USA v. Noe et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-10240
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Catherine M. Larkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Salsberg & Schneider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment John Salsberg +1 617 227 7788 +1 617 227 7766 jrs@salsbergandschneider.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue to March 2, 2011 to Sentencing as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
    MOTION to Continue Sentencing to January 20, 2011 as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/13/2010 as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
        MOTION for Disclosure as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION to Continue as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Richard G. Stearns: PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Catherine M. Larkin. Sentencing set for 12/9/2010 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
              WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Catherine M. Larkin. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) as to Catherine M. Larkin (13) count(s) 1s, 2s. (Missing JS45) (Cummings, Mary) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION to Continue Change of Plea Hearing as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Catherine M. Larkin. Time excluded from 7/14/10 until 9/9/10. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                      Assented to MOTION for Rule 11 Hearing and to Exclude Time as to Catherine M. Larkin by USA. (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Catherine M. Larkin (13 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Catherine M. Larkin (13) as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Simeone, Maria) (Simeone, Maria). (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Money Judgment) as to Joseph Noe by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Order of Forfeiture (Money Judgment))(Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                              Summons Issued as to Catherine M. Larkin (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: Issue summons and hearing re: pretrial memorandum as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                  Memorandum from Pretrial Services as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Oxford, Judy) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to Permit Out-of-State Travel as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) Modified on 8/25/2009 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: REPORT AND ORDER on Final Status Conference and ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Scott Bulgar, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin; Time excluded from 6/15/09 until 7/30/09. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (#210); The Motion (#210) is ALLOWED IN PART as set forth below and otherwise DENIED. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                          Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from May 6, 2009 to June 15, 2009 as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Excludable Delay to as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                              SEALED ex parte MOTION as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Authorization of Services or Funds for Duplication of Discovery as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from December 5, 2008 to March 9, 2009 as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Pre-Trial Services as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from South Shore Midwifery & Ob.Gyn, P.C.)(Salsberg, John) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Second MOTION to travel as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from employer)(Salsberg, John) Modified on 9/23/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine)to amend conditions of release to permit out of state travel. (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Timothy E. Moran appearing for USA. (Moran, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Opposition by USA as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin re 155 MOTION for Disclosure of Percipient Witnesses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Joining Defendant Delavega's Motion for Disclosure of Percipient Witnesses (Docket #155) by Joseph Noe as to Joseph Noe, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin (Krupp, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Margaret E. Fox appearing for Catherine M. Larkin (Fox, Margaret) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Bill of Particulars as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Continue Bail Review Hearing as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Memorandum from Pretrial as to Catherine M. Larkin for action on conditions of release.(rcvd in open court 3/14/08) (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from March 14, 2008 to June 23, 2008 as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin held on September 18, 2007 before Judge Sorokin. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin held on November 19, 2007 before Judge Sorokin. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Excludable Delay to 3/14/08 as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    Letter (non-motion) regarding List of Video Recordings as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay to as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE re automatic disclosure pursuant to Local Rule 116.1 as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : REPORT AND ORDER on Initial Status Conference and ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin Time excluded from 9/18/07 until 11/19/07., Discovery to be completed by 10/18/2007. Status Conference set for 11/19/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            Opposition by USA as to Catherine M. Larkin re 29 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Government re: Detention by USA as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkin (Attachments: # 1)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Catherine M. Larkin: Appointment of Attorney John Salsberg for Catherine M. Larkin. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Excludable Delay to as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Levitt, Peter) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      appearance Bond Entered as to Catherine M. Larkin in amount of $ 25,000., (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Catherine M. Larkin (13) 25,000.00 bond as to Catherine M. Larkin. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Unseal Case as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine M. Larkinby USA. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: PRE TRIAL PROCEEDINGS as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine Larkin (Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Case as to Joseph Noe, Brian Delavega, Scott Bulgar, John Pombriant, Scott Towne, Jose Espada, Mark Direnzo, Chris Sullivan, Edward Bullio, Tony Lima, Steven O'Brien, John Agresta, Catherine Larkinby USA. (Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT as to Joseph Noe (1) count(s) 1, 2, Brian Delavega (2) count(s) 1, Scott Bulgar (3) count(s) 1, John Pombriant (4) count(s) 1, Scott Towne (5) count(s) 1, Jose Espada (6) count(s) 1, Mark Direnzo (7) count(s) 1, Chris Sullivan (8) count(s) 1, Edward Bullio (9) count(s) 1, Tony Lima (10) count(s) 1, Steven O'Brien (11) count(s) 1, John Agresta (12) count(s) 1, Catherine Larkin (13) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 js45)(Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 430 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?