Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England v. Century Indemnity Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10701
District Judge Patti B. Saris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:10 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Elkind

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Albert Gibbons +1 202 420 3644 +1 202 420 2201 GibbonsJ@dicksteinshapiro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth B. Trotter +1 202 420 2912 +1 202 420 2201 TrotterK@dicksteinshapiro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Ettinger +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 jettinger@foleyhoag.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin C. Pentz +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 mpentz@foleyhoag.com
v.
No Logo Century Indemnity Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Chaffin +7 617 423 0370 +3301 330 330 1996

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guy A. Celucci +1 215 864 7000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shane R. Heskin +1 215 864 6329 +1 215 399 9603 heskins@whiteandwilliams.com
Citation Section 11 U.S.C. § 548
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Boston Gas Company and by Century Indemnity Company. (Chaffin, David) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE STAY/CLOSING entered pending the resolution of Civil Action 1:02-cv-12062-PBS. (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        Transcript of Hearing held on May 2, 2011, before Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 5/31/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2011. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Main Document 28 replaced on 5/31/2011) (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 05/10/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
          NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 29, 2010, before Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 11/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2011. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                Transcript of Status Conference held on July 1, 2010, before Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 7/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. The civil cover sheet does designate the above entitled case as related to C.A.02-12062. The Clerk is therefore ordered to also reassign this case to the judge drawnin C.A. 02-12062.(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to File A Two-Page Supplemental Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chaffin, David) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England to 8 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Elkind, David) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Century's Supplemental Memorandum In Support of its Previously Filed Motion to Dismiss by Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England.(Elkind, David) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                          Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Chaffin, David) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                            LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                            Sealed Document: Century Indemnity Company's Reply in Support of it's motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England. (Trotter, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                Joint Letter/request (non-motion) from Boston Gas Company and Century Indemnity Company. (Elkind, David) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Guy A. Cellucci. (Chaffin, David) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Boston Gas Company. (Elkind, David) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to File a Reply in Support of Century's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Seal by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chaffin, David) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England. (Elkind, David) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None
                                          Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Elkind, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2007 (Urso, Lisa). (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David L. Elkind, John A. Gibbons, and Kenneth B. Trotter Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 1538847. by Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England. (Attachments: # 1 Certification# 2 Certification# 3 Certification)(Pentz, Martin) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to June 1, 2007 to File Response/Reply to Century's Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England.(Pentz, Martin) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chaffin, David) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chaffin, David) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Certificate of Good Standing re 4 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Practice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3(b) of Shane R. Heskin by Century Indemnity Company. (Chaffin, David) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Certificate of Good Standing re 4 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Practice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3(b) of Guy A. Cellucci by Century Indemnity Company. (Chaffin, David) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Assented to MOTION for (Guy A.Celluci)& Shane R. Heskin) to Practice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3(b) by Century Indemnity Company. (Chaffin, David) Modified on 5/11/2007 (Johnson, Jay). (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Chaffin on behalf of Century Indemnity Company (Chaffin, David) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Century Indemnity Company served on 4/24/2007, answer due 5/14/2007. (Ettinger, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                              COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Century Indemnity Company Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1480444, filed by Boston Gas Company d/b/a KeySpan Energy Delivery New England. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Ettinger, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?