Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11344
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 10, 2016 at 1:07 AM ST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Columbia Air Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by IZARD NOBEL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Izard, Jr. +1 860 493 6292 +1 860 493 6290 rizard@snlaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Peter Kindall +1 860 493 6294 +1 860 493 6290 firm@izardnobel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford S. Babbitt +1 860 275 8209 +1 860 275 8299 bbabbitt@rc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth R. Leong +1 860 275 8245 +1 860 275 8299 eleong@rc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kate L. Moran +1 617 557 5984 +1 617 557 5999 kcarter@rc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig A. Raabe +1 860 275 8200 craabe@rc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sarraf Gentile LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RONEN SARRAF +1 212 868 3610 +1 212 918 7967 ronen@sarrafgentile.com
v.
No Logo Fidelity Management Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S Dittmar +1 617 570 1944 +2278 227 227 8591 jdittmar44@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Fleckner +1 617 570 1153 +2278 227 227 8591

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Apfel +1 617 570 1970 +1 617 227 8591 dapfel@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison V. Douglass +1 617 570 1676 +1 617 523 1231 adouglass@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN D. BOYLE +1 215 627 3087

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon M. Barrett +1 202 383 5308 +1 202 383 5414 sbarrett@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Norris Eccles +1 202 383 5363 +1 202 383 5414 reccles@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford S. Babbitt +1 860 275 8209 +1 860 275 8299 bbabbitt@rc.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered denying 38 Motion to Alter Judgment (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
    REPLY to Response to 38 MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend Judgment and for Leave to Amend Complaint - Leave to File Granted on November 7, 2008 filed by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
      MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and for Leave to Amend Complaint by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Reply Brief)(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
        Opposition re 38 MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend Judgment and for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Fleckner, James) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Support re 38 MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend Judgment and for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Class Action Complaint)(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
            MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend Judgment and for Leave to Amend Complaint by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff(Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on February 20, 2008 before Judge O'Toole. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark P. Kindall Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000001835444. by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                      Response by Fidelity Management Trust Company to 31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Response to Supplemental Authority). (Fleckner, James) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                        Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant Fidelity Management Trust Company's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint to February 20, 2008 by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Fleckner, James) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                          Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Charters v. John Hancock)(Babbitt, Bradford) Modified on 1/25/2008 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Charters decision)(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION to Strike 23 Reply to Response to Motion, (Defendant's Memorandum in Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike) filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Revised Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint)(Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Strike 23 Reply to Response to Motion, by Columbia Air Services, Inc..(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION re 26 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 25 MOTION to Strike 23 Reply to Response to Motion, (Part 1 of 2) filed by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Strike 23 Reply to Response to Motion, by Columbia Air Services, Inc..(Babbitt, Bradford) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2007: # 1 Main Document) (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ronen Sarraf Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1773232. by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ronen Sarraf)(Moran, Kate) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                          (Reply Memorandum In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint) re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaintfiled by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Fleckner, James) Modified on 12/13/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2007: # 1 Revised Reply Memorandum) (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 7, 2007 to File Response/Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Fleckner, James) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                **See notice of correction dated 11/5/07** MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Babbitt, Bradford) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). Modified on 11/5/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Columbia Air Services, Inc..(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Craig A. Raabe Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1691484. by Columbia Air Services, Inc..(Babbitt, Bradford) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth R. Leong Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1691469. by Columbia Air Services, Inc..(Babbitt, Bradford) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert A. Izard Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1691336. by Columbia Air Services, Inc..(Babbitt, Bradford) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part I)# 2 Exhibit A (Part II)# 3 Exhibit A (Part III)# 4 Exhibit B (Part I)# 5 Exhibit B (Part II)# 6 Exhibit B (Part III)# 7 Exhibit B (Part IV)# 8 Exhibit B (Part V)# 9 Exhibit B (Part VI)# 10 Exhibit C# 11 Exhibit D# 12 Exhibit E# 13 Exhibit F# 14 Exhibit G)(Fleckner, James) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Fleckner, James) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Fleckner, James) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Briefing Schedule by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Fleckner, James) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert N. Eccles, Brian D. Boyle, Stephen D. Brody, and Shannon M. Barrett Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 1651436. by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Robert N. Eccles)# 2 Exhibit B (Certificate of Brian D. Boyle)# 3 Exhibit C (Certificate of Stephen D. Brody)# 4 Exhibit D (Certificate of Shannon M. Barrett))(Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Bradford S. Babbitt for the Firm of Sarraf Gentile LLP (Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Alison V. Douglass on behalf of Fidelity Management Trust Company (Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Fleckner on behalf of Fidelity Management Trust Company (Fleckner, James) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Apfel on behalf of Fidelity Management Trust Company (Apfel, David) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Dittmar on behalf of Fidelity Management Trust Company (Dittmar, James) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 21, 2007 to Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Dittmar, James) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Dittmar, James) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford S. Babbitt on behalf of Columbia Air Services, Inc. (Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Fidelity Management Trust Company Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1602921, filed by Columbia Air Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet# 2 Summons)(Moran, Kate) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 219 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?