Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. v. Troy et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11576

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 4:51 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Atlantic Research Marketing Systems Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes Bostock & Cronin LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob W Schneider +1 978 809 3911 +1 978 809 3869 jschneider@hbcllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes, Messina, Gilman & Hayes, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gannon +1 617 345 6900 +1 617 443 1999 kgannon@hayesmessina.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J Hayes +1 978 809 3850 +1 978 809 3869 phayes@hayesmessina.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder cscott@hinckleyallen.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder cbush@hinckleyallen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Iandiorio & Teska

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy J. Coleman +1 781 890 5678 +1 781 890 1150 rcoleman@iandiorio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Cronin +1 617 439 2292 +1 617 310 9292 pcronin@nutter.com
No Logo Stephen P Troy, Jr., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Ogden +1 617 963 2211 nicholas.ogden@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder tmcnulty@lalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder ahammitte@lalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Schlesinger +1 212 232 1354 tschlesinger@lbbslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowrie, Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carla Miriam Levy +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 clevy@ll-a.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Kinder & Mosseau Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damian R. LaPlaca +1 617 778 7500 dlaplaca@nkmlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian G. Samito +1 617 523 0144 christian@samitolaw.com
No Logo TROY INDUSTRIES INC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Ogden +1 617 963 2211 nicholas.ogden@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder ahammitte@lalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder tmcnulty@lalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Schlesinger +1 212 232 1354 tschlesinger@lbbslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowrie, Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carla Miriam Levy +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 clevy@ll-a.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Kinder & Mosseau Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damian R. LaPlaca +1 617 778 7500 dlaplaca@nkmlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian G. Samito +1 617 523 0144 christian@samitolaw.com
v.
No Logo Stephen P Troy, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Ogden +1 617 963 2211 nicholas.ogden@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia B. Gary +1 617 406 4500 +1 617 406 4501 pgary@donovanhatem.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K. Willey +1 617 406 4572

Toggle Switch Represented by Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder ahammitte@lalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder tmcnulty@lalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Schlesinger +1 212 232 1354 tschlesinger@lbbslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowrie, Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carla Miriam Levy +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 clevy@ll-a.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Kinder & Mosseau Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damian R. LaPlaca +1 617 778 7500 dlaplaca@nkmlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian G. Samito +1 617 523 0144 christian@samitolaw.com
No Logo TROY INDUSTRIES INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Ogden +1 617 963 2211 nicholas.ogden@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia B. Gary +1 617 406 4500 +1 617 406 4501 pgary@donovanhatem.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K. Willey +1 617 406 4572

Toggle Switch Represented by Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder tmcnulty@lalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder ahammitte@lalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Schlesinger +1 212 232 1354 tschlesinger@lbbslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowrie, Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carla Miriam Levy +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 clevy@ll-a.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Kinder & Mosseau Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damian R. LaPlaca +1 617 778 7500 dlaplaca@nkmlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian G. Samito +1 617 523 0144 christian@samitolaw.com
No Logo Atlantic Research Marketing Systems Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder cbush@hinckleyallen.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder cscott@hinckleyallen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Iandiorio & Teska

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy J. Coleman +1 781 890 5678 +1 781 890 1150 rcoleman@iandiorio.com
No Logo Judge Morris E. Lasker, Mediator
No Logo Kenneth P. Neiman, Mediator
No Logo Marianne B. Bowler, Mediator
No Logo Marianne B. Bowler, ADR Provider
  Entries (359) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Date of Dismissal by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Date of Dismissal by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Date of Dismissal by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Date of Dismissal by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 348 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena to Leed-Himmel Industries, Inc. filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                  Opposition re 348 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena to Leed-Himmel Industries, Inc. filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 29, 2012 to Complete Discovery by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Gannon, Kevin) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena to Smith & Wesson Holding Corp. Seeking Testimony by Stephen P Troy, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schlesinger, Thomas) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena Leed-Himmel Industries, Inc. Seeking Testimony by Stephen P Troy, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schlesinger, Thomas) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 349 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                            MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena to Leed-Himmel Industries, Inc. by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schlesinger, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Schlesinger on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (Schlesinger, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re 320 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1367(c) filed by Troy Industries, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                    Opposition re 340 MOTION to Preclude Defendants from Relying On Any Profit Figure Other Than $200 Per Unit filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Gary, Patricia) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                      DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. . (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                        Opposition re 329 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Accounting of Attorneys' Fees and Award of Damages under Chapter 93A) filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION re 340 MOTION to Preclude Defendants from Relying On Any Profit Figure Other Than $200 Per Unit , 341 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Preclude Defendants from Relying