Brine, Corp. v. STX, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11094
District Judge Mark L. Wolf, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brine Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Brine, Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Artz +1 248 433 7502 +1 248 433 7274 jsartz@dickinsonwright.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hays +1 248 433 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gauri Dhavan +1 617 570 1674 +1 617 523 1321 gdhavan@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roland Schwillinski +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rschwillinski@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Stx LLC, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Stx LLC, Defendant
No Logo Brine Corporation, Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Brine, Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Artz +1 248 433 7502 +1 248 433 7274 jsartz@dickinsonwright.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hays +1 248 433 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gauri Dhavan +1 617 570 1674 +1 617 523 1321 gdhavan@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roland Schwillinski +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rschwillinski@goodwinprocter.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 183
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Brine, Corp., STX, LLC. (Schwillinski, Roland) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
      ANSWER to Counterclaim by Brine, Corp..(Schwillinski, Roland) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
        STIPULATION re 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Joint Stipulation And Order To Extend Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Counterclaims) by Brine, Corp., STX, LLC. (Schwillinski, Roland) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by STX, LLC. (Callanan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
            ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Brine, Corp. by STX, LLC.(Callanan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE issued to Attorney Artz and Hays regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John S. Artz and Steven W. Hays Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1600033. by Brine, Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of John S. Artz# 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Steven W. Hays)(Schwillinski, Roland) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed STX, LLC served on 7/12/2007, answer due 8/1/2007. (Schwillinski, Roland) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Gauri M. Dhavan on behalf of Brine, Corp. (Dhavan, Gauri) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brine, Corp.. (Schwillinski, Roland) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT against STX, LLC Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1558387, filed by Brine, Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet # 3 Civil Category Sheet)(Schwillinski, Roland) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2007 (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 190 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?