Bender v. Gilder et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:07-cv-40151

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by James C. Bender. (Pillay, Shoba) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Frank L. McNamara, Jr. (Cushing, Colleen) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by James C. Bender.(Pillay, Shoba) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Amend 9 Scheduling Order, by George Gilder, Frank L. McNamara, Jr.(Cushing, Colleen) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
          Opposition re 15 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Deadline to Amend Pleadings filed by George Gilder, Frank L. McNamara, Jr. (Angelini, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
            MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Deadline to Amend Pleadings by James C. Bender.(Pillay, Shoba) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by George Gilder.(Cushing, Colleen) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Frank L. McNamara, Jr.(Cushing, Colleen) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATION Pursuant to Rule 16.1(D)(3). (Pillay, Shoba) Modified on 9/28/2007 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER:Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.,Status Conference set for 5/6/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.,Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2007.,Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2008.,,Motions due by 9/1/2008.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
                        JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1(d). (Pillay, Shoba) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference:Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2007 at 10:30AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James C. Bender. (Pillay, Shoba) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                              Reply to Counterclaim of Frank L. McNamara in ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by James C. Bender. (Pillay, Shoba) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                Reply to Counterclaim of George Gilder in ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by James C. Bender. (Pillay, Shoba) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Shoba Pillay on behalf of James C. Bender (Pillay, Shoba) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                    STATE COURT Record. (Hassett, Kathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Worcester Superior Court, case number 07-0802. $ 350, receipt number 405088 (Attachments: # 1 Exhbit 1# 2 exhibit 1 A# 3 Exhibit 1 B part 1# 4 exhibit 1 B part 2# 5 exhibit 1 C# 6 Exhibit 2# 7 cover sheet# 8 category sheet)(Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?