AsymmetRx, Inc. v. Biocare Medical LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11189

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 6:54 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AsymmetRx, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Crafts +1 617 963 2355 +1 617 727 5765 amy.crafts@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
No Logo Biocare Medical, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Partridge, Snow & Hahn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas B. Otto +1 774 206 2260 dbo@psh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas B. Otto +1 774 206 2260 dbo@psh.com
v.
No Logo Biocare Medical, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Looney Cohen & Aisenberg, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill K. Hauff +1 617 371 1050 +1 617 371 1051 jhauff@lca-llp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Partridge, Snow & Hahn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas B. Otto +1 774 206 2260 dbo@psh.com
No Logo Emd Biosciences, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas I. Elkind +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 telkind@foley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naikang Tsao +1 608 257 5035 +1 608 258 4258 ntsao@foley.com
No Logo Lab Vision Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Atwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Steir, Jr. +1 207 791 1100 +1 207 791 1350 rstier@pierceatwood.com
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean L. Sweeney +1 207 791 1100 +1 207 791 1350 sean@tredec.im
No Logo Santa Cruz Biotechnology, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Casebeer Madrid & Batchelder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darcy A. Paul +1 408 873 0110

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Kohler +1 415 442 1106 +1 415 442 1001 tkohler@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey W. Moss +1 617 451 9700 +1 617 451 9710 jmoss@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey W. Moss +1 617 451 9700 +1 617 451 9710 jmoss@morganlewis.com
No Logo Sigma Chemical Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keown & Zucchero, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WAYNE A. KEOWN
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WAYNE A. KEOWN
No Logo AsymmetRx, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Crafts +1 617 963 2355 +1 617 727 5765 amy.crafts@state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Crafts +1 617 963 2355 +1 617 727 5765 amy.crafts@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
President and Fellows of Harvard College President and Fellows of Harvard College, Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "The President And Fellows of Harvard College"
Officer/Director, Korea Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Brazilian Equity Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Korea Equity Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne W. Chan +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 ychan@goodwinlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryl L Wiesen +1 614 570 1396 +1 617 523 1231 dwiesen@goodwinprocter.com
President and Fellows of Harvard College President and Fellows of Harvard College, Interested Party
Officer/Director, Korea Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Brazilian Equity Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Korea Equity Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne W. Chan +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 ychan@goodwinlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryl L Wiesen +1 614 570 1396 +1 617 523 1231 dwiesen@goodwinprocter.com
  Entries (114) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns: CONSENT JUDGMENT, ENTERED.granting 113 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Biocare Medical LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2012 to Amend Order,, Pleadings and/or Add Parties by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 16, 2012 to Amend Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings and/or Add Parties by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 7, 2012 to Amend Pleadings and/or Add Parties by AsymmetRx, Inc..(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
            ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling the Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2012 in light of the court adopting, in part, the joint statement 108 . (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
              JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Pursuant to Rule 26(F) and Local Rule 16.1. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Conferral. (Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                      ANSWER to Counterclaim by The President And Fellows of Harvard College.(Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Biocare Medical LLC by AsymmetRx, Inc..(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                          SEALED Exhibits 6 through 12 to the Declaration of Amy Crafts in Support of AsymmetRx, Inc.'s Opposition to Biocare Medical LLC's Motion to Vacate or, alternatively, modify arbitration award, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2012 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER LIFTING STAY in light of the ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 93 Motion to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 97 Opposition to Motion by Biocare Medical LLC to Vacate or, Alternatively, Modify Arbitration Award. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 (filed under seal), # 7 Exhibit 7 (filed under seal), # 8 Exhibit 8 (filed under seal), # 9 Exhibit 9 (filed under seal), # 10 Exhibit 10 (filed under seal), # 11 Exhibit 11 (filed under seal), # 12 Exhibit 12 (filed under seal))(Crafts, Amy) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                  Opposition re 93 MOTION to Vacate or, Alternatively, Modify Arbitration Award filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                    Opposition re 93 MOTION to Vacate or, Alternatively, Modify Arbitration Award filed by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Certain Documents In Support of Asymmetrx, Inc.'s Opposition to Biocare Medical, LLC's Motion to Vacate or, Alternatively, Modify Arbitration Award by AsymmetRx, Inc..