Jenzabar, Inc. v. Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11219
District Judge Joseph L. Tauro, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 2:36 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Jenzabar Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence R. Kulig +1 617 439 8900
TERMINATED: 06/03/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward J. Naughton +1 617 856 8567 +61728078 617 728 0783

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L. Mitchell +1 617 854 1418 +1 617 523 6850 matthew.mitchell@hklaw.com

Represented by Jenzabar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamison J. Barr +61781222 617 781 2225 jamison.barr@jenzabar.net
No Logo Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850

Represented by Bowditch & Dewey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine S. Collins +1 508 926 3441 +1 508 929 3041 ccollins@bowditch.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen E. Cushing +1 508 791 3511 +1 508 929 3063 ccushing@bowditch.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Felper +1 508 926 3452 +1NANA +1N 1NANANA dfelper@bowditch.com
No Logo Michael L. Glubke, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850

Represented by Bowditch & Dewey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine S. Collins +1 508 926 3441 +1 508 929 3041 ccollins@bowditch.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen E. Cushing +1 508 791 3511 +1 508 929 3063 ccushing@bowditch.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Felper +1 508 926 3452 +1NANA +1N 1NANANA dfelper@bowditch.com
v.
No Logo Dorothy Hess, Defendant

Represented by Bowditch & Dewey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine S. Collins +1 508 926 3441 +1 508 929 3041 ccollins@bowditch.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Felper +1 508 926 3452 +1NANA +1N 1NANANA dfelper@bowditch.com
No Logo Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850

Represented by Bowditch & Dewey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine S. Collins +1 508 926 3441 +1 508 929 3041 ccollins@bowditch.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen E. Cushing +1 508 791 3511 +1 508 929 3063 ccushing@bowditch.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Felper +1 508 926 3452 +1NANA +1N 1NANANA dfelper@bowditch.com
No Logo Michael L. Glubke, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850

Represented by Bowditch & Dewey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine S. Collins +1 508 926 3441 +1 508 929 3041 ccollins@bowditch.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen E. Cushing +1 508 791 3511 +1 508 929 3063 ccushing@bowditch.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Felper +1 508 926 3452 +1NANA +1N 1NANANA dfelper@bowditch.com
No Logo Jenzabar Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence R. Kulig +1 617 439 8900
TERMINATED: 06/03/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward J. Naughton +1 617 856 8567 +61728078 617 728 0783

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L. Mitchell +1 617 854 1418 +1 617 523 6850 matthew.mitchell@hklaw.com

Represented by Jenzabar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamison J. Barr +61781222 617 781 2225 jamison.barr@jenzabar.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Jenzabar, Inc. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
    REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider.(Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
      AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT by Jenzabar, Inc., Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke. (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
        STATUS REPORT Re: Mediation by Jenzabar, Inc., Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke. (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT Re: Mediation by Jenzabar, Inc., Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess. (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Settlement -Mediation Report by all parties (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT Re: Mediation by Jenzabar, Inc., Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke. (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT Re: Mediation by Jenzabar, Inc., Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke. (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                  STATUS REPORT Re: Mediation by Jenzabar, Inc., Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke. (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Lawrence R. Kulig as counsel to the plaintiff, Jenzabar, Inc. (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF AND ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION set for 2/19/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. COUNSEL MUST READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED ORDER.(Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered re: DISCOVERY. A Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for December 8, 2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jamison J. Barr on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Barr, Jamison) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                              JOINT STATEMENT of counsel. (Cushing, Colleen) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence R. Kulig on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Kulig, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke.(Cushing, Colleen) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference to 02/09 by Jenzabar, Inc., Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke.(Hampton, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen E. Cushing on behalf of Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke (Cushing, Colleen) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess.(Collins, Christine) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro: RULE 26 DISCOVERY ORDER entered. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Jenzabar, Inc. by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke.(Felper, David) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered denying 2 Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.; denying as moot 19 Motion for Hearing (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Hearing re 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jenzabar, Inc..(Hampton, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K. Hampton on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Hampton, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Mitchell on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Mitchell, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jenzabar, Inc..(Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke. (Felper, David) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Request of Defendants Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc. and Michael L. Glubke To File Reply Brief to Motion re 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke. (Collins, Christine) Modified on 1/28/2008 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION re 12 Opposition to Motion To Dismiss of Jamison J. Barr by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Opposition re 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 22, 2008 to File Response/Reply as to 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jenzabar, Inc..(Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/18/2008 to File Response/Reply as to 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jenzabar, Inc..(Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Certificate of Consultation Under Local Rule 7.1 by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess (Collins, Christine) Modified on 1/3/2008 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess. (Felper, David) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Felper on behalf of Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess (Felper, David) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christine S. Collins on behalf of Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess (Collins, Christine) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of David M. Felper in Support re 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3 and 4)(Collins, Christine) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Michael L. Glubke in Support re 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess. (Collins, Christine) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess. (Collins, Christine) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dynamic Campus Solutions, Inc., Michael L. Glubke, Dorothy Hess.(Collins, Christine) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1579925, filed by Jenzabar, Inc..(Naughton, Edward) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 850 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?