Halchak Corporation v. Symbiot Business Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10227
District Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Halchak Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Madoff & Khoury LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Madoff +1 508 543 0040 +1 508 543 0020 madoff@mandkllp.com
v.
No Logo Symbiot Business Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Craig & Macauley Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin P. Desmery +1 617 367 9500 +1 617 742 1788 mdesmery@craigmacauley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J. Koltun +1 617 367 9500 +1 617 742 1788 jkoltun@craigmacauley.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Halchak Corporation. (Madoff, David) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to January 11, 2008 to Complete Discovery Depositions [Expedited Consideration Requested] by Halchak Corporation, Symbiot Business Group, Inc..(Desmery, Martin) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER"In accordance with the foregoing, the defendants motion todismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Docket No. 10) is DENIED. So ordered."(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/18/2007, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to LR 16.1(D). (Madoff, David) (Entered: 08/18/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Symbiot Business Group, Inc..(Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
            JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceScheduling Conference set for 8/16/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and request for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Halchak Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dale Halchak in Support# 2 Exhibit A-C of Halchak Affidavit# 3 Exhibit D and E of Halchak Affidavit)(Madoff, David) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 15, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Halchak Corporation.(Madoff, David) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                    Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Symbiot Business Group, Inc..(Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Douglas Haymore in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Symbiot Business Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Symbiot Business Group, Inc.. (Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Symbiot Business Group, Inc..(Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by all parties by all parties.(Madoff, David) (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Symbiot Business Group, Inc..(Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2007, Entered: None
                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 28, 2007 to Answer Complaint by Symbiot Business Group, Inc..(Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Halchak Corporation. (Madoff, David) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Symbiot Business Group, Inc. served on 1/12/2007, answer due 2/1/2007. (Madoff, David) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                      STATE COURT Record. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/19/07 to Respond to Complaint by Symbiot Business Group, Inc..(Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Symbiot Business Group, Inc.. (Koltun, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Suffolk County Superior Court, case number 2007-00125. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Category Sheet)(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?