On Any Profit Figure Other Than $200 Per Unit by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 340 MOTION to Preclude Defendants from Relying On Any Profit Figure Other Than $200 Per Unit filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Preclude Defendants from Relying On Any Profit Figure Other Than $200 Per Unit by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 1, 2012 to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for An Accounting of Attorneys' Fees and Award of Damages Under Chapter 93A by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Gary, Patricia) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Ann Lamport Hammitte of Carla M. Levy (Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob W. Schneider on behalf of Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. (Schneider, Jacob) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION in Opposition re 320 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1367(c) by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cronin, Paul) (Modified on 1/23/2012 to Correct Docket Text and Document Linkage) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 320 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1367(c) filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Opposition re 320 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1367(c) filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Damian R. LaPlaca of Christian G. Samito (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah K. Willey on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (Willey, Sarah) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 329 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Accounting of Attorneys' Fees and Award of Damages under Chapter 93A) and attached Declaration of Jacob W.S. Schneider filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of JWSS)(Cronin, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2012: # 2 Exhibit - A, # 3 Exhibit - B, # 4 Exhibit - C, # 5 Exhibit - D, # 6 Exhibit - E) (Paine, Matthew). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/13/2012) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 330 replaced on 1/13/2012) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees (Accounting of Attorneys' Fees and Award of Damages under Chapter 93A) by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER (modified)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Transcript of Status Conference held on December 21, 2011, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 1/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-11576-WGY, 1:10-cv-10761-WGY, 1:11-cv-10384-WGY(Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Recommendations for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff and Defendants. (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint MOTION to Modify the Trial Date by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 20, 2012 to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) Matthew). (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Nicholas A. Ogden by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Modified on 12/28/2011 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia B. Gary on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (Gary, Patricia) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 320 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1367(c) filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gary, Patricia) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1367(c) by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Gary, Patricia) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE entered re 317 USCA Mandate: "Pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(K), the above entitled case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another Judge for any further proceedings in accordance with the Mandate of the U.S. Court of Appeals. In addition, related cases 10-cv-10761 Atlandtic Research Marketing System, Inc., v. Troy Industries, Inc. and 11-cv-10384 Troy v. Samson Manufacturing Corporation et al also shall be reassigned to the same Judge. So Ordered." (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to 285 Notice of Appeal, filed by Troy Industries, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr., 284 Notice of Appeal, filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Appeal 284 , 285 Terminated. This cause having been heard and considered, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: AFFIRMED-IN-PART, REVERSED-IN-PART, AND VACATED IN PART. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              OPINION of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 285 Notice of Appeal, filed by Troy Industries, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr., 284 Notice of Appeal, filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 270 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered DENYING 278 Motion for Attorney Fees. "DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is on appeal. The Court will address attorneys fees after the appeal." (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Transcript of Hearing held on May 4, 2011, before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. COA Case No. 11-1447. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young at 508-384-2003, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: None. Digital Recording transcribed by Maryann Young. Redaction Request due 8/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2011. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 7/26/2011 (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Transcript of Hearing held on December 8, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. COA Case No. 11-1447. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young at 508-384-2003, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: None. Digital Recording transcribed by Maryann Young. Redaction Request due 8/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2011. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          USCA Case Number 11-1447 for 308 Notice of Appeal, filed by Troy Industries, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 308 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette) Modified on 6/1/2011 (Ramos, Jeanette). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2011: # 1 Main Document) (Ramos, Jeanette). (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 307 Order, Order on Motion to Compel,, by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-3426829 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 6/16/2011. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. DENIED (Docket Entry # 296) as to the Barreras affidavit. This court reviewed each of the paragraphs of the affidavit in camera. Upon such review, and in the interest of the finality of the judgment, see Duhaime v. John Hancock Mut. Life Ins. Co., 183 F.3d 1, 7-8 (1st Cir. 1999), as well as other reasons, this court declines to order production of the affidavit. (Bowler, Marianne) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 296 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents FURTHER filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Paul J. Cronin (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Paul J. Hayes (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum on Jurisdiction to Hear and Rule on Motion of Defendants to Compel Production of Documents by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Memorandum on Jurisdiction to Hear and Rule on Motion of Defendants to Compel Production of Documents)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Response by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. re 301 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Documents to November 16, 2010 Plaintiff's Statement of Assent to Defendant's Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Cronin, Paul) Modified on 11/5/2010 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Documents to November 16, 2010 by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Opposition re 296 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS A-G re 297 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C Part 1, # 3 Exhibit C Part 2, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Patch, Christine) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/16/2010) (Hourihan, Lisa). (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 (A)(2) by Damian R. LaPlaca on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 296 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 278 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses In Support of Plaintiff's Statement of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. Judge Judge Patti B. Saris.