(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 22, 2012 to File Response/Reply (Plaintiffs' Second Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Biocare's Motion to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award) by AsymmetRx, Inc., President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 8, 2012 to File Response/Reply as to 93 MOTION to Vacate or, Alternatively, Modify Arbitration Award by AsymmetRx, Inc., President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Vacate or, Alternatively, Modify Arbitration Award by Biocare Medical LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 11, 2012 to Move to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 11, 2012 to Move to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MANDATE of USCA as to 65 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by AsymmetRx, Inc. VACATED AND REMANDED. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                    JUDGMENT of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 65 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by AsymmetRx, Inc. Appeal 65 Terminated. This Cause having been heard and considered, it is Ordered and Adjudged: VACATED AND REMANDED. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                      OPINION of USCA No. 09-1094. For the forgoing reasons, the grant of summary judgment by the district court is vacated, and the case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings in accordance with this opinion. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 84 Motion Stay and to Compel Arbitration. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 84 MOTION To Stay and Compel Arbitration (Partially Assented-To) filed by Biocare Medical LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 84 MOTION To Stay and Compel Arbitration (Partially Assented-To) filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wiesen, Daryl) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION To Stay and Compel Arbitration (Partially Assented-To) by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Wiesen, Daryl) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Defendant, Biocare Medical LLC ANSWER to 81 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against AsymmetRx, Inc. by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 10, 2010 to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Biocare Medical LLC, filed by AsymmetRx, Inc., President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY to Response to 71 MOTION to Amend Plaintiff AsymmetRx's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Join Harvard as a Required Party Plaintiff filed by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Plaintiff AsymmetRx's Motion to Amend Complaint to Join Harvard as a Required Party Plaintiff by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff AsymmetRx's Proposed Reply)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 71 MOTION to Amend Plaintiff AsymmetRx's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Join Harvard as a Required Party Plaintiff filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wiesen, Daryl) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Wiesen, Daryl) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne W. Chan on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl L. Wiesen on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Wiesen, Daryl) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER on Plaintiff Asymmetrx's Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint to Join Harvard As A Required Party Plaintiff, entered. "...Counsel for the President and Fellows of Harvard College is ORDERED to show cause within twenty-one(21) days of the date of this Order why Harvard should not be involuntarily joined to this action as a required plaintiff....."(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Amend Plaintiff AsymmetRx's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Join Harvard as a Required Party Plaintiff filed by Biocare Medical LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by AsymmetRx, Inc. re Order, Notice of Compliance with 9/16/10 Order (Crystal-Lowry, Jamie) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Amend Plaintiff AsymmetRx's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Join Harvard as a Required Party Plaintiff by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Transcript of Summary Judgment Hearing held on July 9, 2008, before Judge Stearns. COA Case No. 08-1094. Court Reporter: James P. Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 2/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              USCA Case Number 09-1094 for 65 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 attachment, # 2 attachment)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Certified and Transmitted Notice of Appeal, Judgment, & Memorandum and Order to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 65 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by AsymmetRx, Inc. Transcript Purchase Order filed with District Court and Court Reporter (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 63 Memorandum & ORDER, 64 Judgment by AsymmetRx, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 01010000000002169356. Appeal Record due by 11/18/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Final Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B - Memo and Order)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Biocare Medical LLC against Asymmetrx, Inc.(Johnson, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDERon Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, ENTERED. ""...Plaintiff's motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED and Biocare's Motion for Summary Judgment is ALLOWED. Perforce, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. The Clerk will enter Judgment for Biocare and close the case."(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Second AFFIDAVIT of Eugene J. Castagnini in Opposition re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Licensing Issues and for a Preliminary Injunction. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Opposition re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Licensing Issues and for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Biocare Medical LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Response by Biocare Medical LLC to 45 Statement of facts, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Licensing Issues and for a Preliminary Injunction FILED UNDER SEAL filed by Biocare Medical LLC. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION Regarding Proof of Service of Biocare's Reply to AsymmetRx's Opposition to its Motion for Summary Judgment by Biocare Medical LLC. (Hauff, Jill) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Under Seal to AsymmetRx's Opposition to Biocare's Motion for Summary Judgment by Biocare Medical LLC.(Hauff, Jill) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION Regarding Proof of Service of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Licensing Issues and for a Preliminary Injunction, and Supporting Papers, Filed Under Seal by Biocare Medical LLC. (Hauff, Jill) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Exhibit 8-13 to the Declaration of Colin G. Cabral in Opposition to Biocare's Motion for Summary Judgment by AsymmetRx, Inc..