Unknown
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-mc-10174

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER OF TERM SUSPENSION entered. (McLaughlin, Tracy) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
    Clerk's Order to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 11/20/2009. (McLaughlin, Tracy) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
      Notice of Filing of Disciplinary Action by Sarah Allison Thornton in re attorney: Gary M. Lee (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 83.6)(McLaughlin, Tracy) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
        ORDER OF TERM SUSPENSION received from the Supreme Judicial Court retroactive to September 15, 2009, the date of his temporary suspension. (McLaughlin, Tracy) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
          ORDER OF IMMEDIATE TEMPORARY SUSPENSION received from the Supreme Judicial Court effective September 15, 2009. (McLaughlin, Tracy) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Colman, Claire) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              Remark: Copy of State Court Judgement of Reinstatement. (Colman, Claire) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT of Compliance of Respondent Gary M. Lee by Gary M. Lee, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER OF TERM SUSPENSION RETROACTIVE TO JULY 6, 2007 entered. (Colman, Claire) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                    Response by Gary M. Lee to 2 Clerk's Order to Show Cause, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                      Clerk's Order to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 8/13/2007. (Colman, Claire) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                        Notice of Filing of Disciplinary Action by Sarah Allison Thornton in re attorney: Gary M. Lee (Attachments: # 1 Copy of State Order of Term Suspension# 2 Local Rule 83.6)(Colman, Claire) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 14 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?