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. for proceedings held on 09/10/2008-06/26/2009 before Judge Patti B. Saris, (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 2011-1003 for 285 Notice of Appeal, filed by Troy Industries, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number 2011-1002 for 284 Notice of Appeal, filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 289 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Statement of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Statement of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Fees by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 285 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette). (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals For the Federal Circuit re 284 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette). (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-3088192 Fee Status: n. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/19/2010. (LaPlaca, Damian) Modified on 10/1/2010 to link to documents and orders being appealed (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-3085770 Fee Status: n. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/18/2010. (Cronin, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2010: # 1 Main Document) (Ramos, Jeanette). (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. re 282 Affidavit of Cynthia Auckly-Barbuto. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Cynthia Auckly-Barbuto in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Fees by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 278 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Main Document 281 replaced on 9/28/2010) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION of Defendants for an Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) Modified on 9/20/2010 to correct event (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 270 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summary of Atty Fees, # 2 Exhibit Vendor invoices, # 3 Exhibit Atty Bios - Scott & Bush, # 4 Exhibit Atty Bios - Mintz, # 5 Exhibit Atty Bio - S. Holmes, # 6 Exhibit NLJ Billing Survey, # 7 Exhibit NLJ Billing Survey, # 8 Exhibit NLJ Billing Survey, # 9 Affidavit Declaration of DG Bostock with exhibit, # 10 Affidavit Declaration of S Holmes with exhibit, # 11 Affidavit Declaration of C Scott with exhibits, # 12 Affidavit Declaration of K Teska with exhibit, # 13 Affidavit Declaration of C Parente with exhibit)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered denying 262 Motion for Reconsideration (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 276 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Request for an Accounting of Fees Under Seal by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Paul Hayes. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/10/2010 to File Response/Reply as to 270 MOTION for Attorney Fees Until September 10, 2010 by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 270 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of ADR Conference: Mediation Hearing set for 8/25/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. It is ORDERED that all parties and trial counsel are REQUIRED to attend and must have full binding settlement authority, leave of Court is required for any exceptions. All confidential meditation briefs are to be submitted to the Court via facsimile at (617) 204-5833 no later than TWO BUSINESS DAYS prior to the hearing. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution before Magistrate Judge Bowler as soon as possible.(Alba, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 262 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Chapter 93A Findings filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Reconsider a Chapter 93A Finding and Conclusion by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2010: # 1 Exhibit reply memorandum) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 262 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Chapter 93A Findings filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Refer to Mediation by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 262 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Chapter 93A Findings filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration of the Chapter 93A Findings by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 237 MOTION for New Trial filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s A-E)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of U.S. Patent Re39,465 filed by Troy Industries, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr., and finding as moot 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. NOTICE OF ACTION BY U.S. PATENT OFFICE RELEVANT TO U.S. PATENT NO. RE39,465 E (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 243 MOTION for Remittitur filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 248 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s A - E)(Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of 248 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Reply, # 2 Exhibit s A - E)(Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. to 252 MOTION for Leave to File Further Memorandum of Law on Chapter 93A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Further Memorandum of Law on Chapter 93A by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 248 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit A to Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 10, 2010 to File Response/Reply as to 243 MOTION for Remittitur by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A)(Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 248 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on January 27, 2010, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 2/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of ADR Conference: Mediation Hearing set for 3/25/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. All parties and trial counsel are REQUIRED to attend and must have full binding settlement authority, leave of Court is required for any exceptions. All confidential meditation briefs are to be submitted to the Court via facsimile at (617) 204-5833 no later than TWO BUSINESS DAYS prior to the hearing. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 244 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 243 MOTION for Remittitur filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Remittitur by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation before Magistrate Judge Bowler A.S.A.P.