Shah v. City of Boston
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10352

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 4:14 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (161) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 167 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and directing entry of an amended judgment for all Defendants for against the Plaintiff. (Woodlock, Douglas)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 Exhibit
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 163 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Jury Verdict
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Proposed Jury Verdict
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/7/2010, Entered: 3/7/2010 Exhibit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Motion to Sequester
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Transcript
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Proposed Jury Questions
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Proposed Jury Verdict
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Proposed Jury Questions
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Pretrial Memorandum
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Proposed Voir Dire
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Transcript
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Status Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Statement of Facts
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Transcript
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Terminate Deadlines
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Motion to Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2007, Entered: 2/24/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?