(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 52 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Colin G. Cabral in Opposition to Defendant Biocare's Motion for Summary Judgment by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment AsymmetRx's Counter-Statement of Facts Pursuant to LR 56.1 in Opposition to Biocare's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Opposition re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Biocare LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re 49 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Biocare Medical LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of facts re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Biocare Medical LLC, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Biocare Medical LLC, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION Regarding Proof of Service of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Supporting Papers, Filed Under Seal by Biocare Medical LLC. (Hauff, Jill) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Colin G. Cabral in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Licensing Issues and for a Preliminary Injunction by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT of facts re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Licensing Issues and for a Preliminary Injunction. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Licensing Issues and for a Preliminary Injunction filed by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Licensing Issues and for a Preliminary Injunction by AsymmetRx, Inc..(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal Notice of Dismissal of Sigma Chemical with Respect to Count IV Only by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered.related document 39 (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 3/17/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. STIPULATION AND Protective ORDER(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Treatment of Confidential Information by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulated Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Crafts on behalf of AsymmetRx, Inc. (Crafts, Amy) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal For Santa Cruz Biotechnology (Count V only) by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION. (Keown, Wayne) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT of counsel pursuant to LR 16.1(d). (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 16.1(d)(3), by Plaintiff AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Dismissal of Lab Vision Corp. by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) Modified on 12/7/2007 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 16.1(D), by Defendant, Biocare Medical LLC. (Hauff, Jill) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 7, 2007 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lab Vision Corp..(Sweeney, Sean) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2007 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lab Vision Corp..(Sweeney, Sean) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas D. Kohler and Darcy A. Paul Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1728095. by Santa Cruz Biotechnology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Affidavit)(Moss, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Santa Cruz Biotechnology, Inc..(Moss, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Sigma Chemical Co..(Keown, Wayne) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 15, 2007 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lab Vision Corp..(Sweeney, Sean) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim Asymmetrx, Inc's Answer to Biocare Medical LLC's Counterclaim by AsymmetRx, Inc..(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference entered.Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against AsymmetRx, Inc. by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to October 31, 2007 to File Answer by Sigma Chemical Co..(Keown, Wayne) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/31/07 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Santa Cruz Biotechnology, Inc..(Moss, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 31, 2007 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lab Vision Corp..(Sweeney, Sean) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to September 30, 2007 to Answer Complaint by Sigma Chemical Co..(Keown, Wayne) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/28/07 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Santa Cruz Biotechnology, Inc..(Moss, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 28, 2007 to Respond to Complaint by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 28, 2007 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lab Vision Corp..(Sweeney, Sean) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AsymmetRx, Inc. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed EMD Biosciences, Inc. served on 7/6/2007, answer due 7/26/2007. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Biocare Medical LLC served on 7/10/2007, answer due 7/30/2007. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Lab Vision Corp. served on 7/9/2007, answer due 7/30/2007. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Sigma Chemical Co. served on 7/6/2007, answer due 7/26/2007. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Moss on behalf of Santa Cruz Biotechnology, Inc. (Moss, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/31/07 to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Santa Cruz Biotechnology, Inc..(Moss, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 31, 2007 to Respond to Complaint by Biocare Medical LLC.(Otto, Douglas) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Sean L. Sweeney on behalf of Lab Vision Corp. (Sweeney, Sean) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 31, 2007 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lab Vision Corp..(Stier, Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Naikang Tsao by EMD Biosciences, Inc..(Elkind, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to August 31, 2007 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by EMD Biosciences, Inc..(Elkind, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Sigma Adrich, Inc. to respond to complaint until 8/31/07(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1574921, filed by AsymmetRx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 From AO120# 3 Category Form)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?