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 240 MOTION for Judgment NOV filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2010: # 12 Signed Memorandum) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment NOV by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2010: # 1 Signed Document) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2010: # 1 Signed Document) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 237 MOTION for New Trial filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Errata D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2010: # 17 Signed Memorandum) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for New Trial by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2010: # 1 Signed Document) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Hayes on behalf of Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cronin on behalf of Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. (Cronin, Paul) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 223 MOTION to Strike Declaration of John R. Nixon and Portions of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Suppor of its Motion for Summary Judgment, 229 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Nixon Declaration And Portions of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law In Suport of Its Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 199 MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial filed by Troy Industries, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr..(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Nixon Declaration And Portions of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law In Suport of Its Motion For Summary Judgment by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 223 MOTION to Strike Declaration of John R. Nixon and Portions of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Suppor of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 226 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 224 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of John R. Nixon and Portions of Plaintiff's Memorandum i Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 223 MOTION to Strike Declaration of John R. Nixon and Portions of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Suppor of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Declaration of John R. Nixon and Portions of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Suppor of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 6, 2009 to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 220 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of U.S. Patent Re39,465 filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7 part 1, # 8 Exhibit 7, part 2, # 9 Exhibit 7, part 3, # 10 Exhibit 7, part 4, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Memorandum in Support of A.R.M.S.'s Motion for Summary Judgment by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of U.S. Patent Re39,465 by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of U.S. Patent Re39,465 by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Judge Saris from Craig M. Scott regarding mediation with Eric Van Loon held on 8/31/09. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Motion for Summary Judgment held on July 7, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Mazilli at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/15/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 208 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Day 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Day 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Day 5, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Day 6, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Trial Exhibit 54, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Trial Exhibit 61, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Trial Exhibit 62, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Trial Exhibit 63, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Trial Exhibit 64, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Trial Exhibit 67, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Trial Exhibit 68 Part 1, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K - Trial Exhibit 68 Part 2, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L - Trial Exhibit 69, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M - Trial Exhibit 150, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit N - Trial Exhibit 158, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit O - Trial Exhibit 168, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit P - Trial Exhibit 236)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Status Hearing held on July 13, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 199 MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 203 Proposed Findings of Fact. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Day 1 Tr.), # 2 Exhibit B (Day 2 Tr.), # 3 Exhibit C (Day 3 Tr.), # 4 Exhibit D (Day 4 Tr.), # 5 Exhibit E (Day 5 Tr.), # 6 Exhibit F (Day 6 Tr.), # 7 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 15, # 10 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 16, # 11 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 17, # 12 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 19, # 13 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 20, # 14 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 21, # 15 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 22, # 16 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 23, # 17 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 24, # 18 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 25, # 19 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 26, # 20 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 28, # 21 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 29, # 22 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 31, # 23 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 32, # 24 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 33, # 25 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 43, # 26 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 53, # 27 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 54, # 28 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 55, # 29 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 59, # 30 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 60, # 31 Exhibit 62, # 32 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 67, # 33 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 68 - part 1, # 34 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 68 - part 2, # 35 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 69, # 36 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 70, # 37 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 71 - part 1, # 38 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 71 - part 2, # 39 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 71 - part 3, # 40 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 75, # 41 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 89, # 42 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 167, # 43 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 201, # 44 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 255)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Findings of Fact by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by Troy Industries, Inc. to 198 Memorandum of Law on Issues of Doctrine of Equivalents, Inequitable Conducts and Inventor Testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.'s Letter/request (non-motion) from Craig M. Scott re mediation. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 199 MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Motion for Declaration of Mistrial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Motion re 183 MOTION to Recall Juror No. 7 on Rule 606(b) Inquiry filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/6/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 183 MOTION to Recall Juror No. 7 on Rule 606(b) Inquiry filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Jury Trial Day Nine held on June 26, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Debra M. Joyce at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Jury Trial Day Eight held on June 25, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Debra M. Joyce at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Jury Trial Day Seven held on June 24, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso and Debra M. Joyce at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Jury Trial Day Six held on June 23, 2090, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JURY VERDICT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Jury Trial Day Five held on June 22, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso and Brenda K. Hancock at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Jury Trial Day Four held on June 18, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Jury Trial Day Three held on June 17, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli and Marcia G. Patrisso at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Jury Trial Day Two held on June 16, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli and Marcia G. Patrisso at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Jury Trial Day One held on June 15, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli and Marcia G. Patrisso at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 183 MOTION to Recall Juror No. 7 on Rule 606(b) Inquiry filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Recall Juror No. 7 on Rule 606(b) Inquiry by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. Motion to Recall Juror No. 7 on Rule 606(b) Inquiry (LaPlaca, Damian) Modified and re-filed on 6/30/2009 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Court's Witness List for Jury Trial held 6/15/09 through 6/18/09 and 6/22/09 through 6/26/09. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Court's Exhibit List for Jury Trial held 6/15/09 through 6/18/09 and 6/22/09 through 6/26/09. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 174 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by all defendants. (Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Proposed Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Verdict by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 171 MOTION to Compel Production of Interference Requet, Patents, Patent Applications, and File Histories Withheld By ARMS MOTION for Sanctions filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/21/2009, Entered: 6/21/2009 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/20/2009, Entered: 6/20/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 121 Second MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE INCONSISTENT TESTIMONY ON TROY'S NET PROFITS filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 121 Second MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE INCONSISTENT TESTIMONY ON TROY'S NET PROFITS (Further Opposition) filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Interference Requet, Patents, Patent Applications, and File Histories Withheld By ARMS, MOTION for Sanctions ( Responses due by 6/30/2009) by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 169 MOTION to Produce Exclude Late Produced Trial Exhibits and Related Testimony filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude Late Produced Trial Exhibits and Related Testimony by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) Modified on 6/17/2009 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REVISED Exhibit List by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Opposition re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment Following Claim Construction filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 164 Emergency MOTION for Contempt filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 164 Emergency MOTION for Contempt filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Motion for Contempt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION for Contempt by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 3, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/29/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 151 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II Through VIII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of US Patent No. RE39,465 filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. re 138 Opposition to Motion, Clarification of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Referring to Proceedings, Rulings and/or the Verdict in Prior Litigation (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from Thomas P. McNulty - Index of Issues and Suggested Schedule for Pretrial Conference and Summary Judgment Hearing. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of US Patent No. RE39,465 filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 150 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Damage filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 144 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Deposition Testimony filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 3)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2009: # 4 Corrected Memorandum) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II Through VIII of Plaintiff's Complaint by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Damage by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of U.S. Patent No. Re39,465 by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of U.S. Patent No. Re39,465)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. of Deposition Counter-Designation of Sgt. Major Martin Barreras (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to 110 Proposed Voir Dire by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to 128 Exhibit List by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' Revised Trial Exhibit List by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc... (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Deposition Testimony by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to 117 Witness List by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' WITNESSES. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 121 Second MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE INCONSISTENT TESTIMONY ON TROY'S NET PROFITS filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 122 Third MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE PATENT EVIDENCE filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to 117 Witness List by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' EXHIBITS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 123 Fourth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF INDIVIDUALS NOT IDENTIFIED IN TROY'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 118 First MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO RULINGS AND VERDICT FROM PRIOR LITIGATION filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 113 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony on the Contempt Action Against Samson Manufacturing, Corp. filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 114 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony on the Existence of Patent Infringement Claims filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 115 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Atlantic Research Marketing Systems from claiming Disgorgement Damages filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objections to 108 Pretrial Disclosures by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 126 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 123 Fourth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF INDIVIDUALS NOT IDENTIFIED IN TROY'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 122 Third MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE PATENT EVIDENCE filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 121 Second MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE INCONSISTENT TESTIMONY ON TROY'S NET PROFITS filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 118 First MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO RULINGS AND VERDICT FROM PRIOR LITIGATION filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. re 108 Exhibit List OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FOR USE AT TRIAL (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fourth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF INDIVIDUALS NOT IDENTIFIED IN TROY'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Third MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE PATENT EVIDENCE by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE INCONSISTENT TESTIMONY ON TROY'S NET PROFITS by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. to Pre-Trial Disclosures. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO RULINGS AND VERDICT FROM PRIOR LITIGATION by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List and Exhibit List by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Preclude Atlantic Research Marketing Systems from claiming Disgorgement Damages by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony on the Existence of Patent Infringement Claims by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony on the Contempt Action Against Samson Manufacturing, Corp. by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(LaPlaca, Damian) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pretrial Disclosures Exhibit List and Witness List by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc... (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Judge Saris from Craig M. Scott, enclosing the requested 13 identified photographs discussed at the conclusion of the Markman hearing. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 17, 2009 to Make Expert Disclosures by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. No mediation to be held at this time. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 3, 2009 to Make Expert Disclosures by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Markman Hearing held on January 23, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 3/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER with respect to Mediation, ENTERED, cc:cl. Mediation set for 3/19/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (Boston Courthouse) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Confidential mediation memoranda shall be submitted by no later than 3/16/09- SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.(Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Patti B. Saris: PRETRIAL ORDER entered. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution a.s.a.p. before Magistrate Judge Neiman. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Christian G. Samito on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (Samito, Christian) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of Re 39,465 filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex.A to Ex. 1, # 4 Exhibit Ex. B to Ex. 1, # 5 Exhibit Ex. C to Ex. 1, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D to Ex. 1)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 94 Opposition to Motion, of Thomas P. McNulty, by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 92 MOTION To Preclude Defendants from Referencing Expert Testimony Concerning Claims Construction and to Preclude Defendants from Asserting the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 92 MOTION To Preclude Defendants from Referencing Expert Testimony Concerning Claims Construction and to Preclude Defendants from Asserting the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION To Preclude Defendants from Referencing Expert Testimony Concerning Claims Construction and to Preclude Defendants from Asserting the Doctrine of Equivalents by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. Certification of Troy that Redactions in Opposition to Motion Summary Judgment Are Confidential (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. re Order on Motion for Leave to File, Certification of Christine K. Bush (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment of invalidty of Claims 31-36 of Re39,465 (Dckt. 72) (refiled per Court Order in Unredacted Form, With Ex. C Unredacted by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Unredacted)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 86 Opposition to Motion of Thomas McNulty In Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PART 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I - Part 1, # 11 Exhibit I - Part 2, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal, With Exhibits by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. re 69 Brief, Plaintiff's Brief in Response to Defendants' Opening Claims Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of US Patent No. RE39,465 filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Errata 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. to 71 Brief, RE ARMS CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 I)(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts II Through VIII of the Complaint filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Errata 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Errata 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts II Through VIII of the Complaint and Exhibits by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS F-K re 79 SEALED MOTION by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 79 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/2/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Thomas McNulty regarding 72 . (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Craig M. Scott Pursuant to the Court's Order of November 17, 2008, Regarding Filing Under Seal by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Christian G. Samito Pursuant to the Court's Order of November 17, 2008, Regarding Filing Under Seal by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Samito, Christian) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K-Part 1, # 7 Exhibit K-Part 2)(Samito, Christian) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # Exhibit 1, # Exhibit 2, # Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Scott, Craig) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2008: # 11 Exhibit 1 Redacted, # 12 Exhibit 2 Redacted, # 13 Exhibit 3 Redacted, # 14 Exhibit 5 Redacted) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 31-36 of US Patent No. RE39,465 by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Re: Opening Claims Construction Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Stephen P. Troy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Samito, Christian) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. Re Initial Claim Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Summary Judgment Briefs by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Dismissing Count IX of Complaint and COunt III of Counterclaim by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Leave to File Claims Construction Briefs and Motions for Summary Judgment, with Exhibits, Under Seal by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Joint Discovery Memorandum Pursuant to Court Order, With Exhibits, Under Seal by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Samito, Christian) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 10, 2008, before Judge Alexander. Court Reporter: Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 10/27/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Christian G. Samito regarding September 10, 2008 Electronic Order. (Samito, Christian) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. for proceedings held on September 10, 2008 before Judge Joyce London Alexander.. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 58 SEALED MOTION filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 58 SEALED MOTION filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J)(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal REDACTED Motion of Troy to Compel Production of Documents by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED Motion of Troy To Compel Production of Documents, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Opposition to 43 Motion to Quash a Deposition Subpoena Served on its Massachusetts Attorneys. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C )(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 48 MOTION to Compel Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. to Properly Designate and Produce A Witness Or Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) To Testify As To Certain Topics MOTION to Compel Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. to Properly Designate and Produce A Witness Or Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) To Testify As To Certain Topics filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition and Exhibits to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Atlantic Research Marketing Systems to Designate and Produce A Witness or Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) to Testify as to Certain Topics by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Scott, Craig) Modified on 7/21/2008 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Extend the Scheduling Order by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 43 MOTION to Quash A Deposition Subpoena Served on Its Massachusetts Attorneys, 49 MOTION to Quash Revised Motion to Quash a Deposition Subpoena Served on Its Massachusetts Attorneys, Refiled Pursuant to Court Order Dated June 26,2008 [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL Opposition and Exhibit to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash a Deposition Subpoena Served On Its Massachusetts Attorneys by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 49 MOTION to Quash Revised Motion to Quash a Deposition Subpoena Served on Its Massachusetts Attorneys, Refiled Pursuant to Court Order Dated June 26,2008 filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash Revised Motion to Quash a Deposition Subpoena Served on Its Massachusetts Attorneys, Refiled Pursuant to Court Order Dated June 26,2008 by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. to Properly Designate and Produce A Witness Or Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) To Testify As To Certain Topics by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Tab A)(Samito, Christian) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. McNulty on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION to Compel Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. to Properly Designate and Produce a Witness or Witnesses by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2 (Section 1), # 5 Exhibit C Part 2 (Section 2))(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. to Properly Designate and Produce A Witness or Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) to Testify As To Certain Topics by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Samito, Christian) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 43 MOTION to Quash A Deposition Subpoena Served on Its Massachusetts Attorneys filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash A Deposition Subpoena Served on Its Massachusetts Attorneys by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Compel, With Exhibit, Under Seal, by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Hammitte, Ann) Modified on 6/23/2008 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /Complete Certain Noticed Depositions After the Close of Discovery by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Petition to Be Excused from Court Attendance by Craig M. Scott (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. of Petition to be Excused from Court Attendance from July 25, 2008 through and including August 4, 2008 of Attorney Christine K. Bush (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Christian G. Samito on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (Samito, Christian) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Clarke, Barbara) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 35 MOTION for Reconsideration re 28 MOTION for Protective Order, 31 MOTION for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,,,,,, 30 Opposition to Motion Opposition to Defendants' Request for Reconsideration or Clarification of the Order on the Motions for Protective Order filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re 28 MOTION for Protective Order, 31 MOTION for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,,,,,, 30 Opposition to Motion by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 33 MOTION for Hearing Motion for a Claims Construction (Markman) Hearing filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Hearing Motion for a Claims Construction (Markman) Hearing by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing Pursuant to Markman [Pretrial] by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition to 28 Motion for Protective Order and Cross-MOTION for Entry of Defendants' Protective Order by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A). Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 28 MOTION for Protective Order and Cross-Motion for Entry of Defendants' Proposed Protective Order filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 28 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Protective Order)(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Joint Scheduling Order. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: April, 2008. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Ogden, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Joint Proposed Schedule. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to Counterclaim ANSWER to 18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc..(Bush, Christine) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting 14 Motion for Clarification re 5 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Troy Industries, Inc., Stephen P Troy, Jr., 9 Opposition to Motion filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. "The docket entry should be amended to state that only the scheduling conference was rescheduled. A hearing on the motion to dismiss is no longer necessary." (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. McNulty on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (McNulty, Thomas) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 14 MOTION for Clarification re 5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 9 Opposition to Motion filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 14, 2007 to File Answer by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Clarification re 5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 9 Opposition to Motion by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Judge Saris from Craig M. Scott requesting an adjournment of the 12/5/07 Scheduling Conference and Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christine K. Bush on behalf of Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. (Bush, Christine) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Scott on behalf of Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2007 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (NOTE: the scheduling conference will be held at the hearing on the motion to dismiss previously set for the same date and time.)(Alba, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: 10/8/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 10/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Miriam Levy on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (Levy, Carla) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Lamport Hammitte on behalf of Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. (Hammitte, Ann) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss or to Stay Litigation by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay filed by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ogden, Nicholas) Modified on 9/26/2007 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss or Stay by Stephen P Troy, Jr, Troy Industries, Inc..(Ogden, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. served on 8/28/2007, answer due 9/17/2007. (Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. Troy Industries, Inc. served on 8/29/2007, answer due 9/18/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1640091, filed by Atlantic Research Marketing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Civil Cover Sheet # 4 Catagory Sheet)(Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?