous - manually filed))Related document [46].(Seelye, Terri)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raytheon Company re [46] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery. (Knight, Peter)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [47] MOTION to Seal Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal its Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery MOTION to Seal Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal its Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Akiko Ohata White. (Angelley, William)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Motion to Seal
                                        MOTION to Seal Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal its Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Allowing Motion to File Under Seal)(Knight, Peter)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Motion to Stay Discovery by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss, # (2) proposed order on motion to stay discovery)(Knight, Peter)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harvey, Gary)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER(Flaherty, Elaine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2008: # (1) no heading version) (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [42] MOTION for Protective Order and Statement of Interest filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration and Formal Claim of State Secrets Privilege by the Honorable Pete Geren, Secretary of the Army, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Materials)(Womack, Eric)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                  MOTION for Protective Order and Statement of Interest by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Womack, Eric)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE by United States of America of Potential Participation (Supplemental) (Womack, Eric)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE by United States of America of Potential Participation (Supplemental) (Womack, Eric)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE by United States of America of Potential Participation (Womack, Eric)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Womack on behalf of United States of America (Womack, Eric)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by Akiko Ohata White. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Gotz, James)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                              Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C - I of II, # (4) Exhibit C - II of II)(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                Defendant's ANSWER to [5] Amended Complaint by Raytheon Company.(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Local Rule 16.4 Certification by Raytheon Company.(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Objection
                                                                    Objection to [32] Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White. (Tarricone, Anthony)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and Proposed Discovery Schedule by Raytheon Company.(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and Proposed Discovery Schedule by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White.(Tarricone, Anthony)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Tarricone on behalf of Akiko Ohata White (Tarricone, Anthony)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE by Raytheon Company re [16] Memorandum in Support of Motion, Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Authority)(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Surreply to Motion
                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Motion re [15] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Akiko Ohata White. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Gotz, James)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Opposition re [26] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Raytheon Company. (Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Akiko Ohata White. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Requested Sur-Reply# (2) Exhibit A)(Gotz, James)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [22] MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, [15] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Leave Granted on August 27, 2007 filed by Raytheon Company. (Knight, Peter)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Opposition re [22] MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Akiko Ohata White. (Gotz, James)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Opposition re [21] MOTION for Hearing re [20] Opposition to Motion, Response of Defendant to Plaintiff's Request for Hearing filed by Raytheon Company. (Knight, Peter)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Raytheon Company.(Knight, Peter)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing re [20] Opposition to Motion, by Akiko Ohata White.(Gotz, James)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Opposition re [15] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex A# (2) Exhibit Ex B# (3) Exhibit Ex C# (4) Exhibit Ex D# (5) Exhibit Ex E)(Gotz, James)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 17, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to [15] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, [16] Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White.(Gotz, James)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Raytheon Company. (Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [15] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [15] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents for Exhibits# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Exhibit 3# (5) Exhibit 4# (6) Exhibit 5)(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                          Certificate of Good Standing re [12] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Kasanow by Raytheon Company. (Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [12] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Kasanow. (Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Kasanow by Raytheon Company.(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                Certificate of Good Standing re [9] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Raymond B. Biagini by Raytheon Company. (Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re [9] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Raymond B. Biagini. (Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Raymond B. Biagini by Raytheon Company.(Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Gary W. Harvey on behalf of Raytheon Company (Harvey, Gary)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Knight on behalf of Raytheon Company (Knight, Peter)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Raytheon Company waiver sent on 5/2/2007, answer due 7/2/2007. (Gotz, James)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Raytheon Company, filed by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White.(Tarricone, Anthony)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William O. Angelley, Esq. by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit William O. Angelley, Esq.)(Gotz, James) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael R. Sherwin, Esq. by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Michael R. Sherwin, Esq.)(Gotz, James)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Tarricone on behalf of Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White (Gotz, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2008: # (1) corrected notice of appearance) (Flaherty, Elaine). Modified on 1/29/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine). Modified on 3/19/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Raytheon Company, filed by Akiko Ohata White, Courtney Ayaka White, Austin Yamato White, Zachary Nathan White. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Category Form)(Gotz, James) Modified on 1